EP2590207 - DICING FILM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 10.06.2016 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.06.2016 | Withdrawal of application | published on 13.07.2016 [2016/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sumitomo Bakelite Company Limited 5-8 Higashi-shinagawa 2-chome Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 140-0002 / JP | [2013/19] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MARUYAMA Kazuhiko c/o SUMITOMO BAKELITE CO. LTD. 5-8 Higashi-Shinagawa 2-chome Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 140-0002 / JP | 02 /
ISOBE Masatoshi c/o SUMITOMO BAKELITE CO. LTD. 5-8 Higashi-Shinagawa 2-chome Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 140-0002 / JP | [2013/19] | Representative(s) | Ilgart, Jean-Christophe, et al BREVALEX 95, Rue d'Amsterdam 75378 Paris Cedex 8 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2013/19] | Ilgart, Jean-Christophe, et al BREVALEX 95 rue d'Amsterdam 75378 Paris Cedex 8 / FR | Application number, filing date | 11825151.1 | 13.09.2011 | WO2011JP70847 | Priority number, date | JP20100220410 | 30.09.2010 Original published format: JP 2010220410 | JP20100204062 | 13.09.2010 Original published format: JP 2010204062 | [2013/19] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2012036149 | Date: | 22.03.2012 | Language: | JA | [2012/12] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2590207 | Date: | 08.05.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/19] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 22.03.2012 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.07.2014 | Classification | IPC: | H01L21/301, C08J5/18, H01L21/683, C09J7/02, C09J153/02, C08L53/02 | [2014/34] | CPC: |
H01L21/6836 (EP,KR,US);
C08L25/14 (EP,KR,US);
C08L53/02 (EP,US);
C08L53/025 (EP,KR,US);
C09J153/02 (EP,KR,US);
C09J7/24 (EP,KR,US);
H01L21/4896 (KR);
H01L21/78 (KR);
C09J2203/326 (EP,US);
C09J2301/414 (EP,US);
C09J2409/006 (EP,US);
C09J2425/006 (EP,US);
C09J2433/006 (EP,US);
H01L2221/68327 (EP,US);
H01L2221/68336 (EP,US);
Y10T428/28 (EP,US)
(-)
| C-Set: |
C08L25/14, C08L53/02 (US,EP);
C08L25/14, C08L53/025 (US,EP);
C08L53/025, C08L25/06 (US,EP);
C08L53/02, C08L25/14 (US,EP); |
Former IPC [2013/19] | H01L21/301, C08J5/18 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/19] | Title | German: | SCHNEIDEN VON FILMEN | [2013/19] | English: | DICING FILM | [2013/19] | French: | FILM DE DÉCOUPAGE EN PUCES | [2013/19] | Entry into regional phase | 30.01.2013 | Translation filed | 30.01.2013 | National basic fee paid | 30.01.2013 | Search fee paid | 30.01.2013 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.01.2013 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.01.2013 | Examination requested [2013/19] | 13.02.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 08.06.2016 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2016/28] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.08.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.08.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.08.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0520515 (FURUKAWA ELECTRIC CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1-5 * abstract * * page 4, lines 31-34 * * page 4, line 57 - page 5, line 11 *; | [X]WO2009119515 (LINTEC CORP [JP], et al) [X] 1,2 * abstract * * figure 1 * * paragraphs [0029] , [0 78] *; | [P]US2011039065 (MORIOKA TAKASHI [JP], et al) [P] * abstract * * figure 1 * * paragraphs [0029] , [0 78] *; | [T] - "SAFETY DATA SHEET (HYBRAR 7125)", (20101201), URL: http://www.kuraray.co.jp/en/products/msds/pdf/h7125.pdf, (20140710), XP055128268 [T] 3 * page 2, section 3 "Composition / Information on Ingredients" * | International search | [Y]JP2004035644 (SUMITOMO BAKELITE CO); | [X]JP2005248018 (FURUKAWA ELECTRIC CO LTD); | [A]JP2008294044 (GUNZE KK); | [Y]WO2009063793 (FURUKAWA ELECTRIC CO LTD [JP], et al) | by applicant | JP2003257893 |