EP2654457 - COMPOSITIONS OF FAT-SOLUBLE ACTIVE INGREDIENTS CONTAINING PLANT PROTEIN-SOY POLYSACCHARIDE COMPLEXES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.09.2019 Database last updated on 24.07.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 12.10.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 11.06.2018 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 03.02.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY, MK | published on 05.08.2020 [2020/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states DSM IP Assets B.V. Het Overloon 1 6411 TE Heerlen / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2018/46] | For all designated states DSM IP Assets B.V. Het Overloon 1 6411 TE Heerlen / NL | ||
Former [2013/44] | For all designated states DSM IP Assets B.V. Het Overloon 1 6411 TE Heerlen / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DENG, Wei 6-301 Shiguang No. 2 Estate Shanghai 200438 / CN | 02 /
LEUENBERGER, Bruno Magdenerstrasse 24 CH-4310 Rheinfelden / CH | 03 /
VIDONI, Olivia 6 rue Théo Bachmann F-68300 Saint Louis / FR | 04 /
YAO, Ping 56-502 60 Lane Guonian Road Shanghai 200433 / CN | 05 /
YIN, Baoru 53-202 78 Lane Wuchuan Road Shanghai 200433 / CN | [2013/44] | Representative(s) | Kurt, Manfred DSM Nutritional Products AG Patent Department (241/625) Wurmisweg 576 4303 Kaiseraugst / CH | [2018/46] |
Former [2013/44] | Schwander, Kuno, et al DSM Nutritional Products Ltd., Wurmisweg 576 4303 Kaiseraugst / CH | Application number, filing date | 11808841.8 | 14.12.2011 | [2018/46] | WO2011EP72690 | Priority number, date | CN201010614218 | 23.12.2010 Original published format: CN201010614218 | WO2011CN01207 | 22.07.2011 Original published format: PCT/CN2011/001207 | [2013/44] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2012084624 | Date: | 28.06.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/26] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2654457 | Date: | 30.10.2013 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.06.2012 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2013/44] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2654457 | Date: | 14.11.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/46] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 28.06.2012 | Classification | IPC: | A23L2/66, A23L2/52, A23L29/206, A23L5/44, A23L33/115, A23L33/155, A23L33/185, A23K20/174, A23K20/179, A23K20/147, A23K20/158 | [2018/26] | CPC: |
A23K20/158 (EP,BR,KR);
A23K20/147 (EP,BR,KR);
A23L2/38 (KR);
A23K20/174 (EP,BR,KR);
A23K20/179 (EP,BR,KR);
A23L2/52 (EP,BR);
A23L2/66 (EP,KR);
A23L29/206 (EP,BR,KR);
A23L33/115 (EP,BR,KR);
A23L33/155 (EP,BR);
A23L33/185 (EP,KR);
A23L5/44 (EP,BR,KR);
|
Former IPC [2013/44] | A23L1/052, A23L1/275, A23L1/30, A23L1/303, A23L1/305, A23L2/52, A23L2/66, B01J13/14, A23K1/16 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/44] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ZUSAMMENSTZUNGEN VON FETTLÖSLICHEN INHALTSSTOFFEN MIT PROTEIN-POLYSACCHARID-KOMPLEXEN | [2018/26] | English: | COMPOSITIONS OF FAT-SOLUBLE ACTIVE INGREDIENTS CONTAINING PLANT PROTEIN-SOY POLYSACCHARIDE COMPLEXES | [2013/44] | French: | COMPOSITIONS D'INGREDIENTS ACTIFS LIPOSOLUBLES CONTENANT DES COMPLEXES DE PROTEINE-POLYSACCHARIDE | [2018/26] |
Former [2013/44] | ZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN AUS FETTLÖSLICHEN INHALTSSTOFFEN MIT PFLANZENPROTEIN-SOJA-POLYSACCHARID-KOMPLEXEN | ||
Former [2013/44] | COMPOSITIONS D'INGRÉDIENTS ACTIFS LIPOSOLUBLES CONTENANT DES COMPLEXES PROTÉINE VÉGÉTALE - POLYSACCHARIDE DE SOJA | Entry into regional phase | 17.05.2013 | National basic fee paid | 17.05.2013 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.05.2013 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.05.2013 | Examination requested [2013/44] | 10.01.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.02.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 26.07.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.06.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.10.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 05.10.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 05.10.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 01.02.2017 | Opposition(s) | 15.08.2019 | No opposition filed within time limit [2019/43] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.12.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.12.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.12.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 13.12.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 12.12.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 14.12.2011 | AL | 14.11.2018 | AT | 14.11.2018 | CY | 14.11.2018 | CZ | 14.11.2018 | EE | 14.11.2018 | FI | 14.11.2018 | HR | 14.11.2018 | LT | 14.11.2018 | LV | 14.11.2018 | MC | 14.11.2018 | MK | 14.11.2018 | NL | 14.11.2018 | PL | 14.11.2018 | RO | 14.11.2018 | RS | 14.11.2018 | SE | 14.11.2018 | SI | 14.11.2018 | SK | 14.11.2018 | SM | 14.11.2018 | TR | 14.11.2018 | IE | 14.12.2018 | LU | 14.12.2018 | MT | 14.12.2018 | BG | 14.02.2019 | NO | 14.02.2019 | GR | 15.02.2019 | IS | 14.03.2019 | PT | 14.03.2019 | [2020/31] |
Former [2020/30] | HU | 14.12.2011 | |
AL | 14.11.2018 | ||
AT | 14.11.2018 | ||
CZ | 14.11.2018 | ||
EE | 14.11.2018 | ||
FI | 14.11.2018 | ||
HR | 14.11.2018 | ||
LT | 14.11.2018 | ||
LV | 14.11.2018 | ||
MC | 14.11.2018 | ||
NL | 14.11.2018 | ||
PL | 14.11.2018 | ||
RO | 14.11.2018 | ||
RS | 14.11.2018 | ||
SE | 14.11.2018 | ||
SI | 14.11.2018 | ||
SK | 14.11.2018 | ||
SM | 14.11.2018 | ||
TR | 14.11.2018 | ||
IE | 14.12.2018 | ||
LU | 14.12.2018 | ||
MT | 14.12.2018 | ||
BG | 14.02.2019 | ||
NO | 14.02.2019 | ||
GR | 15.02.2019 | ||
IS | 14.03.2019 | ||
PT | 14.03.2019 | ||
Former [2020/17] | AL | 14.11.2018 | |
AT | 14.11.2018 | ||
CZ | 14.11.2018 | ||
EE | 14.11.2018 | ||
FI | 14.11.2018 | ||
HR | 14.11.2018 | ||
LT | 14.11.2018 | ||
LV | 14.11.2018 | ||
MC | 14.11.2018 | ||
NL | 14.11.2018 | ||
PL | 14.11.2018 | ||
RO | 14.11.2018 | ||
RS | 14.11.2018 | ||
SE | 14.11.2018 | ||
SI | 14.11.2018 | ||
SK | 14.11.2018 | ||
SM | 14.11.2018 | ||
TR | 14.11.2018 | ||
IE | 14.12.2018 | ||
LU | 14.12.2018 | ||
MT | 14.12.2018 | ||
BG | 14.02.2019 | ||
NO | 14.02.2019 | ||
GR | 15.02.2019 | ||
IS | 14.03.2019 | ||
PT | 14.03.2019 | ||
Former [2020/08] | AL | 14.11.2018 | |
AT | 14.11.2018 | ||
CZ | 14.11.2018 | ||
EE | 14.11.2018 | ||
FI | 14.11.2018 | ||
HR | 14.11.2018 | ||
LT | 14.11.2018 | ||
LV | 14.11.2018 | ||
MC | 14.11.2018 | ||
NL | 14.11.2018 | ||
PL | 14.11.2018 | ||
RO | 14.11.2018 | ||
RS | 14.11.2018 | ||
SE | 14.11.2018 | ||
SI | 14.11.2018 | ||
SK | 14.11.2018 | ||
SM | 14.11.2018 | ||
IE | 14.12.2018 | ||
LU | 14.12.2018 | ||
MT | 14.12.2018 | ||
BG | 14.02.2019 | ||
NO | 14.02.2019 | ||
GR | 15.02.2019 | ||
IS | 14.03.2019 | ||
PT | 14.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/50] | AL | 14.11.2018 | |
AT | 14.11.2018 | ||
CZ | 14.11.2018 | ||
EE | 14.11.2018 | ||
FI | 14.11.2018 | ||
HR | 14.11.2018 | ||
LT | 14.11.2018 | ||
LV | 14.11.2018 | ||
MC | 14.11.2018 | ||
NL | 14.11.2018 | ||
PL | 14.11.2018 | ||
RO | 14.11.2018 | ||
RS | 14.11.2018 | ||
SE | 14.11.2018 | ||
SI | 14.11.2018 | ||
SK | 14.11.2018 | ||
SM | 14.11.2018 | ||
IE | 14.12.2018 | ||
LU | 14.12.2018 | ||
BG | 14.02.2019 | ||
NO | 14.02.2019 | ||
GR | 15.02.2019 | ||
IS | 14.03.2019 | ||
PT | 14.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/48] | AL | 14.11.2018 | |
AT | 14.11.2018 | ||
CZ | 14.11.2018 | ||
EE | 14.11.2018 | ||
FI | 14.11.2018 | ||
HR | 14.11.2018 | ||
LT | 14.11.2018 | ||
LV | 14.11.2018 | ||
MC | 14.11.2018 | ||
NL | 14.11.2018 | ||
PL | 14.11.2018 | ||
RO | 14.11.2018 | ||
RS | 14.11.2018 | ||
SE | 14.11.2018 | ||
SK | 14.11.2018 | ||
SM | 14.11.2018 | ||
IE | 14.12.2018 | ||
LU | 14.12.2018 | ||
BG | 14.02.2019 | ||
NO | 14.02.2019 | ||
GR | 15.02.2019 | ||
IS | 14.03.2019 | ||
PT | 14.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/40] | AL | 14.11.2018 | |
AT | 14.11.2018 | ||
CZ | 14.11.2018 | ||
EE | 14.11.2018 | ||
FI | 14.11.2018 | ||
HR | 14.11.2018 | ||
LT | 14.11.2018 | ||
LV | 14.11.2018 | ||
MC | 14.11.2018 | ||
NL | 14.11.2018 | ||
PL | 14.11.2018 | ||
RO | 14.11.2018 | ||
RS | 14.11.2018 | ||
SE | 14.11.2018 | ||
SK | 14.11.2018 | ||
SM | 14.11.2018 | ||
LU | 14.12.2018 | ||
BG | 14.02.2019 | ||
NO | 14.02.2019 | ||
GR | 15.02.2019 | ||
IS | 14.03.2019 | ||
PT | 14.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/39] | AL | 14.11.2018 | |
AT | 14.11.2018 | ||
CZ | 14.11.2018 | ||
EE | 14.11.2018 | ||
FI | 14.11.2018 | ||
HR | 14.11.2018 | ||
LT | 14.11.2018 | ||
LV | 14.11.2018 | ||
NL | 14.11.2018 | ||
PL | 14.11.2018 | ||
RO | 14.11.2018 | ||
RS | 14.11.2018 | ||
SE | 14.11.2018 | ||
SK | 14.11.2018 | ||
SM | 14.11.2018 | ||
LU | 14.12.2018 | ||
BG | 14.02.2019 | ||
NO | 14.02.2019 | ||
GR | 15.02.2019 | ||
IS | 14.03.2019 | ||
PT | 14.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/37] | AL | 14.11.2018 | |
AT | 14.11.2018 | ||
CZ | 14.11.2018 | ||
EE | 14.11.2018 | ||
FI | 14.11.2018 | ||
HR | 14.11.2018 | ||
LT | 14.11.2018 | ||
LV | 14.11.2018 | ||
NL | 14.11.2018 | ||
PL | 14.11.2018 | ||
RO | 14.11.2018 | ||
RS | 14.11.2018 | ||
SE | 14.11.2018 | ||
SM | 14.11.2018 | ||
BG | 14.02.2019 | ||
NO | 14.02.2019 | ||
GR | 15.02.2019 | ||
IS | 14.03.2019 | ||
PT | 14.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/35] | AL | 14.11.2018 | |
AT | 14.11.2018 | ||
CZ | 14.11.2018 | ||
FI | 14.11.2018 | ||
HR | 14.11.2018 | ||
LT | 14.11.2018 | ||
LV | 14.11.2018 | ||
NL | 14.11.2018 | ||
PL | 14.11.2018 | ||
RS | 14.11.2018 | ||
SE | 14.11.2018 | ||
BG | 14.02.2019 | ||
NO | 14.02.2019 | ||
GR | 15.02.2019 | ||
IS | 14.03.2019 | ||
PT | 14.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/26] | AL | 14.11.2018 | |
AT | 14.11.2018 | ||
FI | 14.11.2018 | ||
HR | 14.11.2018 | ||
LT | 14.11.2018 | ||
LV | 14.11.2018 | ||
NL | 14.11.2018 | ||
RS | 14.11.2018 | ||
SE | 14.11.2018 | ||
BG | 14.02.2019 | ||
NO | 14.02.2019 | ||
GR | 15.02.2019 | ||
IS | 14.03.2019 | ||
PT | 14.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/25] | AT | 14.11.2018 | |
FI | 14.11.2018 | ||
HR | 14.11.2018 | ||
LT | 14.11.2018 | ||
LV | 14.11.2018 | ||
NL | 14.11.2018 | ||
RS | 14.11.2018 | ||
SE | 14.11.2018 | ||
BG | 14.02.2019 | ||
NO | 14.02.2019 | ||
GR | 15.02.2019 | ||
IS | 14.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/24] | AT | 14.11.2018 | |
FI | 14.11.2018 | ||
HR | 14.11.2018 | ||
LT | 14.11.2018 | ||
LV | 14.11.2018 | ||
NL | 14.11.2018 | ||
SE | 14.11.2018 | ||
BG | 14.02.2019 | ||
NO | 14.02.2019 | ||
GR | 15.02.2019 | ||
IS | 14.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/23] | AT | 14.11.2018 | |
FI | 14.11.2018 | ||
HR | 14.11.2018 | ||
LT | 14.11.2018 | ||
LV | 14.11.2018 | ||
NL | 14.11.2018 | ||
BG | 14.02.2019 | ||
NO | 14.02.2019 | ||
IS | 14.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/22] | FI | 14.11.2018 | |
LT | 14.11.2018 | ||
BG | 14.02.2019 | ||
NO | 14.02.2019 | ||
IS | 14.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/21] | FI | 14.11.2018 | |
LT | 14.11.2018 | ||
NO | 14.02.2019 | ||
IS | 14.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/20] | LT | 14.11.2018 | |
NO | 14.02.2019 | Cited in | International search | [X]JP2007215474 ; | [X]JP2004298047 ; | [A]CN101496541 ; | JP2004298047 [ ] (MORINAGA & CO); | [A]EP1698239 (FUJI OIL CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1-12 * the whole document *; | [Y]EP1776873 (FUJI OIL CO LTD [JP]) [Y] 1-12 * the whole document *; | JP2007215474 [ ] (MORINAGA & CO); | [Y]EP2238843 (DSM IP ASSETS BV [NL]) [Y] 1-12 * the whole document *; | [XP]WO2011088941 (UNILEVER NV [NL], et al) [XP] 1,2,5,6,11,12 * the whole document *; | [X] - HIDEFUMI ET ALL., "Autoxidation kinetic analysis of docosahexaenoic acid ethyl ester and docosahexaenoic triglyceride with oxygen sensor.", BIOSCIENCE, BIOTECHNOLOGY AND BIOCHEMISTRY, (2002), vol. 66, no. 4, ISSN 0916-8451, pages 749 - 753, XP002674872 [X] 1,2,5,6 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1271/bbb.66.749 | [X] - DATABASE WPI, 0, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 2007, no. 65, Database accession no. 2007-695663, XP002674873 & JP2007215474 A 20070830 (MORINAGA & CO LTD) [X] 1,2,5-12 * abstract * | [X] - DATABASE WPI, 0, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 2004, no. 73, Database accession no. 2004-741288, XP002674874 & JP2004298047 A 20041028 (MORINAGA & CO LTD) [X] 1,2,5-12 * abstract * | [A] - DATABASE WPI, 0, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 2009, no. 58, Database accession no. 2009-M60649, XP002674875 & CN101496541 A 20090805 (SHANDONG WANDEFU IND GROUP CO LTD) [A] 1-12 * abstract * | by applicant | - "Molecular basis of protein functionality", E. DICKINSON; D.J. MCCLEMENTS, Advances in Food Colloids, BLACKIE ACADEMIC & PROFESSIONAL, (1995), pages 26 - 79 | - RUNGNAPHAR PONGSAWATMANIT; THEPKUNYA HARNSILAWAT; DAVID J. MCCLEMENTS, COLLOIDS AND SURFACES A: PHYSICOCHEM. ENG. ASPECTS, (2006), vol. 287, pages 59 - 67 | - ERIC DICKINSON, SOFT MATTER, (2008), vol. 4, pages 932 - 942 | - N.G. DIFTISA; C.G. BILIADERISB; V.D. KIOSSEOGLOU, FOOD HYDROCOLLOIDS, (2005), vol. 19, pages 1025 - 1031 | - N. DIFTIS; V. KIOSSEOGLOU, FOODCHEMISTRY, (2003), vol. 81, page 1 | - N. DIFTIS; V. KIOSSEOGLOU, FOOD HYDROCOLLOIDS, (2006), vol. 20, page 787 | - N.G. DIFTIS ET AL., FOOD HYDROCOLLOIDS, (2005), vol. 19, page 1025 | - N. DIFTIS; V. KIOSSEOGLOU, FOOD CHEMISTRY, vol. 96, page 228 | - XU; YAO, LANGMUIR, (2009), vol. 25, no. 17, pages 9714 - 9720 | - P. WALSTRA, Encyclopedia of emulsion technology, (1983), vol. 1, page 57 | - DONSI ET AL., J. AGRIC. FOOD CHEM., (2010), vol. 58, pages 10653 - 10660 |