EP2790644 - ORAL CARE COMPOSITIONS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.10.2017 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 19.08.2020 [2020/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Colgate-Palmolive Company 300 Park Avenue New York, NY 10022 / US | [2016/48] |
Former [2014/43] | For all designated states Colgate-Palmolive Company 300 Park Avenue New York, NY 10022 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SCHAEFFER-KORBYLO, Lyndsay 24 Clearbrook Lane Flemington, New Jersey 08822 / US | 02 /
CUIULE, Christine 2 Ardleigh Court Mount Laurel, New Jersey 08054 / US | 03 /
DU-THUMM, Laurence 16 Woodfield Court Princeton, New Jersey 08540 / US | [2014/43] | Representative(s) | Wibbelmann, Jobst, et al Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patentanwälte und Rechtsanwalt PartG mbB Schweigerstrasse 2 81541 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2014/43] | Jenkins, Peter David Page White & Farrer Bedford House John Street London WC1N 2BF / GB | Application number, filing date | 11808056.3 | 15.12.2011 | [2016/48] | WO2011US65129 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2013089735 | Date: | 20.06.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/25] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2790644 | Date: | 22.10.2014 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.06.2013 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2014/43] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2790644 | Date: | 30.11.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/48] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 20.06.2013 | Classification | IPC: | A61K8/19, A61K8/88, A61Q11/00 | [2014/43] | CPC: |
A61Q11/00 (EP,US);
A61K8/64 (US);
A61K8/19 (EP,US);
A61K8/58 (US);
A61K8/88 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/43] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | MUNDPFLEGEZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN | [2014/43] | English: | ORAL CARE COMPOSITIONS | [2014/43] | French: | COMPOSITIONS POUR SOINS BUCCAUX | [2014/43] | Entry into regional phase | 09.07.2014 | National basic fee paid | 09.07.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.07.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.10.2013 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 09.07.2014 | Examination requested [2014/43] | 12.02.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 14.04.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.08.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.11.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.03.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.06.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.10.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 19.10.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 19.10.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 14.04.2015 | Opposition(s) | 31.08.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/45] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.07.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 05.12.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.12.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 15.12.2011 | AL | 30.11.2016 | AT | 30.11.2016 | BE | 30.11.2016 | CY | 30.11.2016 | CZ | 30.11.2016 | DK | 30.11.2016 | EE | 30.11.2016 | ES | 30.11.2016 | FI | 30.11.2016 | HR | 30.11.2016 | IS | 30.11.2016 | IT | 30.11.2016 | LT | 30.11.2016 | LV | 30.11.2016 | MC | 30.11.2016 | MK | 30.11.2016 | NL | 30.11.2016 | PL | 30.11.2016 | RO | 30.11.2016 | RS | 30.11.2016 | SE | 30.11.2016 | SI | 30.11.2016 | SK | 30.11.2016 | SM | 30.11.2016 | TR | 30.11.2016 | IE | 15.12.2016 | LU | 15.12.2016 | MT | 15.12.2016 | CH | 31.12.2016 | LI | 31.12.2016 | BG | 28.02.2017 | NO | 28.02.2017 | GR | 01.03.2017 | PT | 30.03.2017 | [2020/34] |
Former [2018/45] | HU | 15.12.2011 | |
AT | 30.11.2016 | ||
BE | 30.11.2016 | ||
CY | 30.11.2016 | ||
CZ | 30.11.2016 | ||
DK | 30.11.2016 | ||
EE | 30.11.2016 | ||
ES | 30.11.2016 | ||
FI | 30.11.2016 | ||
HR | 30.11.2016 | ||
IS | 30.11.2016 | ||
IT | 30.11.2016 | ||
LT | 30.11.2016 | ||
LV | 30.11.2016 | ||
MC | 30.11.2016 | ||
MK | 30.11.2016 | ||
NL | 30.11.2016 | ||
PL | 30.11.2016 | ||
RO | 30.11.2016 | ||
RS | 30.11.2016 | ||
SE | 30.11.2016 | ||
SI | 30.11.2016 | ||
SK | 30.11.2016 | ||
SM | 30.11.2016 | ||
TR | 30.11.2016 | ||
IE | 15.12.2016 | ||
LU | 15.12.2016 | ||
MT | 15.12.2016 | ||
CH | 31.12.2016 | ||
LI | 31.12.2016 | ||
BG | 28.02.2017 | ||
NO | 28.02.2017 | ||
GR | 01.03.2017 | ||
PT | 30.03.2017 | ||
Former [2018/43] | HU | 15.12.2011 | |
AT | 30.11.2016 | ||
BE | 30.11.2016 | ||
CY | 30.11.2016 | ||
CZ | 30.11.2016 | ||
DK | 30.11.2016 | ||
EE | 30.11.2016 | ||
ES | 30.11.2016 | ||
FI | 30.11.2016 | ||
HR | 30.11.2016 | ||
IS | 30.11.2016 | ||
IT | 30.11.2016 | ||
LT | 30.11.2016 | ||
LV | 30.11.2016 | ||
MC | 30.11.2016 | ||
MK | 30.11.2016 | ||
NL | 30.11.2016 | ||
PL | 30.11.2016 | ||
RO | 30.11.2016 | ||
RS | 30.11.2016 | ||
SE | 30.11.2016 | ||
SI | 30.11.2016 | ||
SK | 30.11.2016 | ||
SM | 30.11.2016 | ||
IE | 15.12.2016 | ||
LU | 15.12.2016 | ||
MT | 15.12.2016 | ||
CH | 31.12.2016 | ||
LI | 31.12.2016 | ||
BG | 28.02.2017 | ||
NO | 28.02.2017 | ||
GR | 01.03.2017 | ||
PT | 30.03.2017 | ||
Former [2018/30] | HU | 15.12.2011 | |
AT | 30.11.2016 | ||
BE | 30.11.2016 | ||
CY | 30.11.2016 | ||
CZ | 30.11.2016 | ||
DK | 30.11.2016 | ||
EE | 30.11.2016 | ||
ES | 30.11.2016 | ||
FI | 30.11.2016 | ||
HR | 30.11.2016 | ||
IS | 30.11.2016 | ||
IT | 30.11.2016 | ||
LT | 30.11.2016 | ||
LV | 30.11.2016 | ||
MC | 30.11.2016 | ||
MK | 30.11.2016 | ||
NL | 30.11.2016 | ||
PL | 30.11.2016 | ||
RO | 30.11.2016 | ||
RS | 30.11.2016 | ||
SE | 30.11.2016 | ||
SI | 30.11.2016 | ||
SK | 30.11.2016 | ||
SM | 30.11.2016 | ||
IE | 15.12.2016 | ||
LU | 15.12.2016 | ||
CH | 31.12.2016 | ||
LI | 31.12.2016 | ||
BG | 28.02.2017 | ||
NO | 28.02.2017 | ||
GR | 01.03.2017 | ||
PT | 30.03.2017 | ||
Former [2017/49] | AT | 30.11.2016 | |
BE | 30.11.2016 | ||
CZ | 30.11.2016 | ||
DK | 30.11.2016 | ||
EE | 30.11.2016 | ||
ES | 30.11.2016 | ||
FI | 30.11.2016 | ||
HR | 30.11.2016 | ||
IT | 30.11.2016 | ||
LT | 30.11.2016 | ||
LV | 30.11.2016 | ||
MC | 30.11.2016 | ||
NL | 30.11.2016 | ||
PL | 30.11.2016 | ||
RO | 30.11.2016 | ||
RS | 30.11.2016 | ||
SE | 30.11.2016 | ||
SI | 30.11.2016 | ||
SK | 30.11.2016 | ||
SM | 30.11.2016 | ||
IE | 15.12.2016 | ||
LU | 15.12.2016 | ||
CH | 31.12.2016 | ||
LI | 31.12.2016 | ||
BG | 28.02.2017 | ||
NO | 28.02.2017 | ||
GR | 01.03.2017 | ||
PT | 30.03.2017 | ||
Former [2017/42] | AT | 30.11.2016 | |
BE | 30.11.2016 | ||
CZ | 30.11.2016 | ||
DK | 30.11.2016 | ||
EE | 30.11.2016 | ||
ES | 30.11.2016 | ||
FI | 30.11.2016 | ||
HR | 30.11.2016 | ||
IT | 30.11.2016 | ||
LT | 30.11.2016 | ||
LV | 30.11.2016 | ||
MC | 30.11.2016 | ||
NL | 30.11.2016 | ||
PL | 30.11.2016 | ||
RO | 30.11.2016 | ||
RS | 30.11.2016 | ||
SE | 30.11.2016 | ||
SK | 30.11.2016 | ||
SM | 30.11.2016 | ||
BG | 28.02.2017 | ||
NO | 28.02.2017 | ||
GR | 01.03.2017 | ||
PT | 30.03.2017 | ||
Former [2017/38] | AT | 30.11.2016 | |
BE | 30.11.2016 | ||
CZ | 30.11.2016 | ||
DK | 30.11.2016 | ||
EE | 30.11.2016 | ||
ES | 30.11.2016 | ||
FI | 30.11.2016 | ||
HR | 30.11.2016 | ||
IT | 30.11.2016 | ||
LT | 30.11.2016 | ||
LV | 30.11.2016 | ||
NL | 30.11.2016 | ||
PL | 30.11.2016 | ||
RO | 30.11.2016 | ||
RS | 30.11.2016 | ||
SE | 30.11.2016 | ||
SK | 30.11.2016 | ||
SM | 30.11.2016 | ||
BG | 28.02.2017 | ||
NO | 28.02.2017 | ||
GR | 01.03.2017 | ||
PT | 30.03.2017 | ||
Former [2017/37] | AT | 30.11.2016 | |
BE | 30.11.2016 | ||
CZ | 30.11.2016 | ||
DK | 30.11.2016 | ||
EE | 30.11.2016 | ||
ES | 30.11.2016 | ||
FI | 30.11.2016 | ||
HR | 30.11.2016 | ||
IT | 30.11.2016 | ||
LT | 30.11.2016 | ||
LV | 30.11.2016 | ||
NL | 30.11.2016 | ||
PL | 30.11.2016 | ||
RO | 30.11.2016 | ||
RS | 30.11.2016 | ||
SE | 30.11.2016 | ||
SK | 30.11.2016 | ||
SM | 30.11.2016 | ||
NO | 28.02.2017 | ||
GR | 01.03.2017 | ||
PT | 30.03.2017 | ||
Former [2017/36] | AT | 30.11.2016 | |
BE | 30.11.2016 | ||
CZ | 30.11.2016 | ||
DK | 30.11.2016 | ||
EE | 30.11.2016 | ||
ES | 30.11.2016 | ||
FI | 30.11.2016 | ||
HR | 30.11.2016 | ||
LT | 30.11.2016 | ||
LV | 30.11.2016 | ||
NL | 30.11.2016 | ||
PL | 30.11.2016 | ||
RO | 30.11.2016 | ||
RS | 30.11.2016 | ||
SE | 30.11.2016 | ||
SK | 30.11.2016 | ||
NO | 28.02.2017 | ||
GR | 01.03.2017 | ||
PT | 30.03.2017 | ||
Former [2017/33] | AT | 30.11.2016 | |
DK | 30.11.2016 | ||
ES | 30.11.2016 | ||
FI | 30.11.2016 | ||
HR | 30.11.2016 | ||
LT | 30.11.2016 | ||
LV | 30.11.2016 | ||
NL | 30.11.2016 | ||
PL | 30.11.2016 | ||
RS | 30.11.2016 | ||
SE | 30.11.2016 | ||
BE | 31.12.2016 | ||
NO | 28.02.2017 | ||
GR | 01.03.2017 | ||
PT | 30.03.2017 | ||
Former [2017/31] | AT | 30.11.2016 | |
ES | 30.11.2016 | ||
FI | 30.11.2016 | ||
HR | 30.11.2016 | ||
LT | 30.11.2016 | ||
LV | 30.11.2016 | ||
NL | 30.11.2016 | ||
PL | 30.11.2016 | ||
RS | 30.11.2016 | ||
SE | 30.11.2016 | ||
BE | 31.12.2016 | ||
NO | 28.02.2017 | ||
GR | 01.03.2017 | ||
PT | 30.03.2017 | ||
Former [2017/26] | AT | 30.11.2016 | |
ES | 30.11.2016 | ||
FI | 30.11.2016 | ||
HR | 30.11.2016 | ||
LT | 30.11.2016 | ||
LV | 30.11.2016 | ||
PL | 30.11.2016 | ||
RS | 30.11.2016 | ||
SE | 30.11.2016 | ||
BE | 31.12.2016 | ||
NO | 28.02.2017 | ||
GR | 01.03.2017 | ||
PT | 30.03.2017 | ||
Former [2017/12] | LV | 30.11.2016 | Cited in | International search | [Y]JP2007008843 ; | [A]US5286480 (BOGGS ROBERT W [US], et al) [A] 1-11 * column 1, line 40 - line 48 ** the whole document *; | [Y]WO2007053581 (SIDEROMICS LLC [US], et al) [Y] 1-11 * page 4, line 3 - line 6 *; | [Y] - DATABASE WPI, 0, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 2007, no. 18, Database accession no. 2007-180895, XP002685682 & JP2007008843 A 20070118 (LION CORP) [Y] 1-11 * abstract * | by applicant | US3535421 | US3538230 | US3678154 | US3696191 | US3862307 | US3937807 | US3959458 | US3991177 | US4051234 | US4058595 | US4154815 | US4340583 | US4355022 | US4842847 | US4866161 | US4885155 | US4992420 | US5000939 | US5004597 | US5188821 | US5192531 |