EP2593729 - COOLING APPARATUS AND REFRIGERATOR HAVING THE SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.03.2024 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 07.04.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 13.03.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 25.01.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 16.10.2022 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 19.06.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.07.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): GB, IE | published on 14.08.2024 [2024/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LG Electronics Inc. 20, Yeouido-dong Yeongdeungpo-gu Seoul 150-721 / KR | [2013/21] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CHO, Yeonwoo LG Electronics Inc. IP Group 327-23 Gasandong Geumcheon-gu Seoul 153-802 / KR | 02 /
KIM, Yanggyu LG Electronics Inc. IP Group 327-23 Gasandong Geumcheon-gu Seoul 153-802 / KR | 03 /
LEE, Younseok LG Electronics Inc. IP Group 327-23 Gasandong Geumcheon-gu Seoul 153-802 / KR | [2013/21] | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | [2023/19] |
Former [2013/21] | Vossius & Partner Siebertstrasse 4 81675 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 11807034.1 | 13.07.2011 | [2023/19] | WO2011KR05150 | Priority number, date | KR20100069287 | 19.07.2010 Original published format: KR 20100069287 | KR20100068466 | 15.07.2010 Original published format: KR 20100068466 | KR20100068461 | 15.07.2010 Original published format: KR 20100068461 | KR20100068244 | 15.07.2010 Original published format: KR 20100068244 | KR20100067196 | 13.07.2010 Original published format: KR 20100067196 | [2013/21] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2012008749 | Date: | 19.01.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/03] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2593729 | Date: | 22.05.2013 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.01.2012 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2013/21] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2593729 | Date: | 10.05.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/19] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 31.05.2012 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.01.2018 | Classification | IPC: | F25D11/02, F25D29/00, F25D25/00, F25D17/08 | [2013/21] | CPC: |
F25D23/12 (EP,US);
F25D17/06 (US);
F25D11/02 (US);
F25D17/04 (US);
F25D31/00 (US);
F25D31/007 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/21] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | KÜHLVORRICHTUNG UND KÜHLSCHRANK DAMIT | [2013/21] | English: | COOLING APPARATUS AND REFRIGERATOR HAVING THE SAME | [2013/21] | French: | APPAREIL DE REFROIDISSEMENT ET RÉFRIGÉRATEUR ÉQUIPÉ DUDIT APPAREIL | [2013/21] | Entry into regional phase | 07.02.2013 | National basic fee paid | 07.02.2013 | Search fee paid | 07.02.2013 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.02.2013 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.02.2013 | Examination requested [2013/21] | 05.06.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 23.06.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.10.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.04.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.06.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.11.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.03.2022 | Invitation to indicate the basis for amendments (Time limit: M01) | 09.03.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.04.2022 | Reply to an invitation to indicate the basis for amendments | 17.10.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.01.2023 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 25.01.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 25.01.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 21.03.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.03.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 23.06.2020 | Opposition(s) | 13.02.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/16] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.07.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.07.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.07.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 22.07.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 24.07.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.07.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 25.07.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 23.07.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 26.07.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 27.07.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 12 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 10.05.2023 | CZ | 10.05.2023 | DK | 10.05.2023 | EE | 10.05.2023 | ES | 10.05.2023 | FI | 10.05.2023 | HR | 10.05.2023 | IT | 10.05.2023 | LT | 10.05.2023 | LV | 10.05.2023 | MC | 10.05.2023 | NL | 10.05.2023 | PL | 10.05.2023 | RO | 10.05.2023 | RS | 10.05.2023 | SE | 10.05.2023 | SI | 10.05.2023 | SK | 10.05.2023 | SM | 10.05.2023 | IE | 13.07.2023 | LU | 13.07.2023 | BE | 31.07.2023 | CH | 31.07.2023 | FR | 31.07.2023 | GB | 10.08.2023 | NO | 10.08.2023 | GR | 11.08.2023 | IS | 10.09.2023 | PT | 11.09.2023 | [2024/33] |
Former [2024/26] | AT | 10.05.2023 | |
CZ | 10.05.2023 | ||
DK | 10.05.2023 | ||
EE | 10.05.2023 | ||
ES | 10.05.2023 | ||
FI | 10.05.2023 | ||
HR | 10.05.2023 | ||
IT | 10.05.2023 | ||
LT | 10.05.2023 | ||
LV | 10.05.2023 | ||
MC | 10.05.2023 | ||
NL | 10.05.2023 | ||
PL | 10.05.2023 | ||
RO | 10.05.2023 | ||
RS | 10.05.2023 | ||
SE | 10.05.2023 | ||
SI | 10.05.2023 | ||
SK | 10.05.2023 | ||
SM | 10.05.2023 | ||
LU | 13.07.2023 | ||
BE | 31.07.2023 | ||
CH | 31.07.2023 | ||
FR | 31.07.2023 | ||
NO | 10.08.2023 | ||
GR | 11.08.2023 | ||
IS | 10.09.2023 | ||
PT | 11.09.2023 | ||
Former [2024/24] | AT | 10.05.2023 | |
CZ | 10.05.2023 | ||
DK | 10.05.2023 | ||
EE | 10.05.2023 | ||
ES | 10.05.2023 | ||
FI | 10.05.2023 | ||
HR | 10.05.2023 | ||
LT | 10.05.2023 | ||
LV | 10.05.2023 | ||
MC | 10.05.2023 | ||
NL | 10.05.2023 | ||
PL | 10.05.2023 | ||
RO | 10.05.2023 | ||
RS | 10.05.2023 | ||
SE | 10.05.2023 | ||
SI | 10.05.2023 | ||
SK | 10.05.2023 | ||
SM | 10.05.2023 | ||
LU | 13.07.2023 | ||
BE | 31.07.2023 | ||
CH | 31.07.2023 | ||
FR | 31.07.2023 | ||
NO | 10.08.2023 | ||
GR | 11.08.2023 | ||
IS | 10.09.2023 | ||
PT | 11.09.2023 | ||
Former [2024/18] | AT | 10.05.2023 | |
CZ | 10.05.2023 | ||
DK | 10.05.2023 | ||
EE | 10.05.2023 | ||
ES | 10.05.2023 | ||
FI | 10.05.2023 | ||
HR | 10.05.2023 | ||
LT | 10.05.2023 | ||
LV | 10.05.2023 | ||
MC | 10.05.2023 | ||
NL | 10.05.2023 | ||
PL | 10.05.2023 | ||
RO | 10.05.2023 | ||
RS | 10.05.2023 | ||
SE | 10.05.2023 | ||
SK | 10.05.2023 | ||
SM | 10.05.2023 | ||
LU | 13.07.2023 | ||
NO | 10.08.2023 | ||
GR | 11.08.2023 | ||
IS | 10.09.2023 | ||
PT | 11.09.2023 | ||
Former [2024/14] | AT | 10.05.2023 | |
CZ | 10.05.2023 | ||
DK | 10.05.2023 | ||
EE | 10.05.2023 | ||
ES | 10.05.2023 | ||
FI | 10.05.2023 | ||
HR | 10.05.2023 | ||
LT | 10.05.2023 | ||
LV | 10.05.2023 | ||
MC | 10.05.2023 | ||
NL | 10.05.2023 | ||
PL | 10.05.2023 | ||
RO | 10.05.2023 | ||
RS | 10.05.2023 | ||
SE | 10.05.2023 | ||
SK | 10.05.2023 | ||
SM | 10.05.2023 | ||
NO | 10.08.2023 | ||
GR | 11.08.2023 | ||
IS | 10.09.2023 | ||
PT | 11.09.2023 | ||
Former [2024/10] | AT | 10.05.2023 | |
CZ | 10.05.2023 | ||
DK | 10.05.2023 | ||
EE | 10.05.2023 | ||
ES | 10.05.2023 | ||
FI | 10.05.2023 | ||
HR | 10.05.2023 | ||
LT | 10.05.2023 | ||
LV | 10.05.2023 | ||
NL | 10.05.2023 | ||
PL | 10.05.2023 | ||
RO | 10.05.2023 | ||
RS | 10.05.2023 | ||
SE | 10.05.2023 | ||
SK | 10.05.2023 | ||
SM | 10.05.2023 | ||
NO | 10.08.2023 | ||
GR | 11.08.2023 | ||
IS | 10.09.2023 | ||
PT | 11.09.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | AT | 10.05.2023 | |
ES | 10.05.2023 | ||
FI | 10.05.2023 | ||
HR | 10.05.2023 | ||
LT | 10.05.2023 | ||
LV | 10.05.2023 | ||
NL | 10.05.2023 | ||
PL | 10.05.2023 | ||
RS | 10.05.2023 | ||
SE | 10.05.2023 | ||
SK | 10.05.2023 | ||
SM | 10.05.2023 | ||
NO | 10.08.2023 | ||
GR | 11.08.2023 | ||
IS | 10.09.2023 | ||
PT | 11.09.2023 | ||
Former [2024/03] | AT | 10.05.2023 | |
ES | 10.05.2023 | ||
FI | 10.05.2023 | ||
HR | 10.05.2023 | ||
LT | 10.05.2023 | ||
LV | 10.05.2023 | ||
NL | 10.05.2023 | ||
PL | 10.05.2023 | ||
RS | 10.05.2023 | ||
SE | 10.05.2023 | ||
NO | 10.08.2023 | ||
GR | 11.08.2023 | ||
IS | 10.09.2023 | ||
PT | 11.09.2023 | ||
Former [2024/01] | AT | 10.05.2023 | |
ES | 10.05.2023 | ||
HR | 10.05.2023 | ||
LT | 10.05.2023 | ||
LV | 10.05.2023 | ||
NL | 10.05.2023 | ||
PL | 10.05.2023 | ||
RS | 10.05.2023 | ||
SE | 10.05.2023 | ||
NO | 10.08.2023 | ||
GR | 11.08.2023 | ||
IS | 10.09.2023 | ||
PT | 11.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/51] | AT | 10.05.2023 | |
ES | 10.05.2023 | ||
HR | 10.05.2023 | ||
NL | 10.05.2023 | ||
PL | 10.05.2023 | ||
RS | 10.05.2023 | ||
SE | 10.05.2023 | ||
NO | 10.08.2023 | ||
GR | 11.08.2023 | ||
IS | 10.09.2023 | ||
PT | 11.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/50] | AT | 10.05.2023 | |
ES | 10.05.2023 | ||
NL | 10.05.2023 | ||
PL | 10.05.2023 | ||
SE | 10.05.2023 | ||
NO | 10.08.2023 | ||
GR | 11.08.2023 | ||
IS | 10.09.2023 | ||
PT | 11.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/48] | AT | 10.05.2023 | |
ES | 10.05.2023 | ||
NL | 10.05.2023 | ||
SE | 10.05.2023 | ||
NO | 10.08.2023 | ||
PT | 11.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/46] | ES | 10.05.2023 | |
PT | 11.09.2023 | Documents cited: | Search | [I]KR20050041036 (LG ELECTRONICS INC [KR]) [I] 1,10 * figures 4-8 *; | [X]JP2006200786 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD) [X] 1,5 * figures 1-8 *; | [A]US2007151284 (FREESMEIER JON [US], et al) [A] 1-15* abstract * | International search | [A]KR20000009208 (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD [KR]); | [A]KR20050041036 (LG ELECTRONICS INC [KR]); | [X]JP2006200786 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD); | [A]US2007151284 (FREESMEIER JON [US], et al) |