EP2617338 - AUTOMATED SYSTEM FOR CLEANING A BUILDING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 18.09.2015 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.09.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 21.10.2015 [2015/43] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Obschestvo S Ogranichennoy Otvetstvennostju Kompaniya "Norkpalm" Ul. Ryabinovaya 61A Moscow 121471 / RU | [2013/30] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BONDAREV, Vladimir Lvovich ul. Arkhitektora Vlasova 18-139 Moscow 117343 / RU | 02 /
DOMNIN, Pavel Nikolaevich ul. Garibaldi 28/1-24 Moscow 117393 / RU | 03 /
NIKULINA, Elena Ivanovna ul. Arkhitektora Vlasova 18-139 Moscow 117343 / RU | [2013/30] | Representative(s) | Andrae Westendorp Patentanwälte Partnerschaft Uhlandstrasse 2 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2014/24] | Andrae Westendorp Uhlandstrasse 2 80336 München / DE | ||
Former [2013/30] | Andrae, Steffen, et al Andrae Flach Haug Balanstrasse 55 81541 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 11825510.8 | 02.06.2011 | WO2011RU00382 | Priority number, date | RU20100138047 | 14.09.2010 Original published format: RU 2010138047 | RU20100138171 | 15.09.2010 Original published format: RU 2010138171 | [2013/30] | Filing language | RU | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2012036586 | Date: | 22.03.2012 | Language: | RU | [2012/12] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2617338 | Date: | 24.07.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/30] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | RU | 22.03.2012 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.07.2014 | Classification | IPC: | A47L9/00, A47B95/00 | [2014/34] | CPC: |
A47L9/009 (EP);
A47L2201/00 (EP);
A47L2201/02 (EP);
A47L2201/022 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2013/30] | A47L9/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/30] | Title | German: | AUTOMATISIERTES SYSTEM ZUR REINIGUNG EINES GEBÄUDES | [2013/30] | English: | AUTOMATED SYSTEM FOR CLEANING A BUILDING | [2013/30] | French: | SYSTÈME AUTOMATIQUE DE NETTOYAGE DE LOCAUX | [2013/30] | Entry into regional phase | 20.03.2013 | Translation filed | 20.03.2013 | National basic fee paid | 20.03.2013 | Search fee paid | 20.03.2013 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.03.2013 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.03.2013 | Examination requested [2013/30] | 05.02.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 29.04.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2015/43] | 03.06.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the invitation to file a copy of earlier search results or a statement of non-availability not received in time [2015/43] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.12.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.06.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2013 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   12.12.2013 | 30.06.2015 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]BG1353U (GEORGIEV VALENTIN [BG]) [X] 1-3 * figure - * [A] 4-14; | [A]US5377106 (DRUNK GERHARD [DE], et al) [A] 1-14 * column 6, line 62 - column 7, line 10 *; | [A]WO2004004534 (KAERCHER GMBH & CO KG ALFRED [DE], et al) [A] 1-14 * page 9, paragraph 8 - page 10, paragraph 1 *; | [A]US2006087273 (KO JANG-YOUN [KR], et al) [A] 1-14 * paragraphs [0031] , [0032] *; | [A]DE202005015610U (ALNO AG [DE]) [A] 1-14 * abstract *; | [A]GB2337695 (UNIV SHEFFIELD [GB], et al) [A] 1-14 * abstract * | International search | [Y]WO2004004534 (KAERCHER GMBH & CO KG ALFRED [DE], et al); | [Y]RU18416U (PODYMOV OLEG VLADIMIROVICH); | [Y]SU698076 (ABRAMOV VALENTIN A [SU], et al); | [Y]RU2357644 (SAMSUNG KWANGJU ELECTRONICS CO [KR]) | by applicant | RU2357644 | RU2350252 | RU2338639 | RU2321879 | RU2311868 | RU2303387 | US2009049640 | EP1842474 | GB2414167 | US7332890 | US7555363 | JP2007181656 |