EP2595994 - PROCESS FOR PREPARING PYRANO - [2,3-C]PYRIDINE DERIVATIVES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.02.2017 Database last updated on 02.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Glaxo Group Limited 980 Great West Road Brentford, Middlesex TW8 9GS / GB | [2013/22] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SISKO, Joseph GlaxoSmithKline c/o Global Patents 709 Swedeland Road King of Prussia, PA 19406 / US | 02 /
MANS, Douglas GlaxoSmithKline c/o Global Patents 709 Swedeland Road King of Prussia, PA 19406 / US | 03 /
YIN, Hao GlaxoSmithKline c/o Global Patents 709 Swedeland Road King of Prussia, PA 19406 / US | [2016/16] |
Former [2013/22] | 01 /
SISKO, Joseph GlaxoSmithKline c/o Global Patents 709 Swedeland Road King of Prussia PA 19406 / US | ||
02 /
MANS, Douglas GlaxoSmithKline c/o Global Patents 709 Swedeland Road King or Prussia PA 19406 / US | |||
03 /
YIN, Hao GlaxoSmithKline c/o Global Patents 709 Swedeland Road King of Prussia PA 19406 / US | Representative(s) | Quillin, Helen Kaye, et al GlaxoSmithKline Global Patents (CN925.1) 980 Great West Road Brentford, Middlesex TW8 9GS / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2016/16] | Valentine, Jill Barbara GlaxoSmithKline Global Patents (CN925.1) 980 Great West Road Brentford, Middlesex TW8 9GS / GB | ||
Former [2013/22] | Valentine, Jill Barbara GlaxoSmithKline Corporate Intellectual Property (CN9.25.1) 980 Great West Road Brentford, Middlesex TW8 9GS / GB | Application number, filing date | 11810260.7 | 19.07.2011 | [2016/16] | WO2011US44489 | Priority number, date | US20100365880P | 20.07.2010 Original published format: US 365880 P | [2013/22] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2012012391 | Date: | 26.01.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/04] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2595994 | Date: | 29.05.2013 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.01.2012 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2013/22] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2595994 | Date: | 20.04.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/16] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 08.08.2013 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.11.2014 | Classification | IPC: | C07D491/052, C07D491/044 | [2014/50] | CPC: |
C07D491/052 (EP,CN,US);
C07D491/04 (KR);
A61K31/436 (KR);
A61P31/00 (EP);
C07D491/044 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2013/22] | C07D498/02 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/22] | Extension states | BA | 11.02.2013 | ME | 11.02.2013 | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON PYRANO-[2,3-C-] PYRIDIN-DERIVATEN | [2013/22] | English: | PROCESS FOR PREPARING PYRANO - [2,3-C]PYRIDINE DERIVATIVES | [2013/22] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE PRÉPARATION DE DÉRIVÉS PYRANO-[2,3-C]PYRIDINE | [2013/22] | Entry into regional phase | 11.02.2013 | National basic fee paid | 11.02.2013 | Search fee paid | 11.02.2013 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.02.2013 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.02.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 11.02.2013 | Examination requested [2013/22] | 07.07.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.12.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.02.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 23.02.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 23.02.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 07.07.2015 | Opposition(s) | 23.01.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/13] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.07.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 08.07.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 09.07.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 19.07.2011 | AL | 20.04.2016 | AT | 20.04.2016 | BE | 20.04.2016 | BG | 20.04.2016 | CY | 20.04.2016 | CZ | 20.04.2016 | DK | 20.04.2016 | EE | 20.04.2016 | FI | 20.04.2016 | HR | 20.04.2016 | IS | 20.04.2016 | LT | 20.04.2016 | LV | 20.04.2016 | MC | 20.04.2016 | MK | 20.04.2016 | NL | 20.04.2016 | PL | 20.04.2016 | RO | 20.04.2016 | RS | 20.04.2016 | SE | 20.04.2016 | SI | 20.04.2016 | SK | 20.04.2016 | SM | 20.04.2016 | TR | 20.04.2016 | IE | 19.07.2016 | LU | 19.07.2016 | NO | 20.07.2016 | GR | 21.07.2016 | CH | 31.07.2016 | LI | 31.07.2016 | MT | 31.07.2016 | PT | 22.08.2016 | [2018/46] |
Former [2018/38] | HU | 19.07.2011 | |
AT | 20.04.2016 | ||
BE | 20.04.2016 | ||
BG | 20.04.2016 | ||
CY | 20.04.2016 | ||
CZ | 20.04.2016 | ||
DK | 20.04.2016 | ||
EE | 20.04.2016 | ||
FI | 20.04.2016 | ||
HR | 20.04.2016 | ||
IS | 20.04.2016 | ||
LT | 20.04.2016 | ||
LV | 20.04.2016 | ||
MC | 20.04.2016 | ||
MK | 20.04.2016 | ||
NL | 20.04.2016 | ||
PL | 20.04.2016 | ||
RO | 20.04.2016 | ||
RS | 20.04.2016 | ||
SE | 20.04.2016 | ||
SI | 20.04.2016 | ||
SK | 20.04.2016 | ||
SM | 20.04.2016 | ||
TR | 20.04.2016 | ||
IE | 19.07.2016 | ||
LU | 19.07.2016 | ||
NO | 20.07.2016 | ||
GR | 21.07.2016 | ||
CH | 31.07.2016 | ||
LI | 31.07.2016 | ||
MT | 31.07.2016 | ||
PT | 22.08.2016 | ||
Former [2018/31] | HU | 19.07.2011 | |
AT | 20.04.2016 | ||
BE | 20.04.2016 | ||
CY | 20.04.2016 | ||
CZ | 20.04.2016 | ||
DK | 20.04.2016 | ||
EE | 20.04.2016 | ||
FI | 20.04.2016 | ||
HR | 20.04.2016 | ||
IS | 20.04.2016 | ||
LT | 20.04.2016 | ||
LV | 20.04.2016 | ||
MC | 20.04.2016 | ||
MK | 20.04.2016 | ||
NL | 20.04.2016 | ||
PL | 20.04.2016 | ||
RO | 20.04.2016 | ||
RS | 20.04.2016 | ||
SE | 20.04.2016 | ||
SI | 20.04.2016 | ||
SK | 20.04.2016 | ||
SM | 20.04.2016 | ||
TR | 20.04.2016 | ||
IE | 19.07.2016 | ||
LU | 19.07.2016 | ||
NO | 20.07.2016 | ||
GR | 21.07.2016 | ||
CH | 31.07.2016 | ||
LI | 31.07.2016 | ||
MT | 31.07.2016 | ||
PT | 22.08.2016 | ||
Former [2018/29] | HU | 19.07.2011 | |
AT | 20.04.2016 | ||
BE | 20.04.2016 | ||
CY | 20.04.2016 | ||
CZ | 20.04.2016 | ||
DK | 20.04.2016 | ||
EE | 20.04.2016 | ||
FI | 20.04.2016 | ||
HR | 20.04.2016 | ||
LT | 20.04.2016 | ||
LV | 20.04.2016 | ||
MC | 20.04.2016 | ||
MK | 20.04.2016 | ||
NL | 20.04.2016 | ||
PL | 20.04.2016 | ||
RO | 20.04.2016 | ||
RS | 20.04.2016 | ||
SE | 20.04.2016 | ||
SI | 20.04.2016 | ||
SK | 20.04.2016 | ||
SM | 20.04.2016 | ||
TR | 20.04.2016 | ||
IE | 19.07.2016 | ||
LU | 19.07.2016 | ||
NO | 20.07.2016 | ||
GR | 21.07.2016 | ||
CH | 31.07.2016 | ||
LI | 31.07.2016 | ||
PT | 22.08.2016 | ||
Former [2018/28] | HU | 19.07.2011 | |
AT | 20.04.2016 | ||
BE | 20.04.2016 | ||
CY | 20.04.2016 | ||
CZ | 20.04.2016 | ||
DK | 20.04.2016 | ||
EE | 20.04.2016 | ||
FI | 20.04.2016 | ||
HR | 20.04.2016 | ||
LT | 20.04.2016 | ||
LV | 20.04.2016 | ||
MC | 20.04.2016 | ||
MK | 20.04.2016 | ||
NL | 20.04.2016 | ||
PL | 20.04.2016 | ||
RO | 20.04.2016 | ||
RS | 20.04.2016 | ||
SE | 20.04.2016 | ||
SI | 20.04.2016 | ||
SK | 20.04.2016 | ||
SM | 20.04.2016 | ||
IE | 19.07.2016 | ||
LU | 19.07.2016 | ||
NO | 20.07.2016 | ||
GR | 21.07.2016 | ||
CH | 31.07.2016 | ||
LI | 31.07.2016 | ||
PT | 22.08.2016 | ||
Former [2017/37] | AT | 20.04.2016 | |
BE | 20.04.2016 | ||
CZ | 20.04.2016 | ||
DK | 20.04.2016 | ||
EE | 20.04.2016 | ||
FI | 20.04.2016 | ||
HR | 20.04.2016 | ||
LT | 20.04.2016 | ||
LV | 20.04.2016 | ||
MC | 20.04.2016 | ||
NL | 20.04.2016 | ||
PL | 20.04.2016 | ||
RO | 20.04.2016 | ||
RS | 20.04.2016 | ||
SE | 20.04.2016 | ||
SI | 20.04.2016 | ||
SK | 20.04.2016 | ||
SM | 20.04.2016 | ||
IE | 19.07.2016 | ||
LU | 19.07.2016 | ||
NO | 20.07.2016 | ||
GR | 21.07.2016 | ||
CH | 31.07.2016 | ||
LI | 31.07.2016 | ||
PT | 22.08.2016 | ||
Former [2017/25] | AT | 20.04.2016 | |
BE | 20.04.2016 | ||
CZ | 20.04.2016 | ||
DK | 20.04.2016 | ||
EE | 20.04.2016 | ||
FI | 20.04.2016 | ||
HR | 20.04.2016 | ||
LT | 20.04.2016 | ||
LV | 20.04.2016 | ||
MC | 20.04.2016 | ||
NL | 20.04.2016 | ||
PL | 20.04.2016 | ||
RO | 20.04.2016 | ||
RS | 20.04.2016 | ||
SE | 20.04.2016 | ||
SI | 20.04.2016 | ||
SK | 20.04.2016 | ||
SM | 20.04.2016 | ||
NO | 20.07.2016 | ||
GR | 21.07.2016 | ||
CH | 31.07.2016 | ||
LI | 31.07.2016 | ||
PT | 22.08.2016 | ||
Former [2017/22] | AT | 20.04.2016 | |
BE | 20.04.2016 | ||
CZ | 20.04.2016 | ||
DK | 20.04.2016 | ||
EE | 20.04.2016 | ||
FI | 20.04.2016 | ||
HR | 20.04.2016 | ||
LT | 20.04.2016 | ||
LV | 20.04.2016 | ||
MC | 20.04.2016 | ||
NL | 20.04.2016 | ||
PL | 20.04.2016 | ||
RO | 20.04.2016 | ||
RS | 20.04.2016 | ||
SE | 20.04.2016 | ||
SK | 20.04.2016 | ||
SM | 20.04.2016 | ||
NO | 20.07.2016 | ||
GR | 21.07.2016 | ||
CH | 31.07.2016 | ||
LI | 31.07.2016 | ||
PT | 22.08.2016 | ||
Former [2017/11] | AT | 20.04.2016 | |
BE | 20.04.2016 | ||
CZ | 20.04.2016 | ||
DK | 20.04.2016 | ||
EE | 20.04.2016 | ||
FI | 20.04.2016 | ||
HR | 20.04.2016 | ||
LT | 20.04.2016 | ||
LV | 20.04.2016 | ||
NL | 20.04.2016 | ||
PL | 20.04.2016 | ||
RO | 20.04.2016 | ||
RS | 20.04.2016 | ||
SE | 20.04.2016 | ||
SK | 20.04.2016 | ||
SM | 20.04.2016 | ||
NO | 20.07.2016 | ||
GR | 21.07.2016 | ||
PT | 22.08.2016 | ||
Former [2017/10] | AT | 20.04.2016 | |
BE | 20.04.2016 | ||
CZ | 20.04.2016 | ||
DK | 20.04.2016 | ||
EE | 20.04.2016 | ||
FI | 20.04.2016 | ||
HR | 20.04.2016 | ||
LT | 20.04.2016 | ||
LV | 20.04.2016 | ||
NL | 20.04.2016 | ||
PL | 20.04.2016 | ||
RO | 20.04.2016 | ||
RS | 20.04.2016 | ||
SE | 20.04.2016 | ||
SK | 20.04.2016 | ||
NO | 20.07.2016 | ||
GR | 21.07.2016 | ||
PT | 22.08.2016 | ||
Former [2017/09] | AT | 20.04.2016 | |
BE | 20.04.2016 | ||
CZ | 20.04.2016 | ||
DK | 20.04.2016 | ||
EE | 20.04.2016 | ||
FI | 20.04.2016 | ||
HR | 20.04.2016 | ||
LT | 20.04.2016 | ||
LV | 20.04.2016 | ||
NL | 20.04.2016 | ||
PL | 20.04.2016 | ||
RO | 20.04.2016 | ||
RS | 20.04.2016 | ||
SE | 20.04.2016 | ||
NO | 20.07.2016 | ||
GR | 21.07.2016 | ||
PT | 22.08.2016 | ||
Former [2017/07] | AT | 20.04.2016 | |
BE | 20.04.2016 | ||
DK | 20.04.2016 | ||
FI | 20.04.2016 | ||
HR | 20.04.2016 | ||
LT | 20.04.2016 | ||
LV | 20.04.2016 | ||
NL | 20.04.2016 | ||
PL | 20.04.2016 | ||
RS | 20.04.2016 | ||
SE | 20.04.2016 | ||
NO | 20.07.2016 | ||
GR | 21.07.2016 | ||
PT | 22.08.2016 | ||
Former [2017/03] | AT | 20.04.2016 | |
BE | 20.04.2016 | ||
FI | 20.04.2016 | ||
HR | 20.04.2016 | ||
LT | 20.04.2016 | ||
LV | 20.04.2016 | ||
NL | 20.04.2016 | ||
PL | 20.04.2016 | ||
RS | 20.04.2016 | ||
SE | 20.04.2016 | ||
NO | 20.07.2016 | ||
GR | 21.07.2016 | ||
PT | 22.08.2016 | ||
Former [2016/52] | AT | 20.04.2016 | |
FI | 20.04.2016 | ||
HR | 20.04.2016 | ||
LT | 20.04.2016 | ||
LV | 20.04.2016 | ||
NL | 20.04.2016 | ||
PL | 20.04.2016 | ||
RS | 20.04.2016 | ||
SE | 20.04.2016 | ||
NO | 20.07.2016 | ||
GR | 21.07.2016 | ||
PT | 22.08.2016 | ||
Former [2016/51] | AT | 20.04.2016 | |
FI | 20.04.2016 | ||
HR | 20.04.2016 | ||
LT | 20.04.2016 | ||
LV | 20.04.2016 | ||
NL | 20.04.2016 | ||
PL | 20.04.2016 | ||
RS | 20.04.2016 | ||
NO | 20.07.2016 | ||
GR | 21.07.2016 | ||
PT | 22.08.2016 | ||
Former [2016/50] | AT | 20.04.2016 | |
FI | 20.04.2016 | ||
HR | 20.04.2016 | ||
LT | 20.04.2016 | ||
LV | 20.04.2016 | ||
NL | 20.04.2016 | ||
PL | 20.04.2016 | ||
RS | 20.04.2016 | ||
NO | 20.07.2016 | ||
Former [2016/49] | FI | 20.04.2016 | |
LT | 20.04.2016 | ||
NL | 20.04.2016 | ||
PL | 20.04.2016 | ||
NO | 20.07.2016 | ||
Former [2016/46] | LT | 20.04.2016 | |
NO | 20.07.2016 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2003130305 (WALKER DANIEL PATRICK [US], et al) [A] 1-13 * example 18; claim - *; | [T] - S.N. GOODMAN ET. AL., "Synthesis of Fused Dihydropyrano(furano)pyridines via [4+2] Cycloaddition of 5-Alkenoxy Substitued Oxazoles.", ORGANIC LETTERS, (20120307), vol. 14, no. 6, pages 1604 - 1607, XP002723731 [T] 1-13 * page 1606; figure 2 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/ol300351v | International search | [A] - MOVASSAGHI ET AL., "A Versatile Cyclodehydration Reaction for the Synthesis of lsoquinoline and beta-Carboline Derivatives", ORG LETT., vol. 10, no. 16, (2008), pages 3485 - 3488, URL: http:/lwww.ncbi.nlm.nih.govlpmdarticIesIPMC26928361pdfinihms-108650.pdf, XP055079588 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/ol801264u | [A] - WILLIAMS ET AL., "Studies of stereocontrolled allylation reactions for the total synthesis of phorboxazole A", PNAS, vol. 101, no. 33, (2004), pages 12058 - 12063, URL: http://www.pnas.orglcontenU101/33/12058.fufl.pdf+html, XP055079589 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1073/pnas.0402477101 | [A] - MARTIN ET AL., "A Convenient, One Step Synthesis of Pyrano(2,3-b)Pyridines", TETRAHEDRON, (1988), vol. 44, no. 18, pages 5861 - 5868, XP055079591 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0040-4020(01)81443-5 |