EP2608719 - BIOPSY MARKER DELIVERY DEVICES AND METHODS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 12.01.2018 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 14.09.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.01.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 14.02.2018 [2018/07] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Devicor Medical Products, Inc. 300 E Business Way Fifth Floor Cincinnati, OH 45241 / US | [2013/33] |
Former [2013/27] | For all designated states Devicor Medical Products, Inc. 300 E Business Way, 5th Floor Cincinnati, OH 45241 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SPEEG, Trevor, W. V. 4712 Richey Road Williamsburg, OH 45176 / US | 02 /
MUMAW, Daniel, J. 953 Long Lane Milford OH 45150 / US | 03 /
MOORE, Kyle, P. 6518 Falling Leaves Court Mason OH 45040 / US | 04 /
CRAIG, Harold, W. 11110 Brookbridge Drive Cincinnati OH 45249 / US | 05 /
SHELTON, Frederick, E. IV 245 East Main Street Hillsboro, OH 45133 / US | [2013/27] | Representative(s) | Tunstall, Christopher Stephen Carpmaels & Ransford LLP One Southampton Row London WC1B 5HA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2013/27] | Tunstall, Christopher Stephen Carpmaels & Ransford One Southampton Row London WC1B 5HA / GB | Application number, filing date | 11820318.1 | 18.07.2011 | WO2011US44323 | Priority number, date | US20100862816 | 25.08.2010 Original published format: US 862816 | [2013/27] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2012027030 | Date: | 01.03.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/09] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2608719 | Date: | 03.07.2013 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.03.2012 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2013/27] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 03.05.2012 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.12.2016 | Classification | IPC: | A61B10/02, A61B17/34, A61M5/14 | [2013/27] | CPC: |
A61B10/0275 (EP,US);
A61B10/02 (KR);
A61B17/34 (KR);
A61B90/39 (EP,US);
A61M25/01 (KR);
A61M5/14 (KR);
A61B10/0283 (EP,US);
A61B2010/0093 (EP,US);
A61B2010/0208 (EP,US);
A61B2017/00398 (EP,US);
A61B2017/00734 (EP,US);
A61B2090/3908 (EP,US);
A61B2090/3987 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/27] | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUR ABGABE VON BIOPSIEMARKERN | [2013/27] | English: | BIOPSY MARKER DELIVERY DEVICES AND METHODS | [2013/27] | French: | DISPOSITIFS ET PROCÉDÉS D'ADMINISTRATION DE MARQUEUR DE BIOPSIE | [2013/27] | Entry into regional phase | 22.03.2013 | National basic fee paid | 22.03.2013 | Search fee paid | 22.03.2013 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.03.2013 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.03.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 22.03.2013 | Examination requested [2013/27] | 20.07.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2018/07] | 15.09.2017 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report not received in time [2018/07] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.07.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.07.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.07.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 22.07.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 24.07.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO0038579 (VIVANT MEDICAL INC [US], et al) [X] 1-15 * page 34, line 11 - page 42, line 17; figures 9a-9f,10a-10h,11a-11e *; | [X]US6220248 (VOEGELE JAMES W [US], et al) [X] 1-15 * column 6, line 59 - column 8, line 37; figures 1-13 *; | [X]US2003050571 (ZARINS SASCHA [US], et al) [X] 1-15 * paragraphs [0037] - [0065]; figures 1-5 *; | [X]US2005228311 (BECKMAN ANDREW T [US], et al) [X] 1-15 * paragraphs [0028] - [0035]; figures 1-11 *; | [L]US2011071391 (SPEEG TREVOR W V [US]) [L] 1-15* paragraphs [0031] - [0048] - [0060] - [0074]; figures 1-3, 10-15 * | International search | [A]US2008058672 (SHABAZ MARTIN V [US], et al); | [A]US2008161720 (NICOSON ZACHARY R [US], et al); | [A]EP2156807 (ETHICON ENDO SURGERY INC [US]); | [X]US2010130887 (SELIS JAMES E [US]) |