EP2593640 - PRESSURE BALANCING PROPPANT ADDITION METHOD AND APPARATUS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 20.09.2013 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.09.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 23.10.2013 [2013/43] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Gasfrac Energy Services Inc. 101-6th Avenue S. W. Suite 850 Calgary, Alberta T2P 3P4 / CA | [2013/21] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ROBERTS, Robbie Suite 850 101-6th Ave SW Calgary, Alberta T2P 3P4 / CA | [2013/21] | Representative(s) | Rankin, Douglas Marks & Clerk LLP Aurora 120 Bothwell Street Glasgow G2 7JS / GB | [2013/21] | Application number, filing date | 11826272.4 | 16.09.2011 | WO2011CA50570 | Priority number, date | US20100383934P | 17.09.2010 Original published format: US 383934 P | [2013/21] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2012037676 | Date: | 29.03.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/13] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2593640 | Date: | 22.05.2013 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.03.2012 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2013/21] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CA | 29.03.2012 | Classification | IPC: | E21B43/267 | [2013/21] | CPC: |
E21B43/267 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/21] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR ZUGABE EINES DRUCKAUSGLEICHS-STÜTZMITTELS | [2013/23] | English: | PRESSURE BALANCING PROPPANT ADDITION METHOD AND APPARATUS | [2013/21] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET APPAREIL D'AJOUT D'AGENT DE SOUTÈNEMENT À ÉQUILIBRAGE DE PRESSION | [2013/21] | Entry into regional phase | 03.04.2013 | National basic fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.04.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2013/43] | 27.05.2013 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: filing fee / search fee not paid in time [2013/43] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]US2007204991 (LOREE, D.N. ET AL.); | [Y]US5899272 (LOREE, D.N.); | [A]US2007137862 (STEPHENSON, S. ET AL.); | [A]CA2649203 (FORDYCE, V. ET AL); | [A]US2004206495 (LEHMAN, L.V. ET AL.); | [A]CA2715622 (SMITH, H. ET AL.); | [A]CA2648265 (ROBINSON, L.R. ET AL.) |