EP2606005 - WATER PURIFICATION USING CONVEYOR SWEEP [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 25.03.2016 Database last updated on 15.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.03.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 27.04.2016 [2016/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Potable Water Systems Ltd. 952 Echo Lane, Suite 120 Houston, TX 77024 / US | [2013/26] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MILLER, Jorge 15835 Pine Mountain Drive Houston TX 77084 / US | 02 /
MILLER, Luisa, Kling 15835 Pine Mountain Drive Houston TX 77084 / US | [2013/26] | Representative(s) | Schiweck Weinzierl Koch Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Ganghoferstraße 68 B 80339 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2013/26] | Schiweck, Wolfram Schiweck, Weinzierl & Koch Landsberger Strasse 98 80339 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 11818804.4 | 18.08.2011 | WO2011US48315 | Priority number, date | US20100859041 | 18.08.2010 Original published format: US 859041 | [2013/26] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2012024533 | Date: | 23.02.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/08] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2606005 | Date: | 26.06.2013 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.02.2012 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2013/26] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 23.02.2012 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.03.2015 | Classification | IPC: | C02F1/463, C25B9/00, C02F1/465, // C02F11/12, C02F1/461, C02F101/30, C02F101/34, C02F103/22, C02F1/467, C02F103/32, C02F103/36, C02F103/28, C02F101/16 | [2015/17] | CPC: |
C02F1/463 (EP,US);
C02F1/465 (EP,US);
C02F1/001 (EP,US);
C02F1/46114 (EP,US);
C02F1/4674 (EP,US);
C02F11/122 (EP,US);
C02F11/123 (EP,US);
C02F11/126 (EP,US);
C02F11/127 (EP,US);
C02F2001/46119 (EP,US);
C02F2001/46133 (EP,US);
C02F2001/46138 (EP,US);
C02F2101/16 (EP,US);
C02F2101/30 (EP,US);
C02F2101/34 (EP,US);
C02F2103/22 (EP,US);
C02F2103/28 (EP,US);
C02F2103/32 (EP,US);
C02F2103/327 (EP,US);
C02F2103/36 (EP,US);
C02F2103/365 (EP,US);
C02F2201/003 (EP,US);
C02F2201/46115 (EP,US);
C02F2201/4613 (EP,US);
C02F2201/4617 (EP,US);
C02F2201/46185 (EP,US);
C02F2301/022 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2013/26] | C02F1/463, C25B9/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/26] | Title | German: | WASSERAUFBEREITUNG MIT EINEM FÖRDERBAND | [2013/26] | English: | WATER PURIFICATION USING CONVEYOR SWEEP | [2013/26] | French: | PURIFICATION D'EAU AU MOYEN D'UN BALAYAGE PAR CONVOYEUR | [2013/26] | Entry into regional phase | 14.03.2013 | National basic fee paid | 14.03.2013 | Search fee paid | 14.03.2013 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.03.2013 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.03.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 14.03.2013 | Examination requested [2013/26] | 24.10.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2016/17] | 10.12.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2016/17] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.08.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.08.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.08.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3944478 (KUJI YOICHI, et al) [A] 1-15* the whole document *; | [A]FR2382941 (COURTAULDS LTD [GB]) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [A]US4551246 (COFFING SAMUEL F [US]) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [A]US4983265 (MARUYAMA SOTOHIRO [JP]) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [A]WO9411308 (TURUN EKOVESI OY [FI], et al) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [I]US2007227904 (MILLER JORGE [US], et al) [I] 1-15 * paragraphs [0011] - [0056] * * figures 1,2 * | International search | [Y]US4802991 (MILLER GEORGE [CO]); | [Y]US6613271 (LEWIS-GRAY ALEXANDER HAMILTON [AU]) |