EP2605512 - METHOD FOR INPUTTING DATA ON IMAGE DISPLAY DEVICE AND IMAGE DISPLAY DEVICE THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.02.2019 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 16.03.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 12.11.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IS | published on 12.08.2020 [2020/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LG Electronics Inc. 20, Yeouido-dong Yeongdeungpo-gu Seoul 150-721 / KR | [2013/25] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
RHEE, Joohyun Intellectual Property Center LG Electronics Inc. 19-1 Cheongho-ri Jinwi-myeon Pyeongtaek-si Gyeonggi-do 451-731 / KR | 02 /
HWANG, Sunjung Intellectual Property Center LG Electronics Inc. 19-1 Cheongho-ri Jinwi-myeon Pyeongtaek-si Gyeonggi-do 451-731 / KR | [2013/25] | Representative(s) | Gunzelmann, Rainer, et al Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patentanwälte und Rechtsanwalt PartG mbB Schweigerstraße 2 81541 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2018/16] | Gunzelmann, Rainer, et al Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patentanwälte PartG mbB Schweigerstraße 2 81541 München / DE | ||
Former [2013/25] | Gunzelmann, Rainer, et al Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Schweigerstraße 2 81541 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 11816561.2 | 03.08.2011 | [2018/16] | WO2011KR05695 | Priority number, date | KR20100078127 | 13.08.2010 Original published format: KR 20100078127 | [2013/25] | Filing language | KO | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2012020945 | Date: | 16.02.2012 | Language: | KO | [2012/07] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2605512 | Date: | 19.06.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/25] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2605512 | Date: | 18.04.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/16] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 31.05.2012 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.12.2013 | Classification | IPC: | H04N5/44, H04N5/445, H04N21/4788 | [2014/02] | CPC: |
H04N21/4312 (EP,US);
H04N21/42204 (KR);
G06F3/048 (KR,US);
H04N21/42209 (KR);
H04N21/4316 (EP,KR,US);
H04N21/47 (EP,KR,US);
H04N21/4788 (EP,KR,US);
H04N21/8126 (EP,KR,US);
H04N21/8133 (EP,KR,US);
|
Former IPC [2013/25] | H04N5/44, H04N5/445 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/25] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR DATENEINGABE IN EINE BILDANZEIGEVORRICHTUNG UND BILDANZEIGEVORRICHTUNG | [2013/25] | English: | METHOD FOR INPUTTING DATA ON IMAGE DISPLAY DEVICE AND IMAGE DISPLAY DEVICE THEREOF | [2013/25] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE SAISIE DE DONNÉES SUR UN DISPOSITIF D'AFFICHAGE D'IMAGE, ET DISPOSITIF D'AFFICHAGE D'IMAGE ASSOCIÉ | [2013/25] | Entry into regional phase | 11.03.2013 | Translation filed | 11.03.2013 | National basic fee paid | 11.03.2013 | Search fee paid | 11.03.2013 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.03.2013 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.03.2013 | Examination requested [2013/25] | 09.07.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 21.06.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.09.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.09.2017 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 19.09.2017 | 19.09.2017 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 13.11.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.03.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 07.03.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 07.03.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 21.06.2016 | Opposition(s) | 21.01.2019 | No opposition filed within time limit [2019/13] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.08.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.08.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.08.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 22.08.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 22.08.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 03.08.2011 | AL | 18.04.2018 | AT | 18.04.2018 | CY | 18.04.2018 | CZ | 18.04.2018 | DK | 18.04.2018 | EE | 18.04.2018 | ES | 18.04.2018 | FI | 18.04.2018 | HR | 18.04.2018 | IT | 18.04.2018 | LT | 18.04.2018 | LV | 18.04.2018 | MC | 18.04.2018 | MK | 18.04.2018 | NL | 18.04.2018 | PL | 18.04.2018 | RO | 18.04.2018 | RS | 18.04.2018 | SE | 18.04.2018 | SI | 18.04.2018 | SK | 18.04.2018 | SM | 18.04.2018 | TR | 18.04.2018 | BG | 18.07.2018 | NO | 18.07.2018 | GR | 19.07.2018 | IE | 03.08.2018 | LU | 03.08.2018 | MT | 03.08.2018 | IS | 18.08.2018 | PT | 20.08.2018 | BE | 31.08.2018 | CH | 31.08.2018 | LI | 31.08.2018 | [2020/32] |
Former [2020/31] | HU | 03.08.2011 | |
AL | 18.04.2018 | ||
AT | 18.04.2018 | ||
CY | 18.04.2018 | ||
CZ | 18.04.2018 | ||
DK | 18.04.2018 | ||
EE | 18.04.2018 | ||
ES | 18.04.2018 | ||
FI | 18.04.2018 | ||
HR | 18.04.2018 | ||
IT | 18.04.2018 | ||
LT | 18.04.2018 | ||
LV | 18.04.2018 | ||
MC | 18.04.2018 | ||
MK | 18.04.2018 | ||
NL | 18.04.2018 | ||
PL | 18.04.2018 | ||
RO | 18.04.2018 | ||
RS | 18.04.2018 | ||
SE | 18.04.2018 | ||
SI | 18.04.2018 | ||
SK | 18.04.2018 | ||
SM | 18.04.2018 | ||
TR | 18.04.2018 | ||
BG | 18.07.2018 | ||
NO | 18.07.2018 | ||
GR | 19.07.2018 | ||
IE | 03.08.2018 | ||
LU | 03.08.2018 | ||
MT | 03.08.2018 | ||
PT | 20.08.2018 | ||
BE | 31.08.2018 | ||
CH | 31.08.2018 | ||
LI | 31.08.2018 | ||
Former [2020/28] | HU | 03.08.2011 | |
AL | 18.04.2018 | ||
AT | 18.04.2018 | ||
CZ | 18.04.2018 | ||
DK | 18.04.2018 | ||
EE | 18.04.2018 | ||
ES | 18.04.2018 | ||
FI | 18.04.2018 | ||
HR | 18.04.2018 | ||
IT | 18.04.2018 | ||
LT | 18.04.2018 | ||
LV | 18.04.2018 | ||
MC | 18.04.2018 | ||
NL | 18.04.2018 | ||
PL | 18.04.2018 | ||
RO | 18.04.2018 | ||
RS | 18.04.2018 | ||
SE | 18.04.2018 | ||
SI | 18.04.2018 | ||
SK | 18.04.2018 | ||
SM | 18.04.2018 | ||
TR | 18.04.2018 | ||
BG | 18.07.2018 | ||
NO | 18.07.2018 | ||
GR | 19.07.2018 | ||
IE | 03.08.2018 | ||
LU | 03.08.2018 | ||
MT | 03.08.2018 | ||
PT | 20.08.2018 | ||
BE | 31.08.2018 | ||
CH | 31.08.2018 | ||
LI | 31.08.2018 | ||
Former [2020/16] | AL | 18.04.2018 | |
AT | 18.04.2018 | ||
CZ | 18.04.2018 | ||
DK | 18.04.2018 | ||
EE | 18.04.2018 | ||
ES | 18.04.2018 | ||
FI | 18.04.2018 | ||
HR | 18.04.2018 | ||
IT | 18.04.2018 | ||
LT | 18.04.2018 | ||
LV | 18.04.2018 | ||
MC | 18.04.2018 | ||
NL | 18.04.2018 | ||
PL | 18.04.2018 | ||
RO | 18.04.2018 | ||
RS | 18.04.2018 | ||
SE | 18.04.2018 | ||
SI | 18.04.2018 | ||
SK | 18.04.2018 | ||
SM | 18.04.2018 | ||
TR | 18.04.2018 | ||
BG | 18.07.2018 | ||
NO | 18.07.2018 | ||
GR | 19.07.2018 | ||
IE | 03.08.2018 | ||
LU | 03.08.2018 | ||
MT | 03.08.2018 | ||
PT | 20.08.2018 | ||
BE | 31.08.2018 | ||
CH | 31.08.2018 | ||
LI | 31.08.2018 | ||
Former [2020/08] | AL | 18.04.2018 | |
AT | 18.04.2018 | ||
CZ | 18.04.2018 | ||
DK | 18.04.2018 | ||
EE | 18.04.2018 | ||
ES | 18.04.2018 | ||
FI | 18.04.2018 | ||
HR | 18.04.2018 | ||
IT | 18.04.2018 | ||
LT | 18.04.2018 | ||
LV | 18.04.2018 | ||
MC | 18.04.2018 | ||
NL | 18.04.2018 | ||
PL | 18.04.2018 | ||
RO | 18.04.2018 | ||
RS | 18.04.2018 | ||
SE | 18.04.2018 | ||
SI | 18.04.2018 | ||
SK | 18.04.2018 | ||
SM | 18.04.2018 | ||
BG | 18.07.2018 | ||
NO | 18.07.2018 | ||
GR | 19.07.2018 | ||
IE | 03.08.2018 | ||
LU | 03.08.2018 | ||
MT | 03.08.2018 | ||
PT | 20.08.2018 | ||
BE | 31.08.2018 | ||
CH | 31.08.2018 | ||
LI | 31.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/38] | AL | 18.04.2018 | |
AT | 18.04.2018 | ||
CZ | 18.04.2018 | ||
DK | 18.04.2018 | ||
EE | 18.04.2018 | ||
ES | 18.04.2018 | ||
FI | 18.04.2018 | ||
HR | 18.04.2018 | ||
IT | 18.04.2018 | ||
LT | 18.04.2018 | ||
LV | 18.04.2018 | ||
MC | 18.04.2018 | ||
NL | 18.04.2018 | ||
PL | 18.04.2018 | ||
RO | 18.04.2018 | ||
RS | 18.04.2018 | ||
SE | 18.04.2018 | ||
SI | 18.04.2018 | ||
SK | 18.04.2018 | ||
SM | 18.04.2018 | ||
BG | 18.07.2018 | ||
NO | 18.07.2018 | ||
GR | 19.07.2018 | ||
IE | 03.08.2018 | ||
LU | 03.08.2018 | ||
PT | 20.08.2018 | ||
BE | 31.08.2018 | ||
CH | 31.08.2018 | ||
LI | 31.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/33] | AL | 18.04.2018 | |
AT | 18.04.2018 | ||
CZ | 18.04.2018 | ||
DK | 18.04.2018 | ||
EE | 18.04.2018 | ||
ES | 18.04.2018 | ||
FI | 18.04.2018 | ||
HR | 18.04.2018 | ||
IT | 18.04.2018 | ||
LT | 18.04.2018 | ||
LV | 18.04.2018 | ||
MC | 18.04.2018 | ||
NL | 18.04.2018 | ||
PL | 18.04.2018 | ||
RO | 18.04.2018 | ||
RS | 18.04.2018 | ||
SE | 18.04.2018 | ||
SI | 18.04.2018 | ||
SK | 18.04.2018 | ||
SM | 18.04.2018 | ||
BG | 18.07.2018 | ||
NO | 18.07.2018 | ||
GR | 19.07.2018 | ||
IE | 03.08.2018 | ||
LU | 03.08.2018 | ||
PT | 20.08.2018 | ||
CH | 31.08.2018 | ||
LI | 31.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/26] | AL | 18.04.2018 | |
AT | 18.04.2018 | ||
CZ | 18.04.2018 | ||
DK | 18.04.2018 | ||
EE | 18.04.2018 | ||
ES | 18.04.2018 | ||
FI | 18.04.2018 | ||
HR | 18.04.2018 | ||
IT | 18.04.2018 | ||
LT | 18.04.2018 | ||
LV | 18.04.2018 | ||
MC | 18.04.2018 | ||
NL | 18.04.2018 | ||
PL | 18.04.2018 | ||
RO | 18.04.2018 | ||
RS | 18.04.2018 | ||
SE | 18.04.2018 | ||
SI | 18.04.2018 | ||
SK | 18.04.2018 | ||
SM | 18.04.2018 | ||
BG | 18.07.2018 | ||
NO | 18.07.2018 | ||
GR | 19.07.2018 | ||
LU | 03.08.2018 | ||
PT | 20.08.2018 | ||
CH | 31.08.2018 | ||
LI | 31.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/21] | AL | 18.04.2018 | |
AT | 18.04.2018 | ||
CZ | 18.04.2018 | ||
DK | 18.04.2018 | ||
EE | 18.04.2018 | ||
ES | 18.04.2018 | ||
FI | 18.04.2018 | ||
HR | 18.04.2018 | ||
IT | 18.04.2018 | ||
LT | 18.04.2018 | ||
LV | 18.04.2018 | ||
MC | 18.04.2018 | ||
NL | 18.04.2018 | ||
PL | 18.04.2018 | ||
RO | 18.04.2018 | ||
RS | 18.04.2018 | ||
SE | 18.04.2018 | ||
SK | 18.04.2018 | ||
SM | 18.04.2018 | ||
BG | 18.07.2018 | ||
NO | 18.07.2018 | ||
GR | 19.07.2018 | ||
LU | 03.08.2018 | ||
PT | 20.08.2018 | ||
CH | 31.08.2018 | ||
LI | 31.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/15] | AL | 18.04.2018 | |
AT | 18.04.2018 | ||
CZ | 18.04.2018 | ||
DK | 18.04.2018 | ||
EE | 18.04.2018 | ||
ES | 18.04.2018 | ||
FI | 18.04.2018 | ||
HR | 18.04.2018 | ||
IT | 18.04.2018 | ||
LT | 18.04.2018 | ||
LV | 18.04.2018 | ||
MC | 18.04.2018 | ||
NL | 18.04.2018 | ||
PL | 18.04.2018 | ||
RO | 18.04.2018 | ||
RS | 18.04.2018 | ||
SE | 18.04.2018 | ||
SK | 18.04.2018 | ||
SM | 18.04.2018 | ||
BG | 18.07.2018 | ||
NO | 18.07.2018 | ||
GR | 19.07.2018 | ||
PT | 20.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/12] | AL | 18.04.2018 | |
AT | 18.04.2018 | ||
CZ | 18.04.2018 | ||
DK | 18.04.2018 | ||
EE | 18.04.2018 | ||
ES | 18.04.2018 | ||
FI | 18.04.2018 | ||
HR | 18.04.2018 | ||
IT | 18.04.2018 | ||
LT | 18.04.2018 | ||
LV | 18.04.2018 | ||
NL | 18.04.2018 | ||
PL | 18.04.2018 | ||
RO | 18.04.2018 | ||
RS | 18.04.2018 | ||
SE | 18.04.2018 | ||
SK | 18.04.2018 | ||
SM | 18.04.2018 | ||
BG | 18.07.2018 | ||
NO | 18.07.2018 | ||
GR | 19.07.2018 | ||
PT | 20.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/10] | AL | 18.04.2018 | |
AT | 18.04.2018 | ||
CZ | 18.04.2018 | ||
DK | 18.04.2018 | ||
EE | 18.04.2018 | ||
ES | 18.04.2018 | ||
FI | 18.04.2018 | ||
HR | 18.04.2018 | ||
LT | 18.04.2018 | ||
LV | 18.04.2018 | ||
NL | 18.04.2018 | ||
PL | 18.04.2018 | ||
RO | 18.04.2018 | ||
RS | 18.04.2018 | ||
SE | 18.04.2018 | ||
SK | 18.04.2018 | ||
BG | 18.07.2018 | ||
NO | 18.07.2018 | ||
GR | 19.07.2018 | ||
PT | 20.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/09] | AL | 18.04.2018 | |
DK | 18.04.2018 | ||
EE | 18.04.2018 | ||
ES | 18.04.2018 | ||
FI | 18.04.2018 | ||
HR | 18.04.2018 | ||
LT | 18.04.2018 | ||
LV | 18.04.2018 | ||
NL | 18.04.2018 | ||
PL | 18.04.2018 | ||
RS | 18.04.2018 | ||
SE | 18.04.2018 | ||
BG | 18.07.2018 | ||
NO | 18.07.2018 | ||
GR | 19.07.2018 | ||
PT | 20.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/08] | AL | 18.04.2018 | |
DK | 18.04.2018 | ||
ES | 18.04.2018 | ||
FI | 18.04.2018 | ||
HR | 18.04.2018 | ||
LT | 18.04.2018 | ||
LV | 18.04.2018 | ||
NL | 18.04.2018 | ||
PL | 18.04.2018 | ||
RS | 18.04.2018 | ||
SE | 18.04.2018 | ||
BG | 18.07.2018 | ||
NO | 18.07.2018 | ||
GR | 19.07.2018 | ||
PT | 20.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/03] | AL | 18.04.2018 | |
ES | 18.04.2018 | ||
FI | 18.04.2018 | ||
HR | 18.04.2018 | ||
LT | 18.04.2018 | ||
LV | 18.04.2018 | ||
NL | 18.04.2018 | ||
PL | 18.04.2018 | ||
RS | 18.04.2018 | ||
SE | 18.04.2018 | ||
BG | 18.07.2018 | ||
NO | 18.07.2018 | ||
GR | 19.07.2018 | ||
PT | 20.08.2018 | ||
Former [2018/52] | AL | 18.04.2018 | |
ES | 18.04.2018 | ||
FI | 18.04.2018 | ||
HR | 18.04.2018 | ||
LT | 18.04.2018 | ||
LV | 18.04.2018 | ||
NL | 18.04.2018 | ||
PL | 18.04.2018 | ||
RS | 18.04.2018 | ||
SE | 18.04.2018 | ||
BG | 18.07.2018 | ||
NO | 18.07.2018 | ||
GR | 19.07.2018 | ||
Former [2018/51] | AL | 18.04.2018 | |
ES | 18.04.2018 | ||
FI | 18.04.2018 | ||
HR | 18.04.2018 | ||
LT | 18.04.2018 | ||
LV | 18.04.2018 | ||
NL | 18.04.2018 | ||
PL | 18.04.2018 | ||
RS | 18.04.2018 | ||
SE | 18.04.2018 | ||
BG | 18.07.2018 | ||
NO | 18.07.2018 | ||
Former [2018/50] | AL | 18.04.2018 | |
ES | 18.04.2018 | ||
FI | 18.04.2018 | ||
HR | 18.04.2018 | ||
LT | 18.04.2018 | ||
NL | 18.04.2018 | ||
PL | 18.04.2018 | ||
SE | 18.04.2018 | ||
BG | 18.07.2018 | ||
NO | 18.07.2018 | ||
Former [2018/49] | AL | 18.04.2018 | |
ES | 18.04.2018 | ||
FI | 18.04.2018 | ||
LT | 18.04.2018 | ||
NL | 18.04.2018 | ||
PL | 18.04.2018 | ||
SE | 18.04.2018 | ||
BG | 18.07.2018 | ||
NO | 18.07.2018 | ||
Former [2018/47] | AL | 18.04.2018 | |
ES | 18.04.2018 | ||
FI | 18.04.2018 | ||
LT | 18.04.2018 | ||
NL | 18.04.2018 | ||
NO | 18.07.2018 | ||
Former [2018/46] | AL | 18.04.2018 | |
LT | 18.04.2018 | ||
NL | 18.04.2018 | ||
NO | 18.07.2018 | ||
Former [2018/43] | NL | 18.04.2018 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2009265737 (ISSA ALFREDO C [US], et al) [X] 1-15 * abstract * * paragraphs [0030] - [0044] - [0 51] - [0052] * * figures 1-21 *; | [X]US2009293079 (MCKEE MARTIN W [US], et al) [X] 1-15 * abstract * * paragraphs [0019] - [0021] - [0 51] - [0061] * * figures 1-11 *; | [I] - HEWLETT-PACKARD COMPANY, "HP Media Center PC User's Guide", USER GUIDE HEWLETT PACKARD, XX, XX, (20030101), pages 1 - 232, XP002378322 [I] 1-15 * pages 67-122 * | International search | [A]JPH1175113 (TOSHIBA CORP); | [Y]KR20070035328 (KT CORPORATION); | [A]KR20090046159 (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD [KR]); | [Y]KR20100071620 (NHN CORP [KR]) | Examination | US2003223093 | EP1591876 | EP1717686 | US2007061299 |