EP2659438 - METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR MARKING MANUFACTURED ITEMS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 08.09.2023 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 11.08.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.09.2023 | Refusal of application | published on 11.10.2023 [2023/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states INEXTO SA Avenue Edouard-Dapples 7 1006 Lausanne / CH | [2016/44] |
Former [2013/45] | For all designated states Digital Coding and Tracking Association c/o Transcontag AG Dufourstrasse 55 8008 Zürich / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CHATELAIN, Philippe Chemin de Chaudremont 12a CH-1373 Chavornay / CH | 02 /
CHANEZ, Patrick Rte d'Yverdon-les-Bains 405 CH-1468 Cheyres / CH | 03 /
FRADET, Erwan Chemin du Grabe 3A 1091 Grandvaux / CH | 04 /
SAGER, Alain Route de Reynet 4 CH-1615 Bossonnens / CH | [2014/27] |
Former [2013/45] | 01 /
CHATELAIN, Philippe Chemin de Chaudremont 12a CH-1373 Chavornay / CH | ||
02 /
CHANEZ, Patrick Rte d'Yverdon-les-Bains 405 CH-1468 Cheyres / CH | |||
03 /
FRADET, Erwan Chemin du Grabe 3A CH-1091 Grandvaux / CH | |||
04 /
SAGER, Alain Route de Reynet 4 CH-1615 Bossonnens / CH | Representative(s) | Cabinet Beau de Loménie 51 avenue Jean Jaurès BP 7073 69301 Lyon Cedex 07 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2013/45] | Fischer, Britta Ruth E. BLUM & CO. AG Vorderberg 11 8044 Zürich / CH | Application number, filing date | 11820843.8 | 21.12.2011 | WO2011EP73588 | Priority number, date | EP20100252258 | 30.12.2010 Original published format: EP 10252258 | [2013/45] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2012089582 | Date: | 05.07.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/27] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2659438 | Date: | 06.11.2013 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.07.2012 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2013/45] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 05.07.2012 | Classification | IPC: | G06Q10/00 | [2013/45] | CPC: |
G06Q30/0185 (EP,US);
G06Q10/08 (KR);
G06Q10/06 (EP,US);
G06Q10/087 (EP,US);
H04L9/0816 (US);
H04L9/0819 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/45] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR MARKIERUNG VON ERZEUGNISSEN | [2013/45] | English: | METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR MARKING MANUFACTURED ITEMS | [2013/45] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET APPAREIL PERMETTANT DE MARQUER DES ARTICLES FABRIQUÉS | [2013/45] | Entry into regional phase | 03.07.2013 | National basic fee paid | 03.07.2013 | Designation fee(s) paid | 03.07.2013 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 03.07.2013 | Examination requested [2013/45] | 02.04.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 14.08.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 11.01.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.09.2019 | Date of oral proceedings | 06.02.2020 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 11.02.2020 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2023/41] | 08.08.2023 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2023/41] | Appeal following examination | 09.04.2020 | Appeal received No. T1479/20 | 18.06.2020 | Statement of grounds filed | 08.08.2023 | Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the applicant withdrawn | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 14.08.2017 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.12.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 03.11.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.10.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.12.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 22.12.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 21.12.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 23.12.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 22.12.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 20.12.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 22.12.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 12 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]GB2342743 (ELLIOT NICHOLAS PAUL [GB], et al) [A] 1-15 * abstract * * page 1, line 1 - page 3, line 12 * * page 5, line 25 - page 6, line 23 *; | [XI]EP1645992 (PHILIP MORRIS PRODUCTS SA [CH]) [X] 1-4,13 * abstract * * paragraph [0006] - paragraph [0008] * * paragraph [0016] - paragraph [0021] * * paragraph [0023] - paragraph [0034] * * paragraph [0040] - paragraph [0059] * * paragraph [0062] - paragraph [0065] * * paragraph [0069] * * claim 1 * [I] 1-15; | [A]US2010258641 (YU ZHI [CN]) [A] 1-15* abstract *; | [I]WO2010140892 (KEZZLER AS [NO], et al) [I] 1-15 * abstract * * page 4, line 21 - page 6, line 8 * * page 7, line 5 - page 14, line 27 * * page 20, line 10 - line 14 * |