EP2618298 - COORDINATED INFORMATION COLLECTION SYSTEM, COORDINATED INFORMATION COLLECTION METHOD AND PROGRAM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 22.02.2019 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 16.11.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.02.2019 | Withdrawal of application | published on 27.03.2019 [2019/13] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NEC Corporation 7-1, Shiba 5-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 108-8001 / JP | [2013/30] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KAMI, Nobuharu c/o NEC Corporation 7-1, Shiba 5-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 108-8001 / JP | [2013/30] | Representative(s) | MacDougall, Alan John Shaw, et al Mathys & Squire The Shard 32 London Bridge Street London SE1 9SG / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2013/30] | MacDougall, Alan John Shaw, et al Mathys & Squire LLP 120 Holborn London EC1N 2SQ / GB | Application number, filing date | 11824955.6 | 25.08.2011 | WO2011JP69157 | Priority number, date | JP20100204609 | 13.09.2010 Original published format: JP 2010204609 | [2013/30] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2012035947 | Date: | 22.03.2012 | Language: | JA | [2012/12] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2618298 | Date: | 24.07.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/30] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 22.03.2012 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.03.2016 | Classification | IPC: | G06Q50/00 | [2013/30] | CPC: |
G06Q10/107 (EP,US);
H04L41/08 (EP,US);
G06Q50/01 (EP,US);
H04L41/04 (US);
H04L41/12 (EP,US);
H04L43/0811 (EP,US);
H04L43/0817 (EP,US);
H04L51/52 (EP,US);
H04L63/14 (EP,US);
H04W4/21 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/30] | Title | German: | SYSTEM FÜR KOORDINIERTE INFORMATIONSSAMMLUNG, VERFAHREN FÜR KOORDINIERTE INFORMATIONSSAMMLUNG UND PROGRAMM DAFÜR | [2013/30] | English: | COORDINATED INFORMATION COLLECTION SYSTEM, COORDINATED INFORMATION COLLECTION METHOD AND PROGRAM | [2013/30] | French: | SYSTÈME DE COLLECTE D'INFORMATIONS COORDONNÉES, PROCÉDÉ DE COLLECTE D'INFORMATIONS COORDONNÉES ET PROGRAMME | [2013/30] | Entry into regional phase | 15.01.2013 | Translation filed | 15.01.2013 | National basic fee paid | 15.01.2013 | Search fee paid | 15.01.2013 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.01.2013 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.01.2013 | Examination requested [2013/30] | 25.10.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 16.11.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.02.2019 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2019/13] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 16.11.2018 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.08.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.08.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.08.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.08.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 14.08.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 10.08.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2006224671 (MIYATA TATSUHIKO [JP], et al) [A] 1-10* the whole document *; | [A]US2009235176 (JAYANTHI MADHAVI [US]) [A] 1-10 * the whole document *; | [I]US2009259441 (YOSHIKAI NORIAKI [JP], et al) [I] 1-10 * abstract * * paragraph [0001] - paragraph [0032] * * paragraph [0075] - paragraph [0130] *; | [I]US2010205254 (HAM KEVIN [CA]) [I] 1-10 * abstract * * paragraph [0001] - paragraph [0013] * * paragraph [0018] - paragraph [0057] * | International search | [A]JP2004274309 (SONY ERICSSON MOBILE COMM JP); | [A]JP2008311844 (NIPPON TELEGRAPH & TELEPHONE); | [T] - NOBUHARU KAMI ET AL., "Information dissemination Network for Real Space Social Networking Services", 2011 NEN THE INSTITUTE OF ELECTRONICS, INFORMATION AND COMMUNICATION ENGINEERS SOGO TAIKAI, (201103), page 224, XP008171050 | [A] - TAKASHI MISHINA, "MANET Forensics ni Okeru Bloom Filter ni yoru Koritsuteki na Shoko Kaiseki Shuho", SYMPOSIUM ON MULTIMEDIA, DISTRIBUTED, COOPERATIVE AND MOBILE SYSTEMS (DICOM02009) RONBUNSHU, IPSJ SYMPOSIUM SERIES, (20090701), vol. 2009, no. 1, pages 815 - 822, XP008171384 |