EP2596614 - METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR INDICATING SWITCHING POINTS IN A STREAMING SESSION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 24.04.2015 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.04.2015 | Withdrawal of application | published on 27.05.2015 [2015/22] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nokia Corporation Karakaari 7 02610 Espoo / FI | [2014/24] |
Former [2013/22] | For all designated states Nokia Corporation Keilalahdentie 4 02150 Espoo / FI | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BOUAZIZI, Imed Insinoorinkatu 22 A 37 FIN-33720 Tampere / FI | 02 /
HANNUKSELA, Miska Matias Pitkatie 14 FIN-36110 Ruutana / FI | [2013/22] | Representative(s) | Nokia EPO representatives Nokia Technologies Oy Karakaari 7 02610 Espoo / FI | [N/P] |
Former [2013/22] | Jaatinen, Jussi Imari, et al Nokia Corporation Intellectual Property Department Keilalahdentie 4 02150 Espoo / FI | Application number, filing date | 11809363.2 | 21.07.2011 | WO2011IB53266 | Priority number, date | US20100366497P | 21.07.2010 Original published format: US 366497 P | [2013/22] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2012011076 | Date: | 26.01.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/04] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2596614 | Date: | 29.05.2013 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.01.2012 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2013/22] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | SE | 26.01.2012 | Classification | IPC: | H04L29/06, H04N7/24 | [2013/22] | CPC: |
H04N21/44016 (EP,US);
H04N7/24 (KR);
H04L65/1083 (EP,US);
H04L65/70 (EP,US);
H04L65/752 (EP);
H04N21/44209 (EP,US);
H04N21/6377 (EP,US);
H04N21/8455 (EP,US);
H04N21/8456 (EP,US);
H04N21/85406 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/22] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR ANZEIGE VON SCHALTPUNKTEN IN EINER STREAMING-SITZUNG | [2013/22] | English: | METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR INDICATING SWITCHING POINTS IN A STREAMING SESSION | [2013/22] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET APPAREIL POUR INDIQUER DES POINTS DE COMMUTATION DANS UNE SESSION DE DIFFUSION EN CONTINU | [2013/22] | Entry into regional phase | 18.12.2012 | National basic fee paid | 18.12.2012 | Search fee paid | 18.12.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.12.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.12.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 18.12.2012 | Examination requested [2013/22] | 22.04.2015 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2015/22] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.07.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.07.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]WO2006084503 (ERICSSON TELEFON AB L M [SE], et al); | [A]WO2010023504 (CSIR [ZA], et al); | [X] - "CR to 26.234: Adaptation in HTTP Streaming", 3GPP TSG-SA4 MEETING #57, S4-100099, ST. JULIAN, MALTA, (20100125), URL: http://www.3gpp.org/ftp/tsg_sa/WG4_CODEC/TSGS4_57/docs, XP050437792 |