EP2610898 - METHOD FOR FABRICATING EPITAXIAL SUBSTRATE FOR SEMICONDUCTOR DEVICE, AND METHOD FOR FABRICATING SEMICONDUCTOR DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2013/27] | EPITAXIAL SUBSTRATE FOR SEMICONDUCTOR ELEMENT, SEMICONDUCTOR ELEMENT, METHOD FOR FABRICATING EPITAXIAL SUBSTRATE FOR SEMICONDUCTOR ELEMENT, AND METHOD FOR FABRICATING SEMICONDUCTOR ELEMENT | ||
[2020/24] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.10.2021 Database last updated on 05.08.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 23.10.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 08.06.2020 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 23.10.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.06.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 17.07.2024 [2024/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NGK Insulators, Ltd. 2-56, Suda-cho Mizuho-ku Nagoya-shi, Aichi 467-8530 / JP | [2013/27] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MIYOSHI, Makoto 1-11-33, Konomiya Inazawa-shi, Aichi 492-8137 / JP | 02 /
ICHIMURA, Mikiya c/o NGK INSULATORS LTD. 2-56, Suda-cho Mizuho-ku Nagoya-shi, Aichi 467-8530 / JP | 03 /
TANAKA, Mitsuhiro 3-7-21, Kasuga Tsukuba-shi, Ibaraki 3050821 / JP | [2015/14] |
Former [2013/27] | 01 /
MIYOSHI Makoto 1-11-33, Konomiya Inazawa-shi Aichi 492-8137 / JP | ||
02 /
ICHIMURA Mikiya c/o NGK INSULATORS LTD. 2-56, Suda-cho Mizuho-ku Nagoya-shi Aichi 467-8530 / JP | |||
03 /
TANAKA Mitsuhiro 3-7-21, Kasuga Tsukuba-shi, Ibaraki 3050821 / JP | Representative(s) | Mewburn Ellis LLP Aurora Building Counterslip Bristol BS1 6BX / GB | [2020/48] |
Former [2013/27] | Naylor, Matthew John Mewburn Ellis LLP 33 Gutter Lane London EC2V 8AS / GB | Application number, filing date | 11819859.7 | 19.08.2011 | [2020/48] | WO2011JP68742 | Priority number, date | JP20100187899 | 25.08.2010 Original published format: JP 2010187899 | [2013/27] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2012026396 | Date: | 01.03.2012 | Language: | JA | [2012/09] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2610898 | Date: | 03.07.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/27] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2610898 | Date: | 25.11.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/48] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 01.03.2012 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.07.2014 | Classification | IPC: | H01L29/778, H01L21/336, H01L21/02, // H01L29/20, H01L29/205 | [2014/34] | CPC: |
H01L29/66462 (EP,US);
H01L29/778 (US);
H01L29/66431 (US);
H01L29/7786 (EP,US);
H01L29/7787 (US);
H01L21/0237 (EP,US);
H01L21/02378 (EP,US);
H01L21/02458 (EP,US);
H01L21/0254 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2013/27] | H01L21/338, H01L21/205, H01L29/778, H01L29/812 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/27] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINES EPITAKTISCHEN SUBSTRATS FÜR EIN HALBLEITERBAUELEMENT UND VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG DES HALBLEITERBAUELEMENTS | [2020/24] | English: | METHOD FOR FABRICATING EPITAXIAL SUBSTRATE FOR SEMICONDUCTOR DEVICE, AND METHOD FOR FABRICATING SEMICONDUCTOR DEVICE | [2020/24] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION D'UN SUBSTRAT ÉPITAXIAL POUR UN DISPOSITIF SEMI-CONDUCTEUR, ET PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION DU DISPOSITIF SEMI-CONDUCTEUR | [2020/24] |
Former [2013/27] | EPITAKTISCHES SUBSTRAT FÜR EIN HALBLEITERELEMENT, HALBLEITERELEMENT, VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG DES EPITAKTISCHEN SUBSTRATS FÜR EIN HALBLEITERELEMENT UND VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG DES HALBLEITERELEMENTS | ||
Former [2013/27] | EPITAXIAL SUBSTRATE FOR SEMICONDUCTOR ELEMENT, SEMICONDUCTOR ELEMENT, METHOD FOR FABRICATING EPITAXIAL SUBSTRATE FOR SEMICONDUCTOR ELEMENT, AND METHOD FOR FABRICATING SEMICONDUCTOR ELEMENT | ||
Former [2013/27] | SUBSTRAT ÉPITAXIAL POUR ÉLÉMENT SEMI-CONDUCTEUR, ÉLÉMENT SEMI-CONDUCTEUR, PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION DE SUBSTRAT ÉPITAXIAL POUR ÉLÉMENT SEMI-CONDUCTEUR, ET PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION D'ÉLÉMENT SEMI-CONDUCTEUR | Entry into regional phase | 21.02.2013 | Translation filed | 21.02.2013 | National basic fee paid | 21.02.2013 | Search fee paid | 21.02.2013 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.02.2013 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.02.2013 | Examination requested [2013/27] | 13.02.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 31.03.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.08.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.10.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.02.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.06.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.10.2020 | Fee for grant paid | 15.10.2020 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 15.10.2020 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 31.03.2015 | Opposition(s) | 26.08.2021 | No opposition filed within time limit [2021/44] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.08.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.08.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.08.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 24.08.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 25.08.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 10.08.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 15.08.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 13.08.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 19.08.2011 | AL | 25.11.2020 | AT | 25.11.2020 | CY | 25.11.2020 | CZ | 25.11.2020 | DK | 25.11.2020 | EE | 25.11.2020 | ES | 25.11.2020 | FI | 25.11.2020 | HR | 25.11.2020 | IT | 25.11.2020 | LT | 25.11.2020 | LV | 25.11.2020 | MC | 25.11.2020 | MK | 25.11.2020 | NL | 25.11.2020 | PL | 25.11.2020 | RO | 25.11.2020 | RS | 25.11.2020 | SE | 25.11.2020 | SI | 25.11.2020 | SK | 25.11.2020 | SM | 25.11.2020 | TR | 25.11.2020 | BG | 25.02.2021 | NO | 25.02.2021 | GR | 26.02.2021 | IS | 25.03.2021 | PT | 25.03.2021 | GB | 19.08.2021 | IE | 19.08.2021 | LU | 19.08.2021 | [2024/29] |
Former [2024/22] | HU | 19.08.2011 | |
AL | 25.11.2020 | ||
AT | 25.11.2020 | ||
CY | 25.11.2020 | ||
CZ | 25.11.2020 | ||
DK | 25.11.2020 | ||
EE | 25.11.2020 | ||
ES | 25.11.2020 | ||
FI | 25.11.2020 | ||
HR | 25.11.2020 | ||
IT | 25.11.2020 | ||
LT | 25.11.2020 | ||
LV | 25.11.2020 | ||
MC | 25.11.2020 | ||
MK | 25.11.2020 | ||
NL | 25.11.2020 | ||
PL | 25.11.2020 | ||
RO | 25.11.2020 | ||
RS | 25.11.2020 | ||
SE | 25.11.2020 | ||
SI | 25.11.2020 | ||
SK | 25.11.2020 | ||
SM | 25.11.2020 | ||
BG | 25.02.2021 | ||
NO | 25.02.2021 | ||
GR | 26.02.2021 | ||
IS | 25.03.2021 | ||
PT | 25.03.2021 | ||
GB | 19.08.2021 | ||
IE | 19.08.2021 | ||
LU | 19.08.2021 | ||
Former [2023/29] | HU | 19.08.2011 | |
AL | 25.11.2020 | ||
AT | 25.11.2020 | ||
CY | 25.11.2020 | ||
CZ | 25.11.2020 | ||
DK | 25.11.2020 | ||
EE | 25.11.2020 | ||
ES | 25.11.2020 | ||
FI | 25.11.2020 | ||
HR | 25.11.2020 | ||
IT | 25.11.2020 | ||
LT | 25.11.2020 | ||
LV | 25.11.2020 | ||
MC | 25.11.2020 | ||
NL | 25.11.2020 | ||
PL | 25.11.2020 | ||
RO | 25.11.2020 | ||
RS | 25.11.2020 | ||
SE | 25.11.2020 | ||
SI | 25.11.2020 | ||
SK | 25.11.2020 | ||
SM | 25.11.2020 | ||
BG | 25.02.2021 | ||
NO | 25.02.2021 | ||
GR | 26.02.2021 | ||
IS | 25.03.2021 | ||
PT | 25.03.2021 | ||
GB | 19.08.2021 | ||
IE | 19.08.2021 | ||
LU | 19.08.2021 | ||
Former [2023/24] | AL | 25.11.2020 | |
AT | 25.11.2020 | ||
CY | 25.11.2020 | ||
CZ | 25.11.2020 | ||
DK | 25.11.2020 | ||
EE | 25.11.2020 | ||
ES | 25.11.2020 | ||
FI | 25.11.2020 | ||
HR | 25.11.2020 | ||
IT | 25.11.2020 | ||
LT | 25.11.2020 | ||
LV | 25.11.2020 | ||
MC | 25.11.2020 | ||
NL | 25.11.2020 | ||
PL | 25.11.2020 | ||
RO | 25.11.2020 | ||
RS | 25.11.2020 | ||
SE | 25.11.2020 | ||
SI | 25.11.2020 | ||
SK | 25.11.2020 | ||
SM | 25.11.2020 | ||
BG | 25.02.2021 | ||
NO | 25.02.2021 | ||
GR | 26.02.2021 | ||
IS | 25.03.2021 | ||
PT | 25.03.2021 | ||
GB | 19.08.2021 | ||
IE | 19.08.2021 | ||
LU | 19.08.2021 | ||
Former [2022/35] | AL | 25.11.2020 | |
AT | 25.11.2020 | ||
CZ | 25.11.2020 | ||
DK | 25.11.2020 | ||
EE | 25.11.2020 | ||
ES | 25.11.2020 | ||
FI | 25.11.2020 | ||
HR | 25.11.2020 | ||
IT | 25.11.2020 | ||
LT | 25.11.2020 | ||
LV | 25.11.2020 | ||
MC | 25.11.2020 | ||
NL | 25.11.2020 | ||
PL | 25.11.2020 | ||
RO | 25.11.2020 | ||
RS | 25.11.2020 | ||
SE | 25.11.2020 | ||
SI | 25.11.2020 | ||
SK | 25.11.2020 | ||
SM | 25.11.2020 | ||
BG | 25.02.2021 | ||
NO | 25.02.2021 | ||
GR | 26.02.2021 | ||
IS | 25.03.2021 | ||
PT | 25.03.2021 | ||
GB | 19.08.2021 | ||
IE | 19.08.2021 | ||
LU | 19.08.2021 | ||
Former [2022/23] | AL | 25.11.2020 | |
AT | 25.11.2020 | ||
CZ | 25.11.2020 | ||
DK | 25.11.2020 | ||
EE | 25.11.2020 | ||
ES | 25.11.2020 | ||
FI | 25.11.2020 | ||
HR | 25.11.2020 | ||
IT | 25.11.2020 | ||
LT | 25.11.2020 | ||
LV | 25.11.2020 | ||
MC | 25.11.2020 | ||
NL | 25.11.2020 | ||
PL | 25.11.2020 | ||
RO | 25.11.2020 | ||
RS | 25.11.2020 | ||
SE | 25.11.2020 | ||
SI | 25.11.2020 | ||
SK | 25.11.2020 | ||
SM | 25.11.2020 | ||
BG | 25.02.2021 | ||
NO | 25.02.2021 | ||
GR | 26.02.2021 | ||
IS | 25.03.2021 | ||
PT | 25.03.2021 | ||
LU | 19.08.2021 | ||
Former [2022/18] | AL | 25.11.2020 | |
AT | 25.11.2020 | ||
CZ | 25.11.2020 | ||
DK | 25.11.2020 | ||
EE | 25.11.2020 | ||
ES | 25.11.2020 | ||
FI | 25.11.2020 | ||
HR | 25.11.2020 | ||
IT | 25.11.2020 | ||
LT | 25.11.2020 | ||
LV | 25.11.2020 | ||
MC | 25.11.2020 | ||
NL | 25.11.2020 | ||
PL | 25.11.2020 | ||
RO | 25.11.2020 | ||
RS | 25.11.2020 | ||
SE | 25.11.2020 | ||
SI | 25.11.2020 | ||
SK | 25.11.2020 | ||
SM | 25.11.2020 | ||
BG | 25.02.2021 | ||
NO | 25.02.2021 | ||
GR | 26.02.2021 | ||
PT | 25.03.2021 | ||
Former [2022/10] | AL | 25.11.2020 | |
AT | 25.11.2020 | ||
CZ | 25.11.2020 | ||
DK | 25.11.2020 | ||
EE | 25.11.2020 | ||
ES | 25.11.2020 | ||
FI | 25.11.2020 | ||
HR | 25.11.2020 | ||
IT | 25.11.2020 | ||
LT | 25.11.2020 | ||
LV | 25.11.2020 | ||
NL | 25.11.2020 | ||
PL | 25.11.2020 | ||
RO | 25.11.2020 | ||
RS | 25.11.2020 | ||
SE | 25.11.2020 | ||
SI | 25.11.2020 | ||
SK | 25.11.2020 | ||
SM | 25.11.2020 | ||
BG | 25.02.2021 | ||
NO | 25.02.2021 | ||
GR | 26.02.2021 | ||
PT | 25.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/51] | AL | 25.11.2020 | |
AT | 25.11.2020 | ||
CZ | 25.11.2020 | ||
DK | 25.11.2020 | ||
EE | 25.11.2020 | ||
ES | 25.11.2020 | ||
FI | 25.11.2020 | ||
HR | 25.11.2020 | ||
IT | 25.11.2020 | ||
LT | 25.11.2020 | ||
LV | 25.11.2020 | ||
NL | 25.11.2020 | ||
PL | 25.11.2020 | ||
RO | 25.11.2020 | ||
RS | 25.11.2020 | ||
SE | 25.11.2020 | ||
SI | 25.11.2020 | ||
SK | 25.11.2020 | ||
SM | 25.11.2020 | ||
BG | 25.02.2021 | ||
NO | 25.02.2021 | ||
GR | 26.02.2021 | ||
IS | 25.03.2021 | ||
PT | 25.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/49] | AL | 25.11.2020 | |
AT | 25.11.2020 | ||
CZ | 25.11.2020 | ||
DK | 25.11.2020 | ||
EE | 25.11.2020 | ||
FI | 25.11.2020 | ||
HR | 25.11.2020 | ||
IT | 25.11.2020 | ||
LT | 25.11.2020 | ||
LV | 25.11.2020 | ||
NL | 25.11.2020 | ||
PL | 25.11.2020 | ||
RO | 25.11.2020 | ||
RS | 25.11.2020 | ||
SE | 25.11.2020 | ||
SI | 25.11.2020 | ||
SK | 25.11.2020 | ||
SM | 25.11.2020 | ||
BG | 25.02.2021 | ||
NO | 25.02.2021 | ||
GR | 26.02.2021 | ||
IS | 25.03.2021 | ||
PT | 25.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/48] | AL | 25.11.2020 | |
AT | 25.11.2020 | ||
CZ | 25.11.2020 | ||
DK | 25.11.2020 | ||
EE | 25.11.2020 | ||
FI | 25.11.2020 | ||
HR | 25.11.2020 | ||
IT | 25.11.2020 | ||
LT | 25.11.2020 | ||
LV | 25.11.2020 | ||
NL | 25.11.2020 | ||
PL | 25.11.2020 | ||
RO | 25.11.2020 | ||
RS | 25.11.2020 | ||
SE | 25.11.2020 | ||
SK | 25.11.2020 | ||
SM | 25.11.2020 | ||
BG | 25.02.2021 | ||
NO | 25.02.2021 | ||
GR | 26.02.2021 | ||
IS | 25.03.2021 | ||
PT | 25.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/46] | AL | 25.11.2020 | |
AT | 25.11.2020 | ||
CZ | 25.11.2020 | ||
DK | 25.11.2020 | ||
EE | 25.11.2020 | ||
FI | 25.11.2020 | ||
HR | 25.11.2020 | ||
LT | 25.11.2020 | ||
LV | 25.11.2020 | ||
NL | 25.11.2020 | ||
PL | 25.11.2020 | ||
RO | 25.11.2020 | ||
RS | 25.11.2020 | ||
SE | 25.11.2020 | ||
SK | 25.11.2020 | ||
SM | 25.11.2020 | ||
BG | 25.02.2021 | ||
NO | 25.02.2021 | ||
GR | 26.02.2021 | ||
IS | 25.03.2021 | ||
PT | 25.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/45] | AL | 25.11.2020 | |
AT | 25.11.2020 | ||
CZ | 25.11.2020 | ||
DK | 25.11.2020 | ||
EE | 25.11.2020 | ||
FI | 25.11.2020 | ||
HR | 25.11.2020 | ||
LT | 25.11.2020 | ||
LV | 25.11.2020 | ||
PL | 25.11.2020 | ||
RO | 25.11.2020 | ||
RS | 25.11.2020 | ||
SE | 25.11.2020 | ||
SK | 25.11.2020 | ||
SM | 25.11.2020 | ||
BG | 25.02.2021 | ||
NO | 25.02.2021 | ||
GR | 26.02.2021 | ||
IS | 25.03.2021 | ||
PT | 25.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/37] | AT | 25.11.2020 | |
CZ | 25.11.2020 | ||
DK | 25.11.2020 | ||
EE | 25.11.2020 | ||
FI | 25.11.2020 | ||
HR | 25.11.2020 | ||
LT | 25.11.2020 | ||
LV | 25.11.2020 | ||
PL | 25.11.2020 | ||
RO | 25.11.2020 | ||
RS | 25.11.2020 | ||
SE | 25.11.2020 | ||
SK | 25.11.2020 | ||
SM | 25.11.2020 | ||
BG | 25.02.2021 | ||
NO | 25.02.2021 | ||
GR | 26.02.2021 | ||
IS | 25.03.2021 | ||
PT | 25.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/36] | AT | 25.11.2020 | |
CZ | 25.11.2020 | ||
EE | 25.11.2020 | ||
FI | 25.11.2020 | ||
HR | 25.11.2020 | ||
LT | 25.11.2020 | ||
LV | 25.11.2020 | ||
PL | 25.11.2020 | ||
RO | 25.11.2020 | ||
RS | 25.11.2020 | ||
SE | 25.11.2020 | ||
SK | 25.11.2020 | ||
SM | 25.11.2020 | ||
BG | 25.02.2021 | ||
NO | 25.02.2021 | ||
GR | 26.02.2021 | ||
IS | 25.03.2021 | ||
PT | 25.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/35] | AT | 25.11.2020 | |
CZ | 25.11.2020 | ||
FI | 25.11.2020 | ||
HR | 25.11.2020 | ||
LT | 25.11.2020 | ||
LV | 25.11.2020 | ||
PL | 25.11.2020 | ||
RO | 25.11.2020 | ||
RS | 25.11.2020 | ||
SE | 25.11.2020 | ||
SK | 25.11.2020 | ||
SM | 25.11.2020 | ||
BG | 25.02.2021 | ||
NO | 25.02.2021 | ||
GR | 26.02.2021 | ||
IS | 25.03.2021 | ||
PT | 25.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/34] | AT | 25.11.2020 | |
CZ | 25.11.2020 | ||
FI | 25.11.2020 | ||
HR | 25.11.2020 | ||
LT | 25.11.2020 | ||
LV | 25.11.2020 | ||
PL | 25.11.2020 | ||
RS | 25.11.2020 | ||
SE | 25.11.2020 | ||
SM | 25.11.2020 | ||
BG | 25.02.2021 | ||
NO | 25.02.2021 | ||
GR | 26.02.2021 | ||
IS | 25.03.2021 | ||
PT | 25.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/33] | AT | 25.11.2020 | |
FI | 25.11.2020 | ||
HR | 25.11.2020 | ||
LT | 25.11.2020 | ||
LV | 25.11.2020 | ||
PL | 25.11.2020 | ||
RS | 25.11.2020 | ||
SE | 25.11.2020 | ||
SM | 25.11.2020 | ||
BG | 25.02.2021 | ||
NO | 25.02.2021 | ||
GR | 26.02.2021 | ||
IS | 25.03.2021 | ||
PT | 25.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/32] | AT | 25.11.2020 | |
FI | 25.11.2020 | ||
HR | 25.11.2020 | ||
LV | 25.11.2020 | ||
PL | 25.11.2020 | ||
RS | 25.11.2020 | ||
SE | 25.11.2020 | ||
SM | 25.11.2020 | ||
BG | 25.02.2021 | ||
NO | 25.02.2021 | ||
GR | 26.02.2021 | ||
IS | 25.03.2021 | ||
PT | 25.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/28] | AT | 25.11.2020 | |
FI | 25.11.2020 | ||
HR | 25.11.2020 | ||
LV | 25.11.2020 | ||
PL | 25.11.2020 | ||
RS | 25.11.2020 | ||
SE | 25.11.2020 | ||
BG | 25.02.2021 | ||
NO | 25.02.2021 | ||
GR | 26.02.2021 | ||
IS | 25.03.2021 | ||
PT | 25.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/25] | AT | 25.11.2020 | |
FI | 25.11.2020 | ||
LV | 25.11.2020 | ||
PL | 25.11.2020 | ||
RS | 25.11.2020 | ||
SE | 25.11.2020 | ||
BG | 25.02.2021 | ||
NO | 25.02.2021 | ||
GR | 26.02.2021 | ||
IS | 25.03.2021 | ||
PT | 25.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/24] | AT | 25.11.2020 | |
FI | 25.11.2020 | ||
LV | 25.11.2020 | ||
RS | 25.11.2020 | ||
SE | 25.11.2020 | ||
BG | 25.02.2021 | ||
NO | 25.02.2021 | ||
GR | 26.02.2021 | ||
PT | 25.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/23] | FI | 25.11.2020 | |
LV | 25.11.2020 | ||
RS | 25.11.2020 | ||
SE | 25.11.2020 | ||
NO | 25.02.2021 | ||
GR | 26.02.2021 | ||
PT | 25.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/22] | FI | 25.11.2020 | |
RS | 25.11.2020 | ||
NO | 25.02.2021 | ||
PT | 25.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/21] | FI | 25.11.2020 | |
PT | 25.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/20] | FI | 25.11.2020 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]EP1612866 (IMEC INTER UNI MICRO ELECTR [BE]) [Y] 1-13 * figure 1 * * paragraphs [0046] , [0 48] , [0 82] , [0 83] , [ 102] , [ 154] , [ 177] *; | [A]JP2008084942 (OKI ELECTRIC IND CO LTD) [A] 2,3,8,9 * figure 1 * * abstract ** paragraph [0021] *; | [YD]WO2009119357 (NGK INSULATORS LTD [JP], et al) [YD] 1-13 * paragraphs [0009] - [0013] - [0 71] , [0 82] , [ 116] * * figures 1-7 and associated text *; | [P]EP2259287 (NGK INSULATORS LTD [JP]) | International search | [Y]WO03032397 (CREE LIGHTING CO [US]); | [Y]JP2006024927 (IMEC INTER UNI MICRO ELECTR); | [Y]WO2009119357 (NGK INSULATORS LTD [JP], et al); | [Y]JP2009302370 (NIPPON TELEGRAPH & TELEPHONE); | [A]JP2010045343 (IMEC) | by applicant | WO2009119357 | - "Highly Reliable 250W High Electron Mobility Transistor Power Amplifier", Jpn. J. Appl. Phys., TOSHIHIDE KIKKAWA, (2005), vol. 44, pages 4896 - 4901 | - STACIA KELLER; YI-FENG WU; GIACINTA PARISH; NAIQIAN ZIANG; JANE J. XU; BERND P. KELLER; STEVEN P. DENBAARS; UMESH K. MISHRA, "Gallium Nitride Based High Power Heterojuncion Field Effect Transistors: process Development and Present Status at USCB", IEEE TRANS. ELECTRON DEVICES, (2001), vol. 48, pages 552 - 559 | - F. MEDJDOUB; J.-F. CARLIN; M. GONSCHOREK; E. FELTIN; M.A. PY; D. DUCATTEAU; C. GAQUIERE; N. GRANDJEAN; E. KOHN, "Can InAlN/GaN be an alternative to high power/high temperature AIGaN/GaN devices?", IEEE IEDM TECH. DIGEST IN IEEE IEDM, (2006), pages 673 - 676 | - AKIRA ENDOH; YOSHIMI YAMASHITA; KEIJI IKEDA; MASATAKA HIGASHIWAKI; KOHKI HIKOSAKA; TOSHIAKI MATSUI; SATOSHI HIYAMIZU; TAKACHI MIMU, "Non-Recessed-Gate Enhancement-Mode AlGaN/GaN High Electron Mobility Transistors with High RF Performance", JAPANESE JOURNAL OF APPLIED PHYSICS, (2004), vol. 43, no. 4B, doi:doi:10.1143/JJAP.43.2255, pages 2255 - 2258, XP001227746 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1143/JJAP.43.2255 | - WATARU SAITO; YOSHIHARU TAKADA; MASAHIKO KURAGUCHI; KUNIO TSUDA; ICHIRO OMURA, "Recessed-Gate Structure Approach Toward Normally Off High-Voltage AlGaN/GaN HEMT for Power Electronics Applications", IEEE TRANS. ELECTRON DEVICES, (2006), vol. 53, pages 356 - 362 | - MASAHIRO KANAMURA; TOSHIHIRO OHKI; TOSHIHIDE KIKKAWA; KENJI IMANISHI; TADAHIRO IMADA; ATSUSHI YAMADA; NAOKI HARA, "Enhancement-Mode GaN MIS-HEMTs With n-GaN/i-AlN/n-GaN Triple Cap Layer and High-K Gate Dielectrics", IEEE ELECTRON DEVICE LETT., (2010), vol. 31, pages 189 - 191 | - K. OTA; K. ENDO; Y. OKAMOTO; Y. ANDO; H. MIYAMOTO; H. SHIMAWAKI, "A Normally-off GaN FET with High Threshold Voltage Uniformity Using A Novel Piezo Neutralization Technique", IEEE IEDM2009 TECH. DIGEST, pages 1 - 4 | - HIROSHI KAMBAYASHI; YOSHIHIRO SATOH; SHINYA OOMOTO; TAKUYA KOKAWA; TAKEHIRO NOMURA; SADAHIRO KATO; TAT-SING PAWL CHOW, "Over 100A Operation normally-off AlGaN/GaN hybrid MOS-HFET on Si substrate with high-breakdown voltage", SOLID-STATE ELECTRONICS, (2010), vol. 54, pages 660 - 664, XP026994157 |