EP2619367 - A PAPER OR PAPERBOARD PRODUCT AND A PROCESS FOR PRODUCTION OF A PAPER OR PAPERBOARD PRODUCT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 21.08.2015 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.08.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 23.09.2015 [2015/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Stora Enso Oyj Kanavaranta 1 00101 Helsinki / FI | [2013/31] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
AXRUP, Lars Lövnäsvägen 12 S-66341 Hammarö / SE | 02 /
HEISKANEN, Isto Kanava-aukio 10 as 13-14 FI-55100 Imatra / FI | 03 /
BACKFOLK, Kaj Valto Käkelän katu 5 as 3 FI-53130 Villmanstrand / FI | 04 /
RIIKONEN, Mika Takamaankatu 22 FI-53300 Lappeenranta / FI | [2013/31] | Representative(s) | Lindberg, Berndt Ake Stora Enso AB Group Intellectual Property Box 9090 650 09 Karlstad / SE | [2013/31] | Application number, filing date | 11827055.2 | 19.09.2011 | WO2011SE51123 | Priority number, date | SE20100050985 | 22.09.2010 Original published format: SE 1050985 | [2013/31] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2012039668 | Date: | 29.03.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/13] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2619367 | Date: | 31.07.2013 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.03.2012 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2013/31] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | SE | 29.03.2012 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.09.2014 | Classification | IPC: | D21H11/18, D21C9/00, D21H17/20, D21H21/00, D21H21/18, D21H11/20, D21H17/24, D21H17/25, D21H17/29, D21H17/42, D21H17/44 | [2014/44] | CPC: |
D21H21/18 (EP,US);
D21C9/007 (SE);
D21H17/24 (US);
D21H11/18 (EP,SE,US);
D21H17/20 (SE);
D21H21/00 (SE);
D21H11/20 (EP,US);
D21H17/25 (EP,US);
D21H17/29 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2013/31] | D21H11/18, D21C9/00, D21H17/20, D21H21/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/31] | Title | German: | PAPIER- ODER PAPPEPRODUKT UND VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINES PAPIER- ODER PAPPEPRODUKTS | [2013/31] | English: | A PAPER OR PAPERBOARD PRODUCT AND A PROCESS FOR PRODUCTION OF A PAPER OR PAPERBOARD PRODUCT | [2013/31] | French: | PRODUIT DE PAPIER OU DE CARTON ET PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION DE PRODUIT DE PAPIER OU DE CARTON | [2013/31] | Entry into regional phase | 22.04.2013 | National basic fee paid | 22.04.2013 | Search fee paid | 22.04.2013 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.04.2013 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.04.2013 | Examination requested [2013/31] | 01.04.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2015/39] | 06.05.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2015/39] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.09.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.2014 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US5061346 (TAGGART THOMAS E [US], et al); | [X]WO2006041401 (STORA ENSO AB [SE], et al); | [XAI]WO2009123560 (STFI PACKFORSK AB [SE], et al); | [XP]WO2011048000 (BASF SE [DE], et al) | International search | [A]GB2066145 (ITT); | [A]JPS58197400 (DAICEL LTD); | [A]US2003188840 (VAN HANDEL JOSEPH DONALD [US], et al); | [A]EP1835075 (WEYERHAEUSER CO [US]); | [A]US2007224419 (SUMNICHT DANIEL W [US], et al); | [A]WO2008076056 (AKZO NOBEL NV [NL], et al); | [X]WO2010092239 (UPM KYMMENE OYJ [FI], et al); | [XP]WO2011042604 (UPM KYMMENE CORP [FI], et al); | [XP]WO2011048000 (BASF SE [DE], et al) |