EP2609626 - POWER FET WITH A RESONANT TRANSISTOR GATE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 01.03.2024 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 08.06.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 31.01.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.03.2024 | (Expected) grant | published on 03.04.2024 [2024/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states De Rochemont, L. Pierre 12501 Tech Ridge Blvd. Austin, Texas 78753 / US | [2013/27] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2013/27] | Representative(s) | FRKelly Waterways House Grand Canal Quay Dublin D02 PD39 / IE | [2024/14] |
Former [2013/27] | Casey, Lindsay Joseph FRKelly 27 Clyde Road Ballsbridge Dublin 4 / IE | Application number, filing date | 11820554.1 | 23.08.2011 | [2024/14] | WO2011US48870 | Priority number, date | US20100375894P | 23.08.2010 Original published format: US 375894 P | [2013/27] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2012027412 | Date: | 01.03.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/09] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2609626 | Date: | 03.07.2013 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.03.2012 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2013/27] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2609626 | Date: | 03.04.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/14] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 01.03.2012 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.11.2014 | Classification | IPC: | H01L29/66, H01L29/423, H01L29/43, H01L23/64, H01L29/78, H01L25/16, H01L29/739, G06F1/32 | [2023/20] | CPC: |
H01L23/64 (EP,US);
H01L27/0629 (US);
G06F1/3203 (US);
H01L23/5222 (US);
H01L23/5227 (US);
H01L23/5228 (US);
H01L23/528 (US);
H01L23/645 (US);
H01L23/66 (US);
H01L25/16 (EP,US);
H01L28/10 (EP,US);
H01L28/20 (EP,US);
H01L28/40 (EP,US);
H01L29/0634 (US);
H01L29/42376 (US);
H01L29/4238 (EP,US);
H01L29/43 (EP,US);
H01L29/435 (EP,US);
H01L29/7395 (EP,US);
H01L29/78 (EP,US);
H01L29/7803 (EP,US);
H01L29/7831 (US);
H01L2223/6627 (EP,US);
H01L2223/6661 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
H01L2924/0002, H01L2924/00 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2014/49] | H01L29/66, H01L29/423, H01L29/43, H01L23/64, H01L29/739, H01L25/16, H01L29/78, H01L49/02, G06F1/32, // H01L23/66 | ||
Former IPC [2013/27] | H01L29/66 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/27] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | POWER-FET MIT EINEM RESONANZ-TRANSISTOR-GATE | [2013/27] | English: | POWER FET WITH A RESONANT TRANSISTOR GATE | [2013/27] | French: | TRANSISTOR À EFFET DE CHAMP DE PUISSANCE AYANT UNE GRILLE DE TRANSISTOR RÉSONANTE | [2013/27] | Entry into regional phase | 25.03.2013 | National basic fee paid | 25.03.2013 | Search fee paid | 25.03.2013 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.03.2013 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.03.2013 | Examination requested [2013/27] | 27.05.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 06.10.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 15.05.2017 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 21.07.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.03.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 18.09.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.06.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.10.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.06.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.10.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 17.10.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 17.10.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 06.10.2016 | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 21.07.2017 | Request for further processing filed | 21.07.2017 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 02.08.2017 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.08.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.09.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.01.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 21.02.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 28.08.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 28.02.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 28.02.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 26.02.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 25.02.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 24.02.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 28.02.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.2014 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   29.09.2014 | 31.08.2015 | 05   M06   Fee paid on   27.01.2016 | 31.08.2016 | 06   M06   Fee paid on   21.02.2017 | 31.08.2018 | 08   M06   Fee paid on   28.02.2019 | 31.08.2019 | 09   M06   Fee paid on   28.02.2020 | 31.08.2020 | 10   M06   Fee paid on   26.02.2021 | 31.08.2021 | 11   M06   Fee paid on   25.02.2022 | 31.08.2022 | 12   M06   Fee paid on   24.02.2023 | 31.08.2023 | 13   M06   Fee paid on   28.02.2024 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [ ] - No further relevant documents disclosed | International search | [Y]GB1125897 (WESTINGHOUSE ELECTRIC CORP); | [Y]EP0026056 (WESTERN ELECTRIC CO [US]); | [Y]US5130675 (SUGAWARA HIDEO [JP]); | [Y]US5263198 (GEDDES JOHN J [US], et al); | [Y]US2002110004 (PARKS DAVID B [US]); | [Y]US6541820 (BOL IGOR [US]); | [Y]US2006086994 (VIEFERS SUSANNE [NO], et al); | [Y]US2008136395 (BENNETT PAUL T [US]); | [A]US2009015314 (KIRCHMEIER THOMAS [DE], et al) | Examination | JPH0888359 |