EP2724141 - SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR GENERATING A COMBINED MODEL FOR ISOTHERMAL AND ANISOTHERMAL FATIGUE LIFE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 08.01.2016 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.01.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 10.02.2016 [2016/06] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Siemens Aktiengesellschaft Wittelsbacherplatz 2 80333 München / DE | [2014/18] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BUCHHOLZ, Björn Steinknappen 81 45470 Mülheim an der Ruhr / DE | [2014/18] | Application number, filing date | 11802309.2 | 05.12.2011 | WO2011EP71712 | Priority number, date | EP20110006943 | 25.08.2011 Original published format: EP 11006943 | [2014/18] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2013026500 | Date: | 28.02.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/09] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2724141 | Date: | 30.04.2014 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.02.2013 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2014/18] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 04.07.2013 | Classification | IPC: | G01N3/00 | [2014/18] | CPC: |
G01N3/32 (EP,US);
G01N2203/0057 (EP,US);
G01N2203/0064 (EP,US);
G01N2203/0073 (EP,US);
G01N2203/0226 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/18] | Title | German: | SYSTEM UND VERFAHREN ZUR ERZEUGUNG EINES KOMBINIERTEN MODELLS FÜR ISOTHERMISCHE UND ANISOTHERMISCHE ERMÜDUNGSBESTÄNDIGKEIT | [2014/18] | English: | SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR GENERATING A COMBINED MODEL FOR ISOTHERMAL AND ANISOTHERMAL FATIGUE LIFE | [2014/18] | French: | SYSTÈME ET PROCÉDÉ DE PRODUCTION D'UN MODÈLE COMBINÉ POUR RÉSISTANCE À LA FATIGUE ISOTHERME ET ANISOTHERME | [2014/18] | Entry into regional phase | 27.01.2014 | National basic fee paid | 27.01.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.01.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.01.2014 | Examination requested [2014/18] | 08.04.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.08.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2016/06] | 24.09.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2016/06] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 08.04.2015 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.01.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.12.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A] - LUKAS P ET AL, "Cyclic stress-strain response and fatigue life of metals in low amplitude region", MATERIALS SCIENCE ENGINEERING, ELSEVIER SEQUOIA, LAUSANNE, CH, vol. 11, no. 6, doi:10.1016/0025-5416(73)90125-0, ISSN 0025-5416, (19730601), pages 345 - 356, (19730601), XP024082454 [A] 1-12 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0025-5416(73)90125-0 | by applicant | - SMITH, K. N.; WATSON, P.; TOPPER, T. H., "A Stress-Strain Function for the Fatigue of Metals", JOURNAL OF MATERIALS, (1970), vol. 5, pages 767 - 778, XP002696888 | - OSTERGREN, W. J., "A Damage Function and Associated Failure Equations for Predicting Hold Time and Frequency Effects in Elevated Temperature, Low Cycle Fatigue", JOURNAL OF TESTING AND EVALUATION (JTE, (1976), vol. 4, no. 5 |