EP2663700 - VARIABLE-GEOMETRY MODULAR STRUCTURE COMPOSED OF THERMO-ACOUSTIC CAISSONS, PARTICULARLY FOR BUILDINGS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 01.08.2014 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.08.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 03.09.2014 [2014/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Caboni, Michele Via Adua 55 09170 Oristano / IT | [2013/47] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2013/47] | Representative(s) | Garavelli, Paolo A.BRE.MAR. S.R.L. Consulenza in Proprietà Industriale Via Servais 27 10146 Torino / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2013/47] | Garavelli, Paolo A.BRE.MAR. S.R.L. Via Servais 27 10146 Torino / IT | Application number, filing date | 11805979.9 | 24.11.2011 | WO2011IT00385 | Priority number, date | IT2010MI02187 | 25.11.2010 Original published format: IT MI20102187 | [2013/47] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2012070079 | Date: | 31.05.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/22] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2663700 | Date: | 20.11.2013 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 31.05.2012 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2013/47] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 15.08.2013 | Classification | IPC: | E04B2/18, E04C1/40 | [2013/47] | CPC: |
E04B1/762 (EP,EA,US);
E04B1/7629 (EP,EA,US);
E04B1/90 (EP,EA,US);
E04B2/18 (EP,EA,US);
E04B2/8641 (EP,EA,US);
E04C1/40 (EP,EA,US);
E04F13/007 (EP,EA,US);
E04B2002/0223 (EP,EA,US);
E04B5/026 (EP,EA,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/47] | Title | German: | MODULARE STRUKTUR MIT VERÄNDERLICHER GEOMETRIE AUS THERMOAKUSTISCHEN CAISSONS, INSBESONDERE FÜR GEBÄUDE | [2013/47] | English: | VARIABLE-GEOMETRY MODULAR STRUCTURE COMPOSED OF THERMO-ACOUSTIC CAISSONS, PARTICULARLY FOR BUILDINGS | [2013/47] | French: | STRUCTURE MODULAIRE À GÉOMÉTRIE VARIABLE CONSTITUÉE PAR DES CAISSONS THERMO-ACOUSTIQUES, EN PARTICULIER POUR DES BÂTIMENTS | [2013/47] | Entry into regional phase | 04.10.2013 | National basic fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.06.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | deleted | Deletion: Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2013/47] | 18.02.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2014/36] | 31.03.2014 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: filing fee / search fee not paid in time [2014/36] | Request for further processing for: | 04.10.2013 | Request for further processing filed | 04.10.2013 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 21.10.2013 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to non-payment of the filing fee | 04.10.2013 | Request for further processing filed | 04.10.2013 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 21.10.2013 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.2013 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [YA]EP0163117 (G P E GENERALE POLISTIROLO ESP [IT]) [Y] 1,2,4,8,9 * page 10, line 15 - page 11, line 11; figures 1,2,5,6; claim 1 * [A] 10; | [YA]EP0137105 (AREGGER BAU AG [CH]) [Y] 1,2,4,8,9 * figures 1,2,4,6 * [A] 10; | [A]US2004103609 (WOSTAL TERRY K [US], et al) [A] 10 * figures 1-3 *; | [A]WO03046310 (OZOROCZKI ZOLTAN [HU]) [A] 1-14 * figures 1-3, 5 * | by applicant | EP0163117 |