EP2590655 - COMPOUNDS AND METHODS FOR INHIBITING PHOSPHATE TRANSPORT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 29.04.2016 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 21.11.2018 [2018/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Ardelyx, Inc. 34175 Ardenwood Blvd. Fremont, California 94555 / US | [2013/20] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LEWIS, Jason, G. 5327 Greenridge Road Castro Valley, California 94552 / US | 02 /
JACOBS, Jeffrey, W. 505 Cornell Avenue San Mateo, California 94402 / US | 03 /
REICH, Nicholas 3001 Deakin Street, Apt. No.6 Berkeley, California 94705 / US | 04 /
LEADBETTER, Michael, R. 335 Beverly Avenue San Leandro, California 94577 / US | 05 /
BELL, Noah 2172 Blake Street, Apt. 10 Berkeley, California 94704 / US | 06 /
CHANG, Han-Ting 220 Garnet Drive Livermore, California 94550 / US | 07 /
CHEN, Tao 3915 Louis Road Palo Alto, California 94303 / US | 08 /
NAVRE, Marc 2708 Wemberly Drive Belmont, California 94002 / US | 09 /
CHARMOT, Dominique 1150 Steinway Avenue Campbell, California 95008 / US | 10 /
CARRERAS, Christopher 910 Chevy Street Belmont, California 94002 / US | 11 /
LABONTE, Eric 401 Baltic Circle Unit 433 Redwood City, California 94065 / US | [2015/26] |
Former [2013/20] | 01 /
LEWIS, Jason, G. 5327 Greenridge Road Castro Valley California 94552 / US | ||
02 /
JACOBS, Jeffrey, W. 505 Cornell Avenue San Mateo California 94402 / US | |||
03 /
REICH, Nicholas 3001 Deakin Street Apt. 6 Berkeley California 94705 / US | |||
04 /
LEADBETTER, Michael, R. 335 Beverly Avenue San Leandro California 94577 / US | |||
05 /
BELL, Noah 2172 Blake Street Apt. 10 Berkeley California 94704 / US | |||
06 /
CHANG, Han-Ting 220 Garnet Drive Livermore California 94550 / US | |||
07 /
CHEN, Tao 3915 Louis Road Palo Alto California 94303 / US | |||
08 /
NAVRE, Marc 2708 Wemberly Drive Belmont California 94002 / US | |||
09 /
CHARMOT, Dominique 1150 Steinway Avenue Campbell California 95008 / US | |||
10 /
CARRERAS, Christopher 910 Chevy Street Belmont California 94002 / US | |||
11 /
LABONTE, Eric 401 Baltic Circle Unit 433 Redwood City California 94065 / US | Representative(s) | Grund, Martin, et al Grund Intellectual Property Group Patentanwälte und Solicitor PartG mbB Steinsdorfstraße 2 80538 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2015/26] | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstraße 4 80802 München / DE | ||
Former [2013/20] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 11804369.4 | 07.07.2011 | WO2011US43261 | Priority number, date | US20100362121P | 07.07.2010 Original published format: US 362121 P | [2013/20] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2012006473 | Date: | 12.01.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/02] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2590655 | Date: | 15.05.2013 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.01.2012 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2013/20] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2590655 | Date: | 24.06.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/26] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 12.01.2012 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.11.2013 | Classification | IPC: | A61K31/506, A61K31/4965, C07D401/00, C07D403/00, C07D211/68, C07D413/00 | [2013/20] | CPC: |
A61K31/5377 (EP,US);
A61K31/415 (EP,US);
A61K31/454 (EP,US);
A61K31/4545 (EP,US);
A61K31/4965 (EP,US);
A61K31/505 (EP,US);
A61K31/59 (EP,US);
A61K45/06 (EP,US);
A61P13/12 (EP);
A61P3/00 (EP);
A61P5/18 (EP);
A61P7/08 (EP);
C07D211/68 (EP,US);
C07D231/40 (EP,US);
C07D233/88 (EP,US);
C07D249/14 (EP,US);
C07D255/02 (EP,US);
C07D277/46 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
A61K31/4965, A61K2300/00 (EP,US);
A61K31/505, A61K2300/00 (US,EP) | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/20] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERBINDUNGEN UND VERFAHREN ZUR HEMMUNG EINES PHOSPHATTRANSPORTS | [2013/20] | English: | COMPOUNDS AND METHODS FOR INHIBITING PHOSPHATE TRANSPORT | [2013/20] | French: | COMPOSÉS ET PROCÉDÉS POUR L'INHIBITION DU TRANSPORT DE PHOSPHATE | [2013/20] | Entry into regional phase | 07.02.2013 | National basic fee paid | 07.02.2013 | Search fee paid | 07.02.2013 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.02.2013 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.02.2013 | Examination requested [2013/20] | 13.06.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 25.07.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.11.2014 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 08.01.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.05.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 08.05.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 08.05.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 25.07.2014 | Opposition(s) | 29.03.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit [2016/22] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.01.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.07.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2013 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   07.01.2014 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 07.07.2011 | AL | 24.06.2015 | AT | 24.06.2015 | BE | 24.06.2015 | CY | 24.06.2015 | CZ | 24.06.2015 | DK | 24.06.2015 | EE | 24.06.2015 | FI | 24.06.2015 | HR | 24.06.2015 | LT | 24.06.2015 | LV | 24.06.2015 | MC | 24.06.2015 | MK | 24.06.2015 | MT | 24.06.2015 | NL | 24.06.2015 | PL | 24.06.2015 | RO | 24.06.2015 | RS | 24.06.2015 | SE | 24.06.2015 | SI | 24.06.2015 | SK | 24.06.2015 | SM | 24.06.2015 | TR | 24.06.2015 | IE | 07.07.2015 | LU | 07.07.2015 | CH | 31.07.2015 | LI | 31.07.2015 | BG | 24.09.2015 | NO | 24.09.2015 | GR | 25.09.2015 | IS | 24.10.2015 | PT | 26.10.2015 | [2018/47] |
Former [2018/31] | HU | 07.07.2011 | |
AT | 24.06.2015 | ||
BE | 24.06.2015 | ||
CY | 24.06.2015 | ||
CZ | 24.06.2015 | ||
DK | 24.06.2015 | ||
EE | 24.06.2015 | ||
FI | 24.06.2015 | ||
HR | 24.06.2015 | ||
LT | 24.06.2015 | ||
LV | 24.06.2015 | ||
MC | 24.06.2015 | ||
MK | 24.06.2015 | ||
MT | 24.06.2015 | ||
NL | 24.06.2015 | ||
PL | 24.06.2015 | ||
RO | 24.06.2015 | ||
RS | 24.06.2015 | ||
SE | 24.06.2015 | ||
SI | 24.06.2015 | ||
SK | 24.06.2015 | ||
SM | 24.06.2015 | ||
TR | 24.06.2015 | ||
IE | 07.07.2015 | ||
LU | 07.07.2015 | ||
CH | 31.07.2015 | ||
LI | 31.07.2015 | ||
BG | 24.09.2015 | ||
NO | 24.09.2015 | ||
GR | 25.09.2015 | ||
IS | 24.10.2015 | ||
PT | 26.10.2015 | ||
Former [2018/02] | HU | 07.07.2011 | |
AT | 24.06.2015 | ||
BE | 24.06.2015 | ||
CY | 24.06.2015 | ||
CZ | 24.06.2015 | ||
DK | 24.06.2015 | ||
EE | 24.06.2015 | ||
FI | 24.06.2015 | ||
HR | 24.06.2015 | ||
LT | 24.06.2015 | ||
LV | 24.06.2015 | ||
MC | 24.06.2015 | ||
MT | 24.06.2015 | ||
NL | 24.06.2015 | ||
PL | 24.06.2015 | ||
RO | 24.06.2015 | ||
RS | 24.06.2015 | ||
SE | 24.06.2015 | ||
SI | 24.06.2015 | ||
SK | 24.06.2015 | ||
SM | 24.06.2015 | ||
TR | 24.06.2015 | ||
IE | 07.07.2015 | ||
LU | 07.07.2015 | ||
CH | 31.07.2015 | ||
LI | 31.07.2015 | ||
BG | 24.09.2015 | ||
NO | 24.09.2015 | ||
GR | 25.09.2015 | ||
IS | 24.10.2015 | ||
PT | 26.10.2015 | ||
Former [2017/39] | HU | 07.07.2011 | |
AT | 24.06.2015 | ||
BE | 24.06.2015 | ||
CY | 24.06.2015 | ||
CZ | 24.06.2015 | ||
DK | 24.06.2015 | ||
EE | 24.06.2015 | ||
FI | 24.06.2015 | ||
HR | 24.06.2015 | ||
LT | 24.06.2015 | ||
LV | 24.06.2015 | ||
MC | 24.06.2015 | ||
MT | 24.06.2015 | ||
NL | 24.06.2015 | ||
PL | 24.06.2015 | ||
RO | 24.06.2015 | ||
RS | 24.06.2015 | ||
SE | 24.06.2015 | ||
SI | 24.06.2015 | ||
SK | 24.06.2015 | ||
SM | 24.06.2015 | ||
TR | 24.06.2015 | ||
IE | 07.07.2015 | ||
CH | 31.07.2015 | ||
LI | 31.07.2015 | ||
BG | 24.09.2015 | ||
NO | 24.09.2015 | ||
GR | 25.09.2015 | ||
IS | 24.10.2015 | ||
PT | 26.10.2015 | ||
Former [2017/22] | AT | 24.06.2015 | |
BE | 24.06.2015 | ||
CZ | 24.06.2015 | ||
DK | 24.06.2015 | ||
EE | 24.06.2015 | ||
FI | 24.06.2015 | ||
HR | 24.06.2015 | ||
LT | 24.06.2015 | ||
LV | 24.06.2015 | ||
MC | 24.06.2015 | ||
MT | 24.06.2015 | ||
PL | 24.06.2015 | ||
RO | 24.06.2015 | ||
RS | 24.06.2015 | ||
SI | 24.06.2015 | ||
SK | 24.06.2015 | ||
IE | 07.07.2015 | ||
CH | 31.07.2015 | ||
LI | 31.07.2015 | ||
BG | 24.09.2015 | ||
NO | 24.09.2015 | ||
GR | 25.09.2015 | ||
IS | 24.10.2015 | ||
PT | 26.10.2015 | ||
Former [2017/03] | AT | 24.06.2015 | |
BE | 24.06.2015 | ||
CZ | 24.06.2015 | ||
DK | 24.06.2015 | ||
EE | 24.06.2015 | ||
FI | 24.06.2015 | ||
HR | 24.06.2015 | ||
LT | 24.06.2015 | ||
LV | 24.06.2015 | ||
MC | 24.06.2015 | ||
PL | 24.06.2015 | ||
RO | 24.06.2015 | ||
RS | 24.06.2015 | ||
SI | 24.06.2015 | ||
SK | 24.06.2015 | ||
IE | 07.07.2015 | ||
CH | 31.07.2015 | ||
LI | 31.07.2015 | ||
BG | 24.09.2015 | ||
NO | 24.09.2015 | ||
GR | 25.09.2015 | ||
IS | 24.10.2015 | ||
PT | 26.10.2015 | ||
Former [2016/36] | AT | 24.06.2015 | |
CZ | 24.06.2015 | ||
DK | 24.06.2015 | ||
EE | 24.06.2015 | ||
FI | 24.06.2015 | ||
HR | 24.06.2015 | ||
LT | 24.06.2015 | ||
LV | 24.06.2015 | ||
MC | 24.06.2015 | ||
PL | 24.06.2015 | ||
RO | 24.06.2015 | ||
RS | 24.06.2015 | ||
SI | 24.06.2015 | ||
SK | 24.06.2015 | ||
IE | 07.07.2015 | ||
CH | 31.07.2015 | ||
LI | 31.07.2015 | ||
BG | 24.09.2015 | ||
NO | 24.09.2015 | ||
GR | 25.09.2015 | ||
IS | 24.10.2015 | ||
PT | 26.10.2015 | ||
Former [2016/33] | AT | 24.06.2015 | |
CZ | 24.06.2015 | ||
DK | 24.06.2015 | ||
EE | 24.06.2015 | ||
FI | 24.06.2015 | ||
HR | 24.06.2015 | ||
LT | 24.06.2015 | ||
LV | 24.06.2015 | ||
MC | 24.06.2015 | ||
PL | 24.06.2015 | ||
RO | 24.06.2015 | ||
RS | 24.06.2015 | ||
SK | 24.06.2015 | ||
IE | 07.07.2015 | ||
CH | 31.07.2015 | ||
LI | 31.07.2015 | ||
BG | 24.09.2015 | ||
NO | 24.09.2015 | ||
GR | 25.09.2015 | ||
IS | 24.10.2015 | ||
PT | 26.10.2015 | ||
Former [2016/22] | AT | 24.06.2015 | |
CZ | 24.06.2015 | ||
DK | 24.06.2015 | ||
EE | 24.06.2015 | ||
FI | 24.06.2015 | ||
HR | 24.06.2015 | ||
LT | 24.06.2015 | ||
LV | 24.06.2015 | ||
MC | 24.06.2015 | ||
PL | 24.06.2015 | ||
RO | 24.06.2015 | ||
RS | 24.06.2015 | ||
SK | 24.06.2015 | ||
CH | 31.07.2015 | ||
LI | 31.07.2015 | ||
BG | 24.09.2015 | ||
NO | 24.09.2015 | ||
GR | 25.09.2015 | ||
IS | 24.10.2015 | ||
PT | 26.10.2015 | ||
Former [2016/20] | AT | 24.06.2015 | |
CZ | 24.06.2015 | ||
DK | 24.06.2015 | ||
EE | 24.06.2015 | ||
FI | 24.06.2015 | ||
HR | 24.06.2015 | ||
LT | 24.06.2015 | ||
LV | 24.06.2015 | ||
MC | 24.06.2015 | ||
PL | 24.06.2015 | ||
RO | 24.06.2015 | ||
RS | 24.06.2015 | ||
SK | 24.06.2015 | ||
BG | 24.09.2015 | ||
NO | 24.09.2015 | ||
GR | 25.09.2015 | ||
IS | 24.10.2015 | ||
PT | 26.10.2015 | ||
Former [2016/18] | AT | 24.06.2015 | |
CZ | 24.06.2015 | ||
EE | 24.06.2015 | ||
FI | 24.06.2015 | ||
HR | 24.06.2015 | ||
LT | 24.06.2015 | ||
LV | 24.06.2015 | ||
MC | 24.06.2015 | ||
PL | 24.06.2015 | ||
RO | 24.06.2015 | ||
RS | 24.06.2015 | ||
SK | 24.06.2015 | ||
BG | 24.09.2015 | ||
NO | 24.09.2015 | ||
GR | 25.09.2015 | ||
IS | 24.10.2015 | ||
PT | 26.10.2015 | ||
Former [2016/11] | AT | 24.06.2015 | |
CZ | 24.06.2015 | ||
EE | 24.06.2015 | ||
FI | 24.06.2015 | ||
HR | 24.06.2015 | ||
LT | 24.06.2015 | ||
LV | 24.06.2015 | ||
PL | 24.06.2015 | ||
RO | 24.06.2015 | ||
RS | 24.06.2015 | ||
SK | 24.06.2015 | ||
BG | 24.09.2015 | ||
NO | 24.09.2015 | ||
GR | 25.09.2015 | ||
IS | 24.10.2015 | ||
PT | 26.10.2015 | ||
Former [2016/10] | CZ | 24.06.2015 | |
EE | 24.06.2015 | ||
FI | 24.06.2015 | ||
HR | 24.06.2015 | ||
LT | 24.06.2015 | ||
LV | 24.06.2015 | ||
PL | 24.06.2015 | ||
RO | 24.06.2015 | ||
RS | 24.06.2015 | ||
SK | 24.06.2015 | ||
BG | 24.09.2015 | ||
NO | 24.09.2015 | ||
GR | 25.09.2015 | ||
IS | 24.10.2015 | ||
PT | 26.10.2015 | ||
Former [2016/09] | EE | 24.06.2015 | |
FI | 24.06.2015 | ||
HR | 24.06.2015 | ||
LT | 24.06.2015 | ||
LV | 24.06.2015 | ||
RS | 24.06.2015 | ||
BG | 24.09.2015 | ||
NO | 24.09.2015 | ||
GR | 25.09.2015 | ||
Former [2015/50] | FI | 24.06.2015 | |
HR | 24.06.2015 | ||
LT | 24.06.2015 | ||
LV | 24.06.2015 | ||
RS | 24.06.2015 | ||
BG | 24.09.2015 | ||
NO | 24.09.2015 | ||
GR | 25.09.2015 | ||
Former [2015/49] | FI | 24.06.2015 | |
HR | 24.06.2015 | ||
LT | 24.06.2015 | ||
LV | 24.06.2015 | ||
RS | 24.06.2015 | ||
NO | 24.09.2015 | ||
GR | 25.09.2015 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO0105398 (SMITHKLINE BEECHAM CORP [US], et al) [A] 1-19 * pages 1-4 *; | [A]WO03057225 (GENZYME CORP [US]) [A] 1-19 * pages 1-5 *; | [A] - CHOU Y-L ET AL, "Structure-Activity Relationships of Substituted Benzothiophene-anthranilamide Factor Xa Inhibitors", BIOORGANIC & MEDICINAL CHEMISTRY LETTERS, PERGAMON, GB, (20030101), vol. 13, doi:10.1016/S0960-894X(02)00938-1, ISSN 0960-894X, pages 507 - 511, XP002991689 [A] 1-19 * table 4; compound 58 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0960-894X(02)00938-1 | International search | [Y]US6608070 (NAKAO KAZUNARI [JP], et al); | [A]US2003195193 (HIRAYAMA FUKUSHI [JP], et al); | [X]US2005261346 (ZHU BING-YAN [US], et al) |