EP2611737 - FLAME PROOF REACTOR AND SYSTEM FOR TREATING LIQUIDS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.10.2018 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 27.10.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 26.06.2017 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 12.12.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL, IS | published on 12.08.2020 [2020/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states AlfaWall Aktiebolag Hans Stahles Väg 7 147 41 Tumba / SE | [2017/48] |
Former [2013/28] | For all designated states AlfaWall Aktiebolag Hans Stahles Väg 7 147 41 Tumba / SE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BERG, Magnus Konditorsvägen 1 S-128 69 Sköndal / SE | [2013/28] | Representative(s) | Alfa Laval Attorneys Alfa Laval Corporate AB Group Patent P.O. Box 73 221 00 Lund / SE | [N/P] |
Former [2014/17] | Alfa Laval Attorneys Alfa Laval Corporate AB Patent Department P.O. Box 73 221 00 Lund / SE | Application number, filing date | 11822229.8 | 02.09.2011 | [2017/48] | WO2011SE51059 | Priority number, date | SE20100000897 | 03.09.2010 Original published format: SE 1000897 | [2013/28] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2012030294 | Date: | 08.03.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/10] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2611737 | Date: | 10.07.2013 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.03.2012 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2013/28] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2611737 | Date: | 29.11.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/48] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | SE | 08.03.2012 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.07.2014 | Classification | IPC: | C02F1/32, F21V31/00, H01J61/50, // F21V25/12, H01R33/965 | [2014/32] | CPC: |
C02F1/325 (EP);
C02F1/32 (KR);
H01J61/50 (EP);
C02F2103/008 (EP);
C02F2201/004 (EP);
C02F2201/3227 (EP);
C02F2201/326 (EP);
C02F2209/02 (EP);
C02F2209/42 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2013/28] | C02F1/32, F21V31/00, H01J61/50 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/28] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | FEUERFESTER REAKTOR UND SYSTEM ZUR BEHANDLUNG VON FLÜSSIGKEITEN | [2013/28] | English: | FLAME PROOF REACTOR AND SYSTEM FOR TREATING LIQUIDS | [2013/28] | French: | RÉACTEUR IGNIFUGÉ ET SYSTÈME POUR TRAITER DES LIQUIDES | [2013/28] | Entry into regional phase | 07.03.2013 | National basic fee paid | 07.03.2013 | Search fee paid | 07.03.2013 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.03.2013 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.03.2013 | Examination requested [2013/28] | 19.01.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 29.07.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.12.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.12.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.04.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.10.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 12.12.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.06.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.10.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 19.10.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 19.10.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 29.07.2015 | Opposition(s) | 30.08.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/45] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.09.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.09.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.09.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 13.09.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 12.09.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 02.09.2011 | AL | 29.11.2017 | AT | 29.11.2017 | CY | 29.11.2017 | CZ | 29.11.2017 | EE | 29.11.2017 | ES | 29.11.2017 | FI | 29.11.2017 | HR | 29.11.2017 | IT | 29.11.2017 | LT | 29.11.2017 | LV | 29.11.2017 | MC | 29.11.2017 | MK | 29.11.2017 | NL | 29.11.2017 | PL | 29.11.2017 | PT | 29.11.2017 | RO | 29.11.2017 | RS | 29.11.2017 | SE | 29.11.2017 | SI | 29.11.2017 | SK | 29.11.2017 | SM | 29.11.2017 | TR | 29.11.2017 | BG | 28.02.2018 | GR | 01.03.2018 | IS | 29.03.2018 | [2020/33] |
Former [2020/31] | HU | 02.09.2011 | |
AT | 29.11.2017 | ||
CY | 29.11.2017 | ||
CZ | 29.11.2017 | ||
EE | 29.11.2017 | ||
ES | 29.11.2017 | ||
FI | 29.11.2017 | ||
HR | 29.11.2017 | ||
IT | 29.11.2017 | ||
LT | 29.11.2017 | ||
LV | 29.11.2017 | ||
MC | 29.11.2017 | ||
MK | 29.11.2017 | ||
NL | 29.11.2017 | ||
PL | 29.11.2017 | ||
PT | 29.11.2017 | ||
RO | 29.11.2017 | ||
RS | 29.11.2017 | ||
SE | 29.11.2017 | ||
SI | 29.11.2017 | ||
SK | 29.11.2017 | ||
SM | 29.11.2017 | ||
TR | 29.11.2017 | ||
BG | 28.02.2018 | ||
GR | 01.03.2018 | ||
Former [2020/27] | HU | 02.09.2011 | |
AT | 29.11.2017 | ||
CY | 29.11.2017 | ||
CZ | 29.11.2017 | ||
EE | 29.11.2017 | ||
ES | 29.11.2017 | ||
FI | 29.11.2017 | ||
HR | 29.11.2017 | ||
IT | 29.11.2017 | ||
LT | 29.11.2017 | ||
LV | 29.11.2017 | ||
MC | 29.11.2017 | ||
NL | 29.11.2017 | ||
PL | 29.11.2017 | ||
PT | 29.11.2017 | ||
RO | 29.11.2017 | ||
RS | 29.11.2017 | ||
SE | 29.11.2017 | ||
SI | 29.11.2017 | ||
SK | 29.11.2017 | ||
SM | 29.11.2017 | ||
TR | 29.11.2017 | ||
BG | 28.02.2018 | ||
GR | 01.03.2018 | ||
Former [2020/16] | AT | 29.11.2017 | |
CY | 29.11.2017 | ||
CZ | 29.11.2017 | ||
EE | 29.11.2017 | ||
ES | 29.11.2017 | ||
FI | 29.11.2017 | ||
HR | 29.11.2017 | ||
IT | 29.11.2017 | ||
LT | 29.11.2017 | ||
LV | 29.11.2017 | ||
MC | 29.11.2017 | ||
NL | 29.11.2017 | ||
PL | 29.11.2017 | ||
RO | 29.11.2017 | ||
RS | 29.11.2017 | ||
SE | 29.11.2017 | ||
SI | 29.11.2017 | ||
SK | 29.11.2017 | ||
SM | 29.11.2017 | ||
TR | 29.11.2017 | ||
BG | 28.02.2018 | ||
GR | 01.03.2018 | ||
Former [2019/24] | AT | 29.11.2017 | |
CY | 29.11.2017 | ||
CZ | 29.11.2017 | ||
EE | 29.11.2017 | ||
ES | 29.11.2017 | ||
FI | 29.11.2017 | ||
HR | 29.11.2017 | ||
IT | 29.11.2017 | ||
LT | 29.11.2017 | ||
LV | 29.11.2017 | ||
MC | 29.11.2017 | ||
NL | 29.11.2017 | ||
PL | 29.11.2017 | ||
RO | 29.11.2017 | ||
RS | 29.11.2017 | ||
SE | 29.11.2017 | ||
SI | 29.11.2017 | ||
SK | 29.11.2017 | ||
SM | 29.11.2017 | ||
BG | 28.02.2018 | ||
GR | 01.03.2018 | ||
Former [2018/52] | AT | 29.11.2017 | |
CY | 29.11.2017 | ||
CZ | 29.11.2017 | ||
EE | 29.11.2017 | ||
ES | 29.11.2017 | ||
FI | 29.11.2017 | ||
HR | 29.11.2017 | ||
IT | 29.11.2017 | ||
LT | 29.11.2017 | ||
LV | 29.11.2017 | ||
NL | 29.11.2017 | ||
PL | 29.11.2017 | ||
RO | 29.11.2017 | ||
RS | 29.11.2017 | ||
SE | 29.11.2017 | ||
SI | 29.11.2017 | ||
SK | 29.11.2017 | ||
SM | 29.11.2017 | ||
BG | 28.02.2018 | ||
GR | 01.03.2018 | ||
Former [2018/40] | AT | 29.11.2017 | |
CY | 29.11.2017 | ||
CZ | 29.11.2017 | ||
EE | 29.11.2017 | ||
ES | 29.11.2017 | ||
FI | 29.11.2017 | ||
HR | 29.11.2017 | ||
IT | 29.11.2017 | ||
LT | 29.11.2017 | ||
LV | 29.11.2017 | ||
NL | 29.11.2017 | ||
PL | 29.11.2017 | ||
RO | 29.11.2017 | ||
RS | 29.11.2017 | ||
SE | 29.11.2017 | ||
SK | 29.11.2017 | ||
SM | 29.11.2017 | ||
BG | 28.02.2018 | ||
GR | 01.03.2018 | ||
Former [2018/39] | AT | 29.11.2017 | |
CY | 29.11.2017 | ||
CZ | 29.11.2017 | ||
EE | 29.11.2017 | ||
ES | 29.11.2017 | ||
FI | 29.11.2017 | ||
HR | 29.11.2017 | ||
IT | 29.11.2017 | ||
LT | 29.11.2017 | ||
LV | 29.11.2017 | ||
NL | 29.11.2017 | ||
PL | 29.11.2017 | ||
RS | 29.11.2017 | ||
SE | 29.11.2017 | ||
SK | 29.11.2017 | ||
SM | 29.11.2017 | ||
BG | 28.02.2018 | ||
GR | 01.03.2018 | ||
Former [2018/37] | AT | 29.11.2017 | |
CY | 29.11.2017 | ||
CZ | 29.11.2017 | ||
EE | 29.11.2017 | ||
ES | 29.11.2017 | ||
FI | 29.11.2017 | ||
HR | 29.11.2017 | ||
LT | 29.11.2017 | ||
LV | 29.11.2017 | ||
NL | 29.11.2017 | ||
PL | 29.11.2017 | ||
RS | 29.11.2017 | ||
SE | 29.11.2017 | ||
SK | 29.11.2017 | ||
SM | 29.11.2017 | ||
BG | 28.02.2018 | ||
GR | 01.03.2018 | ||
Former [2018/34] | AT | 29.11.2017 | |
ES | 29.11.2017 | ||
FI | 29.11.2017 | ||
HR | 29.11.2017 | ||
LT | 29.11.2017 | ||
LV | 29.11.2017 | ||
NL | 29.11.2017 | ||
RS | 29.11.2017 | ||
SE | 29.11.2017 | ||
BG | 28.02.2018 | ||
GR | 01.03.2018 | ||
Former [2018/24] | AT | 29.11.2017 | |
ES | 29.11.2017 | ||
FI | 29.11.2017 | ||
HR | 29.11.2017 | ||
LT | 29.11.2017 | ||
LV | 29.11.2017 | ||
RS | 29.11.2017 | ||
SE | 29.11.2017 | ||
BG | 28.02.2018 | ||
GR | 01.03.2018 | ||
Former [2018/23] | AT | 29.11.2017 | |
ES | 29.11.2017 | ||
FI | 29.11.2017 | ||
HR | 29.11.2017 | ||
LT | 29.11.2017 | ||
RS | 29.11.2017 | ||
SE | 29.11.2017 | ||
GR | 01.03.2018 | ||
Former [2018/22] | ES | 29.11.2017 | |
FI | 29.11.2017 | ||
LT | 29.11.2017 | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US2009321365 (ERIKSSON EMIL [SE], et al) [X] 1,3-6 * figures 2,3 * * paragraph [0019] * * paragraph [0059] - paragraph [0081] * * paragraph [0096] * [I] 2,7-14; | [A]US6039460 (NG TONY [US], et al) [A] 1-14 * the whole document *; | [A]US5832361 (FORET TODD LEON [US]) [A] 1-14 * the whole document * | International search | [A]US4828508 (WETTENGEL LOTHAR [DE], et al); | [A]DE3910872 (STAHL R SCHALTGERAETE GMBH); | [A]DE3943065 (STAHL SCHALTGERAETE GMBH R); | [A]US5030125 (TOMA KIYOMITSU [US], et al); | [A]DE19753505 (WECKENMANN JUERGEN [DE]); | [A]US2003178924 (NAKANO KOJI [JP]); | [A]US2004195954 (PIROVIC ARPAD [US]); | [A]KR100837044B (KANG PIL GU) |