EP2613409 - CONNECTOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 15.04.2016 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.04.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 18.05.2016 [2016/20] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Yazaki Corporation 4-28, Mita 1-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 108-8333 / JP | [2013/28] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HAMADA Keiji c/o Yazaki Parts Co. Ltd. 1500 Mishuku Susono-shi Shizuoka / JP | 02 /
NAKAGISHI Takumi c/o Yazaki Parts Co. Ltd. 1500 Mishuku Susono-shi Shizuoka / JP | 03 /
TSUBO Keigo c/o Yazaki Parts Co., Ltd. 1500, Mishuku Susono-shi Shizuoka / JP | 04 /
FUJINO Kazuhiro c/o Yazaki Syscomplus Co., Ltd. 2-2-1, Hongoku-cho Nhonbashi Chuo-ku Tokyo / JP | 05 /
MURAYAMA Ryusuke c/o Yazaki Syscomplus Co. Ltd. 1-51-1, Hatsudai Shibuya-ku Tokyo / JP | [2013/28] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2013/28] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 11821677.9 | 26.08.2011 | WO2011JP69318 | Priority number, date | JP20100198068 | 03.09.2010 Original published format: JP 2010198068 | [2013/28] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2012029660 | Date: | 08.03.2012 | Language: | JA | [2012/10] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2613409 | Date: | 10.07.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/28] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 08.03.2012 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.12.2013 | Classification | IPC: | H01R12/72, H01R12/57, H01R12/70 | [2014/03] | CPC: |
H01R12/724 (EP,US);
H01R12/71 (US);
H01R12/57 (EP,US);
H01R12/7011 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2013/28] | H01R12/71 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/28] | Title | German: | VERBINDER | [2013/28] | English: | CONNECTOR | [2013/28] | French: | CONNECTEUR | [2013/28] | Entry into regional phase | 01.03.2013 | Translation filed | 01.03.2013 | National basic fee paid | 01.03.2013 | Search fee paid | 01.03.2013 | Designation fee(s) paid | 01.03.2013 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 01.03.2013 | Examination requested [2013/28] | 15.07.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 23.07.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.12.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2016/20] | 08.01.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2016/20] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 23.07.2015 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.08.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.08.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.08.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JP3145209U (HON HAI PREC IND CO LTD) [X] 1,3,5 * figures 1,2,8-10 *; | [X]US2009042450 (ZHENG QI-SHENG [CN], et al) [X] 1,3,5 * paragraph [0048] - paragraph [0054] * * figures 34-45 *; | [X]US2010173529 (HE JIA-YONG [CN], et al) [X] 1,2,4 * figures 1, 12,13 *; | [X]JP2010157505 (HON HAI PREC IND CO LTD) [X] 1,2,4* figures 1,7 * | International search | [A]JPH0485682U (HONDA TSUSHIN KOGYO CO., LTD.); | [A]JP2000243520 (BERG TECH INC); | [A]JP3134262U (MITSUMI ELECTRIC CO., LTD.); | [X]JP2009043717 (HON HAI PREC IND CO LTD) | by applicant | JP2007179960 | JP2009021152 | JP2010027456 | JP20100198068 |