EP2651267 - PICTURE FRAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.07.2017 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 21.11.2018 [2018/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hartlieb, Achim Lindenweg 3 71717 Beilstein / DE | [2013/50] |
Former [2013/43] | For all designated states Hartlieb, Achim Grießbergstraße 2 71546 Aspach / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2013/43] | Representative(s) | Witte, Weller & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Postfach 10 54 62 70047 Stuttgart / DE | [2016/36] |
Former [2013/43] | Witte, Weller & Partner Königstrasse 5 70173 Stuttgart / DE | Application number, filing date | 11815676.9 | 02.12.2011 | [2016/36] | WO2011DE02073 | Priority number, date | DE20101054418 | 14.12.2010 Original published format: DE102010054418 | [2013/43] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2012079561 | Date: | 21.06.2012 | Language: | DE | [2012/25] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2651267 | Date: | 23.10.2013 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.06.2012 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2013/43] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2651267 | Date: | 07.09.2016 | Language: | DE | [2016/36] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 21.06.2012 | Classification | IPC: | A47G1/06, A47G1/10, G09F15/00 | [2013/43] | CPC: |
A47G1/0611 (EP,US);
A47G1/10 (EP,US);
G09F15/0012 (EP);
G09F15/0018 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/43] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | BILDERRAHMEN | [2013/43] | English: | PICTURE FRAME | [2013/43] | French: | CADRE | [2013/43] | Entry into regional phase | 12.07.2013 | National basic fee paid | 12.07.2013 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.07.2013 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.07.2013 | Examination requested [2013/43] | 03.01.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 05.10.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.11.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.03.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.07.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 29.07.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 29.07.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 05.10.2015 | Opposition(s) | 08.06.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/33] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.12.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.12.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 16.12.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 02.12.2011 | AL | 07.09.2016 | CY | 07.09.2016 | CZ | 07.09.2016 | DK | 07.09.2016 | EE | 07.09.2016 | ES | 07.09.2016 | FI | 07.09.2016 | HR | 07.09.2016 | LT | 07.09.2016 | LV | 07.09.2016 | MC | 07.09.2016 | MK | 07.09.2016 | MT | 07.09.2016 | NL | 07.09.2016 | RO | 07.09.2016 | RS | 07.09.2016 | SE | 07.09.2016 | SI | 07.09.2016 | SK | 07.09.2016 | SM | 07.09.2016 | TR | 07.09.2016 | IE | 02.12.2016 | LU | 02.12.2016 | BG | 07.12.2016 | NO | 07.12.2016 | GR | 08.12.2016 | BE | 31.12.2016 | IS | 07.01.2017 | PT | 09.01.2017 | [2018/47] |
Former [2018/45] | HU | 02.12.2011 | |
CY | 07.09.2016 | ||
CZ | 07.09.2016 | ||
DK | 07.09.2016 | ||
EE | 07.09.2016 | ||
ES | 07.09.2016 | ||
FI | 07.09.2016 | ||
HR | 07.09.2016 | ||
LT | 07.09.2016 | ||
LV | 07.09.2016 | ||
MC | 07.09.2016 | ||
MK | 07.09.2016 | ||
MT | 07.09.2016 | ||
NL | 07.09.2016 | ||
RO | 07.09.2016 | ||
RS | 07.09.2016 | ||
SE | 07.09.2016 | ||
SI | 07.09.2016 | ||
SK | 07.09.2016 | ||
SM | 07.09.2016 | ||
TR | 07.09.2016 | ||
IE | 02.12.2016 | ||
LU | 02.12.2016 | ||
BG | 07.12.2016 | ||
NO | 07.12.2016 | ||
GR | 08.12.2016 | ||
BE | 31.12.2016 | ||
IS | 07.01.2017 | ||
PT | 09.01.2017 | ||
Former [2018/43] | HU | 02.12.2011 | |
CY | 07.09.2016 | ||
CZ | 07.09.2016 | ||
DK | 07.09.2016 | ||
EE | 07.09.2016 | ||
ES | 07.09.2016 | ||
FI | 07.09.2016 | ||
HR | 07.09.2016 | ||
LT | 07.09.2016 | ||
LV | 07.09.2016 | ||
MC | 07.09.2016 | ||
MK | 07.09.2016 | ||
MT | 07.09.2016 | ||
NL | 07.09.2016 | ||
RO | 07.09.2016 | ||
RS | 07.09.2016 | ||
SE | 07.09.2016 | ||
SI | 07.09.2016 | ||
SK | 07.09.2016 | ||
SM | 07.09.2016 | ||
IE | 02.12.2016 | ||
LU | 02.12.2016 | ||
BG | 07.12.2016 | ||
NO | 07.12.2016 | ||
GR | 08.12.2016 | ||
BE | 31.12.2016 | ||
IS | 07.01.2017 | ||
PT | 09.01.2017 | ||
Former [2018/28] | HU | 02.12.2011 | |
CY | 07.09.2016 | ||
CZ | 07.09.2016 | ||
DK | 07.09.2016 | ||
EE | 07.09.2016 | ||
ES | 07.09.2016 | ||
FI | 07.09.2016 | ||
HR | 07.09.2016 | ||
LT | 07.09.2016 | ||
LV | 07.09.2016 | ||
MC | 07.09.2016 | ||
MK | 07.09.2016 | ||
NL | 07.09.2016 | ||
RO | 07.09.2016 | ||
RS | 07.09.2016 | ||
SE | 07.09.2016 | ||
SI | 07.09.2016 | ||
SK | 07.09.2016 | ||
SM | 07.09.2016 | ||
IE | 02.12.2016 | ||
LU | 02.12.2016 | ||
BG | 07.12.2016 | ||
NO | 07.12.2016 | ||
GR | 08.12.2016 | ||
BE | 31.12.2016 | ||
IS | 07.01.2017 | ||
PT | 09.01.2017 | ||
Former [2017/49] | CZ | 07.09.2016 | |
DK | 07.09.2016 | ||
EE | 07.09.2016 | ||
ES | 07.09.2016 | ||
FI | 07.09.2016 | ||
HR | 07.09.2016 | ||
LT | 07.09.2016 | ||
LV | 07.09.2016 | ||
MC | 07.09.2016 | ||
NL | 07.09.2016 | ||
RO | 07.09.2016 | ||
RS | 07.09.2016 | ||
SE | 07.09.2016 | ||
SI | 07.09.2016 | ||
SK | 07.09.2016 | ||
SM | 07.09.2016 | ||
IE | 02.12.2016 | ||
LU | 02.12.2016 | ||
BG | 07.12.2016 | ||
NO | 07.12.2016 | ||
GR | 08.12.2016 | ||
BE | 31.12.2016 | ||
IS | 07.01.2017 | ||
PT | 09.01.2017 | ||
Former [2017/45] | CZ | 07.09.2016 | |
DK | 07.09.2016 | ||
EE | 07.09.2016 | ||
ES | 07.09.2016 | ||
FI | 07.09.2016 | ||
HR | 07.09.2016 | ||
LT | 07.09.2016 | ||
LV | 07.09.2016 | ||
MC | 07.09.2016 | ||
NL | 07.09.2016 | ||
RO | 07.09.2016 | ||
RS | 07.09.2016 | ||
SE | 07.09.2016 | ||
SI | 07.09.2016 | ||
SK | 07.09.2016 | ||
SM | 07.09.2016 | ||
BG | 07.12.2016 | ||
NO | 07.12.2016 | ||
GR | 08.12.2016 | ||
BE | 31.12.2016 | ||
IS | 07.01.2017 | ||
PT | 09.01.2017 | ||
Former [2017/37] | CZ | 07.09.2016 | |
DK | 07.09.2016 | ||
EE | 07.09.2016 | ||
ES | 07.09.2016 | ||
FI | 07.09.2016 | ||
HR | 07.09.2016 | ||
LT | 07.09.2016 | ||
LV | 07.09.2016 | ||
NL | 07.09.2016 | ||
RO | 07.09.2016 | ||
RS | 07.09.2016 | ||
SE | 07.09.2016 | ||
SI | 07.09.2016 | ||
SK | 07.09.2016 | ||
SM | 07.09.2016 | ||
BG | 07.12.2016 | ||
NO | 07.12.2016 | ||
GR | 08.12.2016 | ||
BE | 31.12.2016 | ||
IS | 07.01.2017 | ||
PT | 09.01.2017 | ||
Former [2017/34] | CZ | 07.09.2016 | |
DK | 07.09.2016 | ||
EE | 07.09.2016 | ||
ES | 07.09.2016 | ||
FI | 07.09.2016 | ||
HR | 07.09.2016 | ||
LT | 07.09.2016 | ||
LV | 07.09.2016 | ||
NL | 07.09.2016 | ||
RO | 07.09.2016 | ||
RS | 07.09.2016 | ||
SE | 07.09.2016 | ||
SK | 07.09.2016 | ||
SM | 07.09.2016 | ||
BG | 07.12.2016 | ||
NO | 07.12.2016 | ||
GR | 08.12.2016 | ||
BE | 31.12.2016 | ||
IS | 07.01.2017 | ||
PT | 09.01.2017 | ||
Former [2017/32] | CZ | 07.09.2016 | |
EE | 07.09.2016 | ||
ES | 07.09.2016 | ||
FI | 07.09.2016 | ||
HR | 07.09.2016 | ||
LT | 07.09.2016 | ||
LV | 07.09.2016 | ||
NL | 07.09.2016 | ||
RO | 07.09.2016 | ||
RS | 07.09.2016 | ||
SE | 07.09.2016 | ||
SK | 07.09.2016 | ||
SM | 07.09.2016 | ||
BG | 07.12.2016 | ||
NO | 07.12.2016 | ||
GR | 08.12.2016 | ||
BE | 31.12.2016 | ||
IS | 07.01.2017 | ||
PT | 09.01.2017 | ||
Former [2017/13] | ES | 07.09.2016 | |
FI | 07.09.2016 | ||
HR | 07.09.2016 | ||
LT | 07.09.2016 | ||
LV | 07.09.2016 | ||
NL | 07.09.2016 | ||
RS | 07.09.2016 | ||
SE | 07.09.2016 | ||
NO | 07.12.2016 | ||
GR | 08.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/11] | ES | 07.09.2016 | |
FI | 07.09.2016 | ||
HR | 07.09.2016 | ||
LT | 07.09.2016 | ||
RS | 07.09.2016 | ||
SE | 07.09.2016 | ||
NO | 07.12.2016 | ||
GR | 08.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/10] | FI | 07.09.2016 | |
HR | 07.09.2016 | ||
LT | 07.09.2016 | ||
RS | 07.09.2016 | ||
SE | 07.09.2016 | ||
NO | 07.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/09] | FI | 07.09.2016 | |
LT | 07.09.2016 | ||
NO | 07.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/07] | LT | 07.09.2016 | Cited in | International search | [XYI]DE20005194U (GEIBERGER CHRISTOPH [DE], et al) [X] 1,2,4,5,7-15,17,24-27 * abstract * * page 4, paragraph 3 - page 10, paragraph 3 * [Y] 4,5 [I] 32; | [XY]WO9714131 (M & D MANUFACTURE & DESIGN S R [IT], et al) [X] 1,2,6-14,32 * page 6, lines 1-20 - page 8, lines 18-24; figures 1-5 * * page 10, lines 16-18 * [Y] 4,5; | [XY]US2002066218 (DARBY RICHARD J [US]) [X] 1,2,7-10,12-14,32 * abstract * * paragraphs [0028] , [0030] * [Y] 4,5; | [X]US6962017 (POUNDS STEPHEN T [US]) [X] 1-3,9,10,12-14 * abstract * * column 2, lines 40-67 - column 3, lines 1-26 * * column 5, line 67 - column 6, lines 1-18 *; | [X]DE202008007220U (IFFLAND SIEBDRUCK GMBH & CO KG [DE]) [X] 1,2,32 * paragraphs [0011] , [0022] , [0042]; figures 1,4,5 *; | [X]US6176029 (MAIER-HUNKE HORST-WERNER [DE]) [X] 1,2,11-13,32 * abstract * | by applicant | DE19540889 |