EP2654773 - GLUCAGON ANALOGS EXHIBITING GIP RECEPTOR ACTIVITY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.08.2019 Database last updated on 17.07.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 31.08.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 19.04.2018 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 06.03.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY, MK | published on 05.08.2020 [2020/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Indiana University Research and Technology Corporation 518 Indiana Avenue Indianapolis, IN 46202 / US | [2017/25] |
Former [2013/44] | For all designated states Indiana University Research and Technology Corporation 351 West 10th Street Indianapolis, IN 46202 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DIMARCHI, Richard, D. 10890 Wilmington Drive Carmel IN 46033 / US | 02 /
WARD, Brian 2406 Grant Blvd. Lebanon IN 46052 / US | [2013/44] | Representative(s) | Ponti & Partners, S.L.P Edifici PRISMA Av. Diagonal núm. 611-613, Planta 2 08028 Barcelona / ES | [N/P] |
Former [2018/40] | Ponti & Partners, S.L.P C. de Consell de Cent 322 08007 Barcelona / ES | ||
Former [2013/44] | Oficina Ponti, SLP C. Consell de Cent, 322 08007 Barcelona / ES | Application number, filing date | 11808086.0 | 20.12.2011 | [2018/40] | WO2011US66164 | Priority number, date | US201161514609P | 03.08.2011 Original published format: US 201161514609 P | US201061426285P | 22.12.2010 Original published format: US 201061426285 P | [2013/44] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2012088116 | Date: | 28.06.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/26] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2654773 | Date: | 30.10.2013 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.06.2012 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2013/44] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2654773 | Date: | 03.10.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/40] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 15.11.2012 | Classification | IPC: | C07K14/605, A61K38/00 | [2018/17] | CPC: |
C07K14/605 (EP,KR,US);
A61K38/26 (KR);
A61P1/00 (EP);
A61P1/14 (EP);
A61P25/02 (EP);
A61P3/04 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2013/44] | A61K38/26 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/44] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | GLOCAGONANALOGA MIT GIP-REZEPTORAKTIVITÄT | [2013/44] | English: | GLUCAGON ANALOGS EXHIBITING GIP RECEPTOR ACTIVITY | [2013/44] | French: | ANALOGUES DU GLUCAGON PRÉSENTANT UNE ACTIVITÉ DE RÉCEPTEUR DE GIP | [2013/44] | Entry into regional phase | 03.07.2013 | National basic fee paid | 03.07.2013 | Designation fee(s) paid | 03.07.2013 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 03.07.2013 | Examination requested [2013/44] | 10.02.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 14.03.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.05.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.02.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 08.08.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.01.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 05.03.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.04.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.08.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 16.08.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 16.08.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 14.03.2016 | Opposition(s) | 04.07.2019 | No opposition filed within time limit [2019/37] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.12.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.12.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.12.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.12.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.12.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 20.12.2011 | AL | 03.10.2018 | AT | 03.10.2018 | CY | 03.10.2018 | CZ | 03.10.2018 | DK | 03.10.2018 | EE | 03.10.2018 | FI | 03.10.2018 | HR | 03.10.2018 | LT | 03.10.2018 | LV | 03.10.2018 | MC | 03.10.2018 | MK | 03.10.2018 | NL | 03.10.2018 | PL | 03.10.2018 | RO | 03.10.2018 | RS | 03.10.2018 | SE | 03.10.2018 | SI | 03.10.2018 | SK | 03.10.2018 | SM | 03.10.2018 | TR | 03.10.2018 | IE | 20.12.2018 | LU | 20.12.2018 | MT | 20.12.2018 | BE | 31.12.2018 | CH | 31.12.2018 | LI | 31.12.2018 | BG | 03.01.2019 | NO | 03.01.2019 | GR | 04.01.2019 | IS | 03.02.2019 | PT | 03.02.2019 | [2020/31] |
Former [2020/30] | HU | 20.12.2011 | |
AL | 03.10.2018 | ||
AT | 03.10.2018 | ||
CZ | 03.10.2018 | ||
DK | 03.10.2018 | ||
EE | 03.10.2018 | ||
FI | 03.10.2018 | ||
HR | 03.10.2018 | ||
LT | 03.10.2018 | ||
LV | 03.10.2018 | ||
MC | 03.10.2018 | ||
NL | 03.10.2018 | ||
PL | 03.10.2018 | ||
RO | 03.10.2018 | ||
RS | 03.10.2018 | ||
SE | 03.10.2018 | ||
SI | 03.10.2018 | ||
SK | 03.10.2018 | ||
SM | 03.10.2018 | ||
TR | 03.10.2018 | ||
IE | 20.12.2018 | ||
LU | 20.12.2018 | ||
MT | 20.12.2018 | ||
BE | 31.12.2018 | ||
CH | 31.12.2018 | ||
LI | 31.12.2018 | ||
BG | 03.01.2019 | ||
NO | 03.01.2019 | ||
GR | 04.01.2019 | ||
IS | 03.02.2019 | ||
PT | 03.02.2019 | ||
Former [2020/17] | AL | 03.10.2018 | |
AT | 03.10.2018 | ||
CZ | 03.10.2018 | ||
DK | 03.10.2018 | ||
EE | 03.10.2018 | ||
FI | 03.10.2018 | ||
HR | 03.10.2018 | ||
LT | 03.10.2018 | ||
LV | 03.10.2018 | ||
MC | 03.10.2018 | ||
NL | 03.10.2018 | ||
PL | 03.10.2018 | ||
RO | 03.10.2018 | ||
RS | 03.10.2018 | ||
SE | 03.10.2018 | ||
SI | 03.10.2018 | ||
SK | 03.10.2018 | ||
SM | 03.10.2018 | ||
TR | 03.10.2018 | ||
IE | 20.12.2018 | ||
LU | 20.12.2018 | ||
MT | 20.12.2018 | ||
BE | 31.12.2018 | ||
CH | 31.12.2018 | ||
LI | 31.12.2018 | ||
BG | 03.01.2019 | ||
NO | 03.01.2019 | ||
GR | 04.01.2019 | ||
IS | 03.02.2019 | ||
PT | 03.02.2019 | ||
Former [2020/08] | AL | 03.10.2018 | |
AT | 03.10.2018 | ||
CZ | 03.10.2018 | ||
DK | 03.10.2018 | ||
EE | 03.10.2018 | ||
FI | 03.10.2018 | ||
HR | 03.10.2018 | ||
LT | 03.10.2018 | ||
LV | 03.10.2018 | ||
MC | 03.10.2018 | ||
NL | 03.10.2018 | ||
PL | 03.10.2018 | ||
RO | 03.10.2018 | ||
RS | 03.10.2018 | ||
SE | 03.10.2018 | ||
SI | 03.10.2018 | ||
SK | 03.10.2018 | ||
SM | 03.10.2018 | ||
IE | 20.12.2018 | ||
LU | 20.12.2018 | ||
MT | 20.12.2018 | ||
BE | 31.12.2018 | ||
CH | 31.12.2018 | ||
LI | 31.12.2018 | ||
BG | 03.01.2019 | ||
NO | 03.01.2019 | ||
GR | 04.01.2019 | ||
IS | 03.02.2019 | ||
PT | 03.02.2019 | ||
Former [2020/04] | AL | 03.10.2018 | |
AT | 03.10.2018 | ||
CZ | 03.10.2018 | ||
DK | 03.10.2018 | ||
EE | 03.10.2018 | ||
FI | 03.10.2018 | ||
HR | 03.10.2018 | ||
LT | 03.10.2018 | ||
LV | 03.10.2018 | ||
MC | 03.10.2018 | ||
NL | 03.10.2018 | ||
PL | 03.10.2018 | ||
RO | 03.10.2018 | ||
RS | 03.10.2018 | ||
SE | 03.10.2018 | ||
SI | 03.10.2018 | ||
SK | 03.10.2018 | ||
SM | 03.10.2018 | ||
IE | 20.12.2018 | ||
LU | 20.12.2018 | ||
BE | 31.12.2018 | ||
CH | 31.12.2018 | ||
LI | 31.12.2018 | ||
BG | 03.01.2019 | ||
NO | 03.01.2019 | ||
GR | 04.01.2019 | ||
IS | 03.02.2019 | ||
PT | 03.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/50] | AL | 03.10.2018 | |
AT | 03.10.2018 | ||
CZ | 03.10.2018 | ||
DK | 03.10.2018 | ||
EE | 03.10.2018 | ||
FI | 03.10.2018 | ||
HR | 03.10.2018 | ||
LT | 03.10.2018 | ||
LV | 03.10.2018 | ||
MC | 03.10.2018 | ||
NL | 03.10.2018 | ||
PL | 03.10.2018 | ||
RO | 03.10.2018 | ||
RS | 03.10.2018 | ||
SE | 03.10.2018 | ||
SI | 03.10.2018 | ||
SK | 03.10.2018 | ||
SM | 03.10.2018 | ||
IE | 20.12.2018 | ||
LU | 20.12.2018 | ||
BE | 31.12.2018 | ||
BG | 03.01.2019 | ||
NO | 03.01.2019 | ||
GR | 04.01.2019 | ||
IS | 03.02.2019 | ||
PT | 03.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/48] | AL | 03.10.2018 | |
AT | 03.10.2018 | ||
CZ | 03.10.2018 | ||
DK | 03.10.2018 | ||
EE | 03.10.2018 | ||
FI | 03.10.2018 | ||
HR | 03.10.2018 | ||
LT | 03.10.2018 | ||
LV | 03.10.2018 | ||
MC | 03.10.2018 | ||
NL | 03.10.2018 | ||
PL | 03.10.2018 | ||
RO | 03.10.2018 | ||
RS | 03.10.2018 | ||
SE | 03.10.2018 | ||
SK | 03.10.2018 | ||
SM | 03.10.2018 | ||
IE | 20.12.2018 | ||
LU | 20.12.2018 | ||
BG | 03.01.2019 | ||
NO | 03.01.2019 | ||
GR | 04.01.2019 | ||
IS | 03.02.2019 | ||
PT | 03.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/40] | AL | 03.10.2018 | |
AT | 03.10.2018 | ||
CZ | 03.10.2018 | ||
DK | 03.10.2018 | ||
EE | 03.10.2018 | ||
FI | 03.10.2018 | ||
HR | 03.10.2018 | ||
LT | 03.10.2018 | ||
LV | 03.10.2018 | ||
MC | 03.10.2018 | ||
NL | 03.10.2018 | ||
PL | 03.10.2018 | ||
RO | 03.10.2018 | ||
RS | 03.10.2018 | ||
SE | 03.10.2018 | ||
SK | 03.10.2018 | ||
SM | 03.10.2018 | ||
LU | 20.12.2018 | ||
BG | 03.01.2019 | ||
NO | 03.01.2019 | ||
GR | 04.01.2019 | ||
IS | 03.02.2019 | ||
PT | 03.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/39] | AL | 03.10.2018 | |
AT | 03.10.2018 | ||
CZ | 03.10.2018 | ||
DK | 03.10.2018 | ||
EE | 03.10.2018 | ||
FI | 03.10.2018 | ||
HR | 03.10.2018 | ||
LT | 03.10.2018 | ||
LV | 03.10.2018 | ||
NL | 03.10.2018 | ||
PL | 03.10.2018 | ||
RO | 03.10.2018 | ||
RS | 03.10.2018 | ||
SE | 03.10.2018 | ||
SK | 03.10.2018 | ||
SM | 03.10.2018 | ||
LU | 20.12.2018 | ||
BG | 03.01.2019 | ||
NO | 03.01.2019 | ||
GR | 04.01.2019 | ||
IS | 03.02.2019 | ||
PT | 03.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/37] | AL | 03.10.2018 | |
AT | 03.10.2018 | ||
CZ | 03.10.2018 | ||
DK | 03.10.2018 | ||
EE | 03.10.2018 | ||
FI | 03.10.2018 | ||
HR | 03.10.2018 | ||
LT | 03.10.2018 | ||
LV | 03.10.2018 | ||
NL | 03.10.2018 | ||
PL | 03.10.2018 | ||
RO | 03.10.2018 | ||
RS | 03.10.2018 | ||
SE | 03.10.2018 | ||
SM | 03.10.2018 | ||
BG | 03.01.2019 | ||
NO | 03.01.2019 | ||
GR | 04.01.2019 | ||
IS | 03.02.2019 | ||
PT | 03.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/34] | AL | 03.10.2018 | |
AT | 03.10.2018 | ||
CZ | 03.10.2018 | ||
DK | 03.10.2018 | ||
FI | 03.10.2018 | ||
HR | 03.10.2018 | ||
LT | 03.10.2018 | ||
LV | 03.10.2018 | ||
NL | 03.10.2018 | ||
PL | 03.10.2018 | ||
RS | 03.10.2018 | ||
SE | 03.10.2018 | ||
BG | 03.01.2019 | ||
NO | 03.01.2019 | ||
GR | 04.01.2019 | ||
IS | 03.02.2019 | ||
PT | 03.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/26] | AL | 03.10.2018 | |
AT | 03.10.2018 | ||
CZ | 03.10.2018 | ||
FI | 03.10.2018 | ||
HR | 03.10.2018 | ||
LT | 03.10.2018 | ||
LV | 03.10.2018 | ||
NL | 03.10.2018 | ||
PL | 03.10.2018 | ||
RS | 03.10.2018 | ||
SE | 03.10.2018 | ||
BG | 03.01.2019 | ||
NO | 03.01.2019 | ||
GR | 04.01.2019 | ||
IS | 03.02.2019 | ||
PT | 03.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/25] | AT | 03.10.2018 | |
CZ | 03.10.2018 | ||
FI | 03.10.2018 | ||
HR | 03.10.2018 | ||
LT | 03.10.2018 | ||
LV | 03.10.2018 | ||
NL | 03.10.2018 | ||
PL | 03.10.2018 | ||
RS | 03.10.2018 | ||
SE | 03.10.2018 | ||
BG | 03.01.2019 | ||
NO | 03.01.2019 | ||
GR | 04.01.2019 | ||
IS | 03.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/24] | AT | 03.10.2018 | |
CZ | 03.10.2018 | ||
FI | 03.10.2018 | ||
HR | 03.10.2018 | ||
LT | 03.10.2018 | ||
LV | 03.10.2018 | ||
NL | 03.10.2018 | ||
PL | 03.10.2018 | ||
SE | 03.10.2018 | ||
BG | 03.01.2019 | ||
NO | 03.01.2019 | ||
GR | 04.01.2019 | ||
IS | 03.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/23] | AT | 03.10.2018 | |
CZ | 03.10.2018 | ||
FI | 03.10.2018 | ||
HR | 03.10.2018 | ||
LT | 03.10.2018 | ||
LV | 03.10.2018 | ||
NL | 03.10.2018 | ||
PL | 03.10.2018 | ||
BG | 03.01.2019 | ||
NO | 03.01.2019 | ||
IS | 03.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/22] | CZ | 03.10.2018 | |
FI | 03.10.2018 | ||
LT | 03.10.2018 | ||
NL | 03.10.2018 | ||
PL | 03.10.2018 | ||
BG | 03.01.2019 | ||
NO | 03.01.2019 | ||
IS | 03.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/21] | FI | 03.10.2018 | |
LT | 03.10.2018 | ||
NL | 03.10.2018 | ||
NO | 03.01.2019 | ||
IS | 03.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/20] | LT | 03.10.2018 | |
NL | 03.10.2018 | ||
NO | 03.01.2019 | ||
Former [2019/17] | NL | 03.10.2018 | Cited in | International search | [A]WO2008101017 (INDIANA UNVERSITY RES AND TECH [US], et al) [A] 92,94,104-135 * Invention 15 + 17 * * claim 65 * * sequence 495 *; | [X]WO2009155257 (UNIV INDIANA RES & TECH CORP [US], et al) [X] 1-6,14-51,104-136 * Invention 1 * * page 6, line 10 - page 9, line 5 * * page 113; table 8 * * claims 1-96 *; | [X]WO2010071807 (UNIV INDIANA RES & TECH CORP [US], et al) [X] 7-61,104-136 * Invention 2 + 3 * * page 49, line 27 - page 51, line 6 * * page 59, line 8 - page 60, line 22 * * page 66, line 15 - page 67, line 5 *; | [I] - PAN CLARK Q ET AL, "Design of a long acting peptide functioning as both a glucagon-like peptide-1 receptor agonist and a glucagon receptor antagonist", JOURNAL OF BIOLOGICAL CHEMISTRY, THE AMERICAN SOCIETY OF BIOLOGICAL CHEMISTS, INC, US, vol. 281, no. 18, doi:10.1074/JBC.M600127200, ISSN 0021-9258, (20060501), pages 12506 - 12515, (20060227), XP002529523 [I] 1-6,14-51,104-136 * abstract * * page 12506, paragraph 3 - page 12507, paragraph 3 * * page 12508; table 1 * * page 12511; table 3 * * page 12513, paragraph 2 - paragraph 3 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1074/jbc.m600127200 | [I] - PENGYUN LI ET AL, "Design, synthesis and crystallization of a novel glucagon analog as a therapeutic agent", ACTA CRYSTALLOGRAPHICA SECTION F STRUCTURAL BIOLOGY AND CRYSTALLIZATION COMMUNICATIONS, (20070701), vol. 63, no. 7, doi:10.1107/S1744309107028655, ISSN 1744-3091, pages 599 - 601, XP055010072 [I] 52-61,104-136 * Invention 3 * * abstract * * page 600; figure 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1107/S1744309107028655 | [A] - "Enhanced potency exhibiting modified human GLP-1 peptide SEQ ID:495.", Geneseq, (20081127), Database accession no. ATD14223, URL: EBI, XP002679991 [A] 92,94,104-136 * sequence . * | [A] - CHABENNE JOSEPH R ET AL, "Optimization of the native glucagon sequence for medicinal purposes.", JOURNAL OF DIABETES SCIENCE AND TECHNOLOGY NOV 2010 LNKD- PUBMED:21129326, (201011), vol. 4, no. 6, ISSN 1932-2968, pages 1322 - 1331, XP007920819 [A] 92,94,104-136 * abstract * * page 1327, column r, paragraph 2 - page 1328, column r, paragraph 1 * * figure 5 * * page 1330, column r, paragraph 2 * * table 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1177/193229681000400605 | by applicant | US4450150 | WO8705330 | US5087616 | US5449752 | WO9940942 | WO0032218 | WO2004033036 | WO2007133747 | WO2007141411 | US7355008 | US7381408 | WO2008101017 | WO2008130158 | US2008286808 | WO2009023270 | WO2010011439 | WO2010071807 | WO2010148089 | WO2011094337 | - FLEGAL ET AL., JAMA, (2010), vol. 303, no. 3, pages 235 - 241 | - NAUCK ET AL., J. CLIN. ENDOCRINOL. METAB., (1993), vol. 76, pages 912 - 917 | - IRWIN ET AL., REGUL. PEPT., (2009), vol. 153, pages 70 - 76 | - MILLER, BIOCHEM BIOPHYS RES COMMUN, (1996), vol. 218, pages 377 - 382 | - SHIMOHIGASHI; STAMMER, INT J PEPT PROTEIN RES, (1982), vol. 19, pages 54 - 62 | - PREVIERO ET AL., BIOCHIM BIOPHYS ACTA, (1972), vol. 263, pages 7 - 13 | - SAN; SILVIUS, J PEPT RES, (2005), vol. 66, pages 169 - 180 | - "Chemical Modifications of Proteins: History and Applications", BIOCONJUGATE CHEM., (1990), vol. 1, pages 2 - 12 | - HASHIMOTO ET AL., "Synthesis of Palmitoyl Derivatives of Insulin and their Biological Activity", PHARMACUETICAL RES., (1989), vol. 6, no. 2, doi:doi:10.1023/A:1015992828666, pages 171 - 176, XP002050607 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1023/A:1015992828666 | - LYU ET AL., PROC NATL ACAD SCI U.S.A., (1991), vol. 88, pages 5317 - 5320 | - HOUSTON, JR. ET AL., J PEPTIDE SCI, (2004), vol. 1, pages 274 - 282 | - SHEEHAN ET AL., J AM CHEM SOC, (1973), vol. 95, pages 875 - 879 | - SCHAFMEISTER ET AL., J. AM. CHEM. SOC., (2000), vol. 122, pages 5891 - 5892 | - WALENSKY ET AL., SCIENCE, (2004), vol. 305, pages 1466 - 1470 | - BLACKWELL ET AL., ANGEW, CHEM., INT. ED., (1998), vol. 37, pages 3281 - 3284 | - MATTEUCCI ET AL., TETRAHEDRON LETTERS, (2004), vol. 45, pages 1399 - 1401 | - MAYER ET AL., J. PEPTIDE RES., (1998), vol. 51, pages 432 - 436 | - POLINSKY ET AL., J. MED. CHEM., (1992), vol. 35, pages 4185 - 4194 | - OSAPAY ET AL., J. MED. CHEM., (1997), vol. 40, pages 2241 - 2251 | - FUKASE ET AL., BULL. CHEM..SOC. JPN., (1992), vol. 65, pages 2227 - 2240 | - HARPP ET AL., J. ORG. CHEM., (1971), vol. 36, pages 73 - 80 | - GOODMAN; SHAO, PURE APPL. CHEM., (1996), vol. 68, pages 1303 - 1308 | - OSAPAY; GOODMAN, J. CHEM. SOC. CHEM. COMMUN., (1993), pages 1599 - 1600 | - PHELAN ET AL., J. AM. CHEM. SOC., (1997), vol. 119, pages 455 - 460 | - JACKSON ET AL., J. AM. CHEM. SOC., (1991), vol. 113, pages 9391 - 9392 | - RUDINGER; JOST, EXPERIENTIA, (1964), vol. 20, pages 570 - 571 | - ANDREWS; TABOR, TETRAHEDRON, (1999), vol. 55, pages 11711 - 11743 | - GHADIRI ET AL., J. AM. CHEM. SOC., (1990), vol. 112, pages 1630 - 1632 | - GHADIRI ET AL., J. AM. CHEM. SOC., (1997), vol. 119, pages 9063 - 9064 | - DAVIES, J. PEPTIDE. SCI., (2003), vol. 9, pages 471 - 501 | - PASCHEK ET AL., PROC NATL ACAD SCI USA, (2008), vol. 105, no. 46, pages 17754 - 17759 | - H. S. SAWHNEY; C. P. PATHAK; J. A. HUBBELL, MACROMOLECULES, (1993), vol. 26, pages 581 - 587 | - T. E. CREIGHTON, Proteins: Structure and Molecular Properties, W.H. FREEMAN & CO., (1983), pages 79 - 86 | - WRISTON, CRC CRIT. REV. BIOCHEM., (1981), pages 259 - 306 | - BURMEISTER ET AL., NATURE, (1994), vol. 372, page 379 | - SONDERMANN ET AL., NATURE, (2000), vol. 406, pages 267 - 273 | - HENRY ET AL., BIOCHEMISTRY, (1997), vol. 36, pages 15568 - 15578 | - LEWIS ET AL., J IMMUNOL., (2005), vol. 175, pages 6694 - 701 | - SAYERS ET AL., J BIOL CHEM., (2004), vol. 279, no. 34, pages 35320 - 5 | - SHIELDS ET AL., J. BIOL. CHEM., (2001), vol. 276, page 6591 | - ROUTLEDGE ET AL., TRANSPLANTATION, (1995), vol. 60, page 847 | - FRIEND ET AL., TRANSPLANTATION, (1999), vol. 68, page 1632 | - SHIELDS ET AL., J. BIOL. CHEM., (1995), vol. 276, page 6591 | - WARD; GHETIE, THERAPEUTIC IMMUNOLOGY, (1995), vol. 2, page 77 | - ARMOUR ET AL., EUR. J. IMMUNOL., (1999), vol. 29, page 2613 | - KINSTLER ET AL., ADV. DRUG. DELIVERY REV., (2002), vol. 54, pages 477 - 485 | - ROBERTS ET AL., ADV. DRUG DELIVERY REV., (2002), vol. 54, pages 459 - 476 | - ZALIPSKY ET AL., ADV. DRUG DELIVERY REV., (1995), vol. 16, pages 157 - 182 | - QIAN ET AL., INT J PHARM, (2009), vol. 366, pages 218 - 220 | - ADJEI; GARREN, PHARMACEUTICAL RESEARCH, (1990), vol. 7, no. 6, pages 565 - 569 | - KAWASHIMA ET AL., J CONTROLLED RELEASE, (1999), vol. 62, no. 1-2, pages 279 - 287 | - LIU ET AL., PHARM RES, (1993), vol. 10, no. 2, pages 228 - 232 | - BANKER AND CHALMERS,, Pharmaceutics and Pharmacy Practice, J. B. LIPPINCOTT COMPANY, (1982), pages 238 - 250 | - TOISSEL, ASHP Handbook on Injeciable Drugs, 4th ed.,, (1986), pages 622 - 630 | - WADHWA ET AL., J DRUG TARGETING, (1995), vol. 3, pages 111 - 127 | - QIAN ET AL., J PHARM, (2009), vol. 374, pages 46 - 52 | - LTEIF; MATHER, CAN. J. CARDIOL., (2004), vol. 20, no. B, pages 66B - 76B | - WORMAN, HOWARD J., Alcoholic Liver Disease, COLUMBIA UNIVERSITY MEDICAL CENTER | - SCHNOLZER ET AL., INT. J. PEPTIDE PROTEIN RES., (1992), vol. 40, pages 180 - 193 | - SCHNOLZER ET AL., J. PEPTIDE PROTEIN RES., (1992), vol. 40, pages 180 - 193 |