EP2611908 - CELL CULTURE SCREEN FOR AGENTS THAT CONTROL ADIPOGENESIS AND MYOFIBROBLAST DIFFERENTIATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 08.01.2016 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.01.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 10.02.2016 [2016/06] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states The Regents of the University of California 1111 Franklin Street, 12th Floor Oakland, CA 94607 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2013/28] | For all designated states The Regents of the University of California 1111 Franklin Street 12th Floor Oakland, CA 94607-5200 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BISSELL, Mina, J. 854 Euclid Avenue Berkeley, CA 94708 / US | 02 /
TURLEY, Eva, A. 1-517 Dufferin Avenue London, Ontario N6B 2A3 / CA | 03 /
BAHRAMI, Seyed Bahram 6363 Christie Avenue Apt. 1726 Emeryville, CA 94608 / US | [2013/28] | Representative(s) | Chapman, Lee Phillip J A Kemp 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | [2013/28] | Application number, filing date | 11822599.4 | 31.08.2011 | WO2011US50054 | Priority number, date | US20100380125P | 03.09.2010 Original published format: US 380125 P | US20100379265P | 01.09.2010 Original published format: US 379265 P | [2013/28] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2012031015 | Date: | 08.03.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/10] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2611908 | Date: | 10.07.2013 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.03.2012 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2013/28] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 08.03.2012 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.03.2014 | Classification | IPC: | C12N5/071 | [2013/28] | CPC: |
C12N5/0653 (EP,US);
C12N5/0602 (KR);
G01N33/5073 (US);
A61K49/0008 (US);
C12Q1/02 (KR);
G01N33/5044 (EP,US);
C12N2503/02 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/28] | Title | German: | ZELLKULTURSIEB FÜR MITTEL ZUR STEUERUNG VON ADIPOGENESE UND MYOFIBROBLASTENDIFFERENZIERUNG | [2013/28] | English: | CELL CULTURE SCREEN FOR AGENTS THAT CONTROL ADIPOGENESIS AND MYOFIBROBLAST DIFFERENTIATION | [2013/28] | French: | CRIBLAGE DE CULTURE CELLULAIRE POUR AGENTS RÉGULANT L'ADIPOGENÈSE ET LA DIFFÉRENCIATION MYOFRIBROPLASTIQUE | [2013/28] | Entry into regional phase | 21.03.2013 | National basic fee paid | 21.03.2013 | Search fee paid | 21.03.2013 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.03.2013 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.03.2013 | Examination requested [2013/28] | 25.09.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 25.02.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 08.09.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2016/06] | 06.10.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2016/06] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 25.02.2015 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.08.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.08.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.08.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP1158044 (HELIX RES INST [JP]) [X] 1-9,11-15 * paragraphs [0017] , [0028] , [0 33] , [0 46]; example 3; claim 3 *; | [X]WO0044882 (ZEN BIO INC [US], et al) [X] 1-15 * page 11, line 1 - line 28 * * page 12, line 11 - line 15 * * page 17, line 7 - page 18, line 5 *; | [X] - BABISH JOHN G ET AL, "Antidiabetic Screening of Commercial Botanical Products in 3T3-L1 Adipocytes and db/db Mice", JOURNAL OF MEDICINAL FOOD, (201006), vol. 13, no. 3, ISSN 1096-620X, pages 535 - 547, XP002720606 [X] 1-9,11-15 * page 536, column r, paragraph l * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1089/jmf.2009.0110 | International search | [X]US2005008621 (KIRKLAND JAMES [US], et al); | [Y]US2009176306 (TAIRA TOSHIO [JP], et al); | [Y]US7576052 (KAHN C RONALD [US], et al); | [Y]US2009298164 (CATTADORIS HENRY J [US], et al) |