EP2655452 - HYDROPHILIC VINYLIDENE FLUORIDE POLYMERS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 29.12.2017 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 20.01.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 09.12.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL, IS | published on 19.08.2020 [2020/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Solvay Specialty Polymers Italy S.p.A. Via Lombardia, 20 20021 Bollate (MI) / IT | [2013/44] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ABUSLEME, Julio A Via Bergamo 5 I-21047 Saronno (Varese) / IT | 02 /
BIANCARDI, Roberto Via Quattro Marie 14/3 I-20060 Bellinzago Lombardo (MI) / IT | 03 /
ROBLOT, Fabien 10A avenue des Droits de l'Homme et du Citoyen F-21300 Chenove / FR | 04 /
BERTASA, Anna Maria Via Leopardi 8 I-24025 Gazzaniga (BG) / IT | 05 /
BRINATI, Giulio Via Oglio 1 I-20139 Milano / IT | [2013/44] | Representative(s) | Benvenuti, Federica, et al Solvay S.A. Intellectual Assets Management Rue de la Fusée, 98 1130 Haren / BE | [N/P] |
Former [2017/08] | Benvenuti, Federica, et al Solvay S.A. Département de la Propriété Intellectuelle Rue de Ransbeek, 310 1120 Bruxelles / BE | ||
Former [2013/44] | Benvenuti, Federica, et al SOLVAY SA Intellectual Assets Management Rue de Ransbeek, 310 1120 Bruxelles / BE | Application number, filing date | 11802029.6 | 13.12.2011 | [2017/08] | WO2011EP72508 | Priority number, date | EP20100196420 | 22.12.2010 Original published format: EP 10196420 | [2013/44] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2012084580 | Date: | 28.06.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/26] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2655452 | Date: | 30.10.2013 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.06.2012 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2013/44] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2655452 | Date: | 22.02.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/08] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 28.06.2012 | Classification | IPC: | C08F14/22, C08F251/02, B01D71/78, C08J5/22, C08F290/04, C08F290/10, C08F290/02, B01D71/32 | [2016/20] | CPC: |
C08F14/22 (EP,US);
C08F259/08 (KR);
B01D71/32 (EP,US);
B01D71/78 (EP,KR,US);
C08F214/225 (EP,US);
C08F251/02 (EP,KR,US);
C08F290/02 (EP,US);
C08F290/10 (EP,KR,US);
C08F8/00 (US);
| C-Set: |
C08F251/02, C08F214/22 (EP,US);
C08F290/02, C08F214/22 (US,EP);
C08F290/10, C08F214/22 (US,EP)
|
Former IPC [2013/44] | C08F251/02, B01D71/78, C08J5/22, C08F290/04, C08F290/10, C08F290/02 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/44] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | HYDROPHILE VINYLIDENFLOURIDPOLYMERE | [2013/44] | English: | HYDROPHILIC VINYLIDENE FLUORIDE POLYMERS | [2013/44] | French: | POLYMÈRES DE FLUORURE DE VINYLIDÈNE HYDROPHILES | [2013/44] | Entry into regional phase | 22.07.2013 | National basic fee paid | 22.07.2013 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.07.2013 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.07.2013 | Examination requested [2013/44] | 05.02.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 18.12.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 26.02.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.04.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.08.2016 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 29.09.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.12.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 08.12.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 08.12.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 18.12.2015 | Opposition(s) | 23.11.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/05] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.01.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 05.01.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 04.01.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 02.01.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AL | 22.02.2017 | AT | 22.02.2017 | CY | 22.02.2017 | CZ | 22.02.2017 | DK | 22.02.2017 | EE | 22.02.2017 | ES | 22.02.2017 | FI | 22.02.2017 | HR | 22.02.2017 | LT | 22.02.2017 | LV | 22.02.2017 | MC | 22.02.2017 | MK | 22.02.2017 | NL | 22.02.2017 | PL | 22.02.2017 | RO | 22.02.2017 | RS | 22.02.2017 | SE | 22.02.2017 | SI | 22.02.2017 | SK | 22.02.2017 | SM | 22.02.2017 | TR | 22.02.2017 | BG | 22.05.2017 | NO | 22.05.2017 | GR | 23.05.2017 | IS | 22.06.2017 | PT | 22.06.2017 | [2020/33] |
Former [2020/15] | AT | 22.02.2017 | |
CY | 22.02.2017 | ||
CZ | 22.02.2017 | ||
DK | 22.02.2017 | ||
EE | 22.02.2017 | ||
ES | 22.02.2017 | ||
FI | 22.02.2017 | ||
HR | 22.02.2017 | ||
LT | 22.02.2017 | ||
LV | 22.02.2017 | ||
MC | 22.02.2017 | ||
MK | 22.02.2017 | ||
NL | 22.02.2017 | ||
PL | 22.02.2017 | ||
RO | 22.02.2017 | ||
RS | 22.02.2017 | ||
SE | 22.02.2017 | ||
SI | 22.02.2017 | ||
SK | 22.02.2017 | ||
SM | 22.02.2017 | ||
TR | 22.02.2017 | ||
BG | 22.05.2017 | ||
NO | 22.05.2017 | ||
GR | 23.05.2017 | ||
PT | 22.06.2017 | ||
Former [2019/51] | AT | 22.02.2017 | |
CY | 22.02.2017 | ||
CZ | 22.02.2017 | ||
DK | 22.02.2017 | ||
EE | 22.02.2017 | ||
ES | 22.02.2017 | ||
FI | 22.02.2017 | ||
HR | 22.02.2017 | ||
LT | 22.02.2017 | ||
LV | 22.02.2017 | ||
MC | 22.02.2017 | ||
MK | 22.02.2017 | ||
NL | 22.02.2017 | ||
PL | 22.02.2017 | ||
RO | 22.02.2017 | ||
RS | 22.02.2017 | ||
SE | 22.02.2017 | ||
SI | 22.02.2017 | ||
SK | 22.02.2017 | ||
SM | 22.02.2017 | ||
BG | 22.05.2017 | ||
NO | 22.05.2017 | ||
GR | 23.05.2017 | ||
PT | 22.06.2017 | ||
Former [2019/46] | AT | 22.02.2017 | |
CY | 22.02.2017 | ||
CZ | 22.02.2017 | ||
DK | 22.02.2017 | ||
EE | 22.02.2017 | ||
ES | 22.02.2017 | ||
FI | 22.02.2017 | ||
HR | 22.02.2017 | ||
LT | 22.02.2017 | ||
LV | 22.02.2017 | ||
MC | 22.02.2017 | ||
NL | 22.02.2017 | ||
PL | 22.02.2017 | ||
RO | 22.02.2017 | ||
RS | 22.02.2017 | ||
SE | 22.02.2017 | ||
SI | 22.02.2017 | ||
SK | 22.02.2017 | ||
SM | 22.02.2017 | ||
BG | 22.05.2017 | ||
NO | 22.05.2017 | ||
GR | 23.05.2017 | ||
PT | 22.06.2017 | ||
Former [2019/30] | AT | 22.02.2017 | |
CZ | 22.02.2017 | ||
DK | 22.02.2017 | ||
EE | 22.02.2017 | ||
ES | 22.02.2017 | ||
FI | 22.02.2017 | ||
HR | 22.02.2017 | ||
LT | 22.02.2017 | ||
LV | 22.02.2017 | ||
MC | 22.02.2017 | ||
NL | 22.02.2017 | ||
PL | 22.02.2017 | ||
RO | 22.02.2017 | ||
RS | 22.02.2017 | ||
SE | 22.02.2017 | ||
SI | 22.02.2017 | ||
SK | 22.02.2017 | ||
SM | 22.02.2017 | ||
BG | 22.05.2017 | ||
NO | 22.05.2017 | ||
GR | 23.05.2017 | ||
PT | 22.06.2017 | ||
Former [2018/14] | AT | 22.02.2017 | |
CZ | 22.02.2017 | ||
DK | 22.02.2017 | ||
EE | 22.02.2017 | ||
ES | 22.02.2017 | ||
FI | 22.02.2017 | ||
HR | 22.02.2017 | ||
LT | 22.02.2017 | ||
LV | 22.02.2017 | ||
NL | 22.02.2017 | ||
PL | 22.02.2017 | ||
RO | 22.02.2017 | ||
RS | 22.02.2017 | ||
SE | 22.02.2017 | ||
SI | 22.02.2017 | ||
SK | 22.02.2017 | ||
SM | 22.02.2017 | ||
BG | 22.05.2017 | ||
NO | 22.05.2017 | ||
GR | 23.05.2017 | ||
PT | 22.06.2017 | ||
Former [2017/51] | AT | 22.02.2017 | |
CZ | 22.02.2017 | ||
DK | 22.02.2017 | ||
EE | 22.02.2017 | ||
ES | 22.02.2017 | ||
FI | 22.02.2017 | ||
HR | 22.02.2017 | ||
LT | 22.02.2017 | ||
LV | 22.02.2017 | ||
NL | 22.02.2017 | ||
PL | 22.02.2017 | ||
RO | 22.02.2017 | ||
RS | 22.02.2017 | ||
SE | 22.02.2017 | ||
SK | 22.02.2017 | ||
SM | 22.02.2017 | ||
BG | 22.05.2017 | ||
NO | 22.05.2017 | ||
GR | 23.05.2017 | ||
PT | 22.06.2017 | ||
Former [2017/50] | AT | 22.02.2017 | |
CZ | 22.02.2017 | ||
DK | 22.02.2017 | ||
EE | 22.02.2017 | ||
ES | 22.02.2017 | ||
FI | 22.02.2017 | ||
HR | 22.02.2017 | ||
LT | 22.02.2017 | ||
LV | 22.02.2017 | ||
NL | 22.02.2017 | ||
PL | 22.02.2017 | ||
RO | 22.02.2017 | ||
RS | 22.02.2017 | ||
SE | 22.02.2017 | ||
SK | 22.02.2017 | ||
BG | 22.05.2017 | ||
NO | 22.05.2017 | ||
GR | 23.05.2017 | ||
PT | 22.06.2017 | ||
Former [2017/49] | AT | 22.02.2017 | |
CZ | 22.02.2017 | ||
EE | 22.02.2017 | ||
ES | 22.02.2017 | ||
FI | 22.02.2017 | ||
HR | 22.02.2017 | ||
LT | 22.02.2017 | ||
LV | 22.02.2017 | ||
NL | 22.02.2017 | ||
RO | 22.02.2017 | ||
RS | 22.02.2017 | ||
SE | 22.02.2017 | ||
SK | 22.02.2017 | ||
BG | 22.05.2017 | ||
NO | 22.05.2017 | ||
GR | 23.05.2017 | ||
PT | 22.06.2017 | ||
Former [2017/48] | AT | 22.02.2017 | |
CZ | 22.02.2017 | ||
ES | 22.02.2017 | ||
FI | 22.02.2017 | ||
HR | 22.02.2017 | ||
LT | 22.02.2017 | ||
LV | 22.02.2017 | ||
NL | 22.02.2017 | ||
RS | 22.02.2017 | ||
SE | 22.02.2017 | ||
BG | 22.05.2017 | ||
NO | 22.05.2017 | ||
GR | 23.05.2017 | ||
PT | 22.06.2017 | ||
Former [2017/41] | AT | 22.02.2017 | |
ES | 22.02.2017 | ||
FI | 22.02.2017 | ||
HR | 22.02.2017 | ||
LT | 22.02.2017 | ||
LV | 22.02.2017 | ||
NL | 22.02.2017 | ||
RS | 22.02.2017 | ||
SE | 22.02.2017 | ||
BG | 22.05.2017 | ||
NO | 22.05.2017 | ||
GR | 23.05.2017 | ||
PT | 22.06.2017 | Cited in | International search | [X]US5145921 (LASSON PIERRE [BE]) [X] 6 * claims 1, 6 *; | [A] - MU C ET AL, "Remarkable improvement of the performance of poly(vinylidene fluoride) microfiltration membranes by the additive of cellulose acetate", JOURNAL OF MEMBRANE SCIENCE, ELSEVIER SCIENTIFIC PUBL.COMPANY. AMSTERDAM, NL, vol. 350, no. 1-2, doi:DOI:10.1016/J.MEMSCI.2010.01.004, ISSN 0376-7388, (20100315), pages 293 - 300, (20100219), XP026915573 [A] 1-10 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.memsci.2010.01.004 | by applicant | WO2008129041 | EP0417585 | US5145921 | - ALSO, MENG, FANGANG ET AL., "Recent advances in membrane bioreactors (MBRs): membrane fouling and membrane material", WATERRESEARCH., (2009), vol. 43, doi:doi:10.1016/j.watres.2008.12.044, pages 1489 - 1512, XP026026952 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.watres.2008.12.044 | - LIU, FU ET AL., "Preparation of hydrophilic and fouling resistant poly(vinylidene fluoride) hollow fiber membranes", JOURNAL OF MEMBRANE SCIENCE, (2009), vol. 345, doi:doi:10.1016/j.memsci.2009.09.020, pages 331 - 339, XP026675640 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.memsci.2009.09.020 |