EP2612450 - COMBINED CHANNEL STATE INFORMATION AND COMBINED CHANNEL QUALITY INDICATOR IN WIRELESS COMMUNICATION SYSTEMS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 29.06.2018 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 26.03.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.06.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 01.08.2018 [2018/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Intel Corporation 2200 Mission College Boulevard Santa Clara, CA 95054 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2013/28] | For all designated states Intel Corporation MS: RNB-4-150 2200 Mission College Boulevard Santa Clara, CA 95052 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ZHU, Yuan Room 605 Building 16 Mo Li Yuan Bei Yuan Jia Yuan, Chao Yang District. Beijing 100012 / CN | 02 /
LI, Qinghua 5117 Chiltern Lane San Ramon California 94582 / US | 03 /
CHEN, Xiaogang Xitucheng Road BUPT Post box 92 Beijing 100876 / CN | [2013/28] | Representative(s) | HGF Fountain Precinct Balm Green Sheffield S1 2JA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2013/28] | Harrison Goddard Foote LLP Fountain Precinct Balm Green Sheffield S1 2JA / GB | Application number, filing date | 11822420.3 | 29.08.2011 | WO2011US49488 | Priority number, date | US20100873006 | 31.08.2010 Original published format: US 873006 | [2013/28] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2012030687 | Date: | 08.03.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/10] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2612450 | Date: | 10.07.2013 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.03.2012 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2013/28] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 08.03.2012 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.01.2017 | Classification | IPC: | H04B7/04, H04W88/02 | [2013/28] | CPC: |
H04W24/10 (EP,US);
H04L1/0029 (EP,US);
H04L1/0031 (EP,US);
H04L1/205 (EP,US);
H04L1/0026 (EP,US);
H04L25/0212 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/28] | Title | German: | KOMBINIERTE KANALSTATUSINFORMATIONEN UND KOMBINIERTER KANALQUALITÄTSINDIKATOR IN DRAHTLOSEN KOMMUNIKATIONSSYSTEMEN | [2013/28] | English: | COMBINED CHANNEL STATE INFORMATION AND COMBINED CHANNEL QUALITY INDICATOR IN WIRELESS COMMUNICATION SYSTEMS | [2013/28] | French: | INFORMATION COMBINÉE D'ÉTAT DE CANAL ET INDICATEUR COMBINÉ DE QUALITÉ DE CANAL DANS DES SYSTÈMES DE RADIOCOMMUNICATION | [2013/28] | Entry into regional phase | 20.03.2013 | National basic fee paid | 20.03.2013 | Search fee paid | 20.03.2013 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.03.2013 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.03.2013 | Examination requested [2013/28] | 31.07.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.03.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2018/31] | 27.03.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2018/31] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.08.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.08.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.08.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 11.08.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.2017 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US7359311 (PARANJPE MILIND D [US], et al) [A] 1,8,11 * abstract *; | [A]US2008095185 (DIGIROLAMO ROCCO [CA], et al) [A] 1,8,11 * abstract * * paragraph [0042] *; | [A]US2008080635 (HUGL KLAUS [FI], et al) [A] 1,8,11 * abstract * * paragraph [0041] * | [A] - LIAN ZHOU ET AL, "Integrated Power Control and Rate Allocation for Radio Resource Management in Uplink Wideband CDMA Systems", WORLD OF WIRELESS MOBILE AND MULTIMEDIA NETWORKS, 2005. WOWMOM 2005. SIXTH IEEE INTERNATIONAL SYMPOSIUM ON A TAORMINA-GIARDINI NAXOS, ITALY 13-16 JUNE 2005, PISCATAWAY, NJ, USA,IEEE, LOS ALAMITOS, CA, USA, (20050613), doi:10.1109/WOWMOM.2005.55, ISBN 978-0-7695-2342-2, pages 428 - 436, XP010811112 [A] 1-15 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/WOWMOM.2005.55 | International search | [A]US2010172432 (LI QINGHUA [US], et al); | [A]US2010091678 (CHEN RUNHUA [US], et al); | [A]US2009059844 (KO HYUN SOO [KR], et al); | [A]US2009179797 (KWON YOUNG HOON [US], et al) |