EP2655705 - CRUCIBLES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.12.2015 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Steuler Solar GmbH Georg-Steuler-Str. 39 56203 Höhr-Grenzhausen / DE | [2015/05] |
Former [2013/44] | For all designated states Steuler Solar GmbH Georg-Steuler-Str. 56203 Höhr-Grenzhausen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ROLIGHETEN, Rune Storveien 11 N-3919 Porsgrunn / NO | [2013/44] | Representative(s) | dompatent von Kreisler Selting Werner - Partnerschaft von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten mbB Deichmannhaus am Dom Bahnhofsvorplatz 1 50667 Köln / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2015/05] | Von Kreisler Selting Werner - Partnerschaft von Patentanwälten und Rechtsanwälten mbB Deichmannhaus am Dom Bahnhofsvorplatz 1 50667 Köln / DE | ||
Former [2013/44] | von Kreisler Selting Werner Deichmannhaus am Dom Bahnhofsvorplatz 1 50667 Köln / DE | Application number, filing date | 11807894.8 | 19.12.2011 | WO2011EP73250 | Priority number, date | EP20100196529 | 22.12.2010 Original published format: EP 10196529 | [2013/44] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2012084832 | Date: | 28.06.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/26] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2655705 | Date: | 30.10.2013 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.06.2012 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2013/44] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2655705 | Date: | 28.01.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/05] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 28.06.2012 | Classification | IPC: | C30B35/00, C04B35/591, F27B14/10 | [2013/44] | CPC: |
C04B35/591 (EP,KR,US);
C30B35/00 (KR);
C30B28/06 (US);
C30B11/002 (EP,US);
C30B13/14 (KR);
C30B29/06 (EP,US);
C04B2235/3272 (EP,US);
C04B2235/3826 (EP,US);
C04B2235/428 (EP,US);
C04B2235/46 (EP,US);
C04B2235/5436 (EP,US);
C04B2235/5472 (EP,US);
C04B2235/656 (EP,US);
C04B2235/6562 (EP,US);
C04B2235/6567 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/44] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | TIEGEL | [2013/44] | English: | CRUCIBLES | [2013/44] | French: | CREUSETS | [2013/44] | Entry into regional phase | 19.07.2013 | National basic fee paid | 19.07.2013 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.07.2013 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.10.2012 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 19.07.2013 | Examination requested [2013/44] | 21.02.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 04.08.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.11.2014 | Fee for grant paid | 07.11.2014 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 07.11.2014 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 04.08.2014 | Opposition(s) | 29.10.2015 | No opposition filed within time limit [2016/01] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.12.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.12.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AL | 28.01.2015 | CY | 28.01.2015 | EE | 28.01.2015 | HR | 28.01.2015 | LT | 28.01.2015 | LV | 28.01.2015 | MC | 28.01.2015 | MK | 28.01.2015 | MT | 28.01.2015 | PT | 28.01.2015 | RO | 28.01.2015 | RS | 28.01.2015 | SM | 28.01.2015 | BG | 28.04.2015 | GR | 29.04.2015 | IS | 28.05.2015 | [2018/46] |
Former [2018/31] | CY | 28.01.2015 | |
EE | 28.01.2015 | ||
HR | 28.01.2015 | ||
LT | 28.01.2015 | ||
LV | 28.01.2015 | ||
MC | 28.01.2015 | ||
MK | 28.01.2015 | ||
MT | 28.01.2015 | ||
PT | 28.01.2015 | ||
RO | 28.01.2015 | ||
RS | 28.01.2015 | ||
SM | 28.01.2015 | ||
BG | 28.04.2015 | ||
GR | 29.04.2015 | ||
IS | 28.05.2015 | ||
Former [2017/39] | CY | 28.01.2015 | |
EE | 28.01.2015 | ||
HR | 28.01.2015 | ||
LT | 28.01.2015 | ||
LV | 28.01.2015 | ||
MC | 28.01.2015 | ||
MT | 28.01.2015 | ||
RO | 28.01.2015 | ||
RS | 28.01.2015 | ||
SM | 28.01.2015 | ||
BG | 28.04.2015 | ||
GR | 29.04.2015 | ||
IS | 28.05.2015 | ||
Former [2016/33] | EE | 28.01.2015 | |
HR | 28.01.2015 | ||
LT | 28.01.2015 | ||
LV | 28.01.2015 | ||
MC | 28.01.2015 | ||
RO | 28.01.2015 | ||
RS | 28.01.2015 | ||
BG | 28.04.2015 | ||
GR | 29.04.2015 | ||
IS | 28.05.2015 | ||
Former [2015/49] | EE | 28.01.2015 | |
HR | 28.01.2015 | ||
LT | 28.01.2015 | ||
LV | 28.01.2015 | ||
RO | 28.01.2015 | ||
RS | 28.01.2015 | ||
BG | 28.04.2015 | ||
GR | 29.04.2015 | ||
IS | 28.05.2015 | ||
Former [2015/39] | HR | 28.01.2015 | |
LT | 28.01.2015 | ||
LV | 28.01.2015 | ||
RS | 28.01.2015 | ||
BG | 28.04.2015 | ||
GR | 29.04.2015 | ||
IS | 28.05.2015 | ||
Former [2015/38] | HR | 28.01.2015 | |
LT | 28.01.2015 | ||
BG | 28.04.2015 | ||
GR | 29.04.2015 | ||
IS | 28.05.2015 | ||
Former [2015/37] | HR | 28.01.2015 | |
LT | 28.01.2015 | ||
BG | 28.04.2015 | ||
GR | 29.04.2015 | ||
Former [2015/36] | HR | 28.01.2015 | |
LT | 28.01.2015 | ||
BG | 28.04.2015 | ||
Former [2015/35] | LT | 28.01.2015 | Cited in | International search | [XI]CH326155 (CARBORUNDUM CO [US]) [X] 1-5,8 * examples I, II * * page 5, line 81 - line 90 * * page 6; table I * [I] 6; | [X]GB895769 (NAT RES DEV) [X] 1-3,5,7-13 * page 2, column 1, line 6 - line 31 * * page 2, column 1, line 55 - column 2, line 114 * * page 7, column 2, line 70 - line 121 * * page 9, line 104 - line 109 *; | [XI]US3206318 (TOSHIYOSHI YAMAUCHI, et al) [X] 1-4,7,8,11-13 * examples 1-11 * * claims 1-2 * * column 11, line 3 - line 6 * * tables I, IV * * column 4, line 30 - line 35 * * column 5, line 24 - line 36 * [I] 5,6; | [X]GB1373816 (ADVANCED MATERIALS ENG) [X] 1-5,8,9,11 * the whole document *; | [XI]EP0268166 (BAYER AG [DE]) [X] 1,4,7-9,11,14-16 * example . * * claims 1-4,10 * * page 5, line 14 - line 45 * * page 2, line 1 - line 20 * [I] 6; | [A]US5928601 (MIYAKE KAZUMI [JP], et al) [A] 1-13* the whole document * | by applicant | WO2004016835 | WO2007148986 |