EP2600567 - COMMUNICATIONS CONTROL DEVICE, COMMUNICATIONS SYSTEM, AND PROGRAM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 04.03.2016 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.03.2016 | Withdrawal of application | published on 06.04.2016 [2016/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Panasonic Intellectual Property Management Co., Ltd. 7 OBP Panasonic Tower 1-61, Shiromi 2-chome Chuo-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 540-6207 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2015/14] | For all designated states Panasonic Intellectual Property Management Co., Ltd. 7 OBP Panasonic Tower 1-61, Shiromi 2-chome Chuo-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 540-6207 / JP | ||
Former [2013/23] | For all designated states Panasonic Corporation 1006, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi Osaka 571-8501 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TAKAZOE, Tomoki c/o Panasonic Corporation IPROC IP Development Group 7F OBP Panasonic Tower 2-1-61, Shiromi, Chuo-ku Osaka 540-6207 / JP | [2013/23] | Representative(s) | Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte PartG mbB Friedenheimer Brücke 21 80639 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2013/23] | Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte Grafinger Straße 2 81671 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 11812520.2 | 27.07.2011 | WO2011JP67079 | Priority number, date | JP20100168370 | 27.07.2010 Original published format: JP 2010168370 | [2013/23] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2012014931 | Date: | 02.02.2012 | Language: | JA | [2012/05] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2600567 | Date: | 05.06.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/23] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 02.02.2012 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.05.2015 | Classification | IPC: | H04L12/46, H04L12/56 | [2013/23] | CPC: |
H04L63/1466 (EP,US);
H04L45/02 (EP,US);
H04L2101/659 (EP,US);
H04L61/4511 (EP,US);
H04L61/5014 (EP,US);
H04L63/0236 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/23] | Title | German: | KOMMUNIKATIONSSTEUERVORRICHTUNG, KOMMUNIKATIONSSYSTEM UND PROGRAMM | [2013/23] | English: | COMMUNICATIONS CONTROL DEVICE, COMMUNICATIONS SYSTEM, AND PROGRAM | [2013/23] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE COMMANDE DE COMMUNICATION, SYSTÈME DE COMMUNICATION ET PROGRAMME | [2013/23] | Entry into regional phase | 25.01.2012 | Translation filed | 31.01.2013 | National basic fee paid | 31.01.2013 | Search fee paid | 31.01.2013 | Designation fee(s) paid | 31.01.2013 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 31.01.2013 | Examination requested [2013/23] | 26.11.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 25.02.2016 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2016/14] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.07.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.07.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.07.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]US2004028061 (SAWADA SUNAO [JP], et al) [I] 1,6-8 * abstract * * paragraphs [0001] , [0010] , [0029] - [0037] - [0054] , [0056] , [0061] , [0063] , [0067] *; | [A]WO2004042999 (ERICSSON TELEFON AB L M [SE], et al) [A] 2-5* page 6, line 3 - page 6, line 32 *; | [A]US2006067321 (SATOU SOU [JP]) [A] 3,4 * paragraphs [0003] , [0009] , [0012] , [0037] , [0038] , [0039] *; | [I]JP2006324723 (FUJITSU LTD) [I] 1,6-8 * paragraph [0034] *; | [X] - NORDMARK SUN M BAGNULO UC3M E LEVY-ABEGNOLI CISCO SYSTEMS E, "FCFS-SAVI: First-Come First-Serve Source-Address Validation for Locally Assigned Addresses; draft-ietf-savi-fcfs-04.txt", FCFS-SAVI: FIRST-COME FIRST-SERVE SOURCE-ADDRESS VALIDATION FOR LOCALLY ASSIGNED ADDRESSES; DRAFT-IETF-SAVI-FCFS-04.TXT, INTERNET ENGINEERING TASK FORCE, IETF; STANDARDWORKINGDRAFT, INTERNET SOCIETY (ISOC) 4, RUE DES FALAISES CH- 1205 GENEVA, SWITZER, (20100712), no. 4, pages 1 - 28, XP015070051 [X] 1,7,8 * paragraphs [02.1] , [02.3] , [03.1] , [4.2.1] , [4.2.2] * | [X] - FERGUSON CISCO SYSTEMS P ET AL, "Network Ingress Filtering: Defeating Denial of Service Attacks which employ IP Source Address Spoofing; rfc2827.txt", 20000501, (20000501), ISSN 0000-0003, XP015008610 [X] 1,7,8 * paragraphs [0001] , [0003] , [0004] , [0005] * | [A] - DONLEY D KHARBANDA CABLELABS J BRZOZOWSKI Y LEE COMCAST CABLE J WEIL COX COMMUNICATIONS K ERICHSEN L HOWARD TIME WARNER CABLE JF T, "Use Cases and Requirements for an IPv6 CPE Router; draft-donley-ipv6-cpe-rtr-use-cases-and-reqs-00.txt", USE CASES AND REQUIREMENTS FOR AN IPV6 CPE ROUTER; DRAFT-DONLEY-IPV6-CPE-RTR-USE-CASES-AND-REQS-00.TXT, INTERNET ENGINEERING TASK FORCE, IETF; STANDARDWORKINGDRAFT, INTERNET SOCIETY (ISOC) 4, RUE DES FALAISES CH- 1205 GENEVA, SWITZERLAND, (20090702), XP015062952 [A] 1-8 * paragraphs [0001] , [0003] , [4.2.1] , [4.4.1] , [4.4.2] * | [A] - BI J ET AL, "SAVI Solution for DHCP; draft-ietf-savi-dhcp-03.txt", SAVI SOLUTION FOR DHCP; DRAFT-IETF-SAVI-DHCP-03.TXT, INTERNET ENGINEERING TASK FORCE, IETF; STANDARDWORKINGDRAFT, INTERNET SOCIETY (ISOC) 4, RUE DES FALAISES CH- 1205 GENEVA, SWITZERLAND, (20100528), no. 3, pages 1 - 26, XP015068711 [A] 3,4 * abstract * * paragraphs [0001] , [0003] , [06.1] , [06.2] , [0007] , [09.1] , [11.1.1.1] * | International search | [Y]JP2003348116 (HITACHI LTD); | [Y]JP2004180211 (FUJITSU LTD); | [Y]JP2005064570 (HITACHI LTD); | [Y]JP2006324723 (FUJITSU LTD) | by applicant | JP2001211180 | JP2004180211 |