EP2605819 - INTEGRATED GLUCOSE MONITOR AND INSULIN INJECTION PEN WITH AUTOMATIC EMERGENCY NOTIFICATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 21.05.2021 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 24.08.2020 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 07.12.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.05.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 23.06.2021 [2021/25] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Thuban, Inc. 234 A Mountain Road Ridgefield, CT 06877 / US | [2013/26] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
AREFIEG, Rana, J. 234A Mountain Road Ridgefield CT 06877 / US | [2013/26] | Representative(s) | FDST Patentanwälte Nordostpark 16 90411 Nürnberg / DE | [2013/26] | Application number, filing date | 11818470.4 | 01.08.2011 | WO2011US01349 | Priority number, date | US20100806669 | 18.08.2010 Original published format: US 806669 | [2013/26] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2012023964 | Date: | 23.02.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/08] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2605819 | Date: | 26.06.2013 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.02.2012 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2013/26] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 23.02.2012 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.10.2016 | Classification | IPC: | G16H40/67, A61B5/00, A61B5/11, A61M5/172, A61B5/145, A61M5/315, A61B5/15, A61B5/151, A61B5/157, A61M5/142 | [2020/36] | CPC: |
A61M5/14244 (EP,US);
A61B5/0022 (EP,US);
A61B5/14532 (EP,US);
A61B5/150022 (EP,US);
A61B5/150358 (EP,US);
A61B5/150412 (EP,US);
A61B5/150503 (EP,US);
A61B5/150854 (EP,US);
A61B5/15105 (EP,US);
A61B5/15186 (EP,US);
A61B5/157 (EP,US);
A61B5/4839 (EP,US);
A61M5/1723 (EP,US);
G16H40/67 (EP,US);
A61B5/1112 (EP,US);
A61B5/741 (EP,US);
A61B5/747 (EP,US);
A61B5/749 (EP,US);
A61M2205/3523 (EP,US);
A61M2205/3553 (EP,US);
A61M2205/3576 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2016/45] | A61M31/00, A61B5/00, A61B5/11, A61M5/172, A61B5/145, A61B5/151, A61B5/157, A61M5/142, A61B5/15, A61M5/315 | ||
Former IPC [2013/26] | A61M31/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/26] | Title | German: | INSULININJEKTIONSSTIFT MIT INTEGRIERTEM BLUTZUCKERMONITOR UND AUTOMATISCHER NOTFALLBENACHRICHTIGUNG | [2013/26] | English: | INTEGRATED GLUCOSE MONITOR AND INSULIN INJECTION PEN WITH AUTOMATIC EMERGENCY NOTIFICATION | [2013/26] | French: | MONITEUR DE GLUCOSE INTÉGRÉ ET STYLO D'INJECTION D'INSULINE AVEC NOTIFICATION D'URGENCE AUTOMATIQUE | [2013/26] | Entry into regional phase | 15.02.2013 | National basic fee paid | 15.02.2013 | Search fee paid | 15.02.2013 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.02.2013 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.02.2013 | Examination requested [2013/26] | 24.04.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 06.12.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 13.05.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.08.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.01.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2021/25] | 03.02.2021 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2021/25] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 06.12.2018 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.08.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.08.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.08.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.08.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 25.08.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 29.08.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 21.08.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.2020 | 10   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]EP1985322 (ANIMAS CORP [US]) [X] 1-4,11 * abstract * * claims 1-5 * * paragraphs [0020] , [0027] * * figures 1-4 * [I] 5-10,12-15; | [I]WO2009066288 (MEDINGO LTD [IL], et al) [I] 1-15 * abstract * * figure - *; | [I]EP1281351 (ROCHE DIAGNOSTICS GMBH [DE], et al) [I] 1-15 * abstract * * figure - * | International search | [Y]US2008269673 (BUTOI BOGDAN [US], et al) |