EP2618300 - DIGITAL CONTENT CREATION AND RESTORATION METHOD, AND COMPUTER-READABLE RECORDING MEDIUM FOR RECORDING PROGRAM FOR SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 14.08.2015 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.08.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 16.09.2015 [2015/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Lim, Chang-Soo B1 95 Mangwon-ro, Mapo-gu Seoul 127-827 / KR | [2014/04] |
Former [2013/30] | For all designated states Lim, Chang-Soo 101-1503-Ho Daewoo Iaan 54 Yanpyeong-dong 3-ga Yeongdeungpo-gu Seoul 150-103 / KR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2013/30] | Representative(s) | Stolmár & Partner Patentanwälte PartG mbB Blumenstrasse 17 80331 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2013/30] | Stolmár & Partner Blumenstrasse 17 80331 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 11825358.2 | 02.09.2011 | WO2011KR06520 | Priority number, date | KR20100109595 | 05.11.2010 Original published format: KR 20100109595 | KR20100090944 | 16.09.2010 Original published format: KR 20100090944 | [2013/30] | Filing language | KO | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2012036398 | Date: | 22.03.2012 | Language: | KO | [2012/12] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2618300 | Date: | 24.07.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/30] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 10.05.2012 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.08.2014 | Classification | IPC: | G06K19/06 | [2014/36] | CPC: |
G06K19/06037 (EP,US);
G06F16/683 (US);
G06K7/10544 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2013/30] | G06Q50/00, G06F3/12 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/30] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR ERZEUGUNG UND WIEDERHERSTELLUNG DIGITALER INHALTE SOWIE COMPUTERLESBARES AUFZEICHNUNGSMEDIUM ZUR AUFZEICHNUNG EINES PROGRAMMS DAFÜR | [2013/30] | English: | DIGITAL CONTENT CREATION AND RESTORATION METHOD, AND COMPUTER-READABLE RECORDING MEDIUM FOR RECORDING PROGRAM FOR SAME | [2013/30] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE CRÉATION ET DE RESTAURATION DE CONTENUS NUMÉRIQUES ET SUPPORT D'ENREGISTREMENT LISIBLE PAR ORDINATEUR POUR L'ENREGISTREMENT D'UN PROGRAMME À CET EFFET | [2013/30] | Entry into regional phase | 15.04.2013 | Translation filed | 15.04.2013 | National basic fee paid | 15.04.2013 | Search fee paid | 15.04.2013 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.04.2013 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.04.2013 | Examination requested [2013/30] | 03.03.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2015/38] | 14.04.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2015/38] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.09.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.09.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US5369261 (SHAMIR HARRY [US]) [X] 1-3,5-8,10-12 * column 8, line 20 - line 52; figure 7 * * column 17, line 24 - line 48 * * column 20, line 22 - column 21, line 2 * [I] 4,9; | [X]US2002028015 (TACK-DON HAN [KR], et al) [X] 3-12 * paragraph [0034] - paragraph [0040]; figure 1 * * paragraph [0064] - paragraph [0074] *; | [XI]GB2379550 (DYER BARRINGTON [GB]) [X] 3,4,6-9,11,12 * the whole document * [I] 5,10; | [XI]US2004246529 (PRUDEN BENNY J [US], et al) [X] 3,4,6-9,11,12 * abstract * * paragraph [0034] - paragraph [0040] * [I] 5,10; | [X] - Leszek Chmielewski, "HexCheck: The Hexadecimal OCR output reader", (20081227), pages 1 - 5, URL: http://members.inode.at/838331/pc/HexCheck.pdf, (20140722), XP055130860 [X] 1,2 * 01 WTF is HexCheck? * | [IP] - Anonymous, "QR code - Wikipedia, the free encyclopedia", (20101104), URL: http://en.wikipedia.org/w/index.php?title=QR_code&oldid=394775941, (20140722), XP055130863 [IP] 3-12 * the whole document * | International search | [A]EP1548635 (YOSHIDA KENJI [JP]); | [Y]KR100758445B (LIMTTED LIABILITY COMPANY ADEU.NEK); | [Y]JP2009015940 (SCITEC KK, et al); | [A]KR100919841B (YOSHIDA, KENJI) |