EP2609184 - PERFUMERY COMPOSITIONS AND SYNTHESIS OF A ODORANT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2013/27] | SYNTHESIS OF A NOVEL ODORANT | ||
[2016/31] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.12.2017 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 13.01.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 09.01.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL, IS | published on 12.08.2020 [2020/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Vaze, Kedar Ramesh S.H. Kelkar and Co Pvt Ltd LBS Marg Mulund, Mumbai 400 080 / IN | [2013/27] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2013/27] | Representative(s) | De Kezel, Eric, et al Mathisen & Macara LLP Charta House 30-38 Church Street Staines-upon-Thames, Middlesex TW18 4EP / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2013/27] | De Kezel, Eric, et al Mathisen & Macara LLP Communications House South Street Staines-upon-Thames Middlesex, TW18 4PR / GB | Application number, filing date | 11819522.1 | 18.08.2011 | [2017/07] | WO2011IN00550 | Priority number, date | IN2010MUM2366 | 25.08.2010 Original published format: IN 2366MU2010 | [2017/16] |
Former [2013/27] | IN2010MUM2366 | 25.08.2010 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2012025934 | Date: | 01.03.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/09] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2609184 | Date: | 03.07.2013 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.03.2012 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2013/27] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2609184 | Date: | 15.02.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/07] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 01.03.2012 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.07.2014 | Classification | IPC: | C11D3/50, A01N25/00, C11B9/00, C07C31/135, C07C33/14, C07C69/003, C07C69/007 | [2016/31] | CPC: |
C11B9/0034 (EP,CN,US);
C11B9/00 (CN);
C07C31/135 (US);
C07C31/1355 (US);
C07C33/14 (US);
C07C69/003 (US);
|
Former IPC [2014/34] | C11D3/50, A01N25/00, C11B9/00 | ||
Former IPC [2013/27] | C11D3/50, A01N25/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/27] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | DUFTSTOFFZUSAMMENSETZUNG UND SYNTHESE EINES GERUCHSSTOFFS | [2016/31] | English: | PERFUMERY COMPOSITIONS AND SYNTHESIS OF A ODORANT | [2016/31] | French: | COMPOSITION ODORANTE ET SYNTHÈSE D'UN AGENT ODORANT | [2016/31] |
Former [2013/27] | SYNTHESE EINES NEUEN GERUCHSSTOFFS | ||
Former [2013/27] | SYNTHESIS OF A NOVEL ODORANT | ||
Former [2013/27] | SYNTHÈSE D'UN NOUVEL AGENT ODORANT | Entry into regional phase | 11.02.2013 | National basic fee paid | 11.02.2013 | Search fee paid | 11.02.2013 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.02.2013 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.02.2013 | Examination requested [2013/27] | 26.01.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 29.08.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.12.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 28.12.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 28.12.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 29.08.2016 | Opposition(s) | 16.11.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/04] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.08.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.06.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.05.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.08.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 18.08.2011 | AL | 15.02.2017 | AT | 15.02.2017 | CY | 15.02.2017 | CZ | 15.02.2017 | DK | 15.02.2017 | EE | 15.02.2017 | FI | 15.02.2017 | HR | 15.02.2017 | LT | 15.02.2017 | LV | 15.02.2017 | MC | 15.02.2017 | MK | 15.02.2017 | PL | 15.02.2017 | RS | 15.02.2017 | SE | 15.02.2017 | SI | 15.02.2017 | SK | 15.02.2017 | SM | 15.02.2017 | BG | 15.05.2017 | NO | 15.05.2017 | GR | 16.05.2017 | IS | 15.06.2017 | PT | 15.06.2017 | IE | 18.08.2017 | LU | 18.08.2017 | MT | 18.08.2017 | BE | 31.08.2017 | [2020/33] |
Former [2019/51] | HU | 18.08.2011 | |
AT | 15.02.2017 | ||
CY | 15.02.2017 | ||
CZ | 15.02.2017 | ||
DK | 15.02.2017 | ||
EE | 15.02.2017 | ||
FI | 15.02.2017 | ||
HR | 15.02.2017 | ||
LT | 15.02.2017 | ||
LV | 15.02.2017 | ||
MC | 15.02.2017 | ||
MK | 15.02.2017 | ||
PL | 15.02.2017 | ||
RS | 15.02.2017 | ||
SE | 15.02.2017 | ||
SI | 15.02.2017 | ||
SK | 15.02.2017 | ||
SM | 15.02.2017 | ||
BG | 15.05.2017 | ||
NO | 15.05.2017 | ||
GR | 16.05.2017 | ||
PT | 15.06.2017 | ||
IE | 18.08.2017 | ||
LU | 18.08.2017 | ||
MT | 18.08.2017 | ||
BE | 31.08.2017 | ||
Former [2019/46] | HU | 18.08.2011 | |
AT | 15.02.2017 | ||
CY | 15.02.2017 | ||
CZ | 15.02.2017 | ||
DK | 15.02.2017 | ||
EE | 15.02.2017 | ||
FI | 15.02.2017 | ||
HR | 15.02.2017 | ||
LT | 15.02.2017 | ||
LV | 15.02.2017 | ||
MC | 15.02.2017 | ||
PL | 15.02.2017 | ||
RS | 15.02.2017 | ||
SE | 15.02.2017 | ||
SI | 15.02.2017 | ||
SK | 15.02.2017 | ||
SM | 15.02.2017 | ||
BG | 15.05.2017 | ||
NO | 15.05.2017 | ||
GR | 16.05.2017 | ||
PT | 15.06.2017 | ||
IE | 18.08.2017 | ||
LU | 18.08.2017 | ||
MT | 18.08.2017 | ||
BE | 31.08.2017 | ||
Former [2019/31] | HU | 18.08.2011 | |
AT | 15.02.2017 | ||
CZ | 15.02.2017 | ||
DK | 15.02.2017 | ||
EE | 15.02.2017 | ||
FI | 15.02.2017 | ||
HR | 15.02.2017 | ||
LT | 15.02.2017 | ||
LV | 15.02.2017 | ||
MC | 15.02.2017 | ||
PL | 15.02.2017 | ||
RS | 15.02.2017 | ||
SE | 15.02.2017 | ||
SI | 15.02.2017 | ||
SK | 15.02.2017 | ||
SM | 15.02.2017 | ||
BG | 15.05.2017 | ||
NO | 15.05.2017 | ||
GR | 16.05.2017 | ||
PT | 15.06.2017 | ||
IE | 18.08.2017 | ||
LU | 18.08.2017 | ||
MT | 18.08.2017 | ||
BE | 31.08.2017 | ||
Former [2018/43] | AT | 15.02.2017 | |
CZ | 15.02.2017 | ||
DK | 15.02.2017 | ||
EE | 15.02.2017 | ||
FI | 15.02.2017 | ||
HR | 15.02.2017 | ||
LT | 15.02.2017 | ||
LV | 15.02.2017 | ||
MC | 15.02.2017 | ||
PL | 15.02.2017 | ||
RS | 15.02.2017 | ||
SE | 15.02.2017 | ||
SI | 15.02.2017 | ||
SK | 15.02.2017 | ||
SM | 15.02.2017 | ||
BG | 15.05.2017 | ||
NO | 15.05.2017 | ||
GR | 16.05.2017 | ||
PT | 15.06.2017 | ||
IE | 18.08.2017 | ||
LU | 18.08.2017 | ||
MT | 18.08.2017 | ||
BE | 31.08.2017 | ||
Former [2018/39] | AT | 15.02.2017 | |
CZ | 15.02.2017 | ||
DK | 15.02.2017 | ||
EE | 15.02.2017 | ||
FI | 15.02.2017 | ||
HR | 15.02.2017 | ||
LT | 15.02.2017 | ||
LV | 15.02.2017 | ||
MC | 15.02.2017 | ||
PL | 15.02.2017 | ||
RS | 15.02.2017 | ||
SE | 15.02.2017 | ||
SI | 15.02.2017 | ||
SK | 15.02.2017 | ||
SM | 15.02.2017 | ||
BG | 15.05.2017 | ||
NO | 15.05.2017 | ||
GR | 16.05.2017 | ||
PT | 15.06.2017 | ||
IE | 18.08.2017 | ||
LU | 18.08.2017 | ||
BE | 31.08.2017 | ||
Former [2018/34] | AT | 15.02.2017 | |
CZ | 15.02.2017 | ||
DK | 15.02.2017 | ||
EE | 15.02.2017 | ||
FI | 15.02.2017 | ||
HR | 15.02.2017 | ||
LT | 15.02.2017 | ||
LV | 15.02.2017 | ||
MC | 15.02.2017 | ||
PL | 15.02.2017 | ||
RS | 15.02.2017 | ||
SE | 15.02.2017 | ||
SI | 15.02.2017 | ||
SK | 15.02.2017 | ||
SM | 15.02.2017 | ||
BG | 15.05.2017 | ||
NO | 15.05.2017 | ||
GR | 16.05.2017 | ||
PT | 15.06.2017 | ||
IE | 18.08.2017 | ||
LU | 18.08.2017 | ||
Former [2018/18] | AT | 15.02.2017 | |
CZ | 15.02.2017 | ||
DK | 15.02.2017 | ||
EE | 15.02.2017 | ||
FI | 15.02.2017 | ||
HR | 15.02.2017 | ||
LT | 15.02.2017 | ||
LV | 15.02.2017 | ||
MC | 15.02.2017 | ||
PL | 15.02.2017 | ||
RS | 15.02.2017 | ||
SE | 15.02.2017 | ||
SI | 15.02.2017 | ||
SK | 15.02.2017 | ||
SM | 15.02.2017 | ||
BG | 15.05.2017 | ||
NO | 15.05.2017 | ||
GR | 16.05.2017 | ||
PT | 15.06.2017 | ||
Former [2018/14] | AT | 15.02.2017 | |
CZ | 15.02.2017 | ||
DK | 15.02.2017 | ||
EE | 15.02.2017 | ||
FI | 15.02.2017 | ||
HR | 15.02.2017 | ||
LT | 15.02.2017 | ||
LV | 15.02.2017 | ||
PL | 15.02.2017 | ||
RS | 15.02.2017 | ||
SE | 15.02.2017 | ||
SI | 15.02.2017 | ||
SK | 15.02.2017 | ||
SM | 15.02.2017 | ||
BG | 15.05.2017 | ||
NO | 15.05.2017 | ||
GR | 16.05.2017 | ||
PT | 15.06.2017 | ||
Former [2017/52] | AT | 15.02.2017 | |
CZ | 15.02.2017 | ||
DK | 15.02.2017 | ||
EE | 15.02.2017 | ||
FI | 15.02.2017 | ||
HR | 15.02.2017 | ||
LT | 15.02.2017 | ||
LV | 15.02.2017 | ||
PL | 15.02.2017 | ||
RS | 15.02.2017 | ||
SE | 15.02.2017 | ||
SK | 15.02.2017 | ||
SM | 15.02.2017 | ||
BG | 15.05.2017 | ||
NO | 15.05.2017 | ||
GR | 16.05.2017 | ||
PT | 15.06.2017 | ||
Former [2017/50] | AT | 15.02.2017 | |
CZ | 15.02.2017 | ||
DK | 15.02.2017 | ||
EE | 15.02.2017 | ||
FI | 15.02.2017 | ||
HR | 15.02.2017 | ||
LT | 15.02.2017 | ||
LV | 15.02.2017 | ||
PL | 15.02.2017 | ||
RS | 15.02.2017 | ||
SE | 15.02.2017 | ||
SK | 15.02.2017 | ||
BG | 15.05.2017 | ||
NO | 15.05.2017 | ||
GR | 16.05.2017 | ||
PT | 15.06.2017 | ||
Former [2017/49] | AT | 15.02.2017 | |
CZ | 15.02.2017 | ||
EE | 15.02.2017 | ||
FI | 15.02.2017 | ||
HR | 15.02.2017 | ||
LT | 15.02.2017 | ||
LV | 15.02.2017 | ||
RS | 15.02.2017 | ||
SE | 15.02.2017 | ||
SK | 15.02.2017 | ||
BG | 15.05.2017 | ||
NO | 15.05.2017 | ||
GR | 16.05.2017 | ||
PT | 15.06.2017 | ||
Former [2017/48] | AT | 15.02.2017 | |
CZ | 15.02.2017 | ||
FI | 15.02.2017 | ||
HR | 15.02.2017 | ||
LT | 15.02.2017 | ||
LV | 15.02.2017 | ||
RS | 15.02.2017 | ||
SE | 15.02.2017 | ||
BG | 15.05.2017 | ||
NO | 15.05.2017 | ||
GR | 16.05.2017 | ||
PT | 15.06.2017 | ||
Former [2017/41] | AT | 15.02.2017 | |
FI | 15.02.2017 | ||
HR | 15.02.2017 | ||
LT | 15.02.2017 | ||
LV | 15.02.2017 | ||
RS | 15.02.2017 | ||
SE | 15.02.2017 | ||
BG | 15.05.2017 | ||
NO | 15.05.2017 | ||
GR | 16.05.2017 | ||
PT | 15.06.2017 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0258967 (TAKASAGO PERFUMERY CO LTD [JP]) [X] 1,3 * example 13 *; | [I]US5372995 (SPRECKER MARK A [US], et al) [I] 1-9 * column 2, line 4 - column 3, line 32; example -; claim - *; | [I]US2002086901 (BAJGROWICZ JERZY A [CH], et al) [I] 1-9 * paragraphs [0004] , [0072]; example -; claim - * | [X] - PAUL S. BROWN ET AL, "Transposition of allylic alcohols controlled by the Ph2PO group: Reagents for [alpha]-hydroxy-diene synthesis by the horner-wittig reaction", TETRAHEDRON LETTERS, (19850101), vol. 26, no. 2, doi:10.1016/S0040-4039(00)61892-0, ISSN 0040-4039, pages 249 - 252, XP055128312 [X] 1-3 * page 251; compound - * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0040-4039(00)61892-0 | [X] - THEODORE COHEN ET AL, "Reductive metallation", TETRAHEDRON, (19860101), vol. 42, no. 11, doi:10.1016/S0040-4020(01)90569-1, ISSN 0040-4020, pages 2803 - 2808, XP055128315 [X] 1,2 * compound 6 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0040-4020(01)90569-1 | [X] - PAUL S. BROWN ET AL, "The synthesis of (Z)-penta-2,4-dien-1-ol and substituted (E)-pentadienols by the stereochemically controlled Horner?Wittig reaction", JOURNAL OF THE CHEMICAL SOCIETY, PERKIN TRANSACTIONS 1, (19910101), no. 6, doi:10.1039/p19910001485, ISSN 0300-922X, page 1485, XP055128318 [X] 1,3 * compounds E-30 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1039/P19910001485 | [X] - BONNET B ET AL, "Ene diiodo acetals : stereoselective synthesis of ene hydroxy acetals. Handy access to non conjugated dienals", TETRAHEDRON, ELSEVIER SCIENCE PUBLISHERS, AMSTERDAM, NL, (19980319), vol. 54, no. 12, doi:10.1016/S0040-4020(98)83009-3, ISSN 0040-4020, pages 2743 - 2752, XP004357364 [X] 1,2 * compound 5b * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0040-4020(98)83009-3 | International search | [Y]US2003008788 (SONNERBERG) | [Y] - LEVENE, P.A. ET AL., "The Configurational Relatioship of Acids of the Phenethyl Series to Those of the Normal Series.", J. BIOLOG. CHEM., (1935), vol. 110, pages 311 - 321, XP002560394 |