EP2619325 - A METHOD FOR DETECTING, QUANTIFYING AND MAPPING DAMAGE AND/OR REPAIR OF DNA STRANDS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.04.2017 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Genomic Vision 80-84 rue des Meuniers 92220 Bagneux / FR | [2013/31] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CINQUE, Lucia 12 rue Clouet 75015 Paris / FR | 02 /
BENSIMON, Aaron 5 rue Clos de l'Abbaye 92160 Antony / FR | [2013/31] | Representative(s) | Desaix, Anne, et al Ernest Gutmann - Yves Plasseraud SAS 3, rue Auber 75009 Paris / FR | [2013/31] | Application number, filing date | 11802132.8 | 22.09.2011 | [2016/22] | WO2011IB02584 | Priority number, date | US20100386358P | 24.09.2010 Original published format: US 386358 P | [2013/31] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2012038831 | Date: | 29.03.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/13] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2619325 | Date: | 31.07.2013 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.03.2012 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2013/31] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2619325 | Date: | 01.06.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/22] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 24.05.2012 | Classification | IPC: | C12Q1/68 | [2013/31] | CPC: |
A61K33/242 (EP,US);
C12Q1/6834 (US);
A61K33/243 (EP,US);
C12Q1/6804 (US);
C12Q1/6806 (EP,US);
C12Q1/6886 (US);
| C-Set: |
C12Q1/6806, C12Q2521/131, C12Q2523/101, C12Q2527/125, C12Q2563/107 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/31] | Extension states | BA | 14.03.2013 | ME | 14.03.2013 | Title | German: | VERFAHREN FÜR DEN NACHWEIS, DIE QUANTIFIZIERUNG UND KARTIERUNG VON SCHÄDEN UND/ODER REPARATUREN VON DNA-STRÄNGEN | [2013/31] | English: | A METHOD FOR DETECTING, QUANTIFYING AND MAPPING DAMAGE AND/OR REPAIR OF DNA STRANDS | [2013/31] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE DÉTECTION, DE QUANTIFICATION ET DE CARTOGRAPHIE D'UN DOMMAGE ET/OU D'UNE RÉPARATION DE BRINS D'ADN | [2013/31] | Entry into regional phase | 14.03.2013 | National basic fee paid | 14.03.2013 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.03.2013 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.03.2013 | Examination requested [2013/31] | 04.11.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 18.12.2013 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: Claims {1} | 07.03.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 17.09.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.11.2015 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 05.11.2015 | 05.11.2015 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 27.11.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.04.2016 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 05.04.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 05.04.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 26.04.2016 | Information about intention to grant a patent | 26.04.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP16171840.8 / EP3078754 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 07.03.2014 | Opposition(s) | 02.03.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/19] | Request for further processing for: | Loss of rights: Claims | 22.01.2014 | Request for further processing filed | 22.01.2014 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 05.02.2014 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.08.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.08.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.08.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 22.09.2011 | AL | 01.06.2016 | AT | 01.06.2016 | BG | 01.06.2016 | CY | 01.06.2016 | CZ | 01.06.2016 | EE | 01.06.2016 | FI | 01.06.2016 | HR | 01.06.2016 | LT | 01.06.2016 | LV | 01.06.2016 | MK | 01.06.2016 | PL | 01.06.2016 | RO | 01.06.2016 | RS | 01.06.2016 | SI | 01.06.2016 | SK | 01.06.2016 | SM | 01.06.2016 | TR | 01.06.2016 | NO | 01.09.2016 | GR | 02.09.2016 | MT | 30.09.2016 | IS | 01.10.2016 | PT | 03.10.2016 | [2018/46] |
Former [2018/38] | HU | 22.09.2011 | |
AT | 01.06.2016 | ||
BG | 01.06.2016 | ||
CY | 01.06.2016 | ||
CZ | 01.06.2016 | ||
EE | 01.06.2016 | ||
FI | 01.06.2016 | ||
HR | 01.06.2016 | ||
LT | 01.06.2016 | ||
LV | 01.06.2016 | ||
MK | 01.06.2016 | ||
PL | 01.06.2016 | ||
RO | 01.06.2016 | ||
RS | 01.06.2016 | ||
SI | 01.06.2016 | ||
SK | 01.06.2016 | ||
SM | 01.06.2016 | ||
TR | 01.06.2016 | ||
NO | 01.09.2016 | ||
GR | 02.09.2016 | ||
MT | 30.09.2016 | ||
IS | 01.10.2016 | ||
PT | 03.10.2016 | ||
Former [2018/31] | HU | 22.09.2011 | |
AT | 01.06.2016 | ||
CY | 01.06.2016 | ||
CZ | 01.06.2016 | ||
EE | 01.06.2016 | ||
FI | 01.06.2016 | ||
HR | 01.06.2016 | ||
LT | 01.06.2016 | ||
LV | 01.06.2016 | ||
MK | 01.06.2016 | ||
PL | 01.06.2016 | ||
RO | 01.06.2016 | ||
RS | 01.06.2016 | ||
SI | 01.06.2016 | ||
SK | 01.06.2016 | ||
SM | 01.06.2016 | ||
TR | 01.06.2016 | ||
NO | 01.09.2016 | ||
GR | 02.09.2016 | ||
MT | 30.09.2016 | ||
IS | 01.10.2016 | ||
PT | 03.10.2016 | ||
Former [2018/29] | HU | 22.09.2011 | |
AT | 01.06.2016 | ||
CY | 01.06.2016 | ||
CZ | 01.06.2016 | ||
EE | 01.06.2016 | ||
FI | 01.06.2016 | ||
HR | 01.06.2016 | ||
LT | 01.06.2016 | ||
LV | 01.06.2016 | ||
MK | 01.06.2016 | ||
PL | 01.06.2016 | ||
RO | 01.06.2016 | ||
RS | 01.06.2016 | ||
SI | 01.06.2016 | ||
SK | 01.06.2016 | ||
SM | 01.06.2016 | ||
TR | 01.06.2016 | ||
NO | 01.09.2016 | ||
GR | 02.09.2016 | ||
IS | 01.10.2016 | ||
PT | 03.10.2016 | ||
Former [2018/28] | HU | 22.09.2011 | |
AT | 01.06.2016 | ||
CY | 01.06.2016 | ||
CZ | 01.06.2016 | ||
EE | 01.06.2016 | ||
FI | 01.06.2016 | ||
HR | 01.06.2016 | ||
LT | 01.06.2016 | ||
LV | 01.06.2016 | ||
MK | 01.06.2016 | ||
PL | 01.06.2016 | ||
RO | 01.06.2016 | ||
RS | 01.06.2016 | ||
SI | 01.06.2016 | ||
SK | 01.06.2016 | ||
SM | 01.06.2016 | ||
NO | 01.09.2016 | ||
GR | 02.09.2016 | ||
IS | 01.10.2016 | ||
PT | 03.10.2016 | ||
Former [2017/37] | AT | 01.06.2016 | |
CZ | 01.06.2016 | ||
EE | 01.06.2016 | ||
FI | 01.06.2016 | ||
HR | 01.06.2016 | ||
LT | 01.06.2016 | ||
LV | 01.06.2016 | ||
PL | 01.06.2016 | ||
RO | 01.06.2016 | ||
RS | 01.06.2016 | ||
SI | 01.06.2016 | ||
SK | 01.06.2016 | ||
SM | 01.06.2016 | ||
NO | 01.09.2016 | ||
GR | 02.09.2016 | ||
IS | 01.10.2016 | ||
PT | 03.10.2016 | ||
Former [2017/11] | AT | 01.06.2016 | |
CZ | 01.06.2016 | ||
EE | 01.06.2016 | ||
FI | 01.06.2016 | ||
HR | 01.06.2016 | ||
LT | 01.06.2016 | ||
LV | 01.06.2016 | ||
PL | 01.06.2016 | ||
RO | 01.06.2016 | ||
RS | 01.06.2016 | ||
SK | 01.06.2016 | ||
SM | 01.06.2016 | ||
NO | 01.09.2016 | ||
GR | 02.09.2016 | ||
IS | 01.10.2016 | ||
PT | 03.10.2016 | ||
Former [2017/10] | CZ | 01.06.2016 | |
EE | 01.06.2016 | ||
FI | 01.06.2016 | ||
HR | 01.06.2016 | ||
LT | 01.06.2016 | ||
LV | 01.06.2016 | ||
PL | 01.06.2016 | ||
RO | 01.06.2016 | ||
RS | 01.06.2016 | ||
SK | 01.06.2016 | ||
NO | 01.09.2016 | ||
GR | 02.09.2016 | ||
IS | 01.10.2016 | ||
Former [2017/09] | CZ | 01.06.2016 | |
EE | 01.06.2016 | ||
FI | 01.06.2016 | ||
HR | 01.06.2016 | ||
LT | 01.06.2016 | ||
LV | 01.06.2016 | ||
RO | 01.06.2016 | ||
RS | 01.06.2016 | ||
NO | 01.09.2016 | ||
GR | 02.09.2016 | ||
Former [2016/51] | FI | 01.06.2016 | |
HR | 01.06.2016 | ||
LT | 01.06.2016 | ||
LV | 01.06.2016 | ||
RS | 01.06.2016 | ||
NO | 01.09.2016 | ||
GR | 02.09.2016 | ||
Former [2016/50] | FI | 01.06.2016 | |
HR | 01.06.2016 | ||
LT | 01.06.2016 | ||
LV | 01.06.2016 | ||
RS | 01.06.2016 | ||
NO | 01.09.2016 | ||
Former [2016/49] | FI | 01.06.2016 | |
LT | 01.06.2016 | ||
NO | 01.09.2016 | ||
Former [2016/46] | LT | 01.06.2016 | |
NO | 01.09.2016 | Cited in | International search | [X]US2002048767 (BENSIMON AARON [FR], et al) [X] 1-6,8-11 * page 1; page 3, [0058]-[0060]; page 4, [0079]-[0083]; page 13 *; | [X]US2002187508 (WONG GORDON G [US]) [X] 1-6,8-11 * claims; page 3, [0032] - page page 5, [0055] *; | [X]US2002197639 (SHIA MICHAEL A [US], et al) [X] 1-6,8-11 * claims *; | [X]WO2008028931 (PASTEUR INSTITUT [FR], et al) [X] 1-6,8-11 * page 12, [0061] - page 16, [0084]; examples *; | [X]US2008103296 (ZHAO XIAOJIAN DAVID [US], et al) [X] 1-6,8-11 * page 4, [0044]; page 5, [0063]; page 15, [0223]; page 17, [249]; page 20, [0279]-[0280] *; | [X]US2008242556 (CAO HAN [US], et al) [X] 1-6,8-15 * page 3, [0025]-[0027]; page 5, [0065]-[[0066]; page 6, [0069]; page 7, [0088]-[0095]; page 8, [0108]; example 6 *; | [XI]US2010137154 (ACH ROBERT A [US], et al) [X] 1-6,8,11,15 * page 2, [0026]; page 3, [0031]; page 4, [0052]; page 6, [0063]-[0067], page 7, [0072]; page 8, [0084] * [I] 7; | [X] - JÜRGEN REISINGER ET AL, "Visualization of episomal and integrated Epstein-Barr virus DNA by fiber fluorescencein situ hybridization", INTERNATIONAL JOURNAL OF CANCER, (20060401), vol. 118, no. 7, doi:10.1002/ijc.21498, ISSN 0020-7136, pages 1603 - 1608, XP055008000 [X] 1-6 * introduction; page 1603, last paragraph; page 1604; page 1607, last paragraph * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/ijc.21498 | [X] - CABURET S ET AL, "Combing the genome for genomic instability", TRENDS IN BIOTECHNOLOGY, ELSEVIER PUBLICATIONS, CAMBRIDGE, GB, (20020801), vol. 20, no. 8, doi:10.1016/S0167-7799(02)01990-X, ISSN 0167-7799, pages 344 - 350, XP004371920 [X] 1-6 * pages 345-347 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0167-7799(02)01990-X | [A] - NAITO S ET AL, "Role of active oxygen species in DNA damage by pentachlorophenol metabolites", MUTATION RESEARCH, ELSEVIER, AMSTERDAM, NL, vol. 310, no. 1, doi:10.1016/0027-5107(94)90011-6, ISSN 0027-5107, (19941001), pages 79 - 88, (19941001), XP023443544 [A] 1-15 * "Materials and Methods" * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0027-5107(94)90011-6 |