EP2605805 - CONTINUOUS DIGITAL LIGHT PROCESSING ADDITIVE MANUFACTURING OF IMPLANTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.11.2019 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 07.12.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 05.08.2018 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 09.03.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 03.08.2022 [2022/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Case Western Reserve University 10900 Euclid Avenue Cleveland, OH 44106 / US | For all designated states Envisiontec Inc. 1100 Hilton Road Ferndale, Michigan 48220 / US | For all designated states University of Maryland, College Park Office of Technology Commercialization 0133 Cole Student Activities Building College Park, Maryland 20742 / US | For all designated states Rice University 6100 Main Street Houston, TX 77005 / US | [2013/26] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DEAN, H. David 19801 Malvern Road Shaker Heights Ohio 44122 / US | 02 /
WALLACE, Jonathan E. 9835 Chardon Road Chardon Ohio 44024 / US | 03 /
MIKOS, Antonios G. 2329 Wroxton Road Houston Texas 77005 / US | 04 /
WANG, Martha 6632 Waning Moon Way Columbia Maryland 21045 / US | 05 /
SIBLANI, Ali 214 North Beech Daly Dearborn Heights Michigan 48127 / US | 06 /
KIM, Kyobum 7171 Buffalo Speedway Apt. 1715 Houston Texas 77025 / US | 07 /
FISHER, John P. 10008 Connecticut Ave. Kensington Maryland 20895 / US | [2013/26] | Representative(s) | V.O. P.O. Box 87930 2508 DH Den Haag / NL | [2019/02] |
Former [2013/26] | Jansen, Cornelis Marinus V.O. Johan de Wittlaan 7 2517 JR Den Haag / NL | Application number, filing date | 11818890.3 | 22.08.2011 | [2019/02] | WO2011US48620 | Priority number, date | US201161491194P | 29.05.2011 Original published format: US 201161491194 P | US20100375353P | 20.08.2010 Original published format: US 375353 P | [2013/26] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2012024675 | Date: | 23.02.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/08] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2605805 | Date: | 26.06.2013 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.02.2012 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2013/26] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2605805 | Date: | 09.01.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/02] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 31.05.2012 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.07.2017 | Classification | IPC: | A61L27/14, G02B26/00, A61L27/56, A61L27/54, A61L27/40 | [2013/26] | CPC: |
B33Y50/00 (EP,US);
A61L27/14 (KR);
G02B26/0833 (EP,US);
A61L27/40 (KR);
A61L27/50 (EP,US);
A61L27/56 (EP,US);
A61L27/60 (US);
B29C64/129 (EP);
B29C64/135 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/26] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | HERSTELLUNG VON IMPLANTATEN MIT ZUSATZSTOFFEN DURCH KONTINUIERLICHE VERARBEITUNG VON DIGITALEM LICHT | [2013/26] | English: | CONTINUOUS DIGITAL LIGHT PROCESSING ADDITIVE MANUFACTURING OF IMPLANTS | [2013/26] | French: | FABRICATION ADDITIVE D'IMPLANTS PAR PHOTOTRAITEMENT NUMÉRIQUE CONTINU | [2013/26] | Entry into regional phase | 08.03.2013 | National basic fee paid | 08.03.2013 | Search fee paid | 08.03.2013 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.03.2013 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.03.2013 | Examination requested [2013/26] | 06.02.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 09.03.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.07.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.08.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.11.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 27.11.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 27.11.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP19150726.8 / EP3511027 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 09.03.2018 | Opposition(s) | 10.10.2019 | No opposition filed within time limit [2019/51] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.08.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.07.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.01.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.07.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.08.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 21.08.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.2015 | 05   M06   Fee paid on   29.01.2016 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 22.08.2011 | AL | 09.01.2019 | AT | 09.01.2019 | CY | 09.01.2019 | CZ | 09.01.2019 | DK | 09.01.2019 | EE | 09.01.2019 | ES | 09.01.2019 | FI | 09.01.2019 | HR | 09.01.2019 | IT | 09.01.2019 | LT | 09.01.2019 | LV | 09.01.2019 | MC | 09.01.2019 | MK | 09.01.2019 | MT | 09.01.2019 | NL | 09.01.2019 | PL | 09.01.2019 | RO | 09.01.2019 | RS | 09.01.2019 | SE | 09.01.2019 | SI | 09.01.2019 | SK | 09.01.2019 | SM | 09.01.2019 | TR | 09.01.2019 | BG | 09.04.2019 | NO | 09.04.2019 | GR | 10.04.2019 | IS | 09.05.2019 | PT | 09.05.2019 | IE | 22.08.2019 | LU | 22.08.2019 | BE | 31.08.2019 | CH | 31.08.2019 | LI | 31.08.2019 | [2022/31] |
Former [2021/34] | HU | 22.08.2011 | |
AL | 09.01.2019 | ||
AT | 09.01.2019 | ||
CY | 09.01.2019 | ||
CZ | 09.01.2019 | ||
DK | 09.01.2019 | ||
EE | 09.01.2019 | ||
ES | 09.01.2019 | ||
FI | 09.01.2019 | ||
HR | 09.01.2019 | ||
IT | 09.01.2019 | ||
LT | 09.01.2019 | ||
LV | 09.01.2019 | ||
MC | 09.01.2019 | ||
MT | 09.01.2019 | ||
NL | 09.01.2019 | ||
PL | 09.01.2019 | ||
RO | 09.01.2019 | ||
RS | 09.01.2019 | ||
SE | 09.01.2019 | ||
SI | 09.01.2019 | ||
SK | 09.01.2019 | ||
SM | 09.01.2019 | ||
TR | 09.01.2019 | ||
BG | 09.04.2019 | ||
NO | 09.04.2019 | ||
GR | 10.04.2019 | ||
IS | 09.05.2019 | ||
PT | 09.05.2019 | ||
IE | 22.08.2019 | ||
LU | 22.08.2019 | ||
BE | 31.08.2019 | ||
CH | 31.08.2019 | ||
LI | 31.08.2019 | ||
Former [2021/32] | HU | 22.08.2011 | |
AL | 09.01.2019 | ||
AT | 09.01.2019 | ||
CY | 09.01.2019 | ||
CZ | 09.01.2019 | ||
DK | 09.01.2019 | ||
EE | 09.01.2019 | ||
ES | 09.01.2019 | ||
FI | 09.01.2019 | ||
HR | 09.01.2019 | ||
IT | 09.01.2019 | ||
LT | 09.01.2019 | ||
LV | 09.01.2019 | ||
MC | 09.01.2019 | ||
NL | 09.01.2019 | ||
PL | 09.01.2019 | ||
RO | 09.01.2019 | ||
RS | 09.01.2019 | ||
SE | 09.01.2019 | ||
SI | 09.01.2019 | ||
SK | 09.01.2019 | ||
SM | 09.01.2019 | ||
TR | 09.01.2019 | ||
BG | 09.04.2019 | ||
NO | 09.04.2019 | ||
GR | 10.04.2019 | ||
IS | 09.05.2019 | ||
PT | 09.05.2019 | ||
IE | 22.08.2019 | ||
LU | 22.08.2019 | ||
BE | 31.08.2019 | ||
CH | 31.08.2019 | ||
LI | 31.08.2019 | ||
Former [2021/26] | AL | 09.01.2019 | |
AT | 09.01.2019 | ||
CY | 09.01.2019 | ||
CZ | 09.01.2019 | ||
DK | 09.01.2019 | ||
EE | 09.01.2019 | ||
ES | 09.01.2019 | ||
FI | 09.01.2019 | ||
HR | 09.01.2019 | ||
IT | 09.01.2019 | ||
LT | 09.01.2019 | ||
LV | 09.01.2019 | ||
MC | 09.01.2019 | ||
NL | 09.01.2019 | ||
PL | 09.01.2019 | ||
RO | 09.01.2019 | ||
RS | 09.01.2019 | ||
SE | 09.01.2019 | ||
SI | 09.01.2019 | ||
SK | 09.01.2019 | ||
SM | 09.01.2019 | ||
TR | 09.01.2019 | ||
BG | 09.04.2019 | ||
NO | 09.04.2019 | ||
GR | 10.04.2019 | ||
IS | 09.05.2019 | ||
PT | 09.05.2019 | ||
IE | 22.08.2019 | ||
LU | 22.08.2019 | ||
BE | 31.08.2019 | ||
CH | 31.08.2019 | ||
LI | 31.08.2019 | ||
Former [2020/38] | AL | 09.01.2019 | |
AT | 09.01.2019 | ||
CZ | 09.01.2019 | ||
DK | 09.01.2019 | ||
EE | 09.01.2019 | ||
ES | 09.01.2019 | ||
FI | 09.01.2019 | ||
HR | 09.01.2019 | ||
IT | 09.01.2019 | ||
LT | 09.01.2019 | ||
LV | 09.01.2019 | ||
MC | 09.01.2019 | ||
NL | 09.01.2019 | ||
PL | 09.01.2019 | ||
RO | 09.01.2019 | ||
RS | 09.01.2019 | ||
SE | 09.01.2019 | ||
SI | 09.01.2019 | ||
SK | 09.01.2019 | ||
SM | 09.01.2019 | ||
TR | 09.01.2019 | ||
BG | 09.04.2019 | ||
NO | 09.04.2019 | ||
GR | 10.04.2019 | ||
IS | 09.05.2019 | ||
PT | 09.05.2019 | ||
IE | 22.08.2019 | ||
LU | 22.08.2019 | ||
BE | 31.08.2019 | ||
CH | 31.08.2019 | ||
LI | 31.08.2019 | ||
Former [2020/36] | AL | 09.01.2019 | |
AT | 09.01.2019 | ||
CZ | 09.01.2019 | ||
DK | 09.01.2019 | ||
EE | 09.01.2019 | ||
ES | 09.01.2019 | ||
FI | 09.01.2019 | ||
HR | 09.01.2019 | ||
IT | 09.01.2019 | ||
LT | 09.01.2019 | ||
LV | 09.01.2019 | ||
MC | 09.01.2019 | ||
NL | 09.01.2019 | ||
PL | 09.01.2019 | ||
RO | 09.01.2019 | ||
RS | 09.01.2019 | ||
SE | 09.01.2019 | ||
SI | 09.01.2019 | ||
SK | 09.01.2019 | ||
SM | 09.01.2019 | ||
TR | 09.01.2019 | ||
BG | 09.04.2019 | ||
NO | 09.04.2019 | ||
GR | 10.04.2019 | ||
IS | 09.05.2019 | ||
PT | 09.05.2019 | ||
IE | 22.08.2019 | ||
LU | 22.08.2019 | ||
CH | 31.08.2019 | ||
LI | 31.08.2019 | ||
Former [2020/25] | AL | 09.01.2019 | |
AT | 09.01.2019 | ||
CZ | 09.01.2019 | ||
DK | 09.01.2019 | ||
EE | 09.01.2019 | ||
ES | 09.01.2019 | ||
FI | 09.01.2019 | ||
HR | 09.01.2019 | ||
IT | 09.01.2019 | ||
LT | 09.01.2019 | ||
LV | 09.01.2019 | ||
MC | 09.01.2019 | ||
NL | 09.01.2019 | ||
PL | 09.01.2019 | ||
RO | 09.01.2019 | ||
RS | 09.01.2019 | ||
SE | 09.01.2019 | ||
SI | 09.01.2019 | ||
SK | 09.01.2019 | ||
SM | 09.01.2019 | ||
TR | 09.01.2019 | ||
BG | 09.04.2019 | ||
NO | 09.04.2019 | ||
GR | 10.04.2019 | ||
IS | 09.05.2019 | ||
PT | 09.05.2019 | ||
LU | 22.08.2019 | ||
CH | 31.08.2019 | ||
LI | 31.08.2019 | ||
Former [2020/17] | AL | 09.01.2019 | |
AT | 09.01.2019 | ||
CZ | 09.01.2019 | ||
DK | 09.01.2019 | ||
EE | 09.01.2019 | ||
ES | 09.01.2019 | ||
FI | 09.01.2019 | ||
HR | 09.01.2019 | ||
IT | 09.01.2019 | ||
LT | 09.01.2019 | ||
LV | 09.01.2019 | ||
NL | 09.01.2019 | ||
PL | 09.01.2019 | ||
RO | 09.01.2019 | ||
RS | 09.01.2019 | ||
SE | 09.01.2019 | ||
SI | 09.01.2019 | ||
SK | 09.01.2019 | ||
SM | 09.01.2019 | ||
TR | 09.01.2019 | ||
BG | 09.04.2019 | ||
NO | 09.04.2019 | ||
GR | 10.04.2019 | ||
IS | 09.05.2019 | ||
PT | 09.05.2019 | ||
Former [2020/13] | AL | 09.01.2019 | |
AT | 09.01.2019 | ||
CZ | 09.01.2019 | ||
DK | 09.01.2019 | ||
EE | 09.01.2019 | ||
ES | 09.01.2019 | ||
FI | 09.01.2019 | ||
HR | 09.01.2019 | ||
IT | 09.01.2019 | ||
LT | 09.01.2019 | ||
LV | 09.01.2019 | ||
NL | 09.01.2019 | ||
PL | 09.01.2019 | ||
RO | 09.01.2019 | ||
RS | 09.01.2019 | ||
SE | 09.01.2019 | ||
SI | 09.01.2019 | ||
SK | 09.01.2019 | ||
SM | 09.01.2019 | ||
BG | 09.04.2019 | ||
NO | 09.04.2019 | ||
GR | 10.04.2019 | ||
IS | 09.05.2019 | ||
PT | 09.05.2019 | ||
Former [2019/52] | AL | 09.01.2019 | |
AT | 09.01.2019 | ||
CZ | 09.01.2019 | ||
DK | 09.01.2019 | ||
EE | 09.01.2019 | ||
ES | 09.01.2019 | ||
FI | 09.01.2019 | ||
HR | 09.01.2019 | ||
IT | 09.01.2019 | ||
LT | 09.01.2019 | ||
LV | 09.01.2019 | ||
NL | 09.01.2019 | ||
PL | 09.01.2019 | ||
RO | 09.01.2019 | ||
RS | 09.01.2019 | ||
SE | 09.01.2019 | ||
SK | 09.01.2019 | ||
SM | 09.01.2019 | ||
BG | 09.04.2019 | ||
NO | 09.04.2019 | ||
GR | 10.04.2019 | ||
IS | 09.05.2019 | ||
PT | 09.05.2019 | ||
Former [2019/49] | AL | 09.01.2019 | |
AT | 09.01.2019 | ||
CZ | 09.01.2019 | ||
DK | 09.01.2019 | ||
EE | 09.01.2019 | ||
ES | 09.01.2019 | ||
FI | 09.01.2019 | ||
HR | 09.01.2019 | ||
IT | 09.01.2019 | ||
LT | 09.01.2019 | ||
LV | 09.01.2019 | ||
NL | 09.01.2019 | ||
PL | 09.01.2019 | ||
RO | 09.01.2019 | ||
RS | 09.01.2019 | ||
SE | 09.01.2019 | ||
SK | 09.01.2019 | ||
BG | 09.04.2019 | ||
NO | 09.04.2019 | ||
GR | 10.04.2019 | ||
IS | 09.05.2019 | ||
PT | 09.05.2019 | ||
Former [2019/48] | AT | 09.01.2019 | |
DK | 09.01.2019 | ||
ES | 09.01.2019 | ||
FI | 09.01.2019 | ||
HR | 09.01.2019 | ||
IT | 09.01.2019 | ||
LT | 09.01.2019 | ||
LV | 09.01.2019 | ||
NL | 09.01.2019 | ||
PL | 09.01.2019 | ||
RS | 09.01.2019 | ||
SE | 09.01.2019 | ||
BG | 09.04.2019 | ||
NO | 09.04.2019 | ||
GR | 10.04.2019 | ||
IS | 09.05.2019 | ||
PT | 09.05.2019 | ||
Former [2019/46] | AT | 09.01.2019 | |
ES | 09.01.2019 | ||
FI | 09.01.2019 | ||
HR | 09.01.2019 | ||
IT | 09.01.2019 | ||
LT | 09.01.2019 | ||
LV | 09.01.2019 | ||
NL | 09.01.2019 | ||
PL | 09.01.2019 | ||
RS | 09.01.2019 | ||
SE | 09.01.2019 | ||
BG | 09.04.2019 | ||
NO | 09.04.2019 | ||
GR | 10.04.2019 | ||
IS | 09.05.2019 | ||
PT | 09.05.2019 | ||
Former [2019/39] | ES | 09.01.2019 | |
FI | 09.01.2019 | ||
HR | 09.01.2019 | ||
LT | 09.01.2019 | ||
LV | 09.01.2019 | ||
NL | 09.01.2019 | ||
PL | 09.01.2019 | ||
RS | 09.01.2019 | ||
SE | 09.01.2019 | ||
BG | 09.04.2019 | ||
NO | 09.04.2019 | ||
GR | 10.04.2019 | ||
IS | 09.05.2019 | ||
PT | 09.05.2019 | ||
Former [2019/38] | ES | 09.01.2019 | |
FI | 09.01.2019 | ||
LT | 09.01.2019 | ||
NL | 09.01.2019 | ||
PL | 09.01.2019 | ||
SE | 09.01.2019 | ||
BG | 09.04.2019 | ||
NO | 09.04.2019 | ||
GR | 10.04.2019 | ||
PT | 09.05.2019 | ||
Former [2019/37] | ES | 09.01.2019 | |
FI | 09.01.2019 | ||
LT | 09.01.2019 | ||
NL | 09.01.2019 | ||
PL | 09.01.2019 | ||
SE | 09.01.2019 | ||
NO | 09.04.2019 | ||
GR | 10.04.2019 | ||
PT | 09.05.2019 | ||
Former [2019/35] | ES | 09.01.2019 | |
FI | 09.01.2019 | ||
LT | 09.01.2019 | ||
NL | 09.01.2019 | ||
PL | 09.01.2019 | ||
SE | 09.01.2019 | ||
NO | 09.04.2019 | ||
PT | 09.05.2019 | ||
Former [2019/34] | FI | 09.01.2019 | |
LT | 09.01.2019 | ||
NL | 09.01.2019 | ||
SE | 09.01.2019 | ||
NO | 09.04.2019 | ||
PT | 09.05.2019 | ||
Former [2019/33] | FI | 09.01.2019 | |
LT | 09.01.2019 | ||
NL | 09.01.2019 | ||
NO | 09.04.2019 | ||
PT | 09.05.2019 | ||
Former [2019/30] | NL | 09.01.2019 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US5182056 (SPENCE STUART T [US], et al) [Y] 4,5,9,10,14,15 * column 5, line 40- - column 6, line 8 *; | [Y]US6051179 (HAGENAU WILLIAM R [US]) [Y] 4,5,9,10,14,15 * column 2, lines 7-29 *; | [Y]US2002171178 (DEAN DAVID [US], et al) [Y] 1-15 * paragraphs [0001] - [0078]; figures 1-5 *; | [Y]WO2009042671 (UNIV ILLINOIS [US], et al) [Y] 1-15 * paragraphs [0344] - [0347]; figures 61,62 *; | [Y]US2010003619 (DAS SUMAN [US], et al) [Y] 14 * paragraph [0090]; figure 10 *; | [Y] - YI LU ET AL, "A digital micro-mirror device-based system for the microfabrication of complex, spatially patterned tissue engineering scaffolds", JOURNAL OF BIOMEDICAL MATERIALS RESEARCH. PART A, HOBOKEN, NY, US, (20060101), vol. 77A, no. 2, doi:10.1002/jbm.a.30601, ISSN 1549-3296, pages 396 - 405, XP055347024 [Y] 1-15 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/jbm.a.30601 | [Y] - A. NEUMEISTER ET AL, "Process accuracy during laser-based stereo-lithography", PROCEEDINGS OF THE 3ND INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON ADVANCED RESEARCH IN VIRTUAL AND RAPID PROTOTYPING, LEIRIA, PORTUGAL, 24-29 SEPTEMBER 2007, London [u.a.], (20081231), ISBN 978-0-415-41602-3, pages 502 - 505, XP055347494 [Y] 4,9,10,14,15 * section 2.1;; figure 3 * | [Y] - J Rieker ET AL, "Recent Developments in Radical Photoinitiator Chemistry", Chimia, vol. 48, (19940930), pages 423 - 426, URL: http://www.ingentaconnect.com/content/scs/chimia/1994/00000048/00000009/art00024?crawler=true, (20170706), XP055388350 [Y] 11 * the whole document * | International search | [A]US2003013080 (LUEBKE KEVIN J [US], et al); | [Y]US2009130449 (EL-SIBLANI ALI [US]); | [A]US2009130174 (GUELCHER SCOTT A [US], et al); | [Y] - ARMENTANO I. ET AL., "Biodegradable polymer matrix nanocomposites for tissue engineering: A review", POLYMER DEGRADATION AND STABILITY, (20100618), vol. 95, pages 2126 - 2146, XP027406399 | [A] - PETER S.J. ET AL., "Injectable, in situ polymerizable, biodegradable scaffolds based on poly(propylene fumarate) for guided bone regeneration", PH.D. THESIS, RICE UNIVERSITY, HOUSTON TEXAS, (199805), pages I - 194, XP055075908 |