EP2598985 - APPLICATION INSTANCE AND QUERY STORES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 03.02.2023 Database last updated on 15.07.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 17.05.2022 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 05.03.2022 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 17.02.2022 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 23.08.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.02.2023 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 08.03.2023 [2023/10] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Microsoft Technology Licensing, LLC One Microsoft Way Redmond, WA 98052-6399 / US | [2021/45] |
Former [2015/12] | For all designated states Microsoft Technology Licensing, LLC One Microsoft Way Redmond, WA 98052 / US | ||
Former [2013/23] | For all designated states Microsoft Corporation One Microsoft Way Redmond, Washington 98052-6399 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ALLEN, Nicholas, A. c/o Microsoft Corporation LCA - International Patents One Microsoft Way Redmond, Washington 98052-6399 / US | 02 /
TAYLOR, John, A. c/o Microsoft Corporation LCA - International Patents One Microsoft Way Redmond, Washington 98052-6399 / US | 03 /
PARAMASIVAM, Kartik c/o Microsoft Corporation LCA - International Patents One Microsoft Way Redmond, Washington 98052-6399 / US | 04 /
SHUKLA, Dharma c/o Microsoft Corporation LCA - International Patents One Microsoft Way Redmond, Washington 98052-6399 / US | [2022/11] |
Former [2013/23] | 01 /
ALLEN, Nicholas, A. c/o Microsoft Corporation LCA - International Patents One Microsoft Way Redmond Washington 98052-6399 / US | ||
02 /
TAYLOR, John, A. c/o Microsoft Corporation LCA - International Patents One Microsoft Way Redmond Washington 98052-6399 / US | |||
03 /
PARAMASIVAM, Kartik c/o Microsoft Corporation LCA - International Patents One Microsoft Way Redmond Washington 98052-6399 / US | |||
04 /
SHUKLA, Dharma c/o Microsoft Corporation LCA - International Patents One Microsoft Way Redmond Washington 98052-6399 / US | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstraße 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2013/23] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 11812974.1 | 21.07.2011 | WO2011US44907 | Priority number, date | US20100843888 | 27.07.2010 Original published format: US 843888 | [2013/23] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2012015673 | Date: | 02.02.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/05] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2598985 | Date: | 05.06.2013 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.02.2012 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2013/23] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 12.04.2012 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.12.2014 | Classification | IPC: | G06F9/06, G06F9/44 | [2013/23] | CPC: |
G06F16/23 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/23] | Title | German: | ANWENDUNGSINSTANZ UND ABFRAGESPEICHER DAFÜR | [2013/23] | English: | APPLICATION INSTANCE AND QUERY STORES | [2013/23] | French: | INSTANCE D'APPLICATION ET MÉMOIRES DE REQUÊTES | [2013/23] | Entry into regional phase | 28.01.2013 | National basic fee paid | 28.01.2013 | Search fee paid | 28.01.2013 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.01.2013 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.01.2013 | Examination requested [2013/23] | 15.07.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 27.08.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.11.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.11.2021 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 11.11.2021 | 11.11.2021 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 18.02.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.03.2022 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 18.05.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.09.2022 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2023/10] | 20.10.2022 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2023/10] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 27.08.2019 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.07.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 08.07.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 09.07.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 11.07.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 12.07.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 11.07.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 15.07.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 29.06.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 29.06.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2022 | 12   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]US2002156786 (MARTIN CHARLES [CA], et al) [I] 1-15 * paragraph [0008] * * paragraph [0026] - paragraph [0030] *; | [A]WO2006111003 (RESEARCH IN MOTION LTD [CA], et al) [A] 1-15* paragraph [0006] * | International search | [A]US2005188380 (LI HONG B [JP], et al); | [A]US2008104083 (WOODS DAVID R [US]); | [A]US2008270382 (THOMSEN DAN [DK], et al); | [A]US2009083261 (NAGANO SHINICHI [JP], et al) | by applicant | US2002156786 |