EP2598918 - USING A DISTRIBUTED OPTICAL ACOUSTIC SENSOR TO POSITION AN OBJECT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 24.02.2017 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 07.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.02.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 29.03.2017 [2017/13] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Geco Technology B.V. Gevers Deynootweg 61 2586 BJ S'Gravenhage / NL | [2013/23] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WILSON, Colin 1 Collingwood Avenue Tolworth Cambridgeshire KT5 9PT / GB | 02 /
ROBERTSSON, Johan O.A. 10 Burnet Close Grantchester Cambridgeshire CB3 9NJ / GB | 03 /
KRAGH, Julian Edward Justice's Cottage Wethersfield Road Finchingfield Essex CM7 4NX / GB | 04 /
MUYZERT, Everhard 72 Girton Road Girton Cambridgeshire CB3 0LN / GB | 05 /
WELKER, Kenneth E. Kanalen 3 Oslo N-0252 / NO | 06 /
MILLER, Douglas 224 Marlborough 52 Boston, Massachusetts 02116 / US | [2013/24] |
Former [2013/23] | 01 /
WILSON, Colin 1 Collingwood Avenue Tolworth Cambridgeshire KT5 9PT / GB | ||
02 /
ROBERTSSON, Johan O.A. 10 Burnet Close Grantchester Cambridgeshire CB3 9NJ / GB | |||
03 /
KRAGH, Julian Edward Justice's Cottage Wethersfield Road Finchingfield Essex CM7 4NX / GB | |||
04 /
MUYZERT, Everhard 72 Girton Road Girton Cambridgeshire CB3 0LN / GB | |||
05 /
WELKER, Kenneth E. Sundveien 17D N-1397 Nesoya / NO | |||
06 /
MILLER, Douglas 224 Marlborough 52 Boston, Massachusetts 02116 / US | Representative(s) | Oxley, Robin John George, et al Marks & Clerk LLP Alpha Tower Suffolk Street Queensway Birmingham B1 1TT / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2013/23] | Bailey, Richard Alan Marks & Clerk LLP 20 Imperial Square Cheltenham GL50 1QZ / GB | Application number, filing date | 11814961.6 | 29.06.2011 | WO2011US42283 | Priority number, date | US20100843416 | 26.07.2010 Original published format: US 843416 | [2013/23] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2012018460 | Date: | 09.02.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/06] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2598918 | Date: | 05.06.2013 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.02.2012 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2013/23] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 10.05.2012 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.03.2016 | Classification | IPC: | G01V1/38, G01V1/18, G01V1/22, G01H9/00, G01V1/20 | [2016/13] | CPC: |
G01V1/3835 (EP,US);
G01H9/004 (EP,US);
G01V1/201 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2013/23] | G01V1/38, G01V1/18, G01V1/22 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/23] | Title | German: | VERWENDUNG EINES VERTEILTEN OPTISCH-AKUSTISCHEN SENSORS ZUR POSITIONIERUNG EINES OBJEKTS | [2013/23] | English: | USING A DISTRIBUTED OPTICAL ACOUSTIC SENSOR TO POSITION AN OBJECT | [2013/23] | French: | UTILISATION D'UN CAPTEUR ACOUSTIQUE DISTRIBUÉ À FIBRES OPTIQUES POUR POSITIONNER UN OBJET | [2013/23] | Entry into regional phase | 30.01.2013 | National basic fee paid | 30.01.2013 | Search fee paid | 30.01.2013 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.01.2013 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.01.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 30.01.2013 | Examination requested [2013/23] | 29.09.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2017/13] | 08.11.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2017/13] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.06.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.06.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2016 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0277699 (LITTON SYSTEMS INC [US]) [X] 1,4,6,8-12,14 * figure 18 * * page 3, line 56 - page 4, line 4 *; | [XI]US6256090 (CHEN PETER C [US], et al) [X] 1,14 * figures 2,3 * * column 2, lines 36-51 * * column 14, line 39 - column 15, line 21 * * claims 1,3 * [I] 2-15; | [E]EP2635875 (NKT CABLES GROUP AS [DK], et al) [E] 1,2,4-6,8-12,14,15 * the whole document *; | WO2012059108 [ ] (NKT CABLES GROUP AS [DK], et al) [ ] * figures 1-4,6 * * page 2, lines 8-12 * * page 3, lines 6-22 * * page 5, lines 22-24 * * page 7, lines 7-27 * * page 10, lines 4-7 * * page 12, lines 1-18 * * page 13, lines 14-29 * * page 17, line 18 - page 18, line 5 * * page 19, lines 10-14 * * page 22, lines 3-5 * * page 35, line 22 - page 36, line 10 *; | [I]WO2010020781 (QINETIQ LTD [GB], et al) [I] 1,4,6,8-12,14 * figure 2 * * page 2, line 31 - page 3, line 22 * * page 15, lines 15-36 *; | [A]JP2004245779 (NEC CORP) [A] 1-15 * abstract * | International search | [Y]EP1096272 (LITTON SYSTEMS INC [US]); | [Y]US2006215489 (SOLHEIM STIG [NO], et al); | [A]US7558155 (ROENNEKLEIV ERLEND [NO], et al); | [A]US2010103771 (GULBRANSEN ESPEN [NO], et al) |