EP2601785 - ANGLE SENSITIVE PIXEL (ASP)-BASED IMAGE PROCESSING SYSTEM, METHOD, AND APPLICATIONS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 02.10.2020 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 12.10.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.10.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 04.11.2020 [2020/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Cornell University 395 Pine Tree Road Suite 310 Ithaca, NY 14850 / US | [2013/24] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MOLNAR, Alyosha 106 Irving Place Ithaca New York 14850 / US | 02 /
WANG, Albert 201 Maple Avenue Apt. A18A Ithaca New York 14850 / US | 03 /
GILL, Patrick 131 East Green Street 516 Ithaca New York 14850 / US | [2013/24] | Representative(s) | Schmidt, Steffen J., et al Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patentanwälte und Rechtsanwalt PartG mbB Schweigerstrasse 2 81541 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2013/24] | Schmidt, Steffen, et al Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Schweigerstrasse 2 81541 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 11815246.1 | 03.08.2011 | WO2011US46376 | Priority number, date | US201161499372P | 21.06.2011 Original published format: US 201161499372 P | US20100370193P | 03.08.2010 Original published format: US 370193 P | [2013/24] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2012018887 | Date: | 09.02.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/06] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2601785 | Date: | 12.06.2013 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.02.2012 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2013/24] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 12.04.2012 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.11.2017 | Classification | IPC: | H04N5/374, H04N5/225 | [2013/24] | CPC: |
G06T1/0007 (EP,KR,US);
H04N25/76 (EP,KR,US);
H04N13/111 (US);
G06V10/92 (EP,US);
H01L27/14605 (EP,US);
H01L27/14607 (EP,KR,US);
H01L27/14629 (EP,KR,US);
H04N19/14 (EP,US);
H04N19/63 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/24] | Title | German: | WINKELBEWUSSTES PIXELBASIERTES BILDBEARBEITUNGSSYSTEM SOWIE VERFAHREN DAFÜR UND ANWENDUNGEN DAMIT | [2013/24] | English: | ANGLE SENSITIVE PIXEL (ASP)-BASED IMAGE PROCESSING SYSTEM, METHOD, AND APPLICATIONS | [2013/24] | French: | SYSTÈME, PROCÉDÉ ET APPLICATIONS DE TRAITEMENT D'IMAGE À PIXELS SENSIBLES À L'INCLINAISON (ASP) | [2013/24] | Entry into regional phase | 04.02.2013 | National basic fee paid | 04.02.2013 | Search fee paid | 04.02.2013 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.02.2013 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.02.2013 | Examination requested [2013/24] | 16.05.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 15.10.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 22.07.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.11.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 03.06.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2020/45] | 24.06.2020 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2020/45] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 15.10.2018 | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 22.07.2019 | Request for further processing filed | 22.07.2019 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 26.07.2019 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.08.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.08.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.08.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.08.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 28.08.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.08.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 27.08.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO2010044943 (UNIV CORNELL [US], et al) [A] 1-15* page 28, line 9 - page 29, line 5; figures 5a,20a *; | [I] - WANG A ET AL, "Light field image sensors based on the Talbot effect", APPLIED OPTICS, OPTICAL SOCIETY OF AMERICA, WASHINGTON, DC; US, (20091101), vol. 48, no. 31, doi:10.1364/AO.48.005897, ISSN 0003-6935, pages 5897 - 5905, XP001549471 [I] 1-15 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1364/AO.48.005897 | [IP] - ALBERT WANG ET AL, "An angle-sensitive CMOS imager for single-sensor 3D photography", SOLID-STATE CIRCUITS CONFERENCE DIGEST OF TECHNICAL PAPERS (ISSCC), 2011 IEEE INTERNATIONAL, IEEE, (20110220), doi:10.1109/ISSCC.2011.5746375, ISBN 978-1-61284-303-2, pages 412 - 414, XP032013793 [IP] 1-15 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/ISSCC.2011.5746375 | [A] - Hans Otto Carmesin ET AL, "Depth map by convergent 3D-Talbot-interferometry", Institute for Theoretical Physics, University Bremen, D-28334 Bremen, Germany, (19980101), pages 101 - 116, URL: https://www.researchgate.net/profile/Hans_Otto_Carmesin/publication/271271084_Depth_map_by_convergent_3D-_Talbot-interferometry/links/54c551a20cf256ed5a9a9ee2/Depth-map-by-convergent-3D-Talbot-interferometry.pdf, (20171025), XP055418797 [A] 1-15 * the whole document * | International search | [A]JP2004279191 (RICOH KK); | [A]JP2005061981 (RICOH KK); | [A]WO2010044943 (UNIV CORNELL [US], et al); | [A] - ALBERT WANG ET AL., "Light field image sensors based on the Talbot effect", APPLIED OPTICS, (20091101), vol. 48, no. 31, pages 5897 - 5905, XP001549471 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1364/AO.48.005897 | by applicant | WO2010044943 | - WANG A et al., "Light field image sensors based on the Talbot effect", Applied Optics, (20091101), vol. 48, no. 31, doi:doi:10.1364/AO.48.005897, XP001549471 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1364/AO.48.005897 |