EP2599059 - DETECTION DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.01.2019 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 02.02.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 19.09.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IS | published on 12.08.2020 [2020/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Coin Acceptors, Inc. 300 Hunter Drive St. Louis, MO 63124-2013 / US | [2013/23] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LEIBU, Mark 12482 Sparrowwood Drive St. Louis, Missouri 63146 / US | 02 /
HOORMANN, Ronald 4 Misty Hollow Court St. Charles, Missouri 63303 / US | 03 /
COSTELLO, Steven, M. 1016 Illini Drive O'Fallon, Illinois 62269 / US | 04 /
LOVALL, Ron 300 Hunter Drive St. Louis, Missouri 63124-2013 / US | [2013/23] | Representative(s) | Lecomte & Partners 76-78, rue de Merl 2146 Luxembourg / LU | [N/P] |
Former [2013/23] | Lecomte & Partners P.O. Box 1623 1016 Luxembourg / LU | Application number, filing date | 11813153.1 | 27.07.2011 | [2018/10] | WO2011US45627 | Priority number, date | US20100368137P | 27.07.2010 Original published format: US 368137 P | [2013/23] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2012015984 | Date: | 02.02.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/05] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2599059 | Date: | 05.06.2013 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.02.2012 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2013/23] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2599059 | Date: | 07.03.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/10] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 07.06.2012 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.01.2014 | Classification | IPC: | G07D5/02, G01B11/02, G07D5/08 | [2014/05] | CPC: |
G07D5/02 (EP,US);
G07D5/08 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2013/23] | G07D5/02, G01B11/02 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/23] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | DETEKTIONSVORRICHTUNG | [2013/23] | English: | DETECTION DEVICE | [2013/23] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE DÉTECTION | [2013/23] | Entry into regional phase | 27.02.2013 | National basic fee paid | 27.02.2013 | Search fee paid | 27.02.2013 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.02.2013 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.02.2013 | Examination requested [2013/23] | 04.08.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 20.09.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.01.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 29.01.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 29.01.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | 20.02.2018 | Request for correction of the decision to grant filed | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 20.09.2017 | Opposition(s) | 10.12.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit [2019/07] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.07.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.07.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.07.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.07.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.07.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 27.07.2011 | AL | 07.03.2018 | AT | 07.03.2018 | CY | 07.03.2018 | CZ | 07.03.2018 | DK | 07.03.2018 | EE | 07.03.2018 | ES | 07.03.2018 | FI | 07.03.2018 | HR | 07.03.2018 | IT | 07.03.2018 | LT | 07.03.2018 | LV | 07.03.2018 | MC | 07.03.2018 | MK | 07.03.2018 | NL | 07.03.2018 | PL | 07.03.2018 | RO | 07.03.2018 | RS | 07.03.2018 | SE | 07.03.2018 | SI | 07.03.2018 | SK | 07.03.2018 | SM | 07.03.2018 | TR | 07.03.2018 | BG | 07.06.2018 | NO | 07.06.2018 | GR | 08.06.2018 | IS | 07.07.2018 | PT | 09.07.2018 | IE | 27.07.2018 | LU | 27.07.2018 | MT | 27.07.2018 | BE | 31.07.2018 | CH | 31.07.2018 | LI | 31.07.2018 | [2020/33] |
Former [2020/31] | HU | 27.07.2011 | |
AL | 07.03.2018 | ||
AT | 07.03.2018 | ||
CY | 07.03.2018 | ||
CZ | 07.03.2018 | ||
DK | 07.03.2018 | ||
EE | 07.03.2018 | ||
ES | 07.03.2018 | ||
FI | 07.03.2018 | ||
HR | 07.03.2018 | ||
IT | 07.03.2018 | ||
LT | 07.03.2018 | ||
LV | 07.03.2018 | ||
MC | 07.03.2018 | ||
MK | 07.03.2018 | ||
NL | 07.03.2018 | ||
PL | 07.03.2018 | ||
RO | 07.03.2018 | ||
RS | 07.03.2018 | ||
SE | 07.03.2018 | ||
SI | 07.03.2018 | ||
SK | 07.03.2018 | ||
SM | 07.03.2018 | ||
TR | 07.03.2018 | ||
BG | 07.06.2018 | ||
NO | 07.06.2018 | ||
GR | 08.06.2018 | ||
PT | 09.07.2018 | ||
IE | 27.07.2018 | ||
LU | 27.07.2018 | ||
MT | 27.07.2018 | ||
BE | 31.07.2018 | ||
CH | 31.07.2018 | ||
LI | 31.07.2018 | ||
Former [2020/28] | HU | 27.07.2011 | |
AL | 07.03.2018 | ||
AT | 07.03.2018 | ||
CY | 07.03.2018 | ||
CZ | 07.03.2018 | ||
DK | 07.03.2018 | ||
EE | 07.03.2018 | ||
ES | 07.03.2018 | ||
FI | 07.03.2018 | ||
HR | 07.03.2018 | ||
IT | 07.03.2018 | ||
LT | 07.03.2018 | ||
LV | 07.03.2018 | ||
MC | 07.03.2018 | ||
NL | 07.03.2018 | ||
PL | 07.03.2018 | ||
RO | 07.03.2018 | ||
RS | 07.03.2018 | ||
SE | 07.03.2018 | ||
SI | 07.03.2018 | ||
SK | 07.03.2018 | ||
SM | 07.03.2018 | ||
TR | 07.03.2018 | ||
BG | 07.06.2018 | ||
NO | 07.06.2018 | ||
GR | 08.06.2018 | ||
PT | 09.07.2018 | ||
IE | 27.07.2018 | ||
LU | 27.07.2018 | ||
MT | 27.07.2018 | ||
BE | 31.07.2018 | ||
CH | 31.07.2018 | ||
LI | 31.07.2018 | ||
Former [2020/16] | AL | 07.03.2018 | |
AT | 07.03.2018 | ||
CY | 07.03.2018 | ||
CZ | 07.03.2018 | ||
DK | 07.03.2018 | ||
EE | 07.03.2018 | ||
ES | 07.03.2018 | ||
FI | 07.03.2018 | ||
HR | 07.03.2018 | ||
IT | 07.03.2018 | ||
LT | 07.03.2018 | ||
LV | 07.03.2018 | ||
MC | 07.03.2018 | ||
NL | 07.03.2018 | ||
PL | 07.03.2018 | ||
RO | 07.03.2018 | ||
RS | 07.03.2018 | ||
SE | 07.03.2018 | ||
SI | 07.03.2018 | ||
SK | 07.03.2018 | ||
SM | 07.03.2018 | ||
TR | 07.03.2018 | ||
BG | 07.06.2018 | ||
NO | 07.06.2018 | ||
GR | 08.06.2018 | ||
PT | 09.07.2018 | ||
IE | 27.07.2018 | ||
LU | 27.07.2018 | ||
MT | 27.07.2018 | ||
BE | 31.07.2018 | ||
CH | 31.07.2018 | ||
LI | 31.07.2018 | ||
Former [2020/08] | AL | 07.03.2018 | |
AT | 07.03.2018 | ||
CY | 07.03.2018 | ||
CZ | 07.03.2018 | ||
DK | 07.03.2018 | ||
EE | 07.03.2018 | ||
ES | 07.03.2018 | ||
FI | 07.03.2018 | ||
HR | 07.03.2018 | ||
IT | 07.03.2018 | ||
LT | 07.03.2018 | ||
LV | 07.03.2018 | ||
MC | 07.03.2018 | ||
NL | 07.03.2018 | ||
PL | 07.03.2018 | ||
RO | 07.03.2018 | ||
RS | 07.03.2018 | ||
SE | 07.03.2018 | ||
SI | 07.03.2018 | ||
SK | 07.03.2018 | ||
SM | 07.03.2018 | ||
BG | 07.06.2018 | ||
NO | 07.06.2018 | ||
GR | 08.06.2018 | ||
PT | 09.07.2018 | ||
IE | 27.07.2018 | ||
LU | 27.07.2018 | ||
MT | 27.07.2018 | ||
BE | 31.07.2018 | ||
CH | 31.07.2018 | ||
LI | 31.07.2018 | ||
Former [2019/33] | AL | 07.03.2018 | |
AT | 07.03.2018 | ||
CY | 07.03.2018 | ||
CZ | 07.03.2018 | ||
DK | 07.03.2018 | ||
EE | 07.03.2018 | ||
ES | 07.03.2018 | ||
FI | 07.03.2018 | ||
HR | 07.03.2018 | ||
IT | 07.03.2018 | ||
LT | 07.03.2018 | ||
LV | 07.03.2018 | ||
MC | 07.03.2018 | ||
NL | 07.03.2018 | ||
PL | 07.03.2018 | ||
RO | 07.03.2018 | ||
RS | 07.03.2018 | ||
SE | 07.03.2018 | ||
SI | 07.03.2018 | ||
SK | 07.03.2018 | ||
SM | 07.03.2018 | ||
BG | 07.06.2018 | ||
NO | 07.06.2018 | ||
GR | 08.06.2018 | ||
PT | 09.07.2018 | ||
IE | 27.07.2018 | ||
LU | 27.07.2018 | ||
BE | 31.07.2018 | ||
CH | 31.07.2018 | ||
LI | 31.07.2018 | ||
Former [2019/24] | AL | 07.03.2018 | |
AT | 07.03.2018 | ||
CY | 07.03.2018 | ||
CZ | 07.03.2018 | ||
DK | 07.03.2018 | ||
EE | 07.03.2018 | ||
ES | 07.03.2018 | ||
FI | 07.03.2018 | ||
HR | 07.03.2018 | ||
IT | 07.03.2018 | ||
LT | 07.03.2018 | ||
LV | 07.03.2018 | ||
MC | 07.03.2018 | ||
NL | 07.03.2018 | ||
PL | 07.03.2018 | ||
RO | 07.03.2018 | ||
RS | 07.03.2018 | ||
SE | 07.03.2018 | ||
SI | 07.03.2018 | ||
SK | 07.03.2018 | ||
SM | 07.03.2018 | ||
BG | 07.06.2018 | ||
NO | 07.06.2018 | ||
GR | 08.06.2018 | ||
PT | 09.07.2018 | ||
LU | 27.07.2018 | ||
BE | 31.07.2018 | ||
CH | 31.07.2018 | ||
LI | 31.07.2018 | ||
Former [2019/21] | AL | 07.03.2018 | |
AT | 07.03.2018 | ||
CY | 07.03.2018 | ||
CZ | 07.03.2018 | ||
DK | 07.03.2018 | ||
EE | 07.03.2018 | ||
ES | 07.03.2018 | ||
FI | 07.03.2018 | ||
HR | 07.03.2018 | ||
IT | 07.03.2018 | ||
LT | 07.03.2018 | ||
LV | 07.03.2018 | ||
MC | 07.03.2018 | ||
NL | 07.03.2018 | ||
PL | 07.03.2018 | ||
RO | 07.03.2018 | ||
RS | 07.03.2018 | ||
SE | 07.03.2018 | ||
SI | 07.03.2018 | ||
SK | 07.03.2018 | ||
SM | 07.03.2018 | ||
BG | 07.06.2018 | ||
NO | 07.06.2018 | ||
GR | 08.06.2018 | ||
PT | 09.07.2018 | ||
LU | 27.07.2018 | ||
CH | 31.07.2018 | ||
LI | 31.07.2018 | ||
Former [2019/17] | AL | 07.03.2018 | |
AT | 07.03.2018 | ||
CY | 07.03.2018 | ||
CZ | 07.03.2018 | ||
DK | 07.03.2018 | ||
EE | 07.03.2018 | ||
ES | 07.03.2018 | ||
FI | 07.03.2018 | ||
HR | 07.03.2018 | ||
IT | 07.03.2018 | ||
LT | 07.03.2018 | ||
LV | 07.03.2018 | ||
MC | 07.03.2018 | ||
NL | 07.03.2018 | ||
PL | 07.03.2018 | ||
RO | 07.03.2018 | ||
RS | 07.03.2018 | ||
SE | 07.03.2018 | ||
SI | 07.03.2018 | ||
SK | 07.03.2018 | ||
SM | 07.03.2018 | ||
BG | 07.06.2018 | ||
NO | 07.06.2018 | ||
GR | 08.06.2018 | ||
PT | 09.07.2018 | ||
LU | 27.07.2018 | ||
Former [2019/15] | AL | 07.03.2018 | |
AT | 07.03.2018 | ||
CY | 07.03.2018 | ||
CZ | 07.03.2018 | ||
DK | 07.03.2018 | ||
EE | 07.03.2018 | ||
ES | 07.03.2018 | ||
FI | 07.03.2018 | ||
HR | 07.03.2018 | ||
IT | 07.03.2018 | ||
LT | 07.03.2018 | ||
LV | 07.03.2018 | ||
MC | 07.03.2018 | ||
NL | 07.03.2018 | ||
PL | 07.03.2018 | ||
RO | 07.03.2018 | ||
RS | 07.03.2018 | ||
SE | 07.03.2018 | ||
SI | 07.03.2018 | ||
SK | 07.03.2018 | ||
SM | 07.03.2018 | ||
BG | 07.06.2018 | ||
NO | 07.06.2018 | ||
GR | 08.06.2018 | ||
PT | 09.07.2018 | ||
Former [2019/13] | AL | 07.03.2018 | |
AT | 07.03.2018 | ||
CY | 07.03.2018 | ||
CZ | 07.03.2018 | ||
DK | 07.03.2018 | ||
EE | 07.03.2018 | ||
ES | 07.03.2018 | ||
FI | 07.03.2018 | ||
HR | 07.03.2018 | ||
IT | 07.03.2018 | ||
LT | 07.03.2018 | ||
LV | 07.03.2018 | ||
NL | 07.03.2018 | ||
PL | 07.03.2018 | ||
RO | 07.03.2018 | ||
RS | 07.03.2018 | ||
SE | 07.03.2018 | ||
SI | 07.03.2018 | ||
SK | 07.03.2018 | ||
SM | 07.03.2018 | ||
BG | 07.06.2018 | ||
NO | 07.06.2018 | ||
GR | 08.06.2018 | ||
PT | 09.07.2018 | ||
Former [2019/08] | AL | 07.03.2018 | |
AT | 07.03.2018 | ||
CY | 07.03.2018 | ||
CZ | 07.03.2018 | ||
DK | 07.03.2018 | ||
EE | 07.03.2018 | ||
ES | 07.03.2018 | ||
FI | 07.03.2018 | ||
HR | 07.03.2018 | ||
IT | 07.03.2018 | ||
LT | 07.03.2018 | ||
LV | 07.03.2018 | ||
NL | 07.03.2018 | ||
PL | 07.03.2018 | ||
RO | 07.03.2018 | ||
RS | 07.03.2018 | ||
SE | 07.03.2018 | ||
SK | 07.03.2018 | ||
SM | 07.03.2018 | ||
BG | 07.06.2018 | ||
NO | 07.06.2018 | ||
GR | 08.06.2018 | ||
PT | 09.07.2018 | ||
Former [2019/03] | AL | 07.03.2018 | |
AT | 07.03.2018 | ||
CY | 07.03.2018 | ||
CZ | 07.03.2018 | ||
EE | 07.03.2018 | ||
ES | 07.03.2018 | ||
FI | 07.03.2018 | ||
HR | 07.03.2018 | ||
IT | 07.03.2018 | ||
LT | 07.03.2018 | ||
LV | 07.03.2018 | ||
NL | 07.03.2018 | ||
PL | 07.03.2018 | ||
RO | 07.03.2018 | ||
RS | 07.03.2018 | ||
SE | 07.03.2018 | ||
SK | 07.03.2018 | ||
SM | 07.03.2018 | ||
BG | 07.06.2018 | ||
NO | 07.06.2018 | ||
GR | 08.06.2018 | ||
PT | 09.07.2018 | ||
Former [2018/52] | AL | 07.03.2018 | |
AT | 07.03.2018 | ||
CY | 07.03.2018 | ||
CZ | 07.03.2018 | ||
EE | 07.03.2018 | ||
ES | 07.03.2018 | ||
FI | 07.03.2018 | ||
HR | 07.03.2018 | ||
IT | 07.03.2018 | ||
LT | 07.03.2018 | ||
LV | 07.03.2018 | ||
NL | 07.03.2018 | ||
PL | 07.03.2018 | ||
RO | 07.03.2018 | ||
RS | 07.03.2018 | ||
SE | 07.03.2018 | ||
SK | 07.03.2018 | ||
SM | 07.03.2018 | ||
BG | 07.06.2018 | ||
NO | 07.06.2018 | ||
GR | 08.06.2018 | ||
Former [2018/50] | AL | 07.03.2018 | |
AT | 07.03.2018 | ||
CY | 07.03.2018 | ||
CZ | 07.03.2018 | ||
EE | 07.03.2018 | ||
ES | 07.03.2018 | ||
FI | 07.03.2018 | ||
HR | 07.03.2018 | ||
IT | 07.03.2018 | ||
LT | 07.03.2018 | ||
LV | 07.03.2018 | ||
NL | 07.03.2018 | ||
PL | 07.03.2018 | ||
RO | 07.03.2018 | ||
RS | 07.03.2018 | ||
SE | 07.03.2018 | ||
SK | 07.03.2018 | ||
BG | 07.06.2018 | ||
NO | 07.06.2018 | ||
GR | 08.06.2018 | ||
Former [2018/47] | AL | 07.03.2018 | |
CY | 07.03.2018 | ||
ES | 07.03.2018 | ||
FI | 07.03.2018 | ||
HR | 07.03.2018 | ||
IT | 07.03.2018 | ||
LT | 07.03.2018 | ||
LV | 07.03.2018 | ||
NL | 07.03.2018 | ||
RS | 07.03.2018 | ||
SE | 07.03.2018 | ||
BG | 07.06.2018 | ||
NO | 07.06.2018 | ||
GR | 08.06.2018 | ||
Former [2018/46] | AL | 07.03.2018 | |
CY | 07.03.2018 | ||
ES | 07.03.2018 | ||
FI | 07.03.2018 | ||
HR | 07.03.2018 | ||
LT | 07.03.2018 | ||
LV | 07.03.2018 | ||
NL | 07.03.2018 | ||
RS | 07.03.2018 | ||
SE | 07.03.2018 | ||
BG | 07.06.2018 | ||
NO | 07.06.2018 | ||
GR | 08.06.2018 | ||
Former [2018/45] | CY | 07.03.2018 | |
ES | 07.03.2018 | ||
FI | 07.03.2018 | ||
HR | 07.03.2018 | ||
LT | 07.03.2018 | ||
LV | 07.03.2018 | ||
NL | 07.03.2018 | ||
RS | 07.03.2018 | ||
SE | 07.03.2018 | ||
BG | 07.06.2018 | ||
NO | 07.06.2018 | ||
GR | 08.06.2018 | ||
Former [2018/40] | CY | 07.03.2018 | |
ES | 07.03.2018 | ||
FI | 07.03.2018 | ||
HR | 07.03.2018 | ||
LT | 07.03.2018 | ||
LV | 07.03.2018 | ||
RS | 07.03.2018 | ||
SE | 07.03.2018 | ||
BG | 07.06.2018 | ||
NO | 07.06.2018 | ||
GR | 08.06.2018 | ||
Former [2018/39] | CY | 07.03.2018 | |
ES | 07.03.2018 | ||
FI | 07.03.2018 | ||
HR | 07.03.2018 | ||
LT | 07.03.2018 | ||
LV | 07.03.2018 | ||
RS | 07.03.2018 | ||
SE | 07.03.2018 | ||
NO | 07.06.2018 | ||
GR | 08.06.2018 | ||
Former [2018/37] | CY | 07.03.2018 | |
ES | 07.03.2018 | ||
FI | 07.03.2018 | ||
HR | 07.03.2018 | ||
LT | 07.03.2018 | ||
NO | 07.06.2018 | ||
GR | 08.06.2018 | ||
Former [2018/36] | CY | 07.03.2018 | |
ES | 07.03.2018 | ||
FI | 07.03.2018 | ||
HR | 07.03.2018 | ||
LT | 07.03.2018 | ||
NO | 07.06.2018 | ||
Former [2018/35] | CY | 07.03.2018 | |
FI | 07.03.2018 | ||
HR | 07.03.2018 | ||
LT | 07.03.2018 | ||
NO | 07.06.2018 | Documents cited: | Search | [I]EP0936578 (AZKOYEN IND SA [ES]) [I] 1-23 * paragraph [0001] - paragraph [0012] * * paragraph [0015] - paragraph [0035] * * figures 1-7 *; | [I]JPH08329302 (OKI ELECTRIC IND CO LTD) [I] 1-23 * the whole document *; | [I]JPH04278692 (TOSHIBA CORP) [I] 1-23 * paragraph [0002] - paragraph [0005] * * paragraph [0008] * * paragraph [0011] - paragraph [0012] * * paragraph [0014] - paragraph [0025] * * figures 1,2,6,7 *; | [A]WO2009063197 (SCAN COIN IND AB [SE], et al) [A] 1-23 * page 2, lines 9-20 * * page 3, lines 5-16 * * page 6, line 15 - page 7, line 10 * * page 15, lines 7-25 * * figures 2a,2b,3a,3b,11a,11b * | International search | [A]JPH04278692 (TOSHIBA CORP); | [A]JPH08329302 (OKI ELECTRIC IND CO LTD); | [A]US5673781 (COSTELLO STEVEN MICHAEL [US], et al) |