EP2588001 - METHOD FOR CLEANING THE ORAL CAVITY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 08.05.2018 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 19.05.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 31.08.2018 | Refusal of application | published on 03.10.2018 [2018/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc. 199 Grandview Road Skillman, NJ 08558 / US | [2016/33] |
Former [2013/19] | For all designated states McNeil-PPC, Inc. 199 Grandview Avenue Skillman, NJ 08558 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BINNER, Curt 3615 Smith Road Furlong, PA 18925 / US | 02 /
REDDY, Megha 1304 Wessex Place Princeton, NJ 08540 / US | [2013/19] | Representative(s) | Kirsch, Susan Edith Carpmaels & Ransford LLP One Southampton Row London WC1B 5HA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2013/19] | Kirsch, Susan Edith Carpmaels & Ransford One Southampton Row London WC1B 5HA / GB | Application number, filing date | 11804021.1 | 14.06.2011 | WO2011US40351 | Priority number, date | US20100825920 | 29.06.2010 Original published format: US 825920 | [2013/19] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2012005892 | Date: | 12.01.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/02] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2588001 | Date: | 08.05.2013 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.01.2012 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2013/19] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 12.01.2012 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.12.2015 | Classification | IPC: | A61B6/14 | [2013/19] | CPC: |
A61C17/221 (EP,US);
A61B5/0071 (EP,US);
A61B5/0088 (EP,US);
A61C17/225 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/19] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR REINIGUNG DER MUNDHÖHLE | [2013/19] | English: | METHOD FOR CLEANING THE ORAL CAVITY | [2013/19] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE NETTOYAGE DE LA CAVITÉ BUCCALE | [2013/19] | Entry into regional phase | 29.01.2013 | National basic fee paid | 29.01.2013 | Search fee paid | 29.01.2013 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.01.2013 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.01.2013 | Examination requested [2013/19] | 21.07.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 18.05.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.09.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.02.2018 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 04.06.2018 | 24.04.2018 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 08.06.2018 | 09.05.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2018/40] | 19.05.2018 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2018/40] | 04.06.2018 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 08.06.2018 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 18.05.2017 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.06.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.06.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 10.06.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 16.06.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 12.06.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]WO9959462 (HUND HELMUT GMBH [DE], et al); | [I]US2007111166 (DURSI EDMUNDO M [AR]); | [A]EP1829473 (OLYMPUS CORP [JP]); | International search | [A]US5894620 (POLAERT REMY [FR], et al); | [Y]US2009226241 (MCEWEN MENDAL KEITH [CA], et al); | [X]WO2010059484 (GILLETTE CO [US], et al) | by applicant | WO2010059484 |