EP2602771 - VALUABLE FILE IDENTIFICATION METHOD AND IDENTIFICATION SYSTEM, DEVICE THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 17.07.2020 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 20.04.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2020 | Refusal of application | published on 19.08.2020 [2020/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states GRG Banking Equipment Co., Ltd. 9 Kelin Road Science City Luogang District Guangzhou Guangdong 510663 / CN | [2013/24] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LIANG, Tiancai 9 Kelin Road Science City Luogang District Guangzhou Guangdong 510663 / CN | 02 /
MU, Zongbin 9 Kelin Road Science City Luogang District Guangzhou Guangdong 510663 / CN | 03 /
XIAO, Dahai 9 Kelin Road Science City Luogang District Guangzhou Guangdong 510663 / CN | [2013/24] | Representative(s) | Maiwald GmbH Elisenhof Elisenstraße 3 80335 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2013/24] | Maiwald Patentanwalts GmbH Elisenhof Elisenstraße 3 80335 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 11814067.2 | 29.06.2011 | WO2011CN76550 | Priority number, date | CN201010251473 | 03.08.2010 Original published format: CN201010251473 | [2013/24] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2012016484 | Date: | 09.02.2012 | Language: | ZH | [2012/06] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2602771 | Date: | 12.06.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/24] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 09.02.2012 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.04.2014 | Classification | IPC: | G07D7/20 | [2013/24] | CPC: |
G06V30/19173 (EP,US);
G06F18/24137 (US);
G06V10/143 (EP,US);
G06V10/25 (EP,US);
G06V10/30 (EP,US);
G06V10/44 (EP,US);
G06V30/418 (EP,US);
G07D7/2008 (EP,US);
G07D7/202 (EP,US);
G07D7/206 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/24] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND SYSTEM ZUR IDENTIFIKATION RELEVANTER DATEIEN UND VORRICHTUNG DAFÜR | [2013/24] | English: | VALUABLE FILE IDENTIFICATION METHOD AND IDENTIFICATION SYSTEM, DEVICE THEREOF | [2013/24] | French: | PROCÉDÉ D'IDENTIFICATION ET SYSTÈME D'IDENTIFICATION DE DOCUMENT DE VALEUR AINSI QUE DISPOSITIF CORRESPONDANT | [2013/24] | Entry into regional phase | 18.01.2013 | Translation filed | 18.01.2013 | National basic fee paid | 18.01.2013 | Search fee paid | 18.01.2013 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.01.2013 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.01.2013 | Examination requested [2013/24] | 30.10.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 18.04.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.08.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.02.2020 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 17.03.2020 | 26.02.2020 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2020/34] | 07.03.2020 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2020/34] | 17.03.2020 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 18.04.2018 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 06.06.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.06.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.06.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.06.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 29.06.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 29.06.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 28.06.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]WO2008014090 (3M INNOVATIVE PROPERTIES CO [US]) [I] 1-12 * paragraph [0003] - paragraph [0009] * * paragraph [0020] - paragraph [0044] * * paragraph [0039] - paragraph [0040] * * figures 1-4 *; | [XI]US2009152357 (LEI YIWU [CA], et al) [X] 1-4,9-12 * paragraph [0006] - paragraph [0015] * * paragraph [0033] - paragraph [0039] * * paragraph [0044] - paragraph [0048] * * paragraph [0052] - paragraph [0056] * * paragraph [0061] - paragraph [0073] * * paragraph [0080] * * paragraph [0093] - paragraph [0094] * * paragraph [0098] - paragraph [0101] * * figures 1,2,4,5,6,10,12 * [I] 5-8; | [A]WO2010004101 (ADVANCED TRACK & TRACE [FR], et al) [A] 1-12 * page 3, paragraphs 3,4 * * page 4, paragraph 1 - page 5, paragraph 4 * * page 7, paragraphs 3-8 * * page 8, paragraph 1 - page 9, paragraph 2 * * page 10, paragraph 2 - page 11, paragraph 3 ** figures 1-3 *; | [I]DE102008041944 (BUNDESDRUCKEREI GMBH [DE]) [I] 1-12 * paragraph [0005] - paragraph [0016] * * paragraph [0020] - paragraph [0022] * * paragraph [0038] - paragraph [0047] * * paragraph [0051] - paragraph [0062] * * paragraph [0065] - paragraph [0070] * * figures 1,2,4,6 * | International search | [A]CN1139437C (WANG XIAOGUANG [CN]); | [A]WO2009096535 (ARUZE CORP [JP], et al); | [A]CN101517619 (ARUZE CORP [JP]); | [A]CN201383174Y (BAIHUA SONG); | [XP]CN101908241 (GRG BANKING EQUIPMENT CO LTD) |