EP2632720 - METHOD FOR PRODUCING A MULTILAYER STRUCTURE COMPRISING AN ADHESIVE COMPOSITION BASED ON AN AMYLACEOUS MATERIAL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 02.09.2016 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.09.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 05.10.2016 [2016/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Roquette Frères 62136 Lestrem / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2013/36] | For all designated states Roquette Freres 62136 Lestrem / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
COUDYSER, Laurie 15 rue Jules Guesde F-59590 Raismes / FR | 02 /
MONNET, Jean-Luc 41 rue Puebla - Etage 2 F-59000 Lille / FR | [2013/36] | Representative(s) | Plasseraud IP 104 Rue de Richelieu CS92104 75080 Paris Cedex 02 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2013/36] | Cabinet Plasseraud 52, rue de la Victoire 75440 Paris Cedex 09 / FR | Application number, filing date | 11824266.8 | 27.10.2011 | WO2011FR52518 | Priority number, date | FR20100058838 | 27.10.2010 Original published format: FR 1058838 | [2013/36] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2012056183 | Date: | 03.05.2012 | Language: | FR | [2012/18] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2632720 | Date: | 04.09.2013 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.05.2012 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2013/36] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 28.06.2012 | Classification | IPC: | B32B15/085, B32B27/08, B32B29/00, C09J103/00, C09J151/06, C09J123/10, B32B7/10, C09J123/12, C09J11/06 | [2013/36] | CPC: |
B32B7/12 (EP,US);
B32B15/08 (EP,US);
B32B15/088 (EP,US);
B32B27/08 (EP,US);
B32B27/32 (EP,US);
B32B9/02 (EP,US);
B32B9/041 (EP,US);
C08G18/0895 (EP,US);
C08G18/6484 (EP,US);
C08L3/02 (EP,US);
C09J103/00 (EP,US);
C09J103/02 (EP,US);
C09J123/10 (EP,US);
C09J5/06 (US);
C09J7/20 (EP,US);
C09J7/38 (EP,US);
C08L2205/02 (EP,US);
C08L23/10 (EP,US);
C08L51/06 (EP,US);
C09J2400/163 (EP,US);
C09J2400/226 (EP,US);
C09J2403/00 (EP,US);
C09J2423/10 (EP,US);
C09J2451/00 (EP,US);
Y10T428/2883 (EP,US)
(-)
| C-Set: |
C09J103/02, C08L3/02, C08L23/10, C08L51/06 (US,EP);
C09J123/10, C08L3/02, C08L51/06 (US,EP);
C09J2403/00, C09J2423/10, C09J2451/00 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/36] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINER MEHRSCHICHTIGEN STRUKTUR MIT EINER KLEBSTOFFZUSAMMENSETZUNG AUF BASIS EINES STÄRKEHALTIGEN MATERIALS | [2013/36] | English: | METHOD FOR PRODUCING A MULTILAYER STRUCTURE COMPRISING AN ADHESIVE COMPOSITION BASED ON AN AMYLACEOUS MATERIAL | [2013/36] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION DE STRUCTURE MULTICOUCHE COMPRENANT UNE COMPOSITION ADHÉSIVE À BASE DE MATIÈRE AMYLACÉE | [2013/36] | Entry into regional phase | 22.05.2013 | National basic fee paid | 22.05.2013 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.05.2013 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.05.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 22.05.2013 | Examination requested [2013/36] | 03.05.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2016/40] | 25.05.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2016/40] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.09.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.09.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2015 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]JPS58138643 ; | [A]US5510401 (DEHENNAU CLAUDE [BE], et al) [A] 1-21 * abstract ** column 6, line 15 - line 17; claim - *; | [A]WO2006042364 (PLANTIC TECHNOLOGIES LTD [AU], et al) [A] 1-26 * abstract *; | [X]WO2009022195 (CEREPLAST INC [US], et al) [X] 1-26 * paragraphs [0051] , [0053] , [0054]; claim -; table 2 *; | [A] - DATABASE WPI, 0, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 1983, no. 39, Database accession no. 1983-773178, XP002639603 & JPS58138643 A 19830817 (SANKYO ALUMINIUM IND CO LTD) [A] 1-21 * abstract * | by applicant | US5362777 | WO2009022195 | - "Structure et morphologie du grain d'amidon", S. PEREZ, Initiation à la chimie et à la physico- chimie macromoléculaires, GROUPE FRANçAIS D'ETUDES ET D'APPLICATIONS DES POLYMèRES, (2000), vol. 13, pages 41 - 86 |