EP2643226 - CONTAINER ARRANGEMENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 29.12.2017 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 20.01.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 24.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL, IS | published on 19.08.2020 [2020/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Corbeil, Jean Paul Schurichstr. 3 81247 München / DE | [2017/08] |
Former [2013/40] | For all designated states Corbeil, Jean Paul Schurichstr. 3 81247 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2013/40] | Representative(s) | Karakatsanis, Georgios, et al Haft Karakatsanis Patentanwaltskanzlei Schönfelstraße 26 80539 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2017/08] | Karakatsanis, Georgios, et al Haft Karakatsanis Patentanwaltskanzlei Dietlindenstrasse 18 80802 München / DE | ||
Former [2013/40] | von Puttkamer, Nikolaus von Puttkamer - Berngruber Patentanwälte Türkenstrasse 9 80333 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 11819093.3 | 24.11.2011 | [2017/08] | WO2011EP70962 | Priority number, date | DE20101052225 | 24.11.2010 Original published format: DE102010052225 | [2013/40] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2012069598 | Date: | 31.05.2012 | Language: | DE | [2012/22] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2643226 | Date: | 02.10.2013 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 31.05.2012 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2013/40] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2643226 | Date: | 22.02.2017 | Language: | DE | [2017/08] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 31.05.2012 | Classification | IPC: | B65D1/04, B65D81/32 | [2013/40] | CPC: |
B65D1/04 (EP,US);
B65D21/02 (US);
B65D81/3216 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/40] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | BEHÄLTERANORDNUNG | [2013/40] | English: | CONTAINER ARRANGEMENT | [2013/40] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE RÉCIPIENT | [2013/40] | Entry into regional phase | 24.06.2013 | National basic fee paid | 24.06.2013 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.06.2013 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.06.2013 | Examination requested [2013/40] | 29.01.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 03.03.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.08.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 14.10.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.11.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.12.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 21.12.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 21.12.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 03.03.2016 | Opposition(s) | 23.11.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/05] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 14.10.2016 | Request for further processing filed | 14.10.2016 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 02.11.2016 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.11.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.11.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.11.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.11.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 24.11.2011 | AL | 22.02.2017 | CY | 22.02.2017 | CZ | 22.02.2017 | DK | 22.02.2017 | EE | 22.02.2017 | FI | 22.02.2017 | HR | 22.02.2017 | LT | 22.02.2017 | LV | 22.02.2017 | MC | 22.02.2017 | MK | 22.02.2017 | MT | 22.02.2017 | RO | 22.02.2017 | RS | 22.02.2017 | SE | 22.02.2017 | SI | 22.02.2017 | SK | 22.02.2017 | SM | 22.02.2017 | BG | 22.05.2017 | NO | 22.05.2017 | GR | 23.05.2017 | IS | 22.06.2017 | PT | 22.06.2017 | [2020/33] |
Former [2019/51] | HU | 24.11.2011 | |
CY | 22.02.2017 | ||
CZ | 22.02.2017 | ||
DK | 22.02.2017 | ||
EE | 22.02.2017 | ||
FI | 22.02.2017 | ||
HR | 22.02.2017 | ||
LT | 22.02.2017 | ||
LV | 22.02.2017 | ||
MC | 22.02.2017 | ||
MK | 22.02.2017 | ||
MT | 22.02.2017 | ||
RO | 22.02.2017 | ||
RS | 22.02.2017 | ||
SE | 22.02.2017 | ||
SI | 22.02.2017 | ||
SK | 22.02.2017 | ||
SM | 22.02.2017 | ||
BG | 22.05.2017 | ||
NO | 22.05.2017 | ||
GR | 23.05.2017 | ||
PT | 22.06.2017 | ||
Former [2019/46] | HU | 24.11.2011 | |
CY | 22.02.2017 | ||
CZ | 22.02.2017 | ||
DK | 22.02.2017 | ||
EE | 22.02.2017 | ||
FI | 22.02.2017 | ||
HR | 22.02.2017 | ||
LT | 22.02.2017 | ||
LV | 22.02.2017 | ||
MC | 22.02.2017 | ||
MT | 22.02.2017 | ||
RO | 22.02.2017 | ||
RS | 22.02.2017 | ||
SE | 22.02.2017 | ||
SI | 22.02.2017 | ||
SK | 22.02.2017 | ||
SM | 22.02.2017 | ||
BG | 22.05.2017 | ||
NO | 22.05.2017 | ||
GR | 23.05.2017 | ||
PT | 22.06.2017 | ||
Former [2019/31] | HU | 24.11.2011 | |
CZ | 22.02.2017 | ||
DK | 22.02.2017 | ||
EE | 22.02.2017 | ||
FI | 22.02.2017 | ||
HR | 22.02.2017 | ||
LT | 22.02.2017 | ||
LV | 22.02.2017 | ||
MC | 22.02.2017 | ||
MT | 22.02.2017 | ||
RO | 22.02.2017 | ||
RS | 22.02.2017 | ||
SE | 22.02.2017 | ||
SI | 22.02.2017 | ||
SK | 22.02.2017 | ||
SM | 22.02.2017 | ||
BG | 22.05.2017 | ||
NO | 22.05.2017 | ||
GR | 23.05.2017 | ||
PT | 22.06.2017 | ||
Former [2018/43] | CZ | 22.02.2017 | |
DK | 22.02.2017 | ||
EE | 22.02.2017 | ||
FI | 22.02.2017 | ||
HR | 22.02.2017 | ||
LT | 22.02.2017 | ||
LV | 22.02.2017 | ||
MC | 22.02.2017 | ||
MT | 22.02.2017 | ||
RO | 22.02.2017 | ||
RS | 22.02.2017 | ||
SE | 22.02.2017 | ||
SI | 22.02.2017 | ||
SK | 22.02.2017 | ||
SM | 22.02.2017 | ||
BG | 22.05.2017 | ||
NO | 22.05.2017 | ||
GR | 23.05.2017 | ||
PT | 22.06.2017 | ||
Former [2018/33] | CZ | 22.02.2017 | |
DK | 22.02.2017 | ||
EE | 22.02.2017 | ||
FI | 22.02.2017 | ||
HR | 22.02.2017 | ||
LT | 22.02.2017 | ||
LV | 22.02.2017 | ||
MC | 22.02.2017 | ||
RO | 22.02.2017 | ||
RS | 22.02.2017 | ||
SE | 22.02.2017 | ||
SI | 22.02.2017 | ||
SK | 22.02.2017 | ||
SM | 22.02.2017 | ||
BG | 22.05.2017 | ||
NO | 22.05.2017 | ||
GR | 23.05.2017 | ||
PT | 22.06.2017 | ||
Former [2018/14] | CZ | 22.02.2017 | |
DK | 22.02.2017 | ||
EE | 22.02.2017 | ||
FI | 22.02.2017 | ||
HR | 22.02.2017 | ||
LT | 22.02.2017 | ||
LV | 22.02.2017 | ||
RO | 22.02.2017 | ||
RS | 22.02.2017 | ||
SE | 22.02.2017 | ||
SI | 22.02.2017 | ||
SK | 22.02.2017 | ||
SM | 22.02.2017 | ||
BG | 22.05.2017 | ||
NO | 22.05.2017 | ||
GR | 23.05.2017 | ||
PT | 22.06.2017 | ||
Former [2017/51] | CZ | 22.02.2017 | |
DK | 22.02.2017 | ||
EE | 22.02.2017 | ||
FI | 22.02.2017 | ||
HR | 22.02.2017 | ||
LT | 22.02.2017 | ||
LV | 22.02.2017 | ||
RO | 22.02.2017 | ||
RS | 22.02.2017 | ||
SE | 22.02.2017 | ||
SK | 22.02.2017 | ||
SM | 22.02.2017 | ||
BG | 22.05.2017 | ||
NO | 22.05.2017 | ||
GR | 23.05.2017 | ||
PT | 22.06.2017 | ||
Former [2017/50] | CZ | 22.02.2017 | |
DK | 22.02.2017 | ||
EE | 22.02.2017 | ||
FI | 22.02.2017 | ||
HR | 22.02.2017 | ||
LT | 22.02.2017 | ||
LV | 22.02.2017 | ||
RO | 22.02.2017 | ||
RS | 22.02.2017 | ||
SE | 22.02.2017 | ||
SK | 22.02.2017 | ||
BG | 22.05.2017 | ||
NO | 22.05.2017 | ||
GR | 23.05.2017 | ||
PT | 22.06.2017 | ||
Former [2017/49] | CZ | 22.02.2017 | |
EE | 22.02.2017 | ||
FI | 22.02.2017 | ||
HR | 22.02.2017 | ||
LT | 22.02.2017 | ||
LV | 22.02.2017 | ||
RO | 22.02.2017 | ||
RS | 22.02.2017 | ||
SE | 22.02.2017 | ||
SK | 22.02.2017 | ||
BG | 22.05.2017 | ||
NO | 22.05.2017 | ||
GR | 23.05.2017 | ||
PT | 22.06.2017 | ||
Former [2017/48] | CZ | 22.02.2017 | |
FI | 22.02.2017 | ||
HR | 22.02.2017 | ||
LT | 22.02.2017 | ||
LV | 22.02.2017 | ||
RS | 22.02.2017 | ||
SE | 22.02.2017 | ||
BG | 22.05.2017 | ||
NO | 22.05.2017 | ||
GR | 23.05.2017 | ||
PT | 22.06.2017 | ||
Former [2017/41] | FI | 22.02.2017 | |
HR | 22.02.2017 | ||
LT | 22.02.2017 | ||
LV | 22.02.2017 | ||
RS | 22.02.2017 | ||
SE | 22.02.2017 | ||
BG | 22.05.2017 | ||
NO | 22.05.2017 | ||
GR | 23.05.2017 | ||
PT | 22.06.2017 | Cited in | International search | [X]US975939 (EDWARDS WILLIAM M [US]) [X] 1* figure 1 *; | [X]AU475148B (ABRAHAM MAMRUD) [X] 1-3,7-13,17 * page 3, line 18 - page 4, line 4; figure 1 *; | [X]DE20107736U (MOERLEIN DIETER [DE]) [X] 1-17 * figures 4,9; claims 1-20 *; | [X]US2004159625 (KWON KYEONG HEA [KR]) [X] 1-3 * paragraph [0023] - paragraph [0029]; figures 4,5 * | Examination | EP0145425 | by applicant | EP19970954995 |