EP2602121 - GRAVURE PRINTING PLATE AND METHOD FOR PRODUCING GRAVURE PRINTING PLATE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.07.2020 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 02.08.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 23.04.2019 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 13.07.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 10.08.2022 [2022/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Think Laboratory Co., Ltd. 1201-11 Takada Kashiwa-shi Chiba 277-8525 / JP | [2013/24] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SHIGETA, Tatsuo c/o THINK LABORATORY CO. LTD. 1201-11, Takada Kashiwa-shi Chiba 277-8525 / JP | [2013/24] | Representative(s) | Mincone, Antimo Viale Europa 101 50126 Firenze / IT | [2019/36] |
Former [2013/24] | Mincone, Antimo Viale Europa 101 IT-50126 Firenze / IT | Application number, filing date | 11814422.9 | 14.07.2011 | [2019/36] | WO2011JP66037 | Priority number, date | JP20100176307 | 05.08.2010 Original published format: JP 2010176307 | [2013/24] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2012017792 | Date: | 09.02.2012 | Language: | JA | [2012/06] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2602121 | Date: | 12.06.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/24] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2602121 | Date: | 04.09.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/36] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 09.02.2012 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.01.2016 | Classification | IPC: | B41N1/06, B41C1/05, B41C1/18 | [2016/04] | CPC: |
B41C1/05 (EP,US);
B41C1/188 (EP,US);
B41N1/06 (EP,US);
Y10T428/24479 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2013/24] | B41N1/06, B41C1/05, B41M1/10, G03F7/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/24] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | GRAVURDRUCKPLATTE UND VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG DER GRAVURDRUCKPLATTE | [2013/24] | English: | GRAVURE PRINTING PLATE AND METHOD FOR PRODUCING GRAVURE PRINTING PLATE | [2013/24] | French: | PLAQUE D'HÉLIOGRAVURE ET PROCÉDÉ DE PRODUCTION D'UNE PLAQUE D'HÉLIOGRAVURE | [2013/24] | Entry into regional phase | 26.09.2012 | Translation filed | 26.09.2012 | National basic fee paid | 26.09.2012 | Search fee paid | 26.09.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.09.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.09.2012 | Examination requested [2013/24] | 13.07.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 16.07.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 26.11.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.04.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.05.2019 | Fee for grant paid | 17.05.2019 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 06.06.2019 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 16.07.2018 | Opposition(s) | 05.06.2020 | No opposition filed within time limit [2020/33] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.07.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.07.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.07.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 22.07.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 24.07.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.07.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 25.07.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 14.07.2011 | AL | 04.09.2019 | AT | 04.09.2019 | CY | 04.09.2019 | CZ | 04.09.2019 | DK | 04.09.2019 | EE | 04.09.2019 | FI | 04.09.2019 | HR | 04.09.2019 | LT | 04.09.2019 | LV | 04.09.2019 | MC | 04.09.2019 | MK | 04.09.2019 | MT | 04.09.2019 | NL | 04.09.2019 | PL | 04.09.2019 | RO | 04.09.2019 | RS | 04.09.2019 | SE | 04.09.2019 | SI | 04.09.2019 | SK | 04.09.2019 | SM | 04.09.2019 | BG | 04.12.2019 | NO | 04.12.2019 | GR | 05.12.2019 | IS | 05.01.2020 | PT | 06.01.2020 | [2022/32] |
Former [2022/27] | HU | 14.07.2011 | |
AL | 04.09.2019 | ||
AT | 04.09.2019 | ||
CY | 04.09.2019 | ||
CZ | 04.09.2019 | ||
DK | 04.09.2019 | ||
EE | 04.09.2019 | ||
FI | 04.09.2019 | ||
HR | 04.09.2019 | ||
LT | 04.09.2019 | ||
LV | 04.09.2019 | ||
MC | 04.09.2019 | ||
MT | 04.09.2019 | ||
NL | 04.09.2019 | ||
PL | 04.09.2019 | ||
RO | 04.09.2019 | ||
RS | 04.09.2019 | ||
SE | 04.09.2019 | ||
SI | 04.09.2019 | ||
SK | 04.09.2019 | ||
SM | 04.09.2019 | ||
BG | 04.12.2019 | ||
NO | 04.12.2019 | ||
GR | 05.12.2019 | ||
IS | 05.01.2020 | ||
PT | 06.01.2020 | ||
Former [2021/15] | AL | 04.09.2019 | |
AT | 04.09.2019 | ||
CZ | 04.09.2019 | ||
DK | 04.09.2019 | ||
EE | 04.09.2019 | ||
FI | 04.09.2019 | ||
HR | 04.09.2019 | ||
LT | 04.09.2019 | ||
LV | 04.09.2019 | ||
MC | 04.09.2019 | ||
NL | 04.09.2019 | ||
PL | 04.09.2019 | ||
RO | 04.09.2019 | ||
RS | 04.09.2019 | ||
SE | 04.09.2019 | ||
SI | 04.09.2019 | ||
SK | 04.09.2019 | ||
SM | 04.09.2019 | ||
BG | 04.12.2019 | ||
NO | 04.12.2019 | ||
GR | 05.12.2019 | ||
IS | 05.01.2020 | ||
PT | 06.01.2020 | ||
Former [2020/37] | AL | 04.09.2019 | |
AT | 04.09.2019 | ||
CZ | 04.09.2019 | ||
DK | 04.09.2019 | ||
EE | 04.09.2019 | ||
FI | 04.09.2019 | ||
HR | 04.09.2019 | ||
LT | 04.09.2019 | ||
LV | 04.09.2019 | ||
NL | 04.09.2019 | ||
PL | 04.09.2019 | ||
RO | 04.09.2019 | ||
RS | 04.09.2019 | ||
SE | 04.09.2019 | ||
SI | 04.09.2019 | ||
SK | 04.09.2019 | ||
SM | 04.09.2019 | ||
BG | 04.12.2019 | ||
NO | 04.12.2019 | ||
GR | 05.12.2019 | ||
IS | 05.01.2020 | ||
PT | 06.01.2020 | ||
Former [2020/36] | AL | 04.09.2019 | |
AT | 04.09.2019 | ||
CZ | 04.09.2019 | ||
DK | 04.09.2019 | ||
EE | 04.09.2019 | ||
FI | 04.09.2019 | ||
HR | 04.09.2019 | ||
LT | 04.09.2019 | ||
LV | 04.09.2019 | ||
NL | 04.09.2019 | ||
PL | 04.09.2019 | ||
RO | 04.09.2019 | ||
RS | 04.09.2019 | ||
SE | 04.09.2019 | ||
SK | 04.09.2019 | ||
SM | 04.09.2019 | ||
BG | 04.12.2019 | ||
NO | 04.12.2019 | ||
GR | 05.12.2019 | ||
IS | 05.01.2020 | ||
PT | 06.01.2020 | ||
Former [2020/27] | AL | 04.09.2019 | |
AT | 04.09.2019 | ||
CZ | 04.09.2019 | ||
EE | 04.09.2019 | ||
FI | 04.09.2019 | ||
HR | 04.09.2019 | ||
LT | 04.09.2019 | ||
LV | 04.09.2019 | ||
NL | 04.09.2019 | ||
PL | 04.09.2019 | ||
RO | 04.09.2019 | ||
RS | 04.09.2019 | ||
SE | 04.09.2019 | ||
SK | 04.09.2019 | ||
SM | 04.09.2019 | ||
BG | 04.12.2019 | ||
NO | 04.12.2019 | ||
GR | 05.12.2019 | ||
PT | 06.01.2020 | ||
IS | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/25] | AL | 04.09.2019 | |
AT | 04.09.2019 | ||
CZ | 04.09.2019 | ||
EE | 04.09.2019 | ||
FI | 04.09.2019 | ||
HR | 04.09.2019 | ||
LT | 04.09.2019 | ||
LV | 04.09.2019 | ||
NL | 04.09.2019 | ||
PL | 04.09.2019 | ||
RO | 04.09.2019 | ||
RS | 04.09.2019 | ||
SE | 04.09.2019 | ||
SK | 04.09.2019 | ||
BG | 04.12.2019 | ||
NO | 04.12.2019 | ||
GR | 05.12.2019 | ||
PT | 06.01.2020 | ||
IS | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/23] | AL | 04.09.2019 | |
AT | 04.09.2019 | ||
EE | 04.09.2019 | ||
FI | 04.09.2019 | ||
HR | 04.09.2019 | ||
LT | 04.09.2019 | ||
LV | 04.09.2019 | ||
NL | 04.09.2019 | ||
PL | 04.09.2019 | ||
RO | 04.09.2019 | ||
RS | 04.09.2019 | ||
SE | 04.09.2019 | ||
BG | 04.12.2019 | ||
NO | 04.12.2019 | ||
GR | 05.12.2019 | ||
PT | 06.01.2020 | ||
Former [2020/22] | AL | 04.09.2019 | |
EE | 04.09.2019 | ||
FI | 04.09.2019 | ||
HR | 04.09.2019 | ||
LT | 04.09.2019 | ||
LV | 04.09.2019 | ||
NL | 04.09.2019 | ||
RS | 04.09.2019 | ||
SE | 04.09.2019 | ||
BG | 04.12.2019 | ||
NO | 04.12.2019 | ||
GR | 05.12.2019 | ||
PT | 06.01.2020 | ||
Former [2020/20] | AL | 04.09.2019 | |
FI | 04.09.2019 | ||
HR | 04.09.2019 | ||
LT | 04.09.2019 | ||
LV | 04.09.2019 | ||
NL | 04.09.2019 | ||
RS | 04.09.2019 | ||
SE | 04.09.2019 | ||
BG | 04.12.2019 | ||
NO | 04.12.2019 | ||
GR | 05.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/15] | AL | 04.09.2019 | |
FI | 04.09.2019 | ||
HR | 04.09.2019 | ||
LT | 04.09.2019 | ||
LV | 04.09.2019 | ||
RS | 04.09.2019 | ||
SE | 04.09.2019 | ||
BG | 04.12.2019 | ||
NO | 04.12.2019 | ||
GR | 05.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/11] | FI | 04.09.2019 | |
HR | 04.09.2019 | ||
LT | 04.09.2019 | ||
LV | 04.09.2019 | ||
RS | 04.09.2019 | ||
SE | 04.09.2019 | ||
BG | 04.12.2019 | ||
NO | 04.12.2019 | ||
GR | 05.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/10] | FI | 04.09.2019 | |
LT | 04.09.2019 | ||
SE | 04.09.2019 | ||
BG | 04.12.2019 | ||
NO | 04.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/09] | FI | 04.09.2019 | |
LT | 04.09.2019 | ||
NO | 04.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/08] | LT | 04.09.2019 | |
NO | 04.12.2019 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5892588 (SAMWORTH MARK R [US]) [A] 1-11* column 2, lines 10-50 *; | [XYI]US2003010234 (WEICHMANN ARMIN [DE], et al) [X] 11 * paragraphs [0004] , [0005] , [0041] , [0042] * [Y] 9 [I] 1-8,10; | [XAY]JP2004291282 (THINK LABS KK) [X] 11 * abstract * * paragraphs [0010] - [0017] * [A] 1-8,10 [Y] 9; | [XAY]EP1560416 (THINK LABS KK [JP]) [X] 11 * paragraphs [0003] , [0009] , [0013] - [0016] - [0020] * [A] 1-8,10 [Y] 9; | [XYI] - WHITE PAPER, "XM (Cross-Modulated) Screening Technology", WHITE PAPER AGFA, XX, XX, (20030825), pages 1 - 6, XP002287461 [X] 11 * page 1 - page 6 * [Y] 9 [I] 1-8,10 | International search | [Y]JPH1130853 (DAINIPPON PRINTING CO LTD); | [A]JPH11342679 (DAINIPPON PRINTING CO LTD); | [Y]JP2000301686 (DAINIPPON PRINTING CO LTD); | [A]JP2004284295 (THINK LABS KK); | [Y]JP2006086785 (DAINIPPON PRINTING CO LTD); | [XP] - "Zenjido Laser Gravure Seihan System `New FX', Konshu kara Nonyu Kaishi Idea Mansai no Sho Space, Tei Running Cost Gata", CONVERTECH, (20100815), vol. 38, no. 8, pages 12 - 13, XP008171809 | by applicant | JP2004243609 |