EP2608688 - MANNEQUIN, METHOD AND SYSTEM FOR PURCHASE, MAKING AND ALTERATION OF CLOTHING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 04.08.2017 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 18.04.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.08.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 06.09.2017 [2017/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Clonnequin Pty Ltd Level 15, 10 Queens Road Melbourne, Victoria 3004 / AU | [2013/27] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Gennady, Volchek Level 15 10 Queens Road Melbourne Victoria 3004 / AU | [2013/27] | Representative(s) | Fry, David John, et al Agile IP LLP Airport House Purley Way Croydon, Greater London CR0 0XZ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2013/27] | Sayer, Robert David, et al Agile IP LLP Airport House Purley Way Croydon, Surrey CR0 0XZ / GB | Application number, filing date | 11819207.9 | 29.08.2011 | WO2011AU01117 | Priority number, date | AU20100903837 | 27.08.2010 Original published format: AU 2010903837 | [2013/27] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2012024745 | Date: | 01.03.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/09] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2608688 | Date: | 03.07.2013 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.03.2012 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2013/27] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | AU | 01.03.2012 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.07.2014 | Classification | IPC: | A41H5/01, A47F8/00, G06Q30/06 | [2014/33] | CPC: |
A41H5/01 (EP,US);
A47F8/00 (EP,US);
G06Q30/06 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2013/27] | A41H5/01 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/27] | Title | German: | KLEIDERMODELL SOWIE VERFAHREN UND SYSTEM ZUM EINKAUFEN, HERSTELLEN UND WECHSELN VON KLEIDUNG | [2013/27] | English: | MANNEQUIN, METHOD AND SYSTEM FOR PURCHASE, MAKING AND ALTERATION OF CLOTHING | [2013/27] | French: | MANNEQUIN, PROCÉDÉ ET SYSTÈME D'ACHAT, DE FABRICATION ET DE RETOUCHE DE VÊTEMENT | [2013/27] | Entry into regional phase | 27.03.2013 | National basic fee paid | 27.03.2013 | Search fee paid | 27.03.2013 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.03.2013 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.03.2013 | Examination requested [2013/27] | 28.11.2013 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: Claims {1} | 12.05.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 26.10.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.03.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2017/36] | 19.04.2017 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2017/36] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 26.10.2016 | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to indicate the wish to proceed further with the application | 28.05.2015 | Request for further processing filed | 28.05.2015 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 09.06.2015 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report/Supplementary European search report | 28.05.2015 | Request for further processing filed | 28.05.2015 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 09.06.2015 | Decision despatched | Loss of rights: Claims | 03.02.2014 | Request for further processing filed | 03.02.2014 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 13.02.2014 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.08.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.08.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.08.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.08.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XP]WO2010096878 (CLONNEQUIN PTY LTD [AU], et al) [XP] 1-20 * the whole document *; | [A]WO2008113367 (MASSI MILIANO OUE [EE], et al) [A] 1 * abstract *; | [A] - Vincent Everts, "Heikki Haldre of Fits.me", (20100311), URL: http://www.youtube.com/watch?v=kK6lsBrO3mQ, (20140708), XP054975447 [A] 1 * the whole document * | International search | [A]US5680528 (KORSZUN HENRY A [US]); | [A]US6404426 (WEAVER CHRISTOPHER S [US]); | [XP]WO2010096878 (CLONNEQUIN PTY LTD [AU], et al) | by applicant | WO2010096878 |