EP2651988 - OLIGOMERS AND CO-OLIGOMERS OF HIGHLY FLUORINATED SULFINIC ACID AND SALTS THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 28.08.2015 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states 3M Innovative Properties Company 3M Center P.O. Box 33427 St. Paul, MN 55133-3427 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2013/43] | For all designated states 3M Innovative Properties Company 3M Center Post Office Box 33427 Saint Paul, MN 55133-3427 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GUERRA, Miguel A. 3M Center Post Office Box 33427 Saint Paul, Minnesota 55133-3427 / US | 02 /
DAHLKE, Gregg D. 3M Center Post Office Box 33427 Saint Paul, Minnesota 55133-3427 / US | 03 /
DUCHESNE, Denis 3M Center Post Office Box 33427 Saint Paul, Minnesota 55133-3427 / US | 04 /
FUKUSHI, Tatsuo 3M Center Post Office Box 33427 Saint Paul, Minnesota 55133-3427 / US | 05 /
GROOTAERT, Werner M. A. 3M Center Post Office Box 33427 Saint Paul, Minnesota 55133-3427 / US | 06 /
QIU, Zai-Ming 3M Center Post Office Box 33427 Saint Paul, Minnesota 55133-3427 / US | [2013/43] | Representative(s) | Altmann Stößel Dick Patentanwälte PartG mbB Isartorplatz 1 80331 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2014/43] | Herzog, Fiesser & Partner Patentanwälte PartG mbB Isartorplatz 1 80331 München / DE | ||
Former [2013/43] | Herzog, Fiesser & Partner Isartorplatz 1 80331 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 11802230.0 | 06.12.2011 | WO2011US63383 | Priority number, date | US201061424153P | 17.12.2010 Original published format: US 201061424153 P | [2013/43] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2012082454 | Date: | 21.06.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/25] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2651988 | Date: | 23.10.2013 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.06.2012 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2013/43] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2651988 | Date: | 22.10.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/43] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 21.06.2012 | Classification | IPC: | C08F14/18, C08F8/04, C08F8/44, C08F16/30 | [2013/43] | CPC: |
C08F8/44 (EP,US);
C08G61/00 (US);
C08F14/18 (EP,US);
C07C313/02 (US);
C08F214/184 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/43] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | OLIGOMERE UND COOLIGOMERE AUS HOCHFLUORIERTER SULFINSÄURE UND SALZE DAVON | [2013/43] | English: | OLIGOMERS AND CO-OLIGOMERS OF HIGHLY FLUORINATED SULFINIC ACID AND SALTS THEREOF | [2013/43] | French: | OLIGOMÈRES ET CO-OLIGOMÈRES D'ACIDE SULFINIQUE HAUTEMENT FLUORÉ ET LEURS SELS | [2013/43] | Entry into regional phase | 18.06.2013 | National basic fee paid | 18.06.2013 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.06.2013 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.06.2013 | Examination requested [2013/43] | 03.02.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 27.05.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.09.2014 | Fee for grant paid | 11.09.2014 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 11.09.2014 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 27.05.2014 | Opposition(s) | 23.07.2015 | No opposition filed within time limit [2015/40] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.12.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 06.12.2011 | AL | 22.10.2014 | AT | 22.10.2014 | BG | 22.10.2014 | CY | 22.10.2014 | CZ | 22.10.2014 | DK | 22.10.2014 | EE | 22.10.2014 | ES | 22.10.2014 | FI | 22.10.2014 | HR | 22.10.2014 | LT | 22.10.2014 | LV | 22.10.2014 | MC | 22.10.2014 | MK | 22.10.2014 | MT | 22.10.2014 | NL | 22.10.2014 | PL | 22.10.2014 | RO | 22.10.2014 | RS | 22.10.2014 | SE | 22.10.2014 | SI | 22.10.2014 | SK | 22.10.2014 | SM | 22.10.2014 | TR | 22.10.2014 | IE | 06.12.2014 | LU | 06.12.2014 | BE | 31.12.2014 | CH | 31.12.2014 | FR | 31.12.2014 | LI | 31.12.2014 | NO | 22.01.2015 | GR | 23.01.2015 | IS | 22.02.2015 | PT | 23.02.2015 | [2018/46] |
Former [2018/31] | HU | 06.12.2011 | |
AT | 22.10.2014 | ||
BG | 22.10.2014 | ||
CY | 22.10.2014 | ||
CZ | 22.10.2014 | ||
DK | 22.10.2014 | ||
EE | 22.10.2014 | ||
ES | 22.10.2014 | ||
FI | 22.10.2014 | ||
HR | 22.10.2014 | ||
LT | 22.10.2014 | ||
LV | 22.10.2014 | ||
MC | 22.10.2014 | ||
MK | 22.10.2014 | ||
MT | 22.10.2014 | ||
NL | 22.10.2014 | ||
PL | 22.10.2014 | ||
RO | 22.10.2014 | ||
RS | 22.10.2014 | ||
SE | 22.10.2014 | ||
SI | 22.10.2014 | ||
SK | 22.10.2014 | ||
SM | 22.10.2014 | ||
TR | 22.10.2014 | ||
IE | 06.12.2014 | ||
LU | 06.12.2014 | ||
BE | 31.12.2014 | ||
CH | 31.12.2014 | ||
FR | 31.12.2014 | ||
LI | 31.12.2014 | ||
NO | 22.01.2015 | ||
GR | 23.01.2015 | ||
IS | 22.02.2015 | ||
PT | 23.02.2015 | ||
Former [2016/33] | HU | 06.12.2011 | |
AT | 22.10.2014 | ||
BG | 22.10.2014 | ||
CY | 22.10.2014 | ||
CZ | 22.10.2014 | ||
DK | 22.10.2014 | ||
EE | 22.10.2014 | ||
ES | 22.10.2014 | ||
FI | 22.10.2014 | ||
HR | 22.10.2014 | ||
LT | 22.10.2014 | ||
LV | 22.10.2014 | ||
MC | 22.10.2014 | ||
MT | 22.10.2014 | ||
NL | 22.10.2014 | ||
PL | 22.10.2014 | ||
RO | 22.10.2014 | ||
RS | 22.10.2014 | ||
SE | 22.10.2014 | ||
SI | 22.10.2014 | ||
SK | 22.10.2014 | ||
SM | 22.10.2014 | ||
TR | 22.10.2014 | ||
IE | 06.12.2014 | ||
LU | 06.12.2014 | ||
BE | 31.12.2014 | ||
CH | 31.12.2014 | ||
FR | 31.12.2014 | ||
LI | 31.12.2014 | ||
NO | 22.01.2015 | ||
GR | 23.01.2015 | ||
IS | 22.02.2015 | ||
PT | 23.02.2015 | ||
Former [2016/32] | HU | 06.12.2011 | |
AT | 22.10.2014 | ||
BG | 22.10.2014 | ||
CY | 22.10.2014 | ||
CZ | 22.10.2014 | ||
DK | 22.10.2014 | ||
EE | 22.10.2014 | ||
ES | 22.10.2014 | ||
FI | 22.10.2014 | ||
HR | 22.10.2014 | ||
LT | 22.10.2014 | ||
LV | 22.10.2014 | ||
MC | 22.10.2014 | ||
NL | 22.10.2014 | ||
PL | 22.10.2014 | ||
RO | 22.10.2014 | ||
RS | 22.10.2014 | ||
SE | 22.10.2014 | ||
SI | 22.10.2014 | ||
SK | 22.10.2014 | ||
SM | 22.10.2014 | ||
IE | 06.12.2014 | ||
LU | 06.12.2014 | ||
BE | 31.12.2014 | ||
CH | 31.12.2014 | ||
FR | 31.12.2014 | ||
LI | 31.12.2014 | ||
NO | 22.01.2015 | ||
GR | 23.01.2015 | ||
IS | 22.02.2015 | ||
PT | 23.02.2015 | ||
Former [2016/31] | AT | 22.10.2014 | |
BG | 22.10.2014 | ||
CY | 22.10.2014 | ||
CZ | 22.10.2014 | ||
DK | 22.10.2014 | ||
EE | 22.10.2014 | ||
ES | 22.10.2014 | ||
FI | 22.10.2014 | ||
HR | 22.10.2014 | ||
LT | 22.10.2014 | ||
LV | 22.10.2014 | ||
MC | 22.10.2014 | ||
NL | 22.10.2014 | ||
PL | 22.10.2014 | ||
RO | 22.10.2014 | ||
RS | 22.10.2014 | ||
SE | 22.10.2014 | ||
SI | 22.10.2014 | ||
SK | 22.10.2014 | ||
SM | 22.10.2014 | ||
IE | 06.12.2014 | ||
LU | 06.12.2014 | ||
BE | 31.12.2014 | ||
CH | 31.12.2014 | ||
FR | 31.12.2014 | ||
LI | 31.12.2014 | ||
NO | 22.01.2015 | ||
GR | 23.01.2015 | ||
IS | 22.02.2015 | ||
PT | 23.02.2015 | ||
Former [2016/27] | AT | 22.10.2014 | |
CY | 22.10.2014 | ||
CZ | 22.10.2014 | ||
DK | 22.10.2014 | ||
EE | 22.10.2014 | ||
ES | 22.10.2014 | ||
FI | 22.10.2014 | ||
HR | 22.10.2014 | ||
LT | 22.10.2014 | ||
LV | 22.10.2014 | ||
MC | 22.10.2014 | ||
NL | 22.10.2014 | ||
PL | 22.10.2014 | ||
RO | 22.10.2014 | ||
RS | 22.10.2014 | ||
SE | 22.10.2014 | ||
SI | 22.10.2014 | ||
SK | 22.10.2014 | ||
SM | 22.10.2014 | ||
IE | 06.12.2014 | ||
LU | 06.12.2014 | ||
BE | 31.12.2014 | ||
CH | 31.12.2014 | ||
FR | 31.12.2014 | ||
LI | 31.12.2014 | ||
NO | 22.01.2015 | ||
GR | 23.01.2015 | ||
IS | 22.02.2015 | ||
PT | 23.02.2015 | ||
Former [2016/22] | AT | 22.10.2014 | |
CY | 22.10.2014 | ||
CZ | 22.10.2014 | ||
DK | 22.10.2014 | ||
EE | 22.10.2014 | ||
ES | 22.10.2014 | ||
FI | 22.10.2014 | ||
HR | 22.10.2014 | ||
LT | 22.10.2014 | ||
LV | 22.10.2014 | ||
NL | 22.10.2014 | ||
PL | 22.10.2014 | ||
RO | 22.10.2014 | ||
RS | 22.10.2014 | ||
SE | 22.10.2014 | ||
SI | 22.10.2014 | ||
SK | 22.10.2014 | ||
SM | 22.10.2014 | ||
IE | 06.12.2014 | ||
LU | 06.12.2014 | ||
BE | 31.12.2014 | ||
CH | 31.12.2014 | ||
FR | 31.12.2014 | ||
LI | 31.12.2014 | ||
NO | 22.01.2015 | ||
GR | 23.01.2015 | ||
IS | 22.02.2015 | ||
PT | 23.02.2015 | ||
Former [2016/12] | AT | 22.10.2014 | |
CY | 22.10.2014 | ||
CZ | 22.10.2014 | ||
DK | 22.10.2014 | ||
EE | 22.10.2014 | ||
ES | 22.10.2014 | ||
FI | 22.10.2014 | ||
HR | 22.10.2014 | ||
LT | 22.10.2014 | ||
LV | 22.10.2014 | ||
NL | 22.10.2014 | ||
PL | 22.10.2014 | ||
RO | 22.10.2014 | ||
RS | 22.10.2014 | ||
SE | 22.10.2014 | ||
SI | 22.10.2014 | ||
SK | 22.10.2014 | ||
IE | 06.12.2014 | ||
LU | 06.12.2014 | ||
BE | 31.12.2014 | ||
CH | 31.12.2014 | ||
FR | 31.12.2014 | ||
LI | 31.12.2014 | ||
NO | 22.01.2015 | ||
GR | 23.01.2015 | ||
IS | 22.02.2015 | ||
PT | 23.02.2015 | ||
Former [2015/51] | AT | 22.10.2014 | |
CY | 22.10.2014 | ||
CZ | 22.10.2014 | ||
DK | 22.10.2014 | ||
EE | 22.10.2014 | ||
ES | 22.10.2014 | ||
FI | 22.10.2014 | ||
HR | 22.10.2014 | ||
LT | 22.10.2014 | ||
LV | 22.10.2014 | ||
NL | 22.10.2014 | ||
PL | 22.10.2014 | ||
RO | 22.10.2014 | ||
RS | 22.10.2014 | ||
SE | 22.10.2014 | ||
SK | 22.10.2014 | ||
IE | 06.12.2014 | ||
LU | 06.12.2014 | ||
BE | 31.12.2014 | ||
CH | 31.12.2014 | ||
FR | 31.12.2014 | ||
LI | 31.12.2014 | ||
NO | 22.01.2015 | ||
GR | 23.01.2015 | ||
IS | 22.02.2015 | ||
PT | 23.02.2015 | ||
Former [2015/47] | AT | 22.10.2014 | |
CY | 22.10.2014 | ||
CZ | 22.10.2014 | ||
DK | 22.10.2014 | ||
EE | 22.10.2014 | ||
ES | 22.10.2014 | ||
FI | 22.10.2014 | ||
HR | 22.10.2014 | ||
LT | 22.10.2014 | ||
LV | 22.10.2014 | ||
NL | 22.10.2014 | ||
PL | 22.10.2014 | ||
RO | 22.10.2014 | ||
RS | 22.10.2014 | ||
SE | 22.10.2014 | ||
SK | 22.10.2014 | ||
IE | 06.12.2014 | ||
LU | 06.12.2014 | ||
BE | 31.12.2014 | ||
CH | 31.12.2014 | ||
LI | 31.12.2014 | ||
NO | 22.01.2015 | ||
GR | 23.01.2015 | ||
IS | 22.02.2015 | ||
PT | 23.02.2015 | ||
Former [2015/46] | AT | 22.10.2014 | |
CY | 22.10.2014 | ||
CZ | 22.10.2014 | ||
DK | 22.10.2014 | ||
EE | 22.10.2014 | ||
ES | 22.10.2014 | ||
FI | 22.10.2014 | ||
HR | 22.10.2014 | ||
LT | 22.10.2014 | ||
LV | 22.10.2014 | ||
NL | 22.10.2014 | ||
PL | 22.10.2014 | ||
RO | 22.10.2014 | ||
RS | 22.10.2014 | ||
SE | 22.10.2014 | ||
SK | 22.10.2014 | ||
IE | 06.12.2014 | ||
LU | 06.12.2014 | ||
BE | 31.12.2014 | ||
NO | 22.01.2015 | ||
GR | 23.01.2015 | ||
IS | 22.02.2015 | ||
PT | 23.02.2015 | ||
Former [2015/37] | AT | 22.10.2014 | |
CY | 22.10.2014 | ||
CZ | 22.10.2014 | ||
DK | 22.10.2014 | ||
EE | 22.10.2014 | ||
ES | 22.10.2014 | ||
FI | 22.10.2014 | ||
HR | 22.10.2014 | ||
LT | 22.10.2014 | ||
LV | 22.10.2014 | ||
NL | 22.10.2014 | ||
PL | 22.10.2014 | ||
RO | 22.10.2014 | ||
RS | 22.10.2014 | ||
SE | 22.10.2014 | ||
SK | 22.10.2014 | ||
LU | 06.12.2014 | ||
BE | 31.12.2014 | ||
NO | 22.01.2015 | ||
GR | 23.01.2015 | ||
IS | 22.02.2015 | ||
PT | 23.02.2015 | ||
Former [2015/36] | AT | 22.10.2014 | |
CY | 22.10.2014 | ||
CZ | 22.10.2014 | ||
DK | 22.10.2014 | ||
EE | 22.10.2014 | ||
ES | 22.10.2014 | ||
FI | 22.10.2014 | ||
HR | 22.10.2014 | ||
LT | 22.10.2014 | ||
LV | 22.10.2014 | ||
NL | 22.10.2014 | ||
PL | 22.10.2014 | ||
RO | 22.10.2014 | ||
RS | 22.10.2014 | ||
SE | 22.10.2014 | ||
LU | 06.12.2014 | ||
BE | 31.12.2014 | ||
NO | 22.01.2015 | ||
GR | 23.01.2015 | ||
IS | 22.02.2015 | ||
PT | 23.02.2015 | ||
Former [2015/35] | AT | 22.10.2014 | |
CY | 22.10.2014 | ||
DK | 22.10.2014 | ||
EE | 22.10.2014 | ||
ES | 22.10.2014 | ||
FI | 22.10.2014 | ||
HR | 22.10.2014 | ||
LT | 22.10.2014 | ||
LV | 22.10.2014 | ||
NL | 22.10.2014 | ||
PL | 22.10.2014 | ||
RS | 22.10.2014 | ||
SE | 22.10.2014 | ||
LU | 06.12.2014 | ||
BE | 31.12.2014 | ||
NO | 22.01.2015 | ||
GR | 23.01.2015 | ||
IS | 22.02.2015 | ||
PT | 23.02.2015 | ||
Former [2015/30] | AT | 22.10.2014 | |
CY | 22.10.2014 | ||
ES | 22.10.2014 | ||
FI | 22.10.2014 | ||
HR | 22.10.2014 | ||
LT | 22.10.2014 | ||
LV | 22.10.2014 | ||
NL | 22.10.2014 | ||
PL | 22.10.2014 | ||
RS | 22.10.2014 | ||
SE | 22.10.2014 | ||
BE | 31.12.2014 | ||
NO | 22.01.2015 | ||
GR | 23.01.2015 | ||
IS | 22.02.2015 | ||
PT | 23.02.2015 | ||
Former [2015/26] | AT | 22.10.2014 | |
CY | 22.10.2014 | ||
ES | 22.10.2014 | ||
FI | 22.10.2014 | ||
HR | 22.10.2014 | ||
LT | 22.10.2014 | ||
LV | 22.10.2014 | ||
NL | 22.10.2014 | ||
PL | 22.10.2014 | ||
RS | 22.10.2014 | ||
SE | 22.10.2014 | ||
NO | 22.01.2015 | ||
GR | 23.01.2015 | ||
IS | 22.02.2015 | ||
PT | 23.02.2015 | ||
Former [2015/25] | AT | 22.10.2014 | |
ES | 22.10.2014 | ||
FI | 22.10.2014 | ||
HR | 22.10.2014 | ||
LT | 22.10.2014 | ||
LV | 22.10.2014 | ||
NL | 22.10.2014 | ||
PL | 22.10.2014 | ||
RS | 22.10.2014 | ||
SE | 22.10.2014 | ||
NO | 22.01.2015 | ||
GR | 23.01.2015 | ||
IS | 22.02.2015 | ||
PT | 23.02.2015 | ||
Former [2015/24] | ES | 22.10.2014 | |
FI | 22.10.2014 | ||
HR | 22.10.2014 | ||
LT | 22.10.2014 | ||
LV | 22.10.2014 | ||
NL | 22.10.2014 | ||
PL | 22.10.2014 | ||
RS | 22.10.2014 | ||
SE | 22.10.2014 | ||
NO | 22.01.2015 | ||
GR | 23.01.2015 | ||
IS | 22.02.2015 | ||
PT | 23.02.2015 | ||
Former [2015/23] | ES | 22.10.2014 | |
FI | 22.10.2014 | ||
LT | 22.10.2014 | ||
NL | 22.10.2014 | ||
NO | 22.01.2015 | ||
IS | 22.02.2015 | ||
PT | 23.02.2015 | ||
Former [2015/22] | LT | 22.10.2014 | |
NO | 22.01.2015 | ||
PT | 23.02.2015 | ||
Former [2015/21] | LT | 22.10.2014 | |
NO | 22.01.2015 | ||
Former [2015/20] | LT | 22.10.2014 | Cited in | International search | [X]JPS5657832 ; | [X]JPS61185507 ; | [X]US4151053 (FUKUMOTO MITSUNOBU [JP], et al) [X] 1-14 * examples 1,10,12,25 *; | [X]US4544458 (GROT WALTHER G [US], et al) [X] 1-14 * example 2 *; | [X]EP0289869 (DOW CHEMICAL CO [US]) [X] 1-14 * claim - *; | [A]US2009221759 (HARING THOMAS [DE], et al) [A] 1-14* claims 1-2 *; | [X] - DATABASE WPI, 0, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 1981, no. 27, Database accession no. 1981-48838D, XP002669958 & JPS5657832 A 19810520 (KANEGAFUCHI CHEM KK) [X] 1-14 * abstract * | [X] - DATABASE WPI, 0, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 1986, no. 39, Database accession no. 1986-256001, XP002669959 & JPS61185507 A 19860819 (TOKUYAMA SODA KK) [X] 1-14 * abstract * | by applicant | US2713593 | US3420877 | - C. M. HU; F. L. QUING; W. Y. HUANG, J ORG CHEM, (1991), pages 2801 - 2804 | - W. Y. HUANG, JOURNAL OF FLUORINE CHEMISTRY, (1992), vol. 58, pages 1 - 8 | - W. Y. HUANG; B. N. HUANG; W. WANG, ACTA CHIM. SINICA (ENGL. ED., (1986), pages 178 - 184 | - ACTA CHIM. SINICA (ENGL. ED., (1986), pages 68 - 72 | - F. H. WU; B. N. HUANG, JOURNAL OF FLUORINE CHEM, (1994), vol. 67, pages 233 - 234 |