EP2587916 - PESTICIDAL COMPOSITIONS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 18.03.2016 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.03.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 20.04.2016 [2016/16] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Bayer Intellectual Property GmbH Alfred-Nobel-Strasse 10 40789 Monheim / DE | [2013/19] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
REID, Byron 1413 Whittington Drive Raleigh NC 27614 / US | 02 /
KIJLSTRA, Johan Quellenweg 10 51519 Odenthal / DE | 03 /
ROSENFELDT, Frank Zum Stadion 70 40764 Langenfeld / DE | 04 /
NENTWIG, Guenther Schoffenweg 5 51381 Leverkusen / DE | 05 /
GUTSMANN, Volker Brunnenstr. 54 40764 Langenfeld / DE | 06 /
SONNECK, Rainer Ottweilerstr. 12 51375 LEverkusen / DE | [2013/19] | Representative(s) | BIP Patents c/o Bayer Intellectual Property GmbH Alfred-Nobel-Straße 50 40789 Monheim am Rhein / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2013/19] | BIP Patents c/o Bayer Intellectual Property GmbH Creative Campus Monheim Alfred-Nobel-Straße 10 40789 Monheim / DE | Application number, filing date | 11801308.5 | 25.05.2011 | WO2011US37901 | Priority number, date | US20100361013P | 02.07.2010 Original published format: US 361013 P | [2013/19] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2012003060 | Date: | 05.01.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/01] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2587916 | Date: | 08.05.2013 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.01.2012 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2013/19] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 05.01.2012 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.10.2013 | Classification | IPC: | A01N25/04, A01N25/10, A01N25/24, A01N53/00 | [2013/46] | CPC: |
A01N25/04 (EP,KR,US);
A01N25/24 (EP,KR,US);
A01N25/00 (KR);
A01N25/10 (EP,KR,US);
A01N25/22 (KR);
A01N29/12 (KR);
| C-Set: |
A01N25/04, A01N53/00 (EP,US);
A01N25/10, A01N53/00 (US,EP);
A01N25/24, A01N53/00 (US,EP)
|
Former IPC [2013/19] | A01N25/24, A01N57/00, A01N31/14, A01N29/12 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/19] | Title | German: | PESTIZIDZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN | [2013/19] | English: | PESTICIDAL COMPOSITIONS | [2013/19] | French: | COMPOSITIONS PESTICIDES | [2013/19] | Entry into regional phase | 04.02.2013 | National basic fee paid | 04.02.2013 | Search fee paid | 04.02.2013 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.02.2013 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.02.2013 | Examination requested [2013/19] | 30.04.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 28.05.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.08.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.10.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.02.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.07.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.11.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2016/16] | 10.12.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2016/16] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 28.05.2014 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.05.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.05.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.05.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]DE2804563 (KOENIG GUENTER DIPL CHEM DR) [X] 1,8-10 * page 3, line 14 - line 22 * * page 4, line 14 - line 21 * * example 1 * [Y] 1-10; | [Y]US4303642 (KANGAS DONALD A) [Y] 1-10 * column 2, line 45 - column 3, line 20 * * column 4, line 59 - line 68 * * tables IV, VI *; | [Y]WO9410979 (ISP INVESTMENTS INC [US]) [Y] 1-10 * page 3, line 12 - page 4, line 2 * * composition IIIB * * table 13 * * example 27 *; | [XY]EP0862856 (ROHM & HAAS [US]) [X] 1,8-10 * page 2, line 36 - line 37 * * page 7, line 41 - line 45 * * page 6, line 43 - line 56 * * page 8, line 40 - page 9, line 11 * [Y] 1-10; | [Y]WO03034823 (SIAMDUTCH MOSQUITO NETTING COM [TH], et al) [Y] 1-10 * page 2, line 1 - line 21 * * page 4, line 7 * * page 7, line 21 - line 24 * * composition 2 *; | [Y]US2008286226 (TORELD III WILLIAM [US], et al) [Y] 1-10 * paragraphs [0002] , [ 0005] ** examples 1, 2 *; | [XDY]WO2009141109 (BAYER CROPSCIENCE AG [DE], et al) [XD] 1-10 * example F * [Y] 1-10 | International search | [Y]US5023247 (BOULANGER JEAN-PAUL [CA], et al); | [Y]US2008171658 (DYLLICK-BRENZINGER RAINER [DE], et al); | [A]US2009317433 (FINCH CHARLES W [US], et al); | [XP]US2011071228 (KIJLSTRA JOHAN [DE], et al) |