EP2611389 - PERCUTANEOUS MITRAL VALVE REPLACEMENT AND SEALING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2013/28] | TECHNIQUES FOR PERCUTANEOUS MITRAL VALVE REPLACEMENT AND SEALING | ||
[2021/01] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.05.2022 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 12.06.2021 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 28.01.2021 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 03.06.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.06.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 17.07.2024 [2024/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Cardiovalve Ltd 1 Yahadut Canada St. 6037501 Or Yehuda / IL | [2018/44] |
Former [2018/37] | For all designated states Mitraltech Ltd. 1 Yahadut Canada St. 6037501 Or Yehuda / IL | ||
Former [2013/28] | For all designated states Mitraltech Ltd. 6 Yoni Netanyahu Street 60376 Or Yeheda / IL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GROSS, Yossi 10 HaNotea Street 73160 Moshav Mazor / IL | 02 /
HACOHEN, Gil 13 Hatzav Street Ramat Ef'al (Ramat Gan) 52960 / IL | 03 /
MILLER, Eran 546 Hateena Street 76803 Moshav Beit Elazari / IL | 04 /
ZIPORY, Yuval 40 Nahal Meron Street 71700 Modi'in / IL | 05 /
REICH, Tal Molodet M.P. Gilboa 19130 / IL | [2013/35] |
Former [2013/28] | 01 /
GROSS, Yossi 10 HaNotea Street 73160 Moshav Mazor / IL | ||
02 /
HACOHEN, Gil 13 Hatzav Street Ramat Ef'al (Ramat Gan) 52960 / IL | |||
03 /
MILLER, Eran 546 Hateena Street 76803 Moshav Beit Elazari / IL | |||
04 /
ZIPORY, Yuval 40 Nahal Meron Street 71700 Modi'in / IL | |||
05 /
REICH, Tal 38 Ha'erez 30500 Binyamina / IL | Representative(s) | Evens, Paul Jonathan Maguire Boss 24 East Street St. Ives, Cambridgeshire PE27 5PD / GB | [2021/27] |
Former [2013/28] | Evens, Paul Jonathan Maguire Boss 24 East Street St. Ives Cambridgeshire PE27 5PD / GB | Application number, filing date | 11809374.9 | 21.07.2011 | [2021/27] | WO2011IL00582 | Priority number, date | US201161492449P | 02.06.2011 Original published format: US 201161492449 P | US201113033852 | 24.02.2011 Original published format: US201113033852 | US20100840463 | 21.07.2010 Original published format: US 840463 | [2013/28] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2012011108 | Date: | 26.01.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/04] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2611389 | Date: | 10.07.2013 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.01.2012 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2013/28] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2611389 | Date: | 07.07.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/27] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 27.12.2013 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.06.2017 | Classification | IPC: | A61F2/24 | [2013/28] | CPC: |
A61F2/2418 (EP,US);
A61B17/068 (EP,US);
A61F2/2412 (EP,US);
A61F2/2427 (US);
A61F2/243 (US);
A61F2/2436 (EP,US);
A61F2/2439 (EP,US);
A61B17/29 (EP,US);
A61B2017/00243 (EP,US);
A61B2017/0441 (EP,US);
A61B2017/0464 (EP,US);
A61B2017/0647 (EP,US);
A61B2017/0649 (EP,US);
A61F2/2409 (EP,US);
A61F2/2457 (EP,US);
A61F2220/0016 (EP,US);
A61F2220/0025 (EP);
A61F2230/005 (EP,US);
A61F2230/0054 (EP,US);
A61F2250/0039 (EP);
A61F2250/006 (EP,US);
A61F2250/0063 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/28] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Perkutaner Austausch und Abdichtung der Mitralklappe | [2021/02] | English: | PERCUTANEOUS MITRAL VALVE REPLACEMENT AND SEALING | [2021/01] | French: | REMPLACEMENT ET FERMETURE PERCUTANÉS DE VALVULE MITRALE | [2021/01] |
Former [2013/28] | VERFAHREN ZUM PERKUTANEN AUSTAUSCHEN UND ABDICHTEN DER MITRALKLAPPE | ||
Former [2013/28] | TECHNIQUES FOR PERCUTANEOUS MITRAL VALVE REPLACEMENT AND SEALING | ||
Former [2013/28] | TECHNIQUES DE REMPLACEMENT ET DE FERMETURE PERCUTANÉS DE VALVULE MITRALE | Entry into regional phase | 21.02.2013 | National basic fee paid | 21.02.2013 | Search fee paid | 21.02.2013 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.02.2013 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.02.2013 | Examination requested [2013/28] | 08.01.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 08.06.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M01) | 11.06.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.01.2021 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.05.2021 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | 27.05.2021 | Fee for grant paid | 27.05.2021 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP21176010.3 / EP3906895 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 08.06.2020 | Opposition(s) | 08.04.2022 | No opposition filed within time limit [2022/24] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.07.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.07.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.07.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 22.07.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 24.07.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.07.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 25.07.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 14.08.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 21.07.2011 | AL | 07.07.2021 | AT | 07.07.2021 | CY | 07.07.2021 | CZ | 07.07.2021 | DK | 07.07.2021 | EE | 07.07.2021 | ES | 07.07.2021 | FI | 07.07.2021 | HR | 07.07.2021 | LT | 07.07.2021 | LV | 07.07.2021 | MC | 07.07.2021 | MK | 07.07.2021 | NL | 07.07.2021 | PL | 07.07.2021 | RO | 07.07.2021 | RS | 07.07.2021 | SE | 07.07.2021 | SI | 07.07.2021 | SK | 07.07.2021 | SM | 07.07.2021 | TR | 07.07.2021 | IE | 21.07.2021 | LU | 21.07.2021 | BE | 31.07.2021 | CH | 31.07.2021 | LI | 31.07.2021 | BG | 07.10.2021 | NO | 07.10.2021 | GR | 08.10.2021 | IS | 07.11.2021 | PT | 08.11.2021 | [2024/29] |
Former [2024/22] | HU | 21.07.2011 | |
AL | 07.07.2021 | ||
AT | 07.07.2021 | ||
CY | 07.07.2021 | ||
CZ | 07.07.2021 | ||
DK | 07.07.2021 | ||
EE | 07.07.2021 | ||
ES | 07.07.2021 | ||
FI | 07.07.2021 | ||
HR | 07.07.2021 | ||
LT | 07.07.2021 | ||
LV | 07.07.2021 | ||
MC | 07.07.2021 | ||
MK | 07.07.2021 | ||
NL | 07.07.2021 | ||
PL | 07.07.2021 | ||
RO | 07.07.2021 | ||
RS | 07.07.2021 | ||
SE | 07.07.2021 | ||
SI | 07.07.2021 | ||
SK | 07.07.2021 | ||
SM | 07.07.2021 | ||
IE | 21.07.2021 | ||
LU | 21.07.2021 | ||
BE | 31.07.2021 | ||
CH | 31.07.2021 | ||
LI | 31.07.2021 | ||
BG | 07.10.2021 | ||
NO | 07.10.2021 | ||
GR | 08.10.2021 | ||
IS | 07.11.2021 | ||
PT | 08.11.2021 | ||
Former [2023/29] | HU | 21.07.2011 | |
AL | 07.07.2021 | ||
AT | 07.07.2021 | ||
CY | 07.07.2021 | ||
CZ | 07.07.2021 | ||
DK | 07.07.2021 | ||
EE | 07.07.2021 | ||
ES | 07.07.2021 | ||
FI | 07.07.2021 | ||
HR | 07.07.2021 | ||
LT | 07.07.2021 | ||
LV | 07.07.2021 | ||
MC | 07.07.2021 | ||
NL | 07.07.2021 | ||
PL | 07.07.2021 | ||
RO | 07.07.2021 | ||
RS | 07.07.2021 | ||
SE | 07.07.2021 | ||
SI | 07.07.2021 | ||
SK | 07.07.2021 | ||
SM | 07.07.2021 | ||
IE | 21.07.2021 | ||
LU | 21.07.2021 | ||
BE | 31.07.2021 | ||
CH | 31.07.2021 | ||
LI | 31.07.2021 | ||
BG | 07.10.2021 | ||
NO | 07.10.2021 | ||
GR | 08.10.2021 | ||
IS | 07.11.2021 | ||
PT | 08.11.2021 | ||
Former [2023/24] | AL | 07.07.2021 | |
AT | 07.07.2021 | ||
CY | 07.07.2021 | ||
CZ | 07.07.2021 | ||
DK | 07.07.2021 | ||
EE | 07.07.2021 | ||
ES | 07.07.2021 | ||
FI | 07.07.2021 | ||
HR | 07.07.2021 | ||
LT | 07.07.2021 | ||
LV | 07.07.2021 | ||
MC | 07.07.2021 | ||
NL | 07.07.2021 | ||
PL | 07.07.2021 | ||
RO | 07.07.2021 | ||
RS | 07.07.2021 | ||
SE | 07.07.2021 | ||
SI | 07.07.2021 | ||
SK | 07.07.2021 | ||
SM | 07.07.2021 | ||
IE | 21.07.2021 | ||
LU | 21.07.2021 | ||
BE | 31.07.2021 | ||
CH | 31.07.2021 | ||
LI | 31.07.2021 | ||
BG | 07.10.2021 | ||
NO | 07.10.2021 | ||
GR | 08.10.2021 | ||
IS | 07.11.2021 | ||
PT | 08.11.2021 | ||
Former [2022/35] | AL | 07.07.2021 | |
AT | 07.07.2021 | ||
CZ | 07.07.2021 | ||
DK | 07.07.2021 | ||
EE | 07.07.2021 | ||
ES | 07.07.2021 | ||
FI | 07.07.2021 | ||
HR | 07.07.2021 | ||
LT | 07.07.2021 | ||
LV | 07.07.2021 | ||
MC | 07.07.2021 | ||
NL | 07.07.2021 | ||
PL | 07.07.2021 | ||
RO | 07.07.2021 | ||
RS | 07.07.2021 | ||
SE | 07.07.2021 | ||
SI | 07.07.2021 | ||
SK | 07.07.2021 | ||
SM | 07.07.2021 | ||
IE | 21.07.2021 | ||
LU | 21.07.2021 | ||
BE | 31.07.2021 | ||
CH | 31.07.2021 | ||
LI | 31.07.2021 | ||
BG | 07.10.2021 | ||
NO | 07.10.2021 | ||
GR | 08.10.2021 | ||
IS | 07.11.2021 | ||
PT | 08.11.2021 | ||
Former [2022/34] | AL | 07.07.2021 | |
AT | 07.07.2021 | ||
CZ | 07.07.2021 | ||
DK | 07.07.2021 | ||
EE | 07.07.2021 | ||
ES | 07.07.2021 | ||
FI | 07.07.2021 | ||
HR | 07.07.2021 | ||
LT | 07.07.2021 | ||
LV | 07.07.2021 | ||
MC | 07.07.2021 | ||
NL | 07.07.2021 | ||
PL | 07.07.2021 | ||
RO | 07.07.2021 | ||
RS | 07.07.2021 | ||
SE | 07.07.2021 | ||
SI | 07.07.2021 | ||
SK | 07.07.2021 | ||
SM | 07.07.2021 | ||
LU | 21.07.2021 | ||
BE | 31.07.2021 | ||
CH | 31.07.2021 | ||
LI | 31.07.2021 | ||
BG | 07.10.2021 | ||
NO | 07.10.2021 | ||
GR | 08.10.2021 | ||
IS | 07.11.2021 | ||
PT | 08.11.2021 | ||
Former [2022/29] | AL | 07.07.2021 | |
AT | 07.07.2021 | ||
CZ | 07.07.2021 | ||
DK | 07.07.2021 | ||
EE | 07.07.2021 | ||
ES | 07.07.2021 | ||
FI | 07.07.2021 | ||
HR | 07.07.2021 | ||
LT | 07.07.2021 | ||
LV | 07.07.2021 | ||
MC | 07.07.2021 | ||
NL | 07.07.2021 | ||
PL | 07.07.2021 | ||
RO | 07.07.2021 | ||
RS | 07.07.2021 | ||
SE | 07.07.2021 | ||
SI | 07.07.2021 | ||
SK | 07.07.2021 | ||
SM | 07.07.2021 | ||
LU | 21.07.2021 | ||
CH | 31.07.2021 | ||
LI | 31.07.2021 | ||
BG | 07.10.2021 | ||
NO | 07.10.2021 | ||
GR | 08.10.2021 | ||
IS | 07.11.2021 | ||
PT | 08.11.2021 | ||
Former [2022/25] | AT | 07.07.2021 | |
CZ | 07.07.2021 | ||
DK | 07.07.2021 | ||
EE | 07.07.2021 | ||
ES | 07.07.2021 | ||
FI | 07.07.2021 | ||
HR | 07.07.2021 | ||
LT | 07.07.2021 | ||
LV | 07.07.2021 | ||
MC | 07.07.2021 | ||
NL | 07.07.2021 | ||
PL | 07.07.2021 | ||
RO | 07.07.2021 | ||
RS | 07.07.2021 | ||
SE | 07.07.2021 | ||
SK | 07.07.2021 | ||
SM | 07.07.2021 | ||
LU | 21.07.2021 | ||
CH | 31.07.2021 | ||
LI | 31.07.2021 | ||
BG | 07.10.2021 | ||
NO | 07.10.2021 | ||
GR | 08.10.2021 | ||
IS | 07.11.2021 | ||
PT | 08.11.2021 | ||
Former [2022/24] | AT | 07.07.2021 | |
CZ | 07.07.2021 | ||
DK | 07.07.2021 | ||
EE | 07.07.2021 | ||
ES | 07.07.2021 | ||
FI | 07.07.2021 | ||
HR | 07.07.2021 | ||
LT | 07.07.2021 | ||
LV | 07.07.2021 | ||
MC | 07.07.2021 | ||
NL | 07.07.2021 | ||
PL | 07.07.2021 | ||
RO | 07.07.2021 | ||
RS | 07.07.2021 | ||
SE | 07.07.2021 | ||
SK | 07.07.2021 | ||
LU | 21.07.2021 | ||
CH | 31.07.2021 | ||
LI | 31.07.2021 | ||
BG | 07.10.2021 | ||
NO | 07.10.2021 | ||
GR | 08.10.2021 | ||
IS | 07.11.2021 | ||
PT | 08.11.2021 | ||
Former [2022/21] | AT | 07.07.2021 | |
DK | 07.07.2021 | ||
ES | 07.07.2021 | ||
FI | 07.07.2021 | ||
HR | 07.07.2021 | ||
LT | 07.07.2021 | ||
LV | 07.07.2021 | ||
NL | 07.07.2021 | ||
PL | 07.07.2021 | ||
RS | 07.07.2021 | ||
SE | 07.07.2021 | ||
CH | 31.07.2021 | ||
LI | 31.07.2021 | ||
BG | 07.10.2021 | ||
NO | 07.10.2021 | ||
GR | 08.10.2021 | ||
IS | 07.11.2021 | ||
PT | 08.11.2021 | ||
Former [2022/11] | AT | 07.07.2021 | |
ES | 07.07.2021 | ||
FI | 07.07.2021 | ||
HR | 07.07.2021 | ||
LT | 07.07.2021 | ||
LV | 07.07.2021 | ||
NL | 07.07.2021 | ||
PL | 07.07.2021 | ||
RS | 07.07.2021 | ||
SE | 07.07.2021 | ||
BG | 07.10.2021 | ||
NO | 07.10.2021 | ||
GR | 08.10.2021 | ||
IS | 07.11.2021 | ||
PT | 08.11.2021 | ||
Former [2022/09] | AT | 07.07.2021 | |
ES | 07.07.2021 | ||
FI | 07.07.2021 | ||
LT | 07.07.2021 | ||
NL | 07.07.2021 | ||
RS | 07.07.2021 | ||
SE | 07.07.2021 | ||
BG | 07.10.2021 | ||
NO | 07.10.2021 | ||
PT | 08.11.2021 | ||
Former [2022/08] | AT | 07.07.2021 | |
ES | 07.07.2021 | ||
FI | 07.07.2021 | ||
LT | 07.07.2021 | ||
NL | 07.07.2021 | ||
SE | 07.07.2021 | ||
BG | 07.10.2021 | ||
NO | 07.10.2021 | ||
Former [2022/07] | AT | 07.07.2021 | |
LT | 07.07.2021 | ||
NL | 07.07.2021 | ||
NO | 07.10.2021 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2005137688 (SALAHIEH AMR [US], et al) [A] 1-12 * paragraphs [0140] - [0169]; figures 39A-48 *; | [A]US2005137697 (SALAHIEH AMR [US], et al) [A] 1-12 * paragraphs [0063] - [0070]; figures 6A-7 *; | [A]US2008082166 (STYRC MIKOLAJ [LU], et al) [A] 1-12* paragraphs [0090] - [0112]; figures 5-9 *; | [A]US2009005863 (GOETZ WOLFGANG [DE], et al) [A] 1-12 * paragraphs [0063] - [0069]; figures 17-24 * | International search | [Y]US6440164 (DIMATTEO KRISTIAN [US], et al); | [Y]US2007016288 (GURSKIS DONNELL W [US], et al); | [Y]US2007043435 (SEGUIN JACQUES [GB], et al); | [Y]US2008086204 (RANKIN J SCOTT [US]); | [Y]US2009005863 (GOETZ WOLFGANG [DE], et al); | [Y]US2010076548 (KONNO MARK [US]); | [Y]US2010137979 (TUVAL YOSI [IL], et al) |