EP2605904 - ANTI-FOG ORGANOSILOXANE COATING COMPOSITIONS AND COATINGS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.12.2017 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 23.12.2016 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 16.12.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 12.08.2020 [2020/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SDC Technologies, Inc. 45 Parker Suite 100 Irvine, CA 92618 / US | [2013/26] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
IWAZUMI, Masa 600-311 Takatsuku Kamisakunobe Kawasaki-city, Kanagawa 213-0034 / JP | [2017/04] |
Former [2013/26] | 01 /
IWAZUMI, Masanori 21 Bahia Irvine, CA 92614 / US | Representative(s) | Barton, Matthew Thomas Forresters IP LLP Skygarden Erika-Mann-Strasse 11 80636 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2013/26] | Barton, Matthew Thomas Forresters Skygarden Erika-Mann-Strasse 11 80636 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 11818717.8 | 17.08.2011 | [2017/04] | WO2011US48067 | Priority number, date | US20100374890P | 18.08.2010 Original published format: US 374890 P | [2013/26] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2012024387 | Date: | 23.02.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/08] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2605904 | Date: | 26.06.2013 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.02.2012 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2013/26] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2605904 | Date: | 25.01.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/04] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 23.02.2012 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.12.2015 | Classification | IPC: | B32B9/00, C08G77/60 | [2013/26] | CPC: |
C09D183/06 (EP,US);
C08G77/60 (KR);
B05D7/02 (KR);
B32B9/00 (KR);
C08J7/042 (EP,US);
C08J7/0427 (EP,US);
C08J7/043 (EP,US);
C08J7/046 (EP,US);
C08J7/054 (EP,US);
C08J7/056 (EP,US);
C08G77/14 (EP,US);
C08J2369/00 (EP,US);
C08J2483/06 (EP,US);
C08K5/092 (EP,US);
C08K5/5415 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/26] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | KONDENSATVERHINDERNDE ORGANOSILOXAN- BESCHICHTUNGSZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN UND BESCHICHTUNGEN | [2013/26] | English: | ANTI-FOG ORGANOSILOXANE COATING COMPOSITIONS AND COATINGS | [2013/26] | French: | COMPOSITIONS DE REVÊTEMENT D'ORGANOSILOXANE ANTIBUÉE ET REVÊTEMENTS | [2013/26] | Entry into regional phase | 21.02.2013 | National basic fee paid | 21.02.2013 | Search fee paid | 21.02.2013 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.02.2013 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.02.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 21.02.2013 | Examination requested [2013/26] | 11.08.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.09.2016 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 18.10.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.12.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 16.12.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 16.12.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 11.08.2016 | Opposition(s) | 26.10.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/01] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.07.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.08.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.08.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.08.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 17.08.2011 | AL | 25.01.2017 | AT | 25.01.2017 | CY | 25.01.2017 | CZ | 25.01.2017 | DK | 25.01.2017 | EE | 25.01.2017 | ES | 25.01.2017 | FI | 25.01.2017 | HR | 25.01.2017 | IT | 25.01.2017 | LT | 25.01.2017 | LV | 25.01.2017 | MC | 25.01.2017 | MK | 25.01.2017 | NL | 25.01.2017 | PL | 25.01.2017 | RO | 25.01.2017 | RS | 25.01.2017 | SE | 25.01.2017 | SI | 25.01.2017 | SK | 25.01.2017 | SM | 25.01.2017 | TR | 25.01.2017 | BG | 25.04.2017 | NO | 25.04.2017 | GR | 26.04.2017 | IS | 25.05.2017 | PT | 25.05.2017 | GB | 17.08.2017 | IE | 17.08.2017 | LU | 17.08.2017 | MT | 17.08.2017 | BE | 31.08.2017 | CH | 31.08.2017 | LI | 31.08.2017 | [2020/33] |
Former [2020/15] | HU | 17.08.2011 | |
AT | 25.01.2017 | ||
CY | 25.01.2017 | ||
CZ | 25.01.2017 | ||
DK | 25.01.2017 | ||
EE | 25.01.2017 | ||
ES | 25.01.2017 | ||
FI | 25.01.2017 | ||
HR | 25.01.2017 | ||
IT | 25.01.2017 | ||
LT | 25.01.2017 | ||
LV | 25.01.2017 | ||
MC | 25.01.2017 | ||
MK | 25.01.2017 | ||
NL | 25.01.2017 | ||
PL | 25.01.2017 | ||
RO | 25.01.2017 | ||
RS | 25.01.2017 | ||
SE | 25.01.2017 | ||
SI | 25.01.2017 | ||
SK | 25.01.2017 | ||
SM | 25.01.2017 | ||
TR | 25.01.2017 | ||
BG | 25.04.2017 | ||
NO | 25.04.2017 | ||
GR | 26.04.2017 | ||
IS | 25.05.2017 | ||
PT | 25.05.2017 | ||
GB | 17.08.2017 | ||
IE | 17.08.2017 | ||
LU | 17.08.2017 | ||
MT | 17.08.2017 | ||
BE | 31.08.2017 | ||
CH | 31.08.2017 | ||
LI | 31.08.2017 | ||
Former [2019/51] | HU | 17.08.2011 | |
AT | 25.01.2017 | ||
CY | 25.01.2017 | ||
CZ | 25.01.2017 | ||
DK | 25.01.2017 | ||
EE | 25.01.2017 | ||
ES | 25.01.2017 | ||
FI | 25.01.2017 | ||
HR | 25.01.2017 | ||
IT | 25.01.2017 | ||
LT | 25.01.2017 | ||
LV | 25.01.2017 | ||
MC | 25.01.2017 | ||
MK | 25.01.2017 | ||
NL | 25.01.2017 | ||
PL | 25.01.2017 | ||
RO | 25.01.2017 | ||
RS | 25.01.2017 | ||
SE | 25.01.2017 | ||
SI | 25.01.2017 | ||
SK | 25.01.2017 | ||
SM | 25.01.2017 | ||
BG | 25.04.2017 | ||
NO | 25.04.2017 | ||
GR | 26.04.2017 | ||
IS | 25.05.2017 | ||
PT | 25.05.2017 | ||
GB | 17.08.2017 | ||
IE | 17.08.2017 | ||
LU | 17.08.2017 | ||
MT | 17.08.2017 | ||
BE | 31.08.2017 | ||
CH | 31.08.2017 | ||
LI | 31.08.2017 | ||
Former [2019/46] | HU | 17.08.2011 | |
AT | 25.01.2017 | ||
CY | 25.01.2017 | ||
CZ | 25.01.2017 | ||
DK | 25.01.2017 | ||
EE | 25.01.2017 | ||
ES | 25.01.2017 | ||
FI | 25.01.2017 | ||
HR | 25.01.2017 | ||
IT | 25.01.2017 | ||
LT | 25.01.2017 | ||
LV | 25.01.2017 | ||
MC | 25.01.2017 | ||
NL | 25.01.2017 | ||
PL | 25.01.2017 | ||
RO | 25.01.2017 | ||
RS | 25.01.2017 | ||
SE | 25.01.2017 | ||
SI | 25.01.2017 | ||
SK | 25.01.2017 | ||
SM | 25.01.2017 | ||
BG | 25.04.2017 | ||
NO | 25.04.2017 | ||
GR | 26.04.2017 | ||
IS | 25.05.2017 | ||
PT | 25.05.2017 | ||
GB | 17.08.2017 | ||
IE | 17.08.2017 | ||
LU | 17.08.2017 | ||
MT | 17.08.2017 | ||
BE | 31.08.2017 | ||
CH | 31.08.2017 | ||
LI | 31.08.2017 | ||
Former [2019/31] | HU | 17.08.2011 | |
AT | 25.01.2017 | ||
CZ | 25.01.2017 | ||
DK | 25.01.2017 | ||
EE | 25.01.2017 | ||
ES | 25.01.2017 | ||
FI | 25.01.2017 | ||
HR | 25.01.2017 | ||
IT | 25.01.2017 | ||
LT | 25.01.2017 | ||
LV | 25.01.2017 | ||
MC | 25.01.2017 | ||
NL | 25.01.2017 | ||
PL | 25.01.2017 | ||
RO | 25.01.2017 | ||
RS | 25.01.2017 | ||
SE | 25.01.2017 | ||
SI | 25.01.2017 | ||
SK | 25.01.2017 | ||
SM | 25.01.2017 | ||
BG | 25.04.2017 | ||
NO | 25.04.2017 | ||
GR | 26.04.2017 | ||
IS | 25.05.2017 | ||
PT | 25.05.2017 | ||
GB | 17.08.2017 | ||
IE | 17.08.2017 | ||
LU | 17.08.2017 | ||
MT | 17.08.2017 | ||
BE | 31.08.2017 | ||
CH | 31.08.2017 | ||
LI | 31.08.2017 | ||
Former [2018/43] | AT | 25.01.2017 | |
CZ | 25.01.2017 | ||
DK | 25.01.2017 | ||
EE | 25.01.2017 | ||
ES | 25.01.2017 | ||
FI | 25.01.2017 | ||
HR | 25.01.2017 | ||
IT | 25.01.2017 | ||
LT | 25.01.2017 | ||
LV | 25.01.2017 | ||
MC | 25.01.2017 | ||
NL | 25.01.2017 | ||
PL | 25.01.2017 | ||
RO | 25.01.2017 | ||
RS | 25.01.2017 | ||
SE | 25.01.2017 | ||
SI | 25.01.2017 | ||
SK | 25.01.2017 | ||
SM | 25.01.2017 | ||
BG | 25.04.2017 | ||
NO | 25.04.2017 | ||
GR | 26.04.2017 | ||
IS | 25.05.2017 | ||
PT | 25.05.2017 | ||
GB | 17.08.2017 | ||
IE | 17.08.2017 | ||
LU | 17.08.2017 | ||
MT | 17.08.2017 | ||
BE | 31.08.2017 | ||
CH | 31.08.2017 | ||
LI | 31.08.2017 | ||
Former [2018/37] | AT | 25.01.2017 | |
CZ | 25.01.2017 | ||
DK | 25.01.2017 | ||
EE | 25.01.2017 | ||
ES | 25.01.2017 | ||
FI | 25.01.2017 | ||
HR | 25.01.2017 | ||
IT | 25.01.2017 | ||
LT | 25.01.2017 | ||
LV | 25.01.2017 | ||
MC | 25.01.2017 | ||
NL | 25.01.2017 | ||
PL | 25.01.2017 | ||
RO | 25.01.2017 | ||
RS | 25.01.2017 | ||
SE | 25.01.2017 | ||
SI | 25.01.2017 | ||
SK | 25.01.2017 | ||
SM | 25.01.2017 | ||
BG | 25.04.2017 | ||
NO | 25.04.2017 | ||
GR | 26.04.2017 | ||
IS | 25.05.2017 | ||
PT | 25.05.2017 | ||
GB | 17.08.2017 | ||
IE | 17.08.2017 | ||
LU | 17.08.2017 | ||
BE | 31.08.2017 | ||
CH | 31.08.2017 | ||
LI | 31.08.2017 | ||
Former [2018/35] | AT | 25.01.2017 | |
CZ | 25.01.2017 | ||
DK | 25.01.2017 | ||
EE | 25.01.2017 | ||
ES | 25.01.2017 | ||
FI | 25.01.2017 | ||
HR | 25.01.2017 | ||
IT | 25.01.2017 | ||
LT | 25.01.2017 | ||
LV | 25.01.2017 | ||
MC | 25.01.2017 | ||
NL | 25.01.2017 | ||
PL | 25.01.2017 | ||
RO | 25.01.2017 | ||
RS | 25.01.2017 | ||
SE | 25.01.2017 | ||
SI | 25.01.2017 | ||
SK | 25.01.2017 | ||
SM | 25.01.2017 | ||
BG | 25.04.2017 | ||
NO | 25.04.2017 | ||
GR | 26.04.2017 | ||
IS | 25.05.2017 | ||
PT | 25.05.2017 | ||
GB | 17.08.2017 | ||
IE | 17.08.2017 | ||
LU | 17.08.2017 | ||
CH | 31.08.2017 | ||
LI | 31.08.2017 | ||
Former [2018/34] | AT | 25.01.2017 | |
CZ | 25.01.2017 | ||
DK | 25.01.2017 | ||
EE | 25.01.2017 | ||
ES | 25.01.2017 | ||
FI | 25.01.2017 | ||
HR | 25.01.2017 | ||
IT | 25.01.2017 | ||
LT | 25.01.2017 | ||
LV | 25.01.2017 | ||
MC | 25.01.2017 | ||
NL | 25.01.2017 | ||
PL | 25.01.2017 | ||
RO | 25.01.2017 | ||
RS | 25.01.2017 | ||
SE | 25.01.2017 | ||
SI | 25.01.2017 | ||
SK | 25.01.2017 | ||
SM | 25.01.2017 | ||
BG | 25.04.2017 | ||
NO | 25.04.2017 | ||
GR | 26.04.2017 | ||
IS | 25.05.2017 | ||
PT | 25.05.2017 | ||
IE | 17.08.2017 | ||
LU | 17.08.2017 | ||
CH | 31.08.2017 | ||
LI | 31.08.2017 | ||
Former [2018/21] | AT | 25.01.2017 | |
CZ | 25.01.2017 | ||
DK | 25.01.2017 | ||
EE | 25.01.2017 | ||
ES | 25.01.2017 | ||
FI | 25.01.2017 | ||
HR | 25.01.2017 | ||
IT | 25.01.2017 | ||
LT | 25.01.2017 | ||
LV | 25.01.2017 | ||
MC | 25.01.2017 | ||
NL | 25.01.2017 | ||
PL | 25.01.2017 | ||
RO | 25.01.2017 | ||
RS | 25.01.2017 | ||
SE | 25.01.2017 | ||
SI | 25.01.2017 | ||
SK | 25.01.2017 | ||
SM | 25.01.2017 | ||
BG | 25.04.2017 | ||
NO | 25.04.2017 | ||
GR | 26.04.2017 | ||
IS | 25.05.2017 | ||
PT | 25.05.2017 | ||
CH | 31.08.2017 | ||
LI | 31.08.2017 | ||
Former [2018/18] | AT | 25.01.2017 | |
CZ | 25.01.2017 | ||
DK | 25.01.2017 | ||
EE | 25.01.2017 | ||
ES | 25.01.2017 | ||
FI | 25.01.2017 | ||
HR | 25.01.2017 | ||
IT | 25.01.2017 | ||
LT | 25.01.2017 | ||
LV | 25.01.2017 | ||
MC | 25.01.2017 | ||
NL | 25.01.2017 | ||
PL | 25.01.2017 | ||
RO | 25.01.2017 | ||
RS | 25.01.2017 | ||
SE | 25.01.2017 | ||
SI | 25.01.2017 | ||
SK | 25.01.2017 | ||
SM | 25.01.2017 | ||
BG | 25.04.2017 | ||
NO | 25.04.2017 | ||
GR | 26.04.2017 | ||
IS | 25.05.2017 | ||
PT | 25.05.2017 | ||
Former [2018/14] | AT | 25.01.2017 | |
CZ | 25.01.2017 | ||
DK | 25.01.2017 | ||
EE | 25.01.2017 | ||
ES | 25.01.2017 | ||
FI | 25.01.2017 | ||
HR | 25.01.2017 | ||
IT | 25.01.2017 | ||
LT | 25.01.2017 | ||
LV | 25.01.2017 | ||
NL | 25.01.2017 | ||
PL | 25.01.2017 | ||
RO | 25.01.2017 | ||
RS | 25.01.2017 | ||
SE | 25.01.2017 | ||
SI | 25.01.2017 | ||
SK | 25.01.2017 | ||
SM | 25.01.2017 | ||
BG | 25.04.2017 | ||
NO | 25.04.2017 | ||
GR | 26.04.2017 | ||
IS | 25.05.2017 | ||
PT | 25.05.2017 | ||
Former [2017/51] | AT | 25.01.2017 | |
CZ | 25.01.2017 | ||
DK | 25.01.2017 | ||
EE | 25.01.2017 | ||
ES | 25.01.2017 | ||
FI | 25.01.2017 | ||
HR | 25.01.2017 | ||
IT | 25.01.2017 | ||
LT | 25.01.2017 | ||
LV | 25.01.2017 | ||
NL | 25.01.2017 | ||
PL | 25.01.2017 | ||
RO | 25.01.2017 | ||
RS | 25.01.2017 | ||
SE | 25.01.2017 | ||
SK | 25.01.2017 | ||
SM | 25.01.2017 | ||
BG | 25.04.2017 | ||
NO | 25.04.2017 | ||
GR | 26.04.2017 | ||
IS | 25.05.2017 | ||
PT | 25.05.2017 | ||
Former [2017/50] | AT | 25.01.2017 | |
CZ | 25.01.2017 | ||
DK | 25.01.2017 | ||
EE | 25.01.2017 | ||
ES | 25.01.2017 | ||
FI | 25.01.2017 | ||
HR | 25.01.2017 | ||
IT | 25.01.2017 | ||
LT | 25.01.2017 | ||
LV | 25.01.2017 | ||
NL | 25.01.2017 | ||
PL | 25.01.2017 | ||
RO | 25.01.2017 | ||
RS | 25.01.2017 | ||
SE | 25.01.2017 | ||
SK | 25.01.2017 | ||
BG | 25.04.2017 | ||
NO | 25.04.2017 | ||
GR | 26.04.2017 | ||
IS | 25.05.2017 | ||
PT | 25.05.2017 | ||
Former [2017/49] | AT | 25.01.2017 | |
CZ | 25.01.2017 | ||
EE | 25.01.2017 | ||
ES | 25.01.2017 | ||
FI | 25.01.2017 | ||
HR | 25.01.2017 | ||
IT | 25.01.2017 | ||
LT | 25.01.2017 | ||
LV | 25.01.2017 | ||
NL | 25.01.2017 | ||
PL | 25.01.2017 | ||
RO | 25.01.2017 | ||
RS | 25.01.2017 | ||
SE | 25.01.2017 | ||
SK | 25.01.2017 | ||
BG | 25.04.2017 | ||
NO | 25.04.2017 | ||
GR | 26.04.2017 | ||
IS | 25.05.2017 | ||
PT | 25.05.2017 | ||
Former [2017/48] | AT | 25.01.2017 | |
CZ | 25.01.2017 | ||
ES | 25.01.2017 | ||
FI | 25.01.2017 | ||
HR | 25.01.2017 | ||
LT | 25.01.2017 | ||
LV | 25.01.2017 | ||
NL | 25.01.2017 | ||
PL | 25.01.2017 | ||
RS | 25.01.2017 | ||
SE | 25.01.2017 | ||
BG | 25.04.2017 | ||
NO | 25.04.2017 | ||
GR | 26.04.2017 | ||
IS | 25.05.2017 | ||
PT | 25.05.2017 | ||
Former [2017/40] | AT | 25.01.2017 | |
ES | 25.01.2017 | ||
FI | 25.01.2017 | ||
HR | 25.01.2017 | ||
LT | 25.01.2017 | ||
LV | 25.01.2017 | ||
NL | 25.01.2017 | ||
PL | 25.01.2017 | ||
RS | 25.01.2017 | ||
SE | 25.01.2017 | ||
BG | 25.04.2017 | ||
NO | 25.04.2017 | ||
GR | 26.04.2017 | ||
IS | 25.05.2017 | ||
PT | 25.05.2017 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4467073 (CREASY WALTER S [US]) [A] 1-14 * example -; claim - *; | [A]DE10330744 (ITN NANOVATION GMBH [DE]) [A] 1-14 * example -; claim - *; | [A]WO2009085680 (3M INNOVATIVE PROPERTIES CO [US], et al) [A] 1-14* example -; claim - * | International search | [Y]US5411585 (AVERY RICHARD W [US], et al); | [Y]US2005121782 (NAKAMURA KOICHIRO [JP], et al); | [Y]US2008207797 (TAKAHASHI KOJI [JP], et al); | [Y]US2008311376 (MATSUDA MIZUHO [JP], et al); | [A]US2009004098 (SCHMIDT HELMUT [DE], et al); | [A]US2010163234 (FULLER MICHAEL J [US], et al) |