EP2612345 - SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR IONIZATION OF MOLECULES FOR MASS SPECTROMETRY AND ION MOBILITY SPECTROMETRY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.02.2021 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 06.03.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 03.12.2019 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 13.10.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 10.08.2022 [2022/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states University of the Sciences in Philadelphia 600 South 43rd Street Philadelphia, PA 19104 / US | For all designated states Wayne State University 440 Burroughs Street Suite 200 Detroit, MI 48202 / US | [2013/28] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MCEWAN, Charles Nehemiah 28 Tenby Chase Drive Newark, DE 19711 / US | 02 /
TRIMPIN, Sarah 600 River Place Apt. 6609 Detroit, MI 48207 / US | 03 /
PAGNOTTI, Vincent Salvatore 800 Springbrook Avenue Moosic, PA 18507 / US | [2013/28] | Representative(s) | Long, Giorgio, et al Jacobacci & Partners S.p.A. Via Senato, 8 20121 Milano / IT | [2020/15] |
Former [2013/28] | Long, Giorgio, et al Jacobacci & Partners S.p.A. Via Senato 8 20121 Milano / IT | Application number, filing date | 11822641.4 | 01.09.2011 | [2020/15] | WO2011US50150 | Priority number, date | US201161493400P | 03.06.2011 Original published format: US 201161493400 P | US20100379475P | 02.09.2010 Original published format: US 379475 P | US201161446187P | 24.02.2011 Original published format: US 201161446187 P | US20100391248P | 08.10.2010 Original published format: US 391248 P | [2013/28] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2012031082 | Date: | 08.03.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/10] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2612345 | Date: | 10.07.2013 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.03.2012 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2013/28] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2612345 | Date: | 08.04.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/15] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 10.05.2012 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.11.2016 | Classification | IPC: | H01J49/04, H01J49/10 | [2016/51] | CPC: |
H01J49/10 (EP,US);
H01J49/0404 (EP,US);
H01J49/0468 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2013/28] | H01J49/26 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/28] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SYSTEM UND VERFAHREN ZUR IONISATION VON MOLEKÜLEN FÜR DIE MASSENSPEKTROMETRIE UND IONENMOBILITÄTSSPEKTROMETRIE | [2013/28] | English: | SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR IONIZATION OF MOLECULES FOR MASS SPECTROMETRY AND ION MOBILITY SPECTROMETRY | [2013/28] | French: | SYSTÈME ET PROCÉDÉ POUR IONISER DES MOLÉCULES POUR UNE SPECTROMÉTRIE DE MASSE ET UNE SPECTROMÉTRIE DE MOBILITÉ IONIQUE | [2013/28] | Entry into regional phase | 01.03.2013 | National basic fee paid | 01.03.2013 | Search fee paid | 01.03.2013 | Designation fee(s) paid | 01.03.2013 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 01.03.2013 | Examination requested [2013/28] | 08.06.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 17.10.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.02.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.12.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.02.2020 | Fee for grant paid | 28.02.2020 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 28.02.2020 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 17.10.2017 | Opposition(s) | 12.01.2021 | No opposition filed within time limit [2021/11] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.07.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.07.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.07.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 07.09.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.07.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 24.08.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 12.08.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 01.09.2011 | AL | 08.04.2020 | AT | 08.04.2020 | CY | 08.04.2020 | CZ | 08.04.2020 | DK | 08.04.2020 | EE | 08.04.2020 | ES | 08.04.2020 | FI | 08.04.2020 | HR | 08.04.2020 | IT | 08.04.2020 | LT | 08.04.2020 | LV | 08.04.2020 | MC | 08.04.2020 | MK | 08.04.2020 | MT | 08.04.2020 | NL | 08.04.2020 | PL | 08.04.2020 | RO | 08.04.2020 | RS | 08.04.2020 | SE | 08.04.2020 | SI | 08.04.2020 | SK | 08.04.2020 | SM | 08.04.2020 | TR | 08.04.2020 | BG | 08.07.2020 | NO | 08.07.2020 | GR | 09.07.2020 | IS | 08.08.2020 | PT | 17.08.2020 | IE | 01.09.2020 | LU | 01.09.2020 | BE | 30.09.2020 | CH | 30.09.2020 | LI | 30.09.2020 | [2022/32] |
Former [2022/27] | HU | 01.09.2011 | |
AL | 08.04.2020 | ||
AT | 08.04.2020 | ||
CY | 08.04.2020 | ||
CZ | 08.04.2020 | ||
DK | 08.04.2020 | ||
EE | 08.04.2020 | ||
ES | 08.04.2020 | ||
FI | 08.04.2020 | ||
HR | 08.04.2020 | ||
IT | 08.04.2020 | ||
LT | 08.04.2020 | ||
LV | 08.04.2020 | ||
MC | 08.04.2020 | ||
MT | 08.04.2020 | ||
NL | 08.04.2020 | ||
PL | 08.04.2020 | ||
RO | 08.04.2020 | ||
RS | 08.04.2020 | ||
SE | 08.04.2020 | ||
SI | 08.04.2020 | ||
SK | 08.04.2020 | ||
SM | 08.04.2020 | ||
TR | 08.04.2020 | ||
BG | 08.07.2020 | ||
NO | 08.07.2020 | ||
GR | 09.07.2020 | ||
IS | 08.08.2020 | ||
PT | 17.08.2020 | ||
IE | 01.09.2020 | ||
LU | 01.09.2020 | ||
BE | 30.09.2020 | ||
CH | 30.09.2020 | ||
LI | 30.09.2020 | ||
Former [2022/26] | AL | 08.04.2020 | |
AT | 08.04.2020 | ||
CZ | 08.04.2020 | ||
DK | 08.04.2020 | ||
EE | 08.04.2020 | ||
ES | 08.04.2020 | ||
FI | 08.04.2020 | ||
HR | 08.04.2020 | ||
IT | 08.04.2020 | ||
LT | 08.04.2020 | ||
LV | 08.04.2020 | ||
MC | 08.04.2020 | ||
NL | 08.04.2020 | ||
PL | 08.04.2020 | ||
RO | 08.04.2020 | ||
RS | 08.04.2020 | ||
SE | 08.04.2020 | ||
SI | 08.04.2020 | ||
SK | 08.04.2020 | ||
SM | 08.04.2020 | ||
TR | 08.04.2020 | ||
BG | 08.07.2020 | ||
NO | 08.07.2020 | ||
GR | 09.07.2020 | ||
IS | 08.08.2020 | ||
PT | 17.08.2020 | ||
IE | 01.09.2020 | ||
LU | 01.09.2020 | ||
BE | 30.09.2020 | ||
CH | 30.09.2020 | ||
LI | 30.09.2020 | ||
Former [2021/37] | AL | 08.04.2020 | |
AT | 08.04.2020 | ||
CZ | 08.04.2020 | ||
DK | 08.04.2020 | ||
EE | 08.04.2020 | ||
ES | 08.04.2020 | ||
FI | 08.04.2020 | ||
HR | 08.04.2020 | ||
IT | 08.04.2020 | ||
LT | 08.04.2020 | ||
LV | 08.04.2020 | ||
MC | 08.04.2020 | ||
NL | 08.04.2020 | ||
PL | 08.04.2020 | ||
RO | 08.04.2020 | ||
RS | 08.04.2020 | ||
SE | 08.04.2020 | ||
SI | 08.04.2020 | ||
SK | 08.04.2020 | ||
SM | 08.04.2020 | ||
BG | 08.07.2020 | ||
NO | 08.07.2020 | ||
GR | 09.07.2020 | ||
IS | 08.08.2020 | ||
PT | 17.08.2020 | ||
IE | 01.09.2020 | ||
LU | 01.09.2020 | ||
BE | 30.09.2020 | ||
CH | 30.09.2020 | ||
LI | 30.09.2020 | ||
Former [2021/36] | AL | 08.04.2020 | |
AT | 08.04.2020 | ||
CZ | 08.04.2020 | ||
DK | 08.04.2020 | ||
EE | 08.04.2020 | ||
ES | 08.04.2020 | ||
FI | 08.04.2020 | ||
HR | 08.04.2020 | ||
IT | 08.04.2020 | ||
LT | 08.04.2020 | ||
LV | 08.04.2020 | ||
MC | 08.04.2020 | ||
NL | 08.04.2020 | ||
PL | 08.04.2020 | ||
RO | 08.04.2020 | ||
RS | 08.04.2020 | ||
SE | 08.04.2020 | ||
SI | 08.04.2020 | ||
SK | 08.04.2020 | ||
SM | 08.04.2020 | ||
BG | 08.07.2020 | ||
NO | 08.07.2020 | ||
GR | 09.07.2020 | ||
IS | 08.08.2020 | ||
PT | 17.08.2020 | ||
LU | 01.09.2020 | ||
BE | 30.09.2020 | ||
Former [2021/27] | AL | 08.04.2020 | |
AT | 08.04.2020 | ||
CZ | 08.04.2020 | ||
DK | 08.04.2020 | ||
EE | 08.04.2020 | ||
ES | 08.04.2020 | ||
FI | 08.04.2020 | ||
HR | 08.04.2020 | ||
IT | 08.04.2020 | ||
LT | 08.04.2020 | ||
LV | 08.04.2020 | ||
MC | 08.04.2020 | ||
NL | 08.04.2020 | ||
PL | 08.04.2020 | ||
RO | 08.04.2020 | ||
RS | 08.04.2020 | ||
SE | 08.04.2020 | ||
SI | 08.04.2020 | ||
SK | 08.04.2020 | ||
SM | 08.04.2020 | ||
BG | 08.07.2020 | ||
NO | 08.07.2020 | ||
GR | 09.07.2020 | ||
IS | 08.08.2020 | ||
PT | 17.08.2020 | ||
LU | 01.09.2020 | ||
Former [2021/23] | AL | 08.04.2020 | |
AT | 08.04.2020 | ||
CZ | 08.04.2020 | ||
DK | 08.04.2020 | ||
EE | 08.04.2020 | ||
ES | 08.04.2020 | ||
FI | 08.04.2020 | ||
HR | 08.04.2020 | ||
IT | 08.04.2020 | ||
LT | 08.04.2020 | ||
LV | 08.04.2020 | ||
MC | 08.04.2020 | ||
NL | 08.04.2020 | ||
PL | 08.04.2020 | ||
RO | 08.04.2020 | ||
RS | 08.04.2020 | ||
SE | 08.04.2020 | ||
SI | 08.04.2020 | ||
SK | 08.04.2020 | ||
SM | 08.04.2020 | ||
BG | 08.07.2020 | ||
NO | 08.07.2020 | ||
GR | 09.07.2020 | ||
IS | 08.08.2020 | ||
PT | 17.08.2020 | ||
Former [2021/10] | AL | 08.04.2020 | |
AT | 08.04.2020 | ||
CZ | 08.04.2020 | ||
DK | 08.04.2020 | ||
EE | 08.04.2020 | ||
ES | 08.04.2020 | ||
FI | 08.04.2020 | ||
HR | 08.04.2020 | ||
IT | 08.04.2020 | ||
LT | 08.04.2020 | ||
LV | 08.04.2020 | ||
NL | 08.04.2020 | ||
PL | 08.04.2020 | ||
RO | 08.04.2020 | ||
RS | 08.04.2020 | ||
SE | 08.04.2020 | ||
SK | 08.04.2020 | ||
SM | 08.04.2020 | ||
BG | 08.07.2020 | ||
NO | 08.07.2020 | ||
GR | 09.07.2020 | ||
IS | 08.08.2020 | ||
PT | 17.08.2020 | ||
Former [2021/09] | AL | 08.04.2020 | |
AT | 08.04.2020 | ||
CZ | 08.04.2020 | ||
DK | 08.04.2020 | ||
EE | 08.04.2020 | ||
ES | 08.04.2020 | ||
FI | 08.04.2020 | ||
HR | 08.04.2020 | ||
IT | 08.04.2020 | ||
LT | 08.04.2020 | ||
LV | 08.04.2020 | ||
NL | 08.04.2020 | ||
RO | 08.04.2020 | ||
RS | 08.04.2020 | ||
SE | 08.04.2020 | ||
SM | 08.04.2020 | ||
BG | 08.07.2020 | ||
NO | 08.07.2020 | ||
GR | 09.07.2020 | ||
IS | 08.08.2020 | ||
PT | 17.08.2020 | ||
Former [2021/08] | AL | 08.04.2020 | |
DK | 08.04.2020 | ||
ES | 08.04.2020 | ||
FI | 08.04.2020 | ||
HR | 08.04.2020 | ||
LT | 08.04.2020 | ||
LV | 08.04.2020 | ||
NL | 08.04.2020 | ||
RO | 08.04.2020 | ||
RS | 08.04.2020 | ||
SE | 08.04.2020 | ||
SM | 08.04.2020 | ||
BG | 08.07.2020 | ||
NO | 08.07.2020 | ||
GR | 09.07.2020 | ||
IS | 08.08.2020 | ||
PT | 17.08.2020 | ||
Former [2021/04] | AL | 08.04.2020 | |
FI | 08.04.2020 | ||
HR | 08.04.2020 | ||
LT | 08.04.2020 | ||
LV | 08.04.2020 | ||
NL | 08.04.2020 | ||
RS | 08.04.2020 | ||
SE | 08.04.2020 | ||
BG | 08.07.2020 | ||
NO | 08.07.2020 | ||
GR | 09.07.2020 | ||
IS | 08.08.2020 | ||
PT | 17.08.2020 | ||
Former [2021/01] | FI | 08.04.2020 | |
HR | 08.04.2020 | ||
LT | 08.04.2020 | ||
LV | 08.04.2020 | ||
NL | 08.04.2020 | ||
RS | 08.04.2020 | ||
SE | 08.04.2020 | ||
BG | 08.07.2020 | ||
NO | 08.07.2020 | ||
GR | 09.07.2020 | ||
IS | 08.08.2020 | ||
PT | 17.08.2020 | ||
Former [2020/51] | FI | 08.04.2020 | |
HR | 08.04.2020 | ||
LT | 08.04.2020 | ||
LV | 08.04.2020 | ||
NL | 08.04.2020 | ||
RS | 08.04.2020 | ||
SE | 08.04.2020 | ||
NO | 08.07.2020 | ||
GR | 09.07.2020 | ||
IS | 08.08.2020 | ||
PT | 17.08.2020 | ||
Former [2020/50] | FI | 08.04.2020 | |
HR | 08.04.2020 | ||
LT | 08.04.2020 | ||
LV | 08.04.2020 | ||
NL | 08.04.2020 | ||
SE | 08.04.2020 | ||
NO | 08.07.2020 | ||
GR | 09.07.2020 | ||
IS | 08.08.2020 | ||
PT | 17.08.2020 | ||
Former [2020/48] | FI | 08.04.2020 | |
LT | 08.04.2020 | ||
NL | 08.04.2020 | ||
SE | 08.04.2020 | ||
NO | 08.07.2020 | ||
IS | 08.08.2020 | ||
PT | 17.08.2020 | ||
Former [2020/47] | LT | 08.04.2020 | |
NO | 08.07.2020 | ||
IS | 08.08.2020 | ||
Former [2020/46] | IS | 08.08.2020 | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US2005056776 (WILLOUGHBY ROSS C [US], et al) [X] 1-7,11,12,14,18-21 * abstract * * figure 1 * * paragraph [0049] * [I] 8-10,13,15-17,22; | [XI]US2004159784 (DOROSHENKO VLADIMIR M [US], et al) [X] 1-7,11,12,14,18-21 * abstract * * figure 4a * * claim 14 * [I] 8-10,13,15-17,22; | [XI]US2004007673 (COON JOSHUA J [US], et al) [X] 1-7,11,12,14,18-21 * abstract * * figure 1 * [I] 8-10,13,15-17,22; | [XI]WO2006081240 (UNIV GEORGE WASHINGTON [US], et al) [X] 1-7,11-14,18-22 * paragraphs [0059] , [0 63] * * abstract * * figure 1 * [I] 8-10,15-17; | [XI]US5818041 (MORDEHAI ALEXANDER [US], et al) [X] 1-4,8-12,14-21 * column 4, line 38 - column 5, line 19 * * abstract * * figure 1 * [I] 5-7,13,22; | [XI]US7034292 (WHITEHOUSE CRAIG M [US], et al) [X] 1-4,8-12,14-21 * abstract * * figure 1 * * column 25, line 36 - column 26, line 25 * [I] 5-7,13,22; | [XI]US2010090104 (SPLENDORE MAURIZIO A [US], et al) [X] 1-4,8-12,14-21 * paragraph [0026] * * abstract * * figure 1 * [I] 5-7,13,22; | [XI]US2009159794 (SCHLEIFER ARTHUR [US], et al) [X] 1-4,8-22 * paragraphs [0022] , [0 25] * * abstract * [I] 5-7 | International search | [Y]JP3379989B (WATERS INVESTMENT LTD.); | [Y]JP2006518914 (SCIENCE & ENGINEERING SERVICES INC.); | [Y]US5672868 (MORDEHAI ALEXANDER [US], et al); | [A]JP2004294453 (HITACHI LTD) | Examination | - Vincent S. Pagnotti ET AL, "Solvent Assisted Inlet Ionization: An Ultrasensitive New Liquid Introduction Ionization Method for Mass Spectrometry", Analytical Chemistry, US, (20110429), vol. 83, no. 11, doi:10.1021/ac200556z, ISSN 0003-2700, pages 3981 - 3985, XP055414638 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/ac200556z | - PAGE J S ET AL, "Biases in Ion Transmission Through an Electrospray Ionization-Mass Spectrometry Capillary Inlet", JOURNAL OF THE AMERICAN SOCIETY FOR MASS SPECTROMETRY, ELSEVIER SCIENCE INC, US, vol. 20, no. 12, doi:10.1016/J.JASMS.2009.08.018, ISSN 1044-0305, (20091201), pages 2265 - 2272, (20090902), XP026766409 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.jasms.2009.08.018 | - TANG K ET AL, "Charge competition and the linear dynamic range of detection in electrospray ionization mass spectrometry", JOURNAL OF THE AMERICAN SOCIETY FOR MASS SPECTROME, ELSEVIER SCIENCE INC, US, (20041001), vol. 15, no. 10, doi:10.1016/J.JASMS.2004.04.034, ISSN 1044-0305, pages 1416 - 1423, XP004588886 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.jasms.2004.04.034 |