EP2595519 - DISPENSER OF TOWELS WETTED WITH HAND SANITIZER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 08.06.2018 Database last updated on 10.08.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 06.03.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.06.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 11.07.2018 [2018/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states 7225059 Canada Inc 9500 Meilleur, Suite 555 Montréal, Québec H2N 2B7 / CA | [2013/22] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BERDUGO ADLER, Joelle 444 Dufferin Road Hampstead Québec H3X 2Y9 / CA | [2013/22] | Representative(s) | Wittmann, Günther Patentanwaltskanzlei Wittmann Frans-Hals-Straße 31 81479 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2013/22] | Wittmann, Günther Wittmann Hernandez Patent Attorneys Boschetsrieder Straße 67 81379 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 11809119.8 | 25.07.2011 | WO2011CA00878 | Priority number, date | US20100367313P | 23.07.2010 Original published format: US 367313 P | [2013/22] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2012009805 | Date: | 26.01.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/04] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2595519 | Date: | 29.05.2013 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.01.2012 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2013/22] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CA | 26.01.2012 | Classification | IPC: | A47K10/32, A47G21/16, A47K7/03, B65D83/00 | [2013/22] | CPC: |
A47K10/42 (EP,US);
A47K10/24 (EP,US);
A47K7/03 (EP,US);
A47K2010/328 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/22] | Title | German: | SPENDER VON HANDTÜCHERN, DIE MIT HANDREINIGER BENETZT SIND | [2013/22] | English: | DISPENSER OF TOWELS WETTED WITH HAND SANITIZER | [2013/22] | French: | DISTRIBUTEUR DE SERVIETTES IMPRÉGNÉES DE DÉSINFECTANT POUR LES MAINS | [2013/22] | Entry into regional phase | 28.01.2013 | National basic fee paid | 28.01.2013 | Search fee paid | 28.01.2013 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.01.2013 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.01.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 28.01.2013 | Examination requested [2013/22] | 01.02.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2018/28] | 07.03.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2018/28] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.07.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.07.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.07.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 01.08.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2017 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]WO2007066865 (KIM, S. ET AL.); | [X]JP2002306362 (CHEN, J.); | [A]CN201234949Y (RONGGUAN, X.); | [A]CN201234946Y (RONGGUAN, X.) |