EP2607966 - CARTRIDGE AND IMAGE-FORMING APPARATUS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.11.2020 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 06.12.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 09.07.2019 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 14.06.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 13.02.2019 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 09.02.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 10.08.2022 [2022/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Canon Kabushiki Kaisha 30-2, Shimomaruko 3-chome Ohta-ku Tokyo 146-8501 / JP | [2020/02] |
Former [2013/26] | For all designated states Canon Kabushiki Kaisha 30-2 Shimomaruko 3-chome Ohta-ku Tokyo 146-8501 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TAKARADA, Hiroshi c/o Canon Kabushiki Kaisha 30-2 Shimomaruko 3-chome Ohta-ku Tokyo 146-8501 / JP | 02 /
HIRUKAWA, Kuniaki c/o Canon Kabushiki Kaisha 30-2 Shimomaruko 3-chome Ohta-ku Tokyo 146-8501 / JP | 03 /
SUZUKI, Akira c/o Canon Kabushiki Kaisha 30-2 Shimomaruko 3-chome Ohta-ku Tokyo 146-8501 / JP | 04 /
HOSHI, Nobuharu c/o Canon Kabushiki Kaisha 30-2 Shimomaruko 3-chome Ohta-ku Tokyo 146-8501 / JP | 05 /
FUKUI, Yuichi c/o Canon Kabushiki Kaisha 30-2 Shimomaruko 3-chome Ohta-ku Tokyo 146-8501 / JP | [2013/26] | Representative(s) | TBK Bavariaring 4-6 80336 München / DE | [2013/26] | Application number, filing date | 11818273.2 | 19.08.2011 | [2020/02] | WO2011JP69237 | Priority number, date | JP20110160155 | 21.07.2011 Original published format: JP 2011160155 | JP20100185147 | 20.08.2010 Original published format: JP 2010185147 | [2013/26] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2012023633 | Date: | 23.02.2012 | Language: | JA | [2012/08] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2607966 | Date: | 26.06.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/26] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2607966 | Date: | 08.01.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/02] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 23.02.2012 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.09.2015 | Classification | IPC: | G03G21/18, G03G21/16 | [2015/44] | CPC: |
G03G21/1867 (EP,CN,US);
G03G21/18 (KR);
B29C45/0001 (US);
G03G21/1619 (US);
G03G21/1652 (US);
B29K2059/00 (US);
B29K2105/16 (US);
B29K2507/04 (US);
B29K2995/0005 (US);
|
Former IPC [2013/26] | G03G21/18 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/26] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | PATRONE UND BILDERZEUGUNGSVORRICHTUNG | [2013/26] | English: | CARTRIDGE AND IMAGE-FORMING APPARATUS | [2013/26] | French: | CARTOUCHE ET APPAREIL DE FORMATION D'IMAGES | [2013/26] | Entry into regional phase | 19.03.2013 | Translation filed | 20.03.2013 | National basic fee paid | 20.03.2013 | Search fee paid | 20.03.2013 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.03.2013 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.03.2013 | Examination requested [2013/26] | 12.04.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 09.02.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 20.08.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.02.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.06.2019 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 10.07.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.11.2019 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | 20.11.2019 | Fee for grant paid | 20.11.2019 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP19179879.2 / EP3575883 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 09.02.2018 | Opposition(s) | 09.10.2020 | No opposition filed within time limit [2020/51] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.09.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 01.09.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.08.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.08.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.08.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 31.08.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 02.09.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 19.08.2011 | AL | 08.01.2020 | AT | 08.01.2020 | CY | 08.01.2020 | CZ | 08.01.2020 | DK | 08.01.2020 | EE | 08.01.2020 | ES | 08.01.2020 | FI | 08.01.2020 | HR | 08.01.2020 | IT | 08.01.2020 | LT | 08.01.2020 | LV | 08.01.2020 | MC | 08.01.2020 | MK | 08.01.2020 | MT | 08.01.2020 | NL | 08.01.2020 | PL | 08.01.2020 | RO | 08.01.2020 | RS | 08.01.2020 | SE | 08.01.2020 | SI | 08.01.2020 | SK | 08.01.2020 | SM | 08.01.2020 | TR | 08.01.2020 | BG | 08.04.2020 | NO | 08.04.2020 | GR | 09.04.2020 | IS | 08.05.2020 | PT | 31.05.2020 | IE | 19.08.2020 | LU | 19.08.2020 | BE | 31.08.2020 | CH | 31.08.2020 | LI | 31.08.2020 | [2022/31] |
Former [2022/30] | HU | 19.08.2011 | |
AL | 08.01.2020 | ||
AT | 08.01.2020 | ||
CY | 08.01.2020 | ||
CZ | 08.01.2020 | ||
DK | 08.01.2020 | ||
EE | 08.01.2020 | ||
ES | 08.01.2020 | ||
FI | 08.01.2020 | ||
HR | 08.01.2020 | ||
IT | 08.01.2020 | ||
LT | 08.01.2020 | ||
LV | 08.01.2020 | ||
MC | 08.01.2020 | ||
MT | 08.01.2020 | ||
NL | 08.01.2020 | ||
PL | 08.01.2020 | ||
RO | 08.01.2020 | ||
RS | 08.01.2020 | ||
SE | 08.01.2020 | ||
SI | 08.01.2020 | ||
SK | 08.01.2020 | ||
SM | 08.01.2020 | ||
TR | 08.01.2020 | ||
BG | 08.04.2020 | ||
NO | 08.04.2020 | ||
GR | 09.04.2020 | ||
IS | 08.05.2020 | ||
PT | 31.05.2020 | ||
IE | 19.08.2020 | ||
LU | 19.08.2020 | ||
BE | 31.08.2020 | ||
CH | 31.08.2020 | ||
LI | 31.08.2020 | ||
Former [2022/27] | HU | 19.08.2011 | |
AT | 08.01.2020 | ||
CY | 08.01.2020 | ||
CZ | 08.01.2020 | ||
DK | 08.01.2020 | ||
EE | 08.01.2020 | ||
ES | 08.01.2020 | ||
FI | 08.01.2020 | ||
HR | 08.01.2020 | ||
IT | 08.01.2020 | ||
LT | 08.01.2020 | ||
LV | 08.01.2020 | ||
MC | 08.01.2020 | ||
MT | 08.01.2020 | ||
NL | 08.01.2020 | ||
PL | 08.01.2020 | ||
RO | 08.01.2020 | ||
RS | 08.01.2020 | ||
SE | 08.01.2020 | ||
SI | 08.01.2020 | ||
SK | 08.01.2020 | ||
SM | 08.01.2020 | ||
TR | 08.01.2020 | ||
BG | 08.04.2020 | ||
NO | 08.04.2020 | ||
GR | 09.04.2020 | ||
IS | 08.05.2020 | ||
PT | 31.05.2020 | ||
IE | 19.08.2020 | ||
LU | 19.08.2020 | ||
BE | 31.08.2020 | ||
CH | 31.08.2020 | ||
LI | 31.08.2020 | ||
Former [2022/26] | AT | 08.01.2020 | |
CZ | 08.01.2020 | ||
DK | 08.01.2020 | ||
EE | 08.01.2020 | ||
ES | 08.01.2020 | ||
FI | 08.01.2020 | ||
HR | 08.01.2020 | ||
IT | 08.01.2020 | ||
LT | 08.01.2020 | ||
LV | 08.01.2020 | ||
MC | 08.01.2020 | ||
NL | 08.01.2020 | ||
PL | 08.01.2020 | ||
RO | 08.01.2020 | ||
RS | 08.01.2020 | ||
SE | 08.01.2020 | ||
SI | 08.01.2020 | ||
SK | 08.01.2020 | ||
SM | 08.01.2020 | ||
TR | 08.01.2020 | ||
BG | 08.04.2020 | ||
NO | 08.04.2020 | ||
GR | 09.04.2020 | ||
IS | 08.05.2020 | ||
PT | 31.05.2020 | ||
IE | 19.08.2020 | ||
LU | 19.08.2020 | ||
BE | 31.08.2020 | ||
CH | 31.08.2020 | ||
LI | 31.08.2020 | ||
Former [2021/37] | AT | 08.01.2020 | |
CZ | 08.01.2020 | ||
DK | 08.01.2020 | ||
EE | 08.01.2020 | ||
ES | 08.01.2020 | ||
FI | 08.01.2020 | ||
HR | 08.01.2020 | ||
IT | 08.01.2020 | ||
LT | 08.01.2020 | ||
LV | 08.01.2020 | ||
MC | 08.01.2020 | ||
NL | 08.01.2020 | ||
PL | 08.01.2020 | ||
RO | 08.01.2020 | ||
RS | 08.01.2020 | ||
SE | 08.01.2020 | ||
SI | 08.01.2020 | ||
SK | 08.01.2020 | ||
SM | 08.01.2020 | ||
BG | 08.04.2020 | ||
NO | 08.04.2020 | ||
GR | 09.04.2020 | ||
IS | 08.05.2020 | ||
PT | 31.05.2020 | ||
IE | 19.08.2020 | ||
LU | 19.08.2020 | ||
BE | 31.08.2020 | ||
CH | 31.08.2020 | ||
LI | 31.08.2020 | ||
Former [2021/36] | AT | 08.01.2020 | |
CZ | 08.01.2020 | ||
DK | 08.01.2020 | ||
EE | 08.01.2020 | ||
ES | 08.01.2020 | ||
FI | 08.01.2020 | ||
HR | 08.01.2020 | ||
IT | 08.01.2020 | ||
LT | 08.01.2020 | ||
LV | 08.01.2020 | ||
MC | 08.01.2020 | ||
NL | 08.01.2020 | ||
PL | 08.01.2020 | ||
RO | 08.01.2020 | ||
RS | 08.01.2020 | ||
SE | 08.01.2020 | ||
SI | 08.01.2020 | ||
SK | 08.01.2020 | ||
SM | 08.01.2020 | ||
BG | 08.04.2020 | ||
NO | 08.04.2020 | ||
GR | 09.04.2020 | ||
IS | 08.05.2020 | ||
PT | 31.05.2020 | ||
LU | 19.08.2020 | ||
BE | 31.08.2020 | ||
CH | 31.08.2020 | ||
LI | 31.08.2020 | ||
Former [2021/20] | AT | 08.01.2020 | |
CZ | 08.01.2020 | ||
DK | 08.01.2020 | ||
EE | 08.01.2020 | ||
ES | 08.01.2020 | ||
FI | 08.01.2020 | ||
HR | 08.01.2020 | ||
IT | 08.01.2020 | ||
LT | 08.01.2020 | ||
LV | 08.01.2020 | ||
MC | 08.01.2020 | ||
NL | 08.01.2020 | ||
PL | 08.01.2020 | ||
RO | 08.01.2020 | ||
RS | 08.01.2020 | ||
SE | 08.01.2020 | ||
SI | 08.01.2020 | ||
SK | 08.01.2020 | ||
SM | 08.01.2020 | ||
BG | 08.04.2020 | ||
NO | 08.04.2020 | ||
GR | 09.04.2020 | ||
IS | 08.05.2020 | ||
PT | 31.05.2020 | ||
LU | 19.08.2020 | ||
CH | 31.08.2020 | ||
LI | 31.08.2020 | ||
Former [2021/18] | AT | 08.01.2020 | |
CZ | 08.01.2020 | ||
DK | 08.01.2020 | ||
EE | 08.01.2020 | ||
ES | 08.01.2020 | ||
FI | 08.01.2020 | ||
HR | 08.01.2020 | ||
IT | 08.01.2020 | ||
LT | 08.01.2020 | ||
LV | 08.01.2020 | ||
MC | 08.01.2020 | ||
NL | 08.01.2020 | ||
PL | 08.01.2020 | ||
RO | 08.01.2020 | ||
RS | 08.01.2020 | ||
SE | 08.01.2020 | ||
SI | 08.01.2020 | ||
SK | 08.01.2020 | ||
SM | 08.01.2020 | ||
BG | 08.04.2020 | ||
NO | 08.04.2020 | ||
GR | 09.04.2020 | ||
IS | 08.05.2020 | ||
PT | 31.05.2020 | ||
Former [2021/10] | AT | 08.01.2020 | |
CZ | 08.01.2020 | ||
DK | 08.01.2020 | ||
EE | 08.01.2020 | ||
ES | 08.01.2020 | ||
FI | 08.01.2020 | ||
HR | 08.01.2020 | ||
IT | 08.01.2020 | ||
LT | 08.01.2020 | ||
LV | 08.01.2020 | ||
NL | 08.01.2020 | ||
PL | 08.01.2020 | ||
RO | 08.01.2020 | ||
RS | 08.01.2020 | ||
SE | 08.01.2020 | ||
SI | 08.01.2020 | ||
SK | 08.01.2020 | ||
SM | 08.01.2020 | ||
BG | 08.04.2020 | ||
NO | 08.04.2020 | ||
GR | 09.04.2020 | ||
IS | 08.05.2020 | ||
PT | 31.05.2020 | ||
Former [2020/50] | CZ | 08.01.2020 | |
DK | 08.01.2020 | ||
EE | 08.01.2020 | ||
ES | 08.01.2020 | ||
FI | 08.01.2020 | ||
HR | 08.01.2020 | ||
LT | 08.01.2020 | ||
LV | 08.01.2020 | ||
NL | 08.01.2020 | ||
RO | 08.01.2020 | ||
RS | 08.01.2020 | ||
SE | 08.01.2020 | ||
SK | 08.01.2020 | ||
SM | 08.01.2020 | ||
BG | 08.04.2020 | ||
NO | 08.04.2020 | ||
GR | 09.04.2020 | ||
IS | 08.05.2020 | ||
PT | 31.05.2020 | ||
Former [2020/49] | CZ | 08.01.2020 | |
DK | 08.01.2020 | ||
ES | 08.01.2020 | ||
FI | 08.01.2020 | ||
HR | 08.01.2020 | ||
LT | 08.01.2020 | ||
LV | 08.01.2020 | ||
NL | 08.01.2020 | ||
RO | 08.01.2020 | ||
RS | 08.01.2020 | ||
SE | 08.01.2020 | ||
SK | 08.01.2020 | ||
SM | 08.01.2020 | ||
BG | 08.04.2020 | ||
NO | 08.04.2020 | ||
GR | 09.04.2020 | ||
IS | 08.05.2020 | ||
PT | 31.05.2020 | ||
Former [2020/48] | DK | 08.01.2020 | |
ES | 08.01.2020 | ||
FI | 08.01.2020 | ||
HR | 08.01.2020 | ||
LT | 08.01.2020 | ||
LV | 08.01.2020 | ||
NL | 08.01.2020 | ||
RO | 08.01.2020 | ||
RS | 08.01.2020 | ||
SE | 08.01.2020 | ||
SM | 08.01.2020 | ||
BG | 08.04.2020 | ||
NO | 08.04.2020 | ||
GR | 09.04.2020 | ||
IS | 08.05.2020 | ||
PT | 31.05.2020 | ||
Former [2020/47] | DK | 08.01.2020 | |
ES | 08.01.2020 | ||
FI | 08.01.2020 | ||
HR | 08.01.2020 | ||
LT | 08.01.2020 | ||
LV | 08.01.2020 | ||
NL | 08.01.2020 | ||
RS | 08.01.2020 | ||
SE | 08.01.2020 | ||
BG | 08.04.2020 | ||
NO | 08.04.2020 | ||
GR | 09.04.2020 | ||
IS | 08.05.2020 | ||
PT | 31.05.2020 | ||
Former [2020/40] | FI | 08.01.2020 | |
HR | 08.01.2020 | ||
LT | 08.01.2020 | ||
LV | 08.01.2020 | ||
NL | 08.01.2020 | ||
RS | 08.01.2020 | ||
SE | 08.01.2020 | ||
BG | 08.04.2020 | ||
NO | 08.04.2020 | ||
GR | 09.04.2020 | ||
IS | 08.05.2020 | ||
PT | 31.05.2020 | ||
Former [2020/39] | FI | 08.01.2020 | |
HR | 08.01.2020 | ||
LT | 08.01.2020 | ||
LV | 08.01.2020 | ||
NL | 08.01.2020 | ||
RS | 08.01.2020 | ||
SE | 08.01.2020 | ||
BG | 08.04.2020 | ||
NO | 08.04.2020 | ||
GR | 09.04.2020 | ||
PT | 31.05.2020 | ||
Former [2020/38] | FI | 08.01.2020 | |
HR | 08.01.2020 | ||
LT | 08.01.2020 | ||
LV | 08.01.2020 | ||
NL | 08.01.2020 | ||
RS | 08.01.2020 | ||
SE | 08.01.2020 | ||
NO | 08.04.2020 | ||
GR | 09.04.2020 | ||
PT | 31.05.2020 | ||
Former [2020/37] | FI | 08.01.2020 | |
HR | 08.01.2020 | ||
LT | 08.01.2020 | ||
LV | 08.01.2020 | ||
NL | 08.01.2020 | ||
RS | 08.01.2020 | ||
SE | 08.01.2020 | ||
NO | 08.04.2020 | ||
PT | 31.05.2020 | ||
Former [2020/36] | FI | 08.01.2020 | |
LT | 08.01.2020 | ||
NL | 08.01.2020 | ||
RS | 08.01.2020 | ||
NO | 08.04.2020 | ||
PT | 31.05.2020 | ||
Former [2020/35] | FI | 08.01.2020 | |
LT | 08.01.2020 | ||
NL | 08.01.2020 | ||
NO | 08.04.2020 | ||
Former [2020/33] | NL | 08.01.2020 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5485249 (HIGETA AKIRA [JP], et al) [A] 1-15* column 7, line 15 - column 9, line 44 *; | [X]JP2008292556 (FUJI XEROX CO LTD) [X] 1-15 * abstract * | International search | [A]JPH0915967 (CANON KK); | [A]JP2001085600 (SEIKO EPSON CORP); | [A]JP2005038957 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD) | by applicant | JP2007047491 |